Kolker v. Vnus Medical Technologies Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Kolker
Defendant: Vnus Medical Technologies Inc. and Covidien, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv00900
Filed: March 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/6/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER, Motions terminated: 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Covidien, Inc.., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge MAGISTRATE CORLEY for Settlement Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2012 03:00 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/17/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion to Compel (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion for Discovery (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE re 28 . JURY SELECTION CONTINUED TO 12/12/2011 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on August 16, 2011. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Protective ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 10, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CORRECTED JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT DATES (approving 23 as modified by the Court). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/1/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL DENYING 9 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND ACTION TO STATE COURT. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND PARTIES' OBLIGATIONS TO COMPLETE INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT(approving 12 as modified by the Court). The Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2010 is CONTINUED to 9/24/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/15/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kolker v. Vnus Medical Technologies Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Kolker
Represented By: Charles R Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vnus Medical Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Michael McInerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covidien, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Michael McInerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?