Video Software Dealers Association et al v. Schwarzenegger et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs Video Software Dealers Association and Entertainment Software Association sought declaratory and injunctive relief against enforcement of a California statute that penalizes the sale or rental of \"violent\" video games to persons under the age of 18.

Plaintiff: Entertainment Software Association and Video Software Dealers Association
Defendant: Richard Doyle, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Bill Lockyer, Ann Miller Ravel, George Kennedy and Edmund G. Brown, Jr.
Amicus: Common Sense Media
Case Number: 5:2005cv04188
Filed: October 17, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Los Angeles
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2007 132 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER 131 to Continue Hearing on Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/18/07. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2007)
October 17, 2007 131
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Continue Hearing on Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Video Software Dealers Association, Entertainment Software Association. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 10/17/2007)
October 5, 2007 130
Supplemental Declaration of Ethan D. Dettmer in Support of 128 Reply to Opposition filed by Video Software Dealers Association, Entertainment Software Association. (Related document(s)128) (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 10/5/2007) Modified text on 10/10/2007 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2007 127
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arnold Schwarzenegger, Bill Lockyer re 126 Exhibits, 123 Declaration in Support, 121 Declaration in Support, 120 Memorandum in Opposition, 125 Exhibits, 124 Exhibits, 122 Request for Judicial Notice Proof of Service (Gevercer, Steven) (Filed on 9/28/2007)
September 25, 2007 118
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition to 109 Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Richard Doyle. (Fabela, Robert) (Filed on 9/25/2007) Modified on 10/1/2007 to link entry to document #109 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
September 5, 2007 113
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 107 Judgment, 58 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 106 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, by Arnold Schwarzenegger, Edmund G. Brown, Jr. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 54611001655. (Representation Statement attached) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/5/2007 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2007 108
NOTICE by Video Software Dealers Association, Entertainment Software Association Notice of Entry of Judgment (Lyon, Hervey) (Filed on 8/15/2007)
August 14, 2007 107
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Whyte on 8/14/07. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2007)
August 6, 2007 106 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Whyte on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment 70 74 90 (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2007)
March 30, 2007 102 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 99 100 101 Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2007)
May 12, 2006 98
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/12/2006 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 5/12/2006) re 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Video Software Dealers Association,, Entertainment Software Association,, 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bill Lockyer,, Arnold Schwarzenegger,, 90 MOTION to Strike Brief of Amicus Curiae Common Sense Media filed by Video Software Dealers Association,, Entertainment Software Association,. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/12/2006)
May 5, 2006 97
Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike CSM Amicus Brief filed byVideo Software Dealers Association, Entertainment Software Association. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 5/5/2006)
May 4, 2006 96 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER to Change Time in Connection with Motion to Strike. Motion Hearing set for 5/12/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/4/06. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2006)
May 3, 2006 95
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Common Sense Media re 94 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 5/3/2006)
April 28, 2006 93
REPLY to Response to Motion for Summary Judgment filed byVideo Software Dealers Association, Entertainment Software Association. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 4/28/2006)
April 24, 2006 91
Proposed Order re 90 MOTION to Strike Brief of Amicus Curiae Common Sense Media by Video Software Dealers Association, Entertainment Software Association. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 4/24/2006)
March 31, 2006 75
Proposed Order re 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Video Software Dealers Association, Entertainment Software Association. (Minnery, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/31/2006)
March 30, 2006 73
Declaration of Zackery P. Morazzini filed byArnold Schwarzenegger, Bill Lockyer. (Morazzini, Zackery) (Filed on 3/30/2006)
March 16, 2006 69 Opinion or Order of the Court
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Motion Hearing on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment set for 5/12/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Terminated Case Management Conference Hearing set for 3/17/06 @ 10:30 am. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/16/06. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2006)
March 10, 2006 68
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Video Software Dealers Association, Entertainment Software Association. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 3/10/2006)
March 6, 2006 67 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER deeming application 59 of Common Sense Media to participate as amicus curiae submitted on the papers; ORDER granting Common Sense Media leave to file amicus brief. Signed by Judge Whyte on 3/6/2006. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2006)
February 24, 2006 66
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (Morazzini, Zackery) (Filed on 2/24/2006)
February 7, 2006 62
Memorandum in Opposition to Application of Common Sense Media for Leave to Participate in Action as Amicus Curiae 59 filed byVideo Software Dealers Association, Entertainment Software Association. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 2/7/2006)
February 1, 2006 61
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Common Sense Media re 59 Amicus Curiae Appearance, 60 Declaration in Support, (Radford, Francine) (Filed on 2/1/2006)
December 21, 2005 58 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 5 Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2005)
December 19, 2005 56
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/9/2005 before Ronald M. Whyte re 19 Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearing on Preliminary Injunction; Declaration of Kathryn Zoglin; Proposed Order filed by George Kennedy,, Ann Miller Ravel,, 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Video Software Dealers Association,, Entertainment Software Association,. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF)
December 7, 2005 51
Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice 42 filed byVideo Software Dealers Association, Entertainment Software Association. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 12/7/2005)
December 5, 2005 50
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by David Michael Rollo (Rollo, David) (Filed on 12/5/2005)
December 2, 2005 48
Joinder re 27 Memorandum in Opposition, 28 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunctions by Richard Doyle, Richard Doyle. (Fabela, Robert) (Filed on 12/2/2005)
December 1, 2005 47
Proposed Order Denying In Part Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice by Arnold Schwarzenegger, Bill Lockyer. (Morazzini, Zackery) (Filed on 12/1/2005)
November 23, 2005 43
Proposed Order re 41 Reply Memorandum , Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by Video Software Dealers Association, Entertainment Software Association. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 11/23/2005)
November 21, 2005 40
ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief byRichard Doyle. (Fabela, Robert) (Filed on 11/21/2005)
November 16, 2005 38
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arnold Schwarzenegger, Bill Lockyer Supplemental (Morazzini, Zackery) (Filed on 11/16/2005)
November 15, 2005 37 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER by George Kennedy, Ann Miller Ravel. (Zoglin, Kathryn) (Filed on 11/15/2005)
November 10, 2005 29 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 19 Ex Parte Application to continue hearing to December 9, 2005 (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2005)
November 9, 2005 23
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arnold Schwarzenegger, Bill Lockyer Exhibit A and Appendices A-E (Morazzini, Zackery) (Filed on 11/9/2005)
November 8, 2005 21
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Video Software Dealers Association, Entertainment Software Association re 20 Memorandum in Opposition, (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 11/8/2005)
November 7, 2005 19
Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearing on Preliminary Injunction; Declaration of Kathryn Zoglin; Proposed Order filed by George Kennedy, Ann Miller Ravel. (Zoglin, Kathryn) (Filed on 11/7/2005)
October 17, 2005 4
APPLICATION of Katherine A. Fallow for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (fee paid) filed by Video Software Dealers Association, Entertainment Software Association. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2005 (dhm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Video Software Dealers Association et al v. Schwarzenegger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Doyle
Represented By: Robert R. Fabela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger
Represented By: Zackery P. Morazzini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Lockyer
Represented By: Zackery P. Morazzini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Miller Ravel
Represented By: David Michael Rollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Kennedy
Represented By: David Michael Rollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Edward Krueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Entertainment Software Association
Represented By: Amy L. Tenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Video Software Dealers Association
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Common Sense Media
Represented By: Keith E. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?