U.S. Ethernet Innovations, LLC v. Acer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Ethernet Innovations, LLC
Defendant: Acer, Inc., ACER America Corporation, Apple, Inc., Asus Computer International, Asustek Computer Inc., Dell Inc., Fujitsu Ltd., Fujitsu America, Inc., Gateway, Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Electronics Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba America, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Nvidia Corporation and U.S. Ethernet Innovations, LLC
Intervenor: Intel Corporation, Atheros Communications, Inc. and Broadcom Corporation
Intervenor_dft: Marvell Semiconductor, Inc.
Mediator: Robert Faulkner
Case Number: 5:2010cv03724
Filed: August 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1484 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR STAY AND APPROVAL OF SUPERSEDEAS BOND by Hon. Claudia Wilken granting 1478 Motion to Stay. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1475 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY ENFORCEMENT PENDING APPEAL by Hon. Claudia Wilken denying 1471 Motion to Stay. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1469 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' REVISED BILL OF COSTS STATEMENT: The court previously issued its order resolving the disputes about the costs bills and taxing costs for 5 of the 10 defendants. (See 9/4/15 Order, ECF No. 1462 at 12.) The court el iminated costs attributable to the Atheros depositions for five computer defendants and directed them to submit their revised costs that identified and subtracted the Atheros costs. They did so, and the court now issues the attached order taxing the costs for the remaining five defendants. USEI previously moved to stay execution of costs (or a ruling that it may post a bond of 50% or less). (See id. at 11.) The reason in part was that in the Eastern District of Texas, a jury found two of th e four accused patents in this case not invalid. (Id.) As discussed at the hearing, and with the agreement of the parties, the court denied the motion without prejudice to USEIs raising it before the trial judge. As the court previously ordered, USEI must file its motion no later than two weeks from the date of this order. Re 1465 Bill of Costs, filed by Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 9/28/2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2015)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1462 ORDER by Judge Beeler denying 1433 Motion (Fujitsu); granting in part and denying in part 1434 Motion (Intel and defendants); and finding as moot 1444 Motion for Taxation of Costs (Marvell) and finding as moot 1445 Motion for Taxation of Costs (Marvell) based on the in-court resolution of the dollar amounts. The court (1) eliminates costs attributable to the Atheros depositions for the computer defendants Acer, Asus, HP, Sony, and Toshiba, and directs them to submit their revised costs no later than September 11, 2015, (2) reduces certain electronic discovery costs for HP and Intel, (3) taxes the costs for the intervenors and the other computer defendants set forth at the end of the order, and (4) denies the motion to stay execution of the costs without prejudice to USEI's refiling it before the trial judge no later than two weeks after the court enters its final order taxing costs. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 9/4/2015)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1374 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO ALTER OR AMEND SUMMARY JUDGMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/30/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1365 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken ON ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL.(Granting in part and denying in part (1360 in case 4:10-cv-03724-CW; and 603 in case 4:10-cv-05254-CW. ) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1364 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting (1362 in case 4:10-cv-03724-CW; and 605 in case 4:10-cv-05254-CW) Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply In Opposition to USEI's Motion to Alter or Amend the Court's November 7, 2014 Summary Judgment Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e). (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1351 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken ON ADMINISTRATIVE (1342 and 1344 in case 4:10-cv-03724-CW and 591 in case 4:10-cv-05254-CW) MOTIONS TO SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1314 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken ON ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL (granting (1296) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part (1305) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting (1306) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part (1309) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:10-cv-03724-CW; granting (574) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting (575) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part (576) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:10-cv-05254-CW ) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2014)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1293 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken ON ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL(1162, 1165, 1168, 1183, 1192, 1195, 1196, 1217, 1221, 1225, 1238, 1255, 1258, 1261, 1279 in case 4:10-cv-03724-CW; and 525, 526, 532, 536, 537, 545, 553, 556, 559, 568 in case 4:10-cv-05254-CW) Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1289 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken ON (1133 and 1167 in case 4:10-cv-03724-CW) SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1278 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 1277 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andy Tindel terminated. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1276 ORDER DIRECTING ADDITIONAL INTERIM PAYMENT OF COSTSre (1272 in 4:10-cv-03724-CW). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/20/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1271 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken ON (1237 in case 4:10-cv-03724-CW; 552 in case 4:10-cv-05254-CW) MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1264 ORDER GRANTING PACER FEE EXEMPTION. Signed by Judge Wilken on 9/12/2014. (cwlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2014)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1189 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting in part and denying in part 1186 Discovery Letter Brief.(lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1181 ORDER RE Discovery Dispute in ECF No. 1113. (lblc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1153 ORDER SETTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE in 4:10-cv-03724-CW: Responses/Cross Motions due by 7/15/2014; Replies due by 7/31/2014; Reply due by 8/7/2014. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/10/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1144 ORDER REGARDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE (cwlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1131 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE IN ECF NO. 1113 . Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/16/2014. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1127 ORDER VACATING (1110 in 4:10-cv-03724-CW and 512 in 4:10-cv-05254-CW) SUMMARY ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/4/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1110 ORDER by Judge Claudia WilkenSUMMARIZING RULINGS ON (docket nos. 947, and 951 in case 4:10-cv-03724-CW and docket no. 481 in case 4:10-cv-05254-CW) MOTION TO LIMIT ASSERTED CLAIMS AND (484 in case 4:10-cv-05254-CW) MOTION TO ENJOIN. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1109 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE IN ECF NO. 1093 AND ECF NOS. 1094 AND 1098 in case 4:10-cv-03724-CW; AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE IN ECF NO. 510 in case 4:10-cv-05254-CW. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/19/2014. (lblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1084 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 1083 Stipulation for Dismissal of Toshiba America Inc. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1064 ORDER re 1042 Order regarding clawback of any documents beyond those authorized by the 3/7/14 order at ECF No. 1041 (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1042 ORDER by Judge Beeler denying 954 Discovery Letter Brief; denying 997 Discovery Letter Brief (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1018 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting (1017) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 4:10-cv-03724-CW (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1015 Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 2/26/2014. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 945 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 943 Stipulation re Dismissal of Claims Between Plaintiff U.S. Ethernet Innovations, LLC and Intervenor Nvidia Corporation (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 942 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken SEVERING THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFF APPLE INC.S CLAIMS AGAINST THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT ORACLE AMERICA, INC. AND STAYING THE ACTION UNTIL THE UNDERLYING CASE IS RESOLVED. (terminating 939 Stipulation) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 932 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 929 Stipulated Dismissal of Claims Between Plaintiff U.S. Ethernet Innovations, LLC and Intervenor Broadcom Corporation. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 924 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken ADDRESSING ( 777 , 852 , 874 , 884 , 887 ) MOTIONS TO SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013) Modified on 11/22/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 921 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 882 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 903 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 853 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 900 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting in part and denying in part 876 Discovery Letter Brief.(lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 880 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 872 Request for Judicial Assistance Letter Rogatory. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 867 ORDER by Judge Claudia WilkenGRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART (Docket Nos. 766 in 10-3724, 450 in 10-5254) MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ADDRESSING MARKING AND NOMINAL DAMAGES, GRANTING USEIS RULE 56(D) ( 793 in 10-3724) MOTION AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART USEIS (Docket No. 823 in 10-3724) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A NOTICE OF NEWLY DISCOVERED EVIDENCE AND A SURREPLY. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2013)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 857 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken ADDRESSING MOTIONS TO SEAL (750) (765) (769) (777) (795) (798) (808) in case 4:10-cv-03724-CW; (449) (454) in case 4:10-cv-05254-CW (cwlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 855 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING PARALLELS 785 MOTION TO DISMISS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 851 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING PLAINTIFFS 754 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO ASSERT CLAIMS AGAINST THIRD PARTY DEFENDANTS SILICON INTEGRATED SYSTEMS, INC. AND ORACLE CORPORATION AND GRANTING SILICON INTEGRATED SYSTEMS CORPORATIONS 731 MOTION TO DISMISS AND QUASH. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 837 ORDER DIRECTING THE PARTIES TO PROVIDE CERTAIN MATERIAL TO THE TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/9/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 818 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 805 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Chris Cravey. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 797 ORDER CHANGING TIME ON PLAINTIFFS 793 RULE 56(D) MOTION. Reset Deadlines/Hearing: Responses due by 6/20/2013; Replies due by 6/24/2013; Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/10/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 783 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 775 Stipulation to change time to respond to re 766 MOTION for Summary Judgment Concerning Marking and Nominal Damages. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 770 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART 763 STIPULATED REQUEST TO CHANGE TIME FOR U.S. ETHERNET INNOVATIONS, LLC TO RESPOND TO BROADCOM CORPORATIONS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION AND THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 760 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE INTERVERNOR NVIDIA CORPORATIONS ( 755 in 4:10-cv-03724-CW) MOTION TO SEAL AND ADDRESSING DEFENDANTS AND INTERVENORS (Docket Nos. 756 in 10-3724 and 442 in 10-5254) MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/17/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 752 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 751 Stipulation Changing Time to Respond re 735 Amended Complaint, Third Party Complaint. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 747 ORDER re 730 Joint Discovery Letter Brief, filed by Hewlett Packard Co. & U.S. Ethernet Innovations, LLC. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/2/2013. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 744 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 743 Stipulation FOR EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT SILICON INTEGRATED SYSTEMS CORPORATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 734 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING APPLES (Docket No. 685 in 10-3724) MOTION, GRANTING SIGMAS (Docket No. 431 in 10-5254) MOTION, GRANTING BROADCOMS (Docket No. 714 in 10-3724) MOTION, GRANTING IN PART, AND DENYING IN PART, USEIS (Docket Nos. 429 in 10-5254 and 711 in 10-3724)MOTION AND MODIFYING THE CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 687 ORDER VACATING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE ON APPLES 685 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/12/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 661 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 26, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 658 JOINT STATUS REPORT FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER THEREON. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 16, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 652 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE AND ORDER THEREON. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 5, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 641 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Hon. Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/10/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER Granting Request to Withdraw Ashlea Raymond as Counsel of Record for Defendant Dell Inc. re 508 Notice (Other). Ashlea Raymond is also listed as Attorney Ashlea Pflug and is hereby terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/11/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER FOLLOWING TUTORIAL HEARING; ORDER RELATING CASES FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION PURPOSES. Although it is the Court's practice to not relate cases that are already assigned to it, the Court orders that C 10-5254 JW be related to C 10-3724 for the p urposes of claim construction coordination. The Court lifts the stay imposed in C 10-5254 JW so that the parties in the AT&T case can meet and confer with the Defendants in the Acer case and participate in the claim construction process. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/18/2011. Case Management Conference set for 3/28/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/7/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 486 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request to Extend Time to Answer Broadcom Corporation's Complaint in Intervention re 485 Stipulation. Answer due 1/19/2011. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/14/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ACTING CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGE SPERO FOR DETERMINATION OFAPPROPRIATE REASSIGNMENT. The Court refers this matter to Acting Chief Magistrate Judge Spero for determination of appropriate reassignment of this case to another magist rate judge to: (1) resolve the pending 456 Motion ; and (2) for permanent assignment to resolve all future discovery disputes in accordance with the Civil Local Rules of Court. Once Judge Spero makes his determination, the moving party shall renotice its Motion before the newly assigned magistrate judge in accordance with that Judge's civil calendar. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/5/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 478 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 3, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 472 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. This case is scheduled for a Case Management Conference on December 13, 2010. In light of the parties' pending Motions, the Court finds that a Case Management Conference would be premature at this time. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the December 13 Conference. The Court will set a new Case Management Conference date in its Order addressing the parties' Motions. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/7/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2010)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON INTERVENORS' AND DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SEVER re 453 Administrative Motion to Schedule Hearing and Briefing Schedule on Intervenors' and Defendants' Motion to Sever. Set/Reset Dea dlines: Responses due by 11/16/2010. Replies due by 11/18/2010. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motions terminated: 453 MOTION for Hearing Administrative Motion to Schedule Hearing and Briefing Schedule on Intervenors' and Defendants' Motion to Sever and Restructure Case to Coincide with Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/12/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER re 356 Administrative MOTION to Relate Case filed by Intel Corporation. The Court find, however, that REASSIGNMENT of the actions currently assigned to another judge, C03-2177 VRW and C10-3481 CRB, IS NOT WARRANTED. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 9/28/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Ethernet Innovations, LLC v. Acer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Ethernet Innovations, LLC
Represented By: E Joseph Benz, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acer, Inc.
Represented By: Steven S Baik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACER America Corporation
Represented By: Steven S Baik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Ruben Singh Bains
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asus Computer International
Represented By: Matthew J. Brigham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asustek Computer Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Brigham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell Inc.
Represented By: Kimball R Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fujitsu Ltd.
Represented By: Michael L Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fujitsu America, Inc.
Represented By: Michael L Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gateway, Inc.
Represented By: Steven S Baik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett Packard Co.
Represented By: Michael J. Bettinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation
Represented By: Michael L Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation of America
Represented By: Michael L Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Electronics Inc.
Represented By: Michael L Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Represented By: Michael L Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America, Inc.
Represented By: Michael L Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Michael L Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nvidia Corporation
Represented By: Charlene Marie Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Ethernet Innovations, LLC
Represented By: John K. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Intel Corporation
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Atheros Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Scott D Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Broadcom Corporation
Represented By: William F. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Marvell Semiconductor, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Robert Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?