Nelson v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Vickie F. Nelson
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 5:2007cv01810
Filed: March 30, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull Denying 16 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Granting 20 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
October 18, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 to Remove Status Conference. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 10/18/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
September 27, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER re 46 to Continue Status Conference. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 9/27/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 9/27/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie F. Nelson
Represented By: Harvey Peter Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: Sarah Lynn Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?