Wayne Merritt Motor Co, Inc et al v. American International Goup, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Wayne Merritt Motor Co, Inc, Wayne Merritt and Peggy Merritt
Defendant: American International Goup, Inc and New Hampshire Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2011cv01762
Filed: April 11, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 59 Stipulation and Order for Request for Dismissal.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER RE DISMISSAL AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2012)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Re: Notice of Settlement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/10/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2012)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion to Dismiss. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Vacating Hearing on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/25/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER to File Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/19/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 45 Stipulation to Continue Hearing and Case Management Conference.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2012)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS re 18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by New Hampshire Insurance Company Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on October 21, 2011. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re 23 Continuing Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference to 10/20/2011. Signed by Judge Koh on 8/2/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re 14 Adopting Joint Stipulation. Signed by Judge Koh on 5/4/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wayne Merritt Motor Co, Inc et al v. American International Goup, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Merritt Motor Co, Inc
Represented By: John Arthur Shepardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Merritt
Represented By: John Arthur Shepardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Merritt
Represented By: John Arthur Shepardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American International Goup, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Hampshire Insurance Company
Represented By: Eduardo Arturo Brito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?