Spilsbury v. Target Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Spilsbury
Defendant: Target Corporation and Select Brands, Inc
Case Number: 5:2009cv05955
Filed: December 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 179 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Dismissal with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1) re 178 Stipulation. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/8/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DISCOVERY MOTIONS. In light of Defendants' notice 175 that the parties have reached a settlement, the parties' various pending discovery motions (Docket Nos. 99 , 139 , 142 , 145 , 148 , 152 & 157 ) are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/25/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER VACATING INTERIM CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; CONTINUING PRELIMINARYPRETRIAL CONFERENCE; EXTENDING DISCOVERY SCHEDULE. Accordingly, the Court modifies the Scheduling Order as follows: (1) The Court sets May 13, 2011 as the new close of all disco very. (2) The Court sets July 11, 2011 as the last date for hearing dispositive motions. The Court will set a new Preliminary Pretrial Conference in its Order addressing any dispositive Motions. Finding as Moot and Motions terminated: 121 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Reopen Plaintiff's Deposition, 102 MOTION for Discovery, 101 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/16/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER GRANTING 118 Plaintiff's Request for Reconsideration and Resetting Third Party's Motion to Quash. The Court will hear Spilsbury, Sr.'s motion to quash 99 on April 5, 2011 at 10:00 a.m., and briefing shall proceed in accordance with Civil Local Rule 7-3. In addition, compliance with the subpoena at issue is stayed pending resolution of Spilsbury, Sr.'s motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/2/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 95 99 103 112 115 the parties' respective discovery motions. The Court refers to Judge Ware 101 102 the parties' respective administrative motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/28/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Motion for an Order Allowing Defendants to Conduct Deposition of Theodore Martinez re 93 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/7/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER re 91 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion. Defendants' motion for a protective order 53 is TERMINATED without prejudice per Defendants' request 91 , and the 2/1/2011 hearing is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/28/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO MODIFY DEADLINES FOR FILING OPPOSITION AND REPLY FILING DEADLINES re 74 Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 74 Stipulation re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment: Opposition due by 1/25/2011. Reply due by 2/8/2011. Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/21/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER DENYING Stipulation to Modify Scheduling Order/Discovery Cutoff/Motion for Summary Judgment/Motion for Protective Order re 69 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/18/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
December 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER DENYING 52 Defendants' Motion to Shorten Time. Defendants' motion for protective order shall be heard on February 1, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/24/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2010)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER re 49 GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXTEND TIME REGARDING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James Ware on November 19, 2010. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting 47 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Modifying Scheduling Order re: Disclosure of Expert Witnesses. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/12/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 37 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 08/30/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 Stipulation for Physical Examination filed by Target Corporation, Select Brands, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/10/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR re 21 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/9/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spilsbury v. Target Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Spilsbury
Represented By: Timothy Dennis McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Colette Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Brands, Inc
Represented By: Colette Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?