Hernandez et al v. Vallco Shopping Mall, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Alma Clarisa Hernandez, Theresa Wallen and Ronald Moore
Defendant: Vallco Shopping Mall, LLC, Vallco International Shopping Center, LLC, GKK Cupertino Owner, Cupertino Property Development I, LLC, JC Penney Propertities, Inc., United Commercial Bank, Alexander Steakhouse, Inc., American Multi-Cinema, Inc., David Chang, Benihana National Corporation, Jimmy Chen, Bonnie E Schaefer, Euson Huang, Alexander Giverts, Dynasty Group Inc, Frederick Slater, OD, Hyuk Dong Kwon, Fresh Choice LLC, Valentine Rybkin, General Nutrition Center, Golden Vision Optometry, Inc, Nobumitsu Kobayashi, The Gymboree Corporation and Matthew McCauley, Thomas Howard, Ice Center Enterprises, LLC, Mel Nash, Macy's Department Stores, Inc., Maxis Mansour Jalalvandi, Meenu Jhigan, Sears Roebuck and Co, Sterling City USA, Inc, Strike Holding LLC, TGI Friday, Inc, Don Hammar, Rajasekhar Meka, Jafar Boland, Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC, MCS Cupertino Buffett, LLC, Tho Tran, Mabel Gunski, Hashim Banglesh, Joseph Fortuno, Claire's Bontique, Inc., West Valley Investors, Inc and Coldstone Creamery, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv02848
Filed: June 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER GRANTING 301 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Theresa Wallen, Ronald Moore, Alma Clarisa Hernandez. Plaintiff hereby dismisses this action with prejudice in its entirety pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/9/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. Joint Statement or Stipulated Dismissal due by 7/20/2012. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/27/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/19/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER GRANTING 294 Stipulation for Dismissal of Defendant Maxis Mansour Jalalvandi dba Maxi's Fine Jewelers ONLY. Maxis Mansour Jalalvandi terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/2/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER GRANTING 281 Stipulation for Dismissal of Defendant The Gymboree Corporation ONLY. The Gymboree Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/24/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 283 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING 279 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Jafar Boland, Jimmy Chen, GKK Cupertino Owner, Thomas Howard, Euson Huang, Matthew McCauley, Rajasekhar Meka, Bonnie E. Schaefer, Sterling City USA, Inc., Tho Tran and West Valley Investors, Inc. ONLY. GKK Cupertino Owner, Thomas Howard, Euson Huang, Matthew McCauley, Rajasekhar Meka, Bonnie E Schaefer, Sterling City USA, Inc, Tho Tran, West Valley Investors, Inc., Jafar Boland and Jimmy Chen terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/23/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER GRANTING 277 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Alexander Giverts dba Dollar Plus ONLY filed by Theresa Wallen, Ronald Moore, Alma Clarisa Hernandez. Alexander Giverts terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/19/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2012)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER GRANTING 271 Stipulation for Dismissal of Meenu Jhigan dba Perfume Plus ONLY. Meenu Jhigan terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/3/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER GRANTING 267 Stipulation filed by Theresa Wallen, Ronald Moore, Alma Clarisa Hernandez. Sears Roebuck and Co terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/29/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 266 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING Dismissal of Defendant General Nutrition Centers (Erroneously Sued Herein as General Nutrition Corporation) ONLY re 265 Stipulation. General Nutrition Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/19/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 263 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL of Defendants Legends Comics & Games, LLC and Mel Nash (Erroneously Sued Herein as Mel Nash dba Legends of Sports & Fantasy aka Legends Comics & Games, LLC) ONLY re 261 Stipulation. Mel Nash terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/29/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER GRANTING SECOND REQUEST TO CONTINUE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DATE SET FOR AMENDMENT OF PLEADINGS re 257 Proposed Order. Amended Pleadings due by 5/4/2012. Case Management Statement due by 4/27/2012. Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/27/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2012)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER GRANTING Dismissal of Defendant Strike Holdings LLC aka Strike Cupertino VFP, LLC dba Strike (now known as Bowlmor Lanes) re 256 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/16/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER GRANTING 254 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Hyuk Dong Kwon dba Fashion Plaza with prejudice. Hyuk Dong Kwon terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/14/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 251 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING Dismissal of Alexander's Steakhouse, Inc. ONLY pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Plaintiffs and Defendant shall bear their own attorney fees and costsv re 250 Stipulation. Alexander 's Steakhouse, Inc terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/8/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 249 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING Dismissal of Benihana National Corporation Only pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(l)(A)(ii) re 248 Stipulation. Plaintiffs and Defendant shall bear their own attorney fees and costs. Benihana National Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/29/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 247 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING Dismissal of J.C Penny Corporation, Inc. and J.C. Penny Properties, Inc. ONLY re 246 Stipulation. JC Penney Company, Inc and JC Penney Properties, Inc terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/11/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 245 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Based on the parties' Joint Case Management Statement and proposed schedule, the court has determined an appearance is unnecessary at this time. Accordingly, the 9/16/2011 Case Management Conference is VACATED and the par ties are ordered to comply with the following schedule. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/6/2012. Case Management Conference set for 1/13/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose. ***9/16/2011 Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/14/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 243 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Dismissal of Nobumitsu Kobayashi dba Grain D'or ONLY re 242 Proposed. Nobumitsu Kobayashi terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/24/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 241 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Dismissal of Golden Vision Optometry, Inc. ONLY re 240 Stipulation. Golden Vision Optometry, Inc terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/8/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 239 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING Dismissal of Hashim Banglesh and Mabel Gunski dba Sports Action Only re 237 Stipulation. Hashim Banglesh and Mabel Gunski terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/6/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 231 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF HOWARD'S SHOES FOR CHILDREN INC. ONLY. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/13/2011. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER Dismissing Cold Stone Creamery. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/5/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 1/25/2011. Reply due 2/8/2011. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/4/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER Vacating Default Judgment Pursuant to Stipulation. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/15/2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER Vacating Default per Joint Stipulation. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/25/2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER re 133 Continuing Hearing, and Setting Deadline for Parties to File Either a "Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge," or Else a "Declination to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment." Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 9/30/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 132 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 129 to Vacate Notice of Default. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 8/12/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez et al v. Vallco Shopping Mall, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma Clarisa Hernandez
Represented By: Kenneth Randolph Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Wallen
Represented By: Kenneth Randolph Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Moore
Represented By: Kenneth Randolph Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vallco Shopping Mall, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vallco International Shopping Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GKK Cupertino Owner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cupertino Property Development I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JC Penney Propertities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Commercial Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Steakhouse, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Multi-Cinema, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benihana National Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie E Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Euson Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Giverts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynasty Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Slater, OD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyuk Dong Kwon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresh Choice LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valentine Rybkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Nutrition Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Vision Optometry, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nobumitsu Kobayashi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gymboree Corporation and Matthew McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ice Center Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mel Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macy's Department Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxis Mansour Jalalvandi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meenu Jhigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears Roebuck and Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling City USA, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strike Holding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TGI Friday, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Hammar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajasekhar Meka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jafar Boland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCS Cupertino Buffett, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tho Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mabel Gunski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hashim Banglesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Fortuno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claire's Bontique, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Valley Investors, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coldstone Creamery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?