Solis v. Walgreen Co.
Plaintiff: Belinda Solis
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Case Number: 5:2011cv00605
Filed: February 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 31 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/9/2013. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2013)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Order Granting 61 Stipulation to take the deposition of Plaintiff's Non-Retained Expert, Dr. Neville Udwadia, and Continuing Dates for Plaintiff's Retrained Expert to File Supplemental Rule 26 Report and Deposition of Craig Enos. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 11/21/2012.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 PRETRIAL ORDER (JURY TRIAL). The court advises the parties that this is the final case schedule. All parties are expected to comply as directed above. This schedule will not be amended further absent the presentation of good cause necessitating such an amendment. Based on the parties' Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statement and the discussions held at the 11/9/2012 conference, the parties are ordered to comply with the following schedule: Joint Final Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statement due by 6/7/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/14/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Jury Selection set for 8/5/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial set for 8/6/ 2013, 8/7/2013, 8/8/2013, 8/9/2013, 8/12/2013, 8/13/2013, 8/14/2013, 8/15/2013, 8/16/2013. Jury Deliberations set for 8/19/2013, 8/20/2013, 8/21/2013 before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/9/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for a settlement conference to occur no later than 1/18/2013. The parties are instructed to contact Judge Lloyd's Courtroom Deputy to arrange a date for the conference. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/9/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 11/9/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/31/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2012)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting Stipulation for leave to take the deposition of Ronda DiMarzo. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/14/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference from 5/16/2011 to 6/20/2011 re 14 Stipulation. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/10/2011. Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/8/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading by Walgreen Co. re 7 Stipulation filed by Walgreen Co. Response due 4/8/2011. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/28/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solis v. Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda Solis
Represented By: Anne Smallwood Kelson
Represented By: Michael J. Bononi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Scott M. Plamondon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?