Sturgis v. Rupf et al
Plaintiff: Lamos Wayne Sturgis
Defendant: Warren E. Rupf, Drollete and Fitzgerald
Case Number: 5:2010cv03680
Filed: August 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Luis Obispo
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER by Judge 1/7/2013 granting 101 Stipulation (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/14/2012. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER TO FILE SETTLEMENT STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/11/2012. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 88 Stipulation (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 04/05/12. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sturgis v. Rupf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamos Wayne Sturgis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren E. Rupf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drollete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?