Estate of Gurmit Singh et al v. City of Gilroy et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Gurmit Singh, Paramjit Kaur, S.K. and A.S.
Defendant: City Of Gilroy, Denise Turner, Scot Smithee, Rodriguez, Stanford, Jaquez and Heath
Case Number: 5:2009cv00740
Filed: February 19, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER GRANTING PETITION TO COMPROMISE CLAIM OF MINORS re 198 Amended Document filed by Estate of Gurmit Singh, 197 Notice (Other) filed by Estate of Gurmit Singh. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/31/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 194 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING REQUEST VACATING PRIOR ORDER TO FILE PROPOSED JUDGMENT re 193 Proposed Order. The parties shall file a brief joint statement updating the court on the progress of the settlement by 6/22/2012 unless a request for dismissal has been submitted prior to that date. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/22/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
May 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 192 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Extension of Time to File Proposed Judgment re 191 Proposed Order. Proposed Judgment due 5/25/2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/4/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER RE: PROPOSED JUDGMENT. This action having been tried before a jury and verdict having been rendered accordingly, the court hereby orders that Plaintiffs shall submit to the court a proposed form of judgment on or before 5/4/2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/23/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER TO PAY ADDITIONAL ATTENDANCE FEE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that each member of the jury hearing the above case shall receive a total attendance fee of $50.00 per day for each day of service in excess of thirty (30) days. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/22/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2012)
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER GRANTING Use of Audio/Visual Equipment for Presentation at Trial re 160 Proposed Order filed by Estate of Gurmit Singh. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/9/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Order by Hon. Edward J. Davila granting 123 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(ejdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2012)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF FILING DEADLINES RE: DATE FOR JURY MATERIALS, PRE-TRIAL FILING OPPOSITION AND OBJECTION PAPERS re 88 Stipulation filed by City Of Gilroy, Stanford, Jaquez, Heath, Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/17/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER FOLLOWING JULY 15, 2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 85 Proposed Order. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/2/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Dismissal of Defendants Police Chief Denise Turner and Captain Scott Smithee ONLY re 82 Proposed Order. Scott Smithee and Denise Turner terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/6/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request for Order Setting Case Management Conference re 80 Stipulation. Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/30/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER - (JURY TRIAL). Based on their joint submission, it appears that a trial schedule for the case can be set without the necessity of an appearance at this time. Accordingly, the 4/4/2011 Preliminary Pret rial Conference is VACATED and the parties are ordered tocomply with the following schedule: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/29/2011 11:00 AM. Joint Pretrial Conference Statement, In Limine Motions, and Proposed Jury Instructions Due 7/29/2011. J ury Selection set for 9/13/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. James Ware. Jury Trial set for 9/13/2011 - 9/16/2011 01:00 PM - 04:00 PM; Jury Trial set for 9/20/2011 - 9/23/2011 01:00 PM - 04:00 PM; Jury Trial set for 9/27/2011 - 9/28/2011 01:00 PM - 04:00 PM ; Argue and Submit set for 9/29/2011 01:00 PM - 04:00 PM; Jury Deliberations 9/30/2011; 10/3/2011 - 10/4/2011 01:00 PM before Hon. James Ware. Please see Order for further trial specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/30/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Extension of Time re Deadline for filing Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment re 61 Stipulation. This is a final extension. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/25/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. In light of Defendants' pending dispositive Motion, the Court finds that an interim Conference unnecessary at this time. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the October 18 Conference. The Court will set a new Case Management Conference date in its Order addressing Defendants' pending Motion for Summary Judgment, if necessary. *** CMC Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/13/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE Due Date for Summary Judgment Opposition and Reply Papers re 56 Stipulation. Opposition due 11/5/2010; Reply due 11/29/2010. Motion Hearing re 48 Motion for Summary Judgment set for 2/28/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/15/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request to Vacate Trial and Set Case Management Conference re 46 Stipulation. ***Trial Deadlines terminated. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2010. Case Management Conference set for 10/18/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/10/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Denying Stipulation to Set Case Management Conference re 44 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/19/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS DATE re 39 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/3/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DENYING JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PRODUCTION OF GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT re 37 Stipulation, filed by Paramjit Kaur, Estate of Gurmit Singh, S.K., A.S.. Signed by Judge James Ware on October 30, 2009. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 35 as Modified by the Court (see Paragraph 6.3). Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 9/3/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 9/3/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Gurmit Singh et al v. City of Gilroy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Gurmit Singh
Represented By: Karen Leigh Snell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paramjit Kaur
Represented By: Karen Leigh Snell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.K.
Represented By: Karen Leigh Snell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.S.
Represented By: Karen Leigh Snell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Gilroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scot Smithee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?