MedioStream Inc v. Microsoft Corporation Featured Case
Plaintiff: MedioStream Inc
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Consol_plaintiff: MedioStream, Inc.
Consol_defendant: ACER America Corporation, Apple Computer, Inc., Dell, Inc., Gateway, Inc., Asus Computer International Inc., Sony Electronics, Inc., Cyberlink, Inc., Nero, Inc., Sonic Solutions, Cyberlink.com Corporation, Nero AG and Sony Corporation
Consol_countercla: Dell, Inc., ACER America Corporation, Gateway, Inc., Cyberlink.com Corporation, Apple Computer, Inc., Asus Computer International Inc., Nero, Inc., Sonic Solutions and Nero AG
Consol_counterdft: MedioStream, Inc.
3rd_party_defendant: Asustek Computer, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2011cv02525
Filed: June 7, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2011 Filing 568 RESPONSE in Opposition re 567 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 270 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Conditional Motion to Modify the Protective Order Regarding the Production of Source CodeOpposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 270 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Conditional Motion to Modify the Protective Order Regarding the Production of Source Code filed by MedioStream Inc. (Grinstein, Joseph)
April 1, 2011 Filing 567 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 270 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Conditional Motion to Modify the Protective Order Regarding the Production of Source Code by Apple Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D)(Scarsi, Mark)
April 1, 2011 Filing 566 RESPONSE to Motion re 563 Opposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel and Transfer of Source Code] Notice of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Apple Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scarsi, Mark)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 565 ORDER denying 413 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/29/2011. (ch, )
March 17, 2011 Filing 564 NOTICE by MedioStream Inc(a California Corporation), Mediostream, Inc.(a Calfornia Corporation), Mediostream, Inc., Mediostream, Inc.(a California Corporation), Mediostream, Inc.(a California Corporation) re 561 Emergency MOTION to Enforce this Court's Protective Order and Discovery Order Regarding Delivery of Source Code of Ripeness and Waiver of Reply (Rambin, Daymon)
March 14, 2011 Filing 563 Opposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel and Transfer of Source Code] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bishop, Gregory)
March 14, 2011 Filing 562 RESPONSE in Opposition re 561 Emergency MOTION to Enforce this Court's Protective Order and Discovery Order Regarding Delivery of Source Code filed by Apple Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 DECLARATION OF MARK C. SCARSI IN SUPPORT OF APPLE INC.S OPPOSITION TO MEDIOSTREAMS EMERGENCY MOTION, # 2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Mark Scarsi, # 3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Mark Scarsi, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Scarsi, Mark)
February 24, 2011 Filing 561 Emergency MOTION to Enforce this Court's Protective Order and Discovery Order Regarding Delivery of Source Code by MedioStream Inc(a California Corporation), Mediostream, Inc.(a Calfornia Corporation), Mediostream, Inc., Mediostream, Inc.(a California Corporation), Mediostream, Inc.(a California Corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambin, Daymon)
February 8, 2011 Filing 560 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Samuel Grinstein on behalf of MedioStream Inc (Grinstein, Joseph)
February 8, 2011 Filing 559 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Max Lalon Tribble, Jr on behalf of MedioStream Inc (Tribble, Max)
February 8, 2011 Filing 558 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen D Susman on behalf of MedioStream Inc (Susman, Stephen)
February 8, 2011 Filing 557 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brooke Ashley-May Taylor on behalf of MedioStream Inc (Taylor, Brooke)
January 18, 2011 Filing 556 NOTICE from USCA for the Federal Circuit Misc #942 Court grants motion to amend 12/3/10 order that Page 4, line 17, change "except for Dell" to - except for Dell and Microsoft-- (ehs, )
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 555 ORDER granting 553 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Melvin R Wilcox, III terminated as counsel for Sony Corporation and Sony Electronics Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/7/2011. (ch, )
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 554 ORDER granting 552 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Adam A Biggs terminated as counsel for Apple Computer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/7/2011. (ch, )
January 6, 2011 Filing 553 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
January 6, 2011 Filing 552 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Appple Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Adam A. Biggs as Counsel of Record by Apple Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 551 ORDER from USCA for the Federal Circuit granting the petition for a writ of mandamus directing the District Court to vacate its orders denying petitioners' motion to transfer venue and to transfer case to the Northern District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/6/10. (ehs, )
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 550 ORDER from USCA for the Federal Circuit granting petition wor writ of mandamusto transfer case. The motion to stay paroceedings in the USDC is denied as moot. Signed by Jan Horbaly, Clerk on 12/3/10. (ehs, )
December 1, 2010 Filing 549 NOTICE by MedioStream Inc [Notice of Change of Address and Firm Affiliation of Byron Cooper] (Cooper, Byron)
November 22, 2010 Filing 548 USCA for the Federal Circuit Order granting motion for atty, Richard S. Gresalfi to withdraw as counsel. Sony should promptly designate one of its counsel as principal counsel in the proceeding. (ljw, )
November 17, 2010 Filing 547 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 546 Notice (Other), Notice (Other). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Rambin, Daymon)
November 17, 2010 Filing 546 NOTICE by MedioStream Inc(a California Corporation), Mediostream, Inc.(a Calfornia Corporation), Mediostream, Inc., Mediostream, Inc.(a California Corporation), Mediostream, Inc.(a California Corporation) of Activity at Federal Circuit Regarding Briefing on Motion for Stay (Rambin, Daymon)
November 15, 2010 Filing 545 NOTICE from USCA for the Federal Circuit - Order that petitioners move for an order staying proceedings in the US District Court pending disposition by this court of their petition for a writ of mandamus. Ordered that MedioStream Inc. is directed to respond to the motion to stay proceedings no later than 11/15/10, all proceedings in this case in the USDA for the ED.TX are temporarily stayed pending this court's consideration of the papers submitted (ehs, ) Modified on 11/16/2010 (jml, ).
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ORDER granting 539 Motion for Extension of Time to File. All parties be and hereby are granted an extension of time to file rebuttal expert reports. The deadline for all parties to file rebuttal expert reports is November 17, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/9/10. (ehs, )
November 9, 2010 Filing 543 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation re 540 Opposed SEALED MOTION - Emergency Motion to Strike Portions of The Expert Report of Dr. James Foley - Notice of Service of CD containing Exhibits 1 and 2 (Smith, Melissa)
November 9, 2010 NOTICE - clerk modified # 541 to read response instead of reply. (ch, )
November 8, 2010 Filing 542 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 464 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants Sony Corporation and Sony Electronics Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration of Their Motion to Compel Plaintiff Mediostream to Produce Clawed Back Documents filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Byron)
November 8, 2010 Filing 541 SEALED PATENT Response to PATENT Motion re 465 SEALED MOTION To Seek Leave To Amend Invalidity Contentions filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Text of Proposed Order) (Chan, Andy) Modified to show response not reply on 11/9/2010 (ch, ).
November 8, 2010 Filing 540 Opposed SEALED MOTION - Emergency Motion to Strike Portions of The Expert Report of Dr. James Foley by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
November 8, 2010 Filing 539 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rebuttal Expert Reports by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 538 ORDER granting 535 Motion For Leave To File Attachments To Motion To Strike On Disk. Microsoft is granted leave to provide the Court with two (2) copies of the attachments to its Motion toStrike on disk concurrently with the filing of its motion in lieu of submitting these attachments via PACER. Microsoft is directed to refrain from providing paper copies of the attachments on these disks simultaneously with the date of filing. The Court will contact counsel for Microsoft if it desires courtesy copies of any or all of the documents filed on disk pursuant to this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/8/10. (ehs, )
November 5, 2010 Filing 537 RESPONSE in Opposition re 462 MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY PENDING COMPLETION OF INTER PARTES REEXAMINATIONS filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Motorola v. Vtech, # 3 Nat'l Oilwell Varco v. Auto Drill Order, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Chan, Andy)
November 5, 2010 Filing 536 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 463 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Joint Motion for Leave to Supplement and Amend Invalidity Contentions filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Bishop, Gregory)
November 5, 2010 Filing 535 Unopposed MOTION For Leave to File Attachments to Motion to Strike on Disk by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
November 5, 2010 Filing 534 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Roger A Ford for Microsoft Corporation,Roger A Ford for Microsoft Corporation. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-103) (ehs, )
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 533 ORDER denying Nero's 520 Sealed Motion motion to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/5/10. (ehs, )
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 532 ORDER granting 332 Sealed Patent Motion to Compel Nero AG to Appear for Deposition in the United States. (Dkt. No. 332). The Court has considered the relevant factors and is persuaded that Nero AGs witnesses should appear in the United States for deposition. In particular, given the history of this case, there is a high likelihood of discovery disputes. In addition, Nero, Inc., a United States corporation, designated the same witnesses as 30(b)(6) designees. Also, Nero asserts its own counterclaims against the plaintiff in this case. These facts counsel the Court to require the depositions in the United States. Accordingly, Mr. Kopf and Mr. Giebermann must appear in the United States for both their Nero, Inc. and Nero AG depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/5/10. (ehs, )
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 531 ORDER granting 529 Motion for an extension of time for all parties to identify rebuttal trial witnesses. Deadline extended to 11/19/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/5/10. (ehs, )
November 4, 2010 Filing 530 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 520 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Compel Mediostream to Produce a Witness for Deposition filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Unruh, Rebecca)
November 4, 2010 Filing 529 Unopposed MOTION Extend Deadline To Identify Rebuttal Trial Witnesses by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 528 ORDER REGARDING EXHIBITS - the court enters this order sua sponte. Due to the voluminous exhibits expected to betendered during the trial of this case, the Court ORDERS the following herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/3/2010. (ch, )
November 2, 2010 Filing 527 NOTICE by Sonic Solutions DECLARATION OF RODERICK M. THOMPSON IN COMPLIANCE WITH OCTOBER 18, 2010 COURT ORDER (Thompson, Roderick)
November 2, 2010 Filing 526 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation (Notice of Compliance with Court's October 18, 2010 Order) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit - Declaration of George F. Pappas)(Smith, Melissa)
November 2, 2010 Filing 525 Sealed Document. Declaration of M. Craig Tyler in Satisfaction of Court Order Regarding Mediostream's Motion to Compel (Tyler, Marvin)
November 2, 2010 Filing 524 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Sealed Document.Declaration of M. Craig Tyler in Satisfaction of Court Order Regarding Mediostream's Motion to Compel (Tyler, Marvin) Modified on 11/2/2010 (ch, ).
November 2, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION Document # 524, Sealed Document. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 523 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION: Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Opposition re 461 to Nero, Inc. and Nero AG's SEALED MOTION for Protective Order filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Unruh, Rebecca)
November 1, 2010 Filing 522 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION: Plaintiff MedioStream Inc.'s Opposition re 466 to Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Opposed SEALED MOTION For Leave to File Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Chan, Andy)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 521 ORDER - Pending before the court is defendant Nero AGs emergency motion to compel plaintiff MedioStream to produce a Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) witness for deposition. The court orders MedioStream to file its response to the motion by Thursday, November 4, 2010 at 5:00 p.m. CDT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/1/10. (ehs, )
October 29, 2010 Filing 520 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Compel Mediostream to Produce a Witness for Deposition by Nero AG. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of M. Craig Tyler in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2010: # 5 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ).
October 29, 2010 Filing 519 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 465 SEALED MOTION To Seek Leave To Amend Invalidity Contentions by MedioStream Inc(a California Corporation), Mediostream, Inc.(a Calfornia Corporation), Mediostream, Inc., Mediostream, Inc.(a California Corporation), Mediostream, Inc.(a California Corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambin, Daymon)
October 29, 2010 Filing 518 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 463 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Joint Motion for Leave to Supplement and Amend Invalidity Contentions by MedioStream Inc(a California Corporation), Mediostream, Inc.(a Calfornia Corporation), Mediostream, Inc., Mediostream, Inc.(a California Corporation), Mediostream, Inc.(a California Corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambin, Daymon)
October 29, 2010 Filing 517 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Nero Inc.'s Fourth and Nero AG's Fifth Amended Answer and Counterclaims by Nero AG, Nero, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of M. Craig Tyler in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin)
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 516 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - the court GRANTS MedioStreams motion to dismiss with regard to Neros fifth counterclaim alleging breach of contract due to MedioStreams failure to destroy or return its copy of the embedded API. The court, however, DENIES MedioStreams motion to dismiss the remainder of Neros fifth counterclaim, as well as Neros sixth through fourteenth counterclaims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/29/10. (ehs, )
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER granting 514 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants Sony Corporation and Sony Electronics Inc.s Motion for Reconsideration of Their Motion to Compel Plaintiff MedioStream to Produce Clawed Back Documents [Dkt. No. 464]. Responses due by 11/8/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/29/10. (ehs, )
October 29, 2010 Filing 514 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 464 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants Sony Corporation and Sony Electronics Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration of Their Motion to Compel Plaintiff Mediostream to Produce Clawed Back Documents by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chan, Andy)
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER granting 512 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court GRANTS the Motion and extends the deadline for Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc. to file its Response to November 5, 2010.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/29/10. (ehs, )
October 29, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 512, Unopposed Motion to file extension. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
October 29, 2010 ***Per ruling on motion - Reopen Document 512 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File its Response to Defendants Sony Corporation and Sony Electronics Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration of Their Motion to Compel MedioStream to Produce Clawed Back Documents (ehs, )
October 28, 2010 Filing 512 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File its Response to Defendants Sony Corporation and Sony Electronics Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration of Their Motion to Compel MedioStream to Produce Clawed Back Documents by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chan, Andy) Modified on 10/29/2010 (ch, ).
October 27, 2010 Filing 511 Opposed SEALED MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Opposed Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendant Dell Inc.] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Bishop, Gregory)
October 27, 2010 Filing 510 NOTICE by Nero AG, Nero, Inc. Notice of Compliance with FRCP 26(a)(2) (Tyler, Marvin)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 509 ORDER granting 506 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 462 MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY PENDING COMPLETION OF INTER PARTES REEXAMINATIONS Responses due by 11/5/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/27/2010. (ch, )
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 508 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - For the reasons stated above, Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss Defendants Inequitable Conduct Counterclaims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) (Dkt. No. 223) and Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendants Inequitable Conduct Affirmative Defenses Pursuant to Rule 12(f) (Dkt. No. 224) are DENIED. Plaintiff also incorporated these arguments in its Motion to Dismiss Nero AGs Counterclaims (Dkt. No. 225), and to the extent that motion seeks relief from Nero AGs inequitable conduct counterclaims and defenses, it is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/27/2010. (ch, )
October 26, 2010 Filing 507 NOTICE by MedioStream Inc of Compliance with October 22, 2010 Deadlines and Rule 26(a)(2) (Chan, Andy)
October 26, 2010 Filing 506 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 462 MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY PENDING COMPLETION OF INTER PARTES REEXAMINATIONS (Mediostream, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File their Response to Apple Computer, Inc.'s Motion to Stay Pending Completion of Inter Parties Reexaminations) by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambin, Daymon)
October 26, 2010 Filing 505 NOTICE by Dell, Inc. Compliance with Rule 26(a)(2) (Fulghum, Roger)
October 26, 2010 Filing 504 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Dell, Inc. Compliance with Rule 26(a)(2) (Fulghum, Roger) Modified on 10/26/2010 (ch, ).
October 26, 2010 NOTICE FROM CLERK - modified text on documents # 498 and 499 to remove Cyberlink, Inc. from the notice (ch, )
October 26, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 504, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
October 25, 2010 Filing 503 NOTICE by Sonic Solutions : Notice of Compliance With Rule 26(A)(2) (Hollander, Christina)
October 25, 2010 Filing 502 NOTICE by Asus Computer International Inc. OF COMPLIANCE WITH FRCP 26(a)(2) (Masur, Joshua)
October 25, 2010 Filing 501 NOTICE by Gateway, Inc. of Compliance re Trial Witnesses (Hogan, Holly)
October 25, 2010 Filing 500 NOTICE by Gateway, Inc. in Compliance with Rule 26(a)(2) (Hogan, Holly)
October 25, 2010 Filing 499 NOTICE by Cyberlink.com Corporation in Compliance re Trial Witnesses (Hogan, Holly) Modified on 10/26/2010 (ch, ).
October 25, 2010 Filing 498 NOTICE by Cyberlink.com Corporation in Complaince with Rule 26(a)(2) (Hogan, Holly) Modified on 10/26/2010 (ch, ).
October 25, 2010 Filing 497 NOTICE by Acer America Corporation of Compliance re Trial Witnesses (Hogan, Holly)
October 25, 2010 Filing 496 NOTICE by Acer America Corporation of Compliance with Rule 25(a)(2) (Hogan, Holly)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER granting 470 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Nero AG and Nero, Inc.s Motion for Protective Order [Dkt. 461]. Court GRANTSthe Motion and extends the deadline for Plaintiff, Mediostream to file their Response to November 1, 2010. Responses due by 11/1/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/25/10. (ehs, )
October 25, 2010 Filing 494 Additional Attachments to Main Document: (Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal) 474 Sealed Document.. (Leibnitz, Andrew) Modified on 10/26/2010 (ch, ).
October 25, 2010 Filing 493 NOTICE by Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc. of Compliance With Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) (Wilcox, Melvin)
October 25, 2010 Filing 492 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of Compliance with Rule 26(a)(2) (Smith, Melissa)
October 25, 2010 Filing 491 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of Compliance with Docket Control Order Regarding Identification of Trial Witnesses For Issues on Which It Bears the Burden of Proof (Smith, Melissa)
October 25, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. ORDERS ARE NOT FILED AS SEPARATE DOCUMENTS Document # 481, Additional Attachments. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
October 25, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 472, Additional Attachments. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
October 22, 2010 Filing 490 NOTICE by Gateway, Inc. 's List of Trial Witnesses for Issues on Which It Bears The Burden of Proof (Hogan, Holly)
October 22, 2010 Filing 489 NOTICE by Cyberlink.com Corporation 's List of Trial Witnesses for Issues on Which It Bears The Burden of Proof (Hogan, Holly)
October 22, 2010 Filing 488 NOTICE by Acer America Corporation 's List of Trial Witnesses for Issues on Which It Bears The Burden of Proof (Hogan, Holly)
October 22, 2010 Filing 487 NOTICE by Sonic Solutions : Sonic Solutions' Identification of Trial Witnesses (Hollander, Christina)
October 22, 2010 Filing 486 NOTICE by Sonic Solutions : Notice of Compliance With Rule 26(A)(2) (Hollander, Christina)
October 22, 2010 Filing 485 NOTICE by Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc. of Compliance With Docket Control Order Regarding Identification of Trial Witnesses (Wilcox, Melvin)
October 22, 2010 Filing 484 NOTICE by MedioStream Inc : MedioStream, Inc.'s Identification of Trial Witnesses (Cooper, Byron)
October 22, 2010 Filing 483 NOTICE by Asus Computer International Inc. Identification of Trial Witnesses (Masur, Joshua)
October 22, 2010 Filing 482 NOTICE by Apple Computer, Inc. Apple Inc.'s Identification of Trial Witnesses (Holm, Chris)
October 22, 2010 Filing 481 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: 471 MOTION for Leave to File DEFENDANT SONIC SOLUTIONS' OPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS.. (Thompson, Roderick) Modified on 10/25/2010 (ch, ).
October 22, 2010 Filing 480 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 474 SEALED DOCUMENT. (Thompson, Roderick) Modified on 10/25/2010 (ch, ).
October 22, 2010 Filing 479 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 474 Sealed Document. (Thompson, Roderick)
October 22, 2010 Filing 478 NOTICE by Nero AG, Nero, Inc. Nero, Inc. and Nero AG's Identification of Trial Witnesses (Tyler, Marvin)
October 22, 2010 Filing 477 Witness List by Dell, Inc.. (Fulghum, Roger)
October 22, 2010 Filing 476 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 474 SEALED DOCUMENT. (Thompson, Roderick) Modified on 10/25/2010 (ch, ).
October 22, 2010 Filing 475 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 474 Sealed Document. (Thompson, Roderick)
October 22, 2010 Filing 474 Sealed Document. Sonic Solutions Second Amended Answer to Mediostream, Inc's Fourth Amended Complaint, Defenses, and Counterclaims (Thompson, Roderick) Modified on 10/25/2010 (ch, ).
October 22, 2010 Filing 473 Sealed Document. Declaration of Andrew Leibnitz In Support of Dft Sonic Solutions Opposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Thompson, Roderick) Modified on 10/25/2010 (ch, ).
October 22, 2010 Filing 472 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: 471 MOTION for Leave to File DEFENDANT SONIC SOLUTIONS' OPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Thompson, Roderick) Modified on 10/25/2010 (ch, ).
October 22, 2010 Filing 471 MOTION for Leave to File DEFENDANT SONIC SOLUTIONS' OPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS by Sonic Solutions. (Thompson, Roderick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/26/2010: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
October 22, 2010 Filing 470 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 461 SEALED MOTION for Protective Order (Mediostream, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File their Response to Nero AG & Nero, Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order) by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambin, Daymon)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ORDER denying 213 Sealed Patent Motion to dismiss Neros state law counterclaims for lack of subject matter jurisdiction.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/18/10. (ehs, )
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 468 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - numerous motions by Plaintiff to amend its infringement contentions as to numerous defendants (Dkt. Nos. 304, 306, 308, 309, 310, 311, and 365) and to compel discovery from Microsoft, Sonic Solutions, and Nero (Dkt. Nos. 307, 312, and 320). Having reviewed the briefing and the parties oral arguments, the Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Plaintiffs motions for the reasons set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/18/10. (ehs, )
October 15, 2010 Filing 467 Sealed Document - Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 35)(Smith, Melissa)
October 15, 2010 Filing 466 Opposed SEALED MOTION For Leave to File Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Sudarshan Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
October 14, 2010 Filing 465 SEALED MOTION To Seek Leave To Amend Invalidity Contentions by Nero AG, Nero, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of M. Craig Tyler, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin)
October 12, 2010 Filing 464 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants Sony Corporation and Sony Electronics Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration of Their Motion to Compel Plaintiff Mediostream to Produce Clawed Back Documents by Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
October 12, 2010 Filing 463 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Joint Motion for Leave to Supplement and Amend Invalidity Contentions by Apple Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Declaration of Chris L. Holm, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Scarsi, Mark)
October 11, 2010 Filing 462 MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY PENDING COMPLETION OF INTER PARTES REEXAMINATIONS by Apple Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scarsi, Mark)
October 7, 2010 Filing 461 SEALED MOTION for Protective Order by Nero AG, Nero, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of M. Craig Tyler In Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin)
October 6, 2010 Filing 460 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John E Lord on behalf of MedioStream Inc(a California Corporation), Mediostream, Inc.(a Calfornia Corporation), Mediostream, Inc., Mediostream, Inc.(a California Corporation), Mediostream, Inc.(a California Corporation) (Lord, John)
October 1, 2010 Filing 459 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brian G Bieluch for Microsoft Corporation,Brian G Bieluch for Microsoft Corporation. (Fee paid - check mailed to Tyler)(rml, ) Modified on 10/6/2010 (rml, ).
September 23, 2010 Filing 458 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTIONS HEARING held on 8/20/10 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (53 Pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/18/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/28/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/27/2010. (tja, )
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER granting 456 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Opening Expert Reports October 22, 2010. Rebuttal Expert Reports November 13, 2010. Deadline to file Dispositive Motions and any other motions that may require a hearing (including Daubert motions) November 20, 2010. Deadline to file responses to Dispositive Motions (including Daubert motions) December 13, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/20/10. (ehs, )
September 17, 2010 Filing 456 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions and Expert Reports by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
September 17, 2010 Filing 455 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING held on 8/20/10 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (109 Pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/12/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/21/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/20/2010. (tja, )
September 16, 2010 Filing 454 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ramiz I Rafeedie for Acer America Corporation (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5642(ch, )
September 14, 2010 Filing 453 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William E Zapf for Microsoft Corporation,William E Zapf for Microsoft Corporation. ( APPROVED FEE PAID 2-1-5629) (ehs, )
September 10, 2010 Filing 452 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas R Makin for Sony Corporation,Thomas R Makin for Sony Electronics, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5624. (ch, )
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER granting 447 Motion for Extension of Time to File Expert Reports. All parties Opening Expert Reports and all parties Rebuttal Expert Reports. All parties Opening Expert Reports shall be filed by 9/24/2010 and all parties Rebuttal Expert Reports shall be filed by 10/15/2010.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/8/2010. (ch, )
September 7, 2010 Filing 450 AMENDED COMMISSION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/7/2010. (ch, )
September 7, 2010 Filing 449 Emergency MOTION for an Amended Commission for the Taking of the Deposition of Sony Corporation in Japan (Unopposed) by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Commission)(Forman, Daniel)
September 3, 2010 Filing 448 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ruby Wood on behalf of MedioStream Inc(a California Corporation) (Wood, Ruby)
September 2, 2010 Filing 447 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Reports by Acer America Corporation, Apple Computer, Inc., Asus Computer International Inc., Cyberlink, Inc., Dell, Inc., Gateway, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Nero AG, Nero, Inc., Sonic Solutions, Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
September 2, 2010 Filing 446 COMMISSION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/2/2010. (ch, )
September 2, 2010 Filing 445 Emergency MOTION for a Commission for the Taking of the Deposition of Sony Corporation in Japan (Unopposed) by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Forman, Daniel)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER denying 391 Sealed Patent Motion to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/31/10. (ehs, )
August 30, 2010 Filing 443 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 391 "DEFENDANT SONY CORPORATION'S SUR-REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF MEDIOSTREAM'S MOTION TO COMPEL SONY CORPORATION TO APPEAR FOR DEPOSITIONS IN THE UNITED STATES" Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Sony Corporation to Appear for Depositions in the United States] filed by Sony Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Wilcox, Melvin)
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 442 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION ORDER Resolving Claim Construction Disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on August 27, 2010. (jml)
August 24, 2010 Filing 441 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ramtin Taheri for Microsoft Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5589(ch, )
August 23, 2010 Filing 440 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 393 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel CyberLink.com Corporation to Appear for Deposition in the United States]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel CyberLink.com Corporation to Appear for Deposition in the United States] filed by Acer America Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit P)(Hogan, Holly)
August 20, 2010 Filing 439 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Markman Hearing and Motions Hearing held on 8/20/2010.(Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (Attachments: # 1 sign-in sheet)(delat)
August 19, 2010 Filing 438 REPLY to Response to Motion re 391 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Sony Corporation to Appear for Depositions in the United States]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Sony Corporation to Appear for Depositions in the United States]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Sony Corporation to Appear for Depositions in the United States] filed by MedioStream Inc. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 437 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - before the court are numerous motions relating to discovery and other patent matters. The court's rulings on docket numbers 298, 300, 301, 302, 305, and 313 are set forth herein (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/19/2010. (ch, )
August 19, 2010 Filing 436 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Frederick Gilbert Michaud, Jr on behalf of MedioStream Inc (Michaud, Frederick)
August 19, 2010 Filing 435 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott English Stevens on behalf of Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc. (Stevens, Scott)
August 19, 2010 Filing 434 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott English Stevens on behalf of Cyberlink.com Corporation (Stevens, Scott)
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER - the court gives notice to the parties that oral argument will be heard on 8/20/2010, following the claim construction hearing, concerning the following pending motions: Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Discovery from Miscrosoft [307., Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions as to Microsoft 310 ., Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions as to Sonic Solutions 311 . The court will rule on the remaining motions pending between the parties without oral argument. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/19/2010. (ch, )
August 18, 2010 Filing 432 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Hotline Conference held on 8/18/2010. (Jan Lockhart, ECRO.) (jml)
August 18, 2010 Filing 431 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT.[PLAINTIFF MEDIOSTREAM, INC.'S SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT TO REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF] to 258 Pla Opening Claim Construction Brief and 329 [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Reply Claim Construction Brief] filed by MedioStream, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 32)(Cooper, Byron) Modified on 8/18/2010 (sm, ).
August 13, 2010 Filing 430 SEALED RESPONSE, DEFENDANT SONY CORPORATIONS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF MEDIOSTREAM, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL SONY CORPORATION TO APPEAR FOR DEPOSITIONS IN THE UNITED STATES, to Motion re 391 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Sony Corporation to Appear for Depositions in the United States]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Sony Corporation to Appear for Depositions in the United States]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Sony Corporation to Appear for Depositions in the United States] filed by Sony Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N)(Wilcox, Melvin)
August 12, 2010 Filing 429 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 393 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel CyberLink.com Corporation to Appear for Deposition in the United States] filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S)(Bishop, Gregory)
August 3, 2010 Filing 428 NOTICE by MedioStream Inc (Plaintiff Mediostream, Inc.'s Notice of Service of CD) (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER granting 421 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James C Otteson terminated for Defendants Asus Computer International, Inc., Nero AG and Nero, Inc. (ehs, )
August 2, 2010 Filing 426 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 303 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendant Apple Inc.]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendant Apple Inc.]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendant Apple Inc.] filed by Apple Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Scarsi Declaration)(Scarsi, Mark)
August 2, 2010 Filing 425 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 393 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel CyberLink.com Corporation to Appear for Deposition in the United States]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel CyberLink.com Corporation to Appear for Deposition in the United States] filed by Cyberlink.com Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Hogan, Holly)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER granting 418 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Sonics Unopposed Motion For Leave To Exceed Page Limitations by three (3) pages is GRANTED.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/2/10. (ehs, )
August 2, 2010 Filing 423 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation - Notice of Service of CD upon counsel of record (Defendants' Claim Construction Tutorial) (Smith, Melissa)
August 2, 2010 Filing 422 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation - Notice of Service of CD upon Court (Defendants' Claim Construction Tutorial) (Smith, Melissa)
August 1, 2010 Filing 421 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel by Asus Computer International Inc., Nero AG, Nero, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Otteson, James)
July 30, 2010 Filing 420 NOTICE of Hearing: Markman Hearing RESET for 8/20/2010, 09:00 AM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.(delat)
July 30, 2010 Filing 419 RESPONSE in Opposition re 413 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 391 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Sony Corporation to Appear for Depositions in the United States]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTIONOpposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 391 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Sony Corporation to Appear for Depositions in the United States]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTIONOpposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 391 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Sony Corporation to Appear for Depositions in the United States]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Forman, Daniel)
July 30, 2010 Filing 418 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages In Sonic's Surreply Regarding Mediostream's Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions (docket # 416 ) by Sonic Solutions. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leibnitz, Andrew) Modified on 7/30/2010 (ehs, ).
July 30, 2010 Filing 417 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of Conference to show opposed): 413 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 391 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Sony Corporation to Appear for Depositions in the United States]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTIONOpposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 391 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Sony Corporation to Appear for Depositions in the United States]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTIONOpposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 391 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Sony Corporation to Appear for Depositions in the United States]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Conference)(Wilcox, Melvin) Modified on 7/30/2010 (sm, ).
July 30, 2010 Filing 416 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 311 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Sonic Solutions] filed by Sonic Solutions. (Leibnitz, Andrew)
July 30, 2010 Filing 415 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 312 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream's Motion to Compel Discovery from Sonic Solutions] (Thompson, Roderick)
July 30, 2010 Filing 414 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of Conference to show opposed): 413 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 391 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Sony Corporation to Appear for Depositions in the United States]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTIONOpposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 391 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Sony Corporation to Appear for Depositions in the United States]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTIONOpposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 391 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Sony Corporation to Appear for Depositions in the United States]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Conference)(Wilcox, Melvin) Modified on 7/30/2010 (sm, ).
July 29, 2010 Filing 413 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 391 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Sony Corporation to Appear for Depositions in the United States]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Sony Corporation to Appear for Depositions in the United States]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Sony Corporation to Appear for Depositions in the United States] by Sony Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
July 29, 2010 Filing 412 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony H Cataldo, III on behalf of MedioStream Inc (Cataldo, Anthony)
July 29, 2010 Filing 411 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 332 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Nero AG to Appear for Deposition in the United States]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Nero AG to Appear for Deposition in the United States] filed by Nero AG, Nero, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Tyler, Marvin)
July 27, 2010 Filing 410 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 310 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Defendant Microsoft Corporation]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Defendant Microsoft Corporation]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Defendant Microsoft Corporation]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Defendant Microsoft Corporation]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Defendant Microsoft Corporation] filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Schrader, Scott)
July 26, 2010 Filing 409 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 301 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Defendant ASUS Computer International, Inc. to Produce Marketing and Revenue Documents filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Cataldo Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Supplemental Cataldo Declaration)(Cooper, Byron)
July 26, 2010 Filing 408 REPLY to Response to Motion re 365 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions Against Sony Corporation and Sony Electronics, Inc.]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions Against Sony Corporation and Sony Electronics, Inc.] filed by MedioStream Inc. (Forman, Daniel)
July 26, 2010 Filing 407 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 307 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION -[Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Microsoft Corporation filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit - Declaration of Kip Olson)(Smith, Melissa)
July 23, 2010 Filing 406 NOTICE of Claim Construction Chart by Acer America Corporation, Apple Computer, Inc., Asus Computer International Inc., Cyberlink, Inc., Dell, Inc., Gateway, Inc., MedioStream Inc, Microsoft Corporation, Nero AG, Nero, Inc., Sonic Solutions, Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cooper, Byron) Modified on 7/26/2010 (sm, ).
July 22, 2010 Filing 405 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 303 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendant Apple Inc.]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendant Apple Inc.]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendant Apple Inc.] filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6 Part 1, # 7 Exhibit 6 Part 2, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Declaration of Byron Cooper in Support of Plaintiff MedioStream's Reply in Support of its Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendant Apple Inc.)(Cooper, Byron)
July 20, 2010 Filing 404 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT [PLAINTIFF MEDIOSTREAM, INC.'S SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBITS TO REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF] re 258 [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Opening Claim Construction Brief] and re 329 [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Reply Claim Construction Brief] filed by MedioStream, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 30 Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 30 Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 30 Part 3, # 4 Exhibit 30 Part 4, # 5 Exhibit 31)(Cooper, Byron) Modified on 7/21/2010 (sm, ).
July 19, 2010 Filing 403 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 311 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Sonic Solutions] filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, Part 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, Part 2, # 4 Exhibit 2, Part 3, # 5 Exhibit 2, Part 4, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5)(Koch, Charles)
July 19, 2010 Filing 402 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 312 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream's Motion to Compel Discovery from Sonic Solutions] filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Koch, Charles)
July 19, 2010 Filing 401 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 307 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Microsoft Corporation] filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Koch, Charles)
July 19, 2010 Filing 400 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 310 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Defendant Microsoft Corporation] filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, Part 1, # 4 Exhibit 3, Part 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, Part 3, # 6 Exhibit 3, Part 4, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5)(Koch, Charles)
July 19, 2010 Filing 399 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 298 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MEDIOSTREAM TO PRODUCE CLAWED BACK DOCUMENTS filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Declaration of Stephane Desproges)(Cooper, Byron)
July 19, 2010 Filing 398 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 332 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Nero AG to Appear for Deposition in the United States]filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Bishop, Gregory)
July 19, 2010 Filing 397 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 300 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MEDIOSTREAM TO PROVIDE A COMPLETE RESPONSE TO JOINT INTERROGATORY NO. 8 filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Chan, Andy)
July 19, 2010 Filing 396 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 320 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendants Nero, Inc.and Nero AG]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendants Nero, Inc.and Nero AG] filed by Nero AG, Nero, Inc.. (Tyler, Marvin)
July 16, 2010 Filing 395 RESPONSE in Opposition re 365 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions Against Sony Corporation and Sony Electronics, Inc.]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions Against Sony Corporation and Sony Electronics, Inc.] DEFENDANTS SONY CORPORATION AND SONY ELECTRONICS INC.'S OPPOSITION-IN-PART TO PLAINTIFF MEDIOSTREAM, INC.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AGAINST SONY CORPORATION AND SONY ELECTRONICS INC. filed by Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc.. (Wilcox, Melvin)
July 15, 2010 Filing 394 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam A Biggs on behalf of Apple Computer, Inc. (Biggs, Adam)
July 14, 2010 Filing 393 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel CyberLink.com Corporation to Appear for Deposition in the United States] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (s) 1-11, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bishop, Gregory)
July 12, 2010 Filing 392 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 306 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against ASUS Computer International, Inc] filed by MedioStream Inc. (Chan, Andy)
July 12, 2010 Filing 391 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Sony Corporation to Appear for Depositions in the United States] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel Forman, # 2 Exhibit (s) 1-14 to Forman Decl., # 3 Exhibit 15 to Forman Decl., # 4 Exhibit 16 to Forman Decl., # 5 Exhibit 17 to Forman Decl., # 6 Exhibit 18 to Forman Decl., # 7 Exhibit 19 to Forman Decl., # 8 Exhibit 20 to Forman Decl., # 9 Exhibit 21 to Forman Decl., # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Forman, Daniel)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER granting 387 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply in Support of its Motion to Compel ASUS Computer International, Inc. to Produce Marketing and Revenue Documents. Reply will be due 7/26/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/12/10. (ehs, )
July 9, 2010 Filing 389 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 303 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendant Apple Inc.]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendant Apple Inc.]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendant Apple Inc.] filed by Apple Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Mark C. Scarsi, # 2 Exhibit A)(Scarsi, Mark)
July 9, 2010 Filing 388 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 332 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Nero AG to Appear for Deposition in the United States]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Nero AG to Appear for Deposition in the United States] filed by Nero AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin)
July 9, 2010 Filing 387 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply in Support of Its Motion to Compel ASUS Computer International, Inc. to Produce Marketing and Revenue Documents] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chan, Andy)
July 8, 2010 Filing 386 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 310 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Defendant Microsoft Corporation]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Defendant Microsoft Corporation]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Defendant Microsoft Corporation]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Defendant Microsoft Corporation]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Defendant Microsoft Corporation] filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Scott A. Schrader, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S)(Schrader, Scott)
July 8, 2010 Filing 385 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 320 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendants Nero, Inc.and Nero AG]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendants Nero, Inc.and Nero AG] filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Bishop, Gregory)
July 8, 2010 Filing 384 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 300 DEFENDANTS SONY CORPORATION AND SONY ELECTRONICS INC.'S REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MEDIOSTREAM TO PROVIDE A COMPLETE RESPONSE TO JOINT INTERROGATORY NO. 8 filed by Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Wilcox, Melvin)
July 8, 2010 Filing 383 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 298 "DEFENDANTS SONY REPLY BREF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MEDIOSTREAM TO PRODUCE CLAWED BACK DOCUMENTS" SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MEDIOSTREAM TO PRODUCE CLAWED BACK DOCUMENTS filed by Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Wilcox, Melvin)
July 8, 2010 Filing 382 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 307 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION - [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Microsoft Corporation] filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit - Gutierrez Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A to Gutierrez Decl., # 3 Exhibit B to Gutierrez Decl., # 4 Exhibit C to Gutierrez Decl., # 5 Exhibit D to Gutierrez Decl., # 6 Exhibit E to Gutierrez Decl., # 7 Exhibit F to Gutierrez Decl., # 8 Exhibit G to Gutierrez Decl., # 9 Exhibit H to Gutierrez Decl., # 10 Exhibit I to Gutierrez Decl., # 11 Affidavit - Olson Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 1 to Olson Declaration, # 13 Affidavit - Williams Declaration)(Smith, Melissa)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER granting 379 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/7/2010. (ch, )
July 7, 2010 Filing 380 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE [Opposition] to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 311 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Sonic Solutions]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Sonic Solutions] filed by Sonic Solutions. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leibnitz, Andrew)
July 7, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY - ATTORNEY WILL REFILE Document # 376, Sealed Patent Response. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
July 7, 2010 NOTICE - clerk modified documents # 378 and 379 to link to # 380. Document # 376 was refiled as document # 380 (ch, )
July 6, 2010 Filing 379 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re 380 Opposition to MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions by Sonic Solutions. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leibnitz, Andrew) Modified on 7/7/2010 (ch, ).
July 6, 2010 Filing 378 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT [DECLARATION of Andrew Leibnitz in Support of 380 Sonic Solutions' Opposition to MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions]. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH, # 35 Exhibit II, # 36 Exhibit JJ, # 37 Exhibit KK, # 38 Exhibit LL, # 39 Exhibit MM, # 40 Exhibit NN, # 41 Exhibit OO, # 42 Exhibit PP)(Leibnitz, Andrew) Modified on 7/7/2010 (ch, ).
July 6, 2010 Filing 377 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT [Declaration of James Roth in Support of Defendant Sonic Solutions' Opposition to MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel 374 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Thompson, Roderick)
July 6, 2010 Filing 376 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED PATENT RESPONSE [Opposition] to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 311 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Sonic Solutions]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Sonic Solutions] filed by Sonic Solutions. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leibnitz, Andrew) Modified on 7/7/2010 (ch, ).
July 6, 2010 Filing 375 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT [Declaration of Andrew Leibnitz in Support of Defendant Sonic Solutions' Opposition to MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel 374 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB)(Thompson, Roderick)
July 6, 2010 Filing 374 SEALED RESPONSE [Opposition] to Motion re 312 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream's Motion to Compel Discovery from Sonic Solutions]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream's Motion to Compel Discovery from Sonic Solutions]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream's Motion to Compel Discovery from Sonic Solutions] filed by Sonic Solutions. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Roderick)
July 2, 2010 Filing 373 RESPONSE in Opposition re 306 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against ASUS Computer International, Inc.]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against ASUS Computer International, Inc.] (refiled with Certificate of Service) filed by Asus Computer International Inc.. (Masur, Joshua)
July 2, 2010 Filing 372 RESPONSE in Opposition re 301 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Defendant ASUS Computer International, Inc. to Produce Marketing and Revenue Documents]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Defendant ASUS Computer International, Inc. to Produce Marketing and Revenue Documents] (refiled with Certificate of Service) filed by Asus Computer International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Joshua M. Masur (with Exhibits 1-4))(Masur, Joshua)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER granting 368 Motion for Extension of Time to File opposition to Pltf's MedioStream's motion to compel discovery from deft Apple Inc. Responses due by 7/9/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/2/10. (ehs, )
July 2, 2010 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 370, Response in Opposition to 307 submitted by Asus Computer International Inc.. NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
July 2, 2010 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 369 submitted Response in Opposition by Asus Computer International Inc.. NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
July 1, 2010 Filing 370 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***RESPONSE in Opposition re 307 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Microsoft Corporation]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Microsoft Corporation], 301 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Defendant ASUS Computer International, Inc. to Produce Marketing and Revenue Documents]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Defendant ASUS Computer International, Inc. to Produce Marketing and Revenue Documents] filed by Asus Computer International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Joshua M. Masur)(Masur, Joshua) Modified on 7/2/2010 (ch, ).
July 1, 2010 Filing 369 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***RESPONSE in Opposition re 306 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against ASUS Computer International, Inc.]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against ASUS Computer International, Inc.] filed by Asus Computer International Inc.. (Masur, Joshua) Modified on 7/2/2010 (ch, ).
July 1, 2010 Filing 368 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 303 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendant Apple Inc.]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendant Apple Inc.]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendant Apple Inc.] by Apple Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scarsi, Mark)
July 1, 2010 Filing 367 NOTICE by Nero AG, Nero, Inc. re 302 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Nero, Inc. and Nero AG]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Nero, Inc. and Nero AG] Defendant Nero, Inc. and Nero AG's Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff Mediostream, INc.'s Motion to Amend It's Infringement Contentions against Nero, Inc. and Nero AG (Tyler, Marvin)
June 28, 2010 Filing 366 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 320 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendants Nero, Inc.and Nero AG]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendants Nero, Inc.and Nero AG] filed by Nero AG, Nero, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Rene Petri In Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin)
June 28, 2010 Filing 365 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions Against Sony Corporation and Sony Electronics, Inc.] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 1 Part 3, # 4 Exhibit 1 Part 4, # 5 Exhibit 1 Part 5, # 6 Exhibit 1 Part 6, # 7 Exhibit 1 Part 7, # 8 Exhibit 1 Part 8, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Forman, Daniel)
June 28, 2010 Filing 364 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 298 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MEDIOSTREAM TO PRODUCE CLAWED BACK DOCUMENTS filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit (s) 2-6, # 3 Exhibit 7, # 4 Exhibit 8, # 5 Exhibit 9, # 6 Exhibit (s) 10-15, # 7 Exhibit (s) 16-20, # 8 Exhibit A Part 1, # 9 Exhibit A Part 2, # 10 Exhibit A Part 3, # 11 Exhibit A Part 4, # 12 Exhibit A Part 5, # 13 Exhibit A Part 6, # 14 Exhibit A Part 7, # 15 Exhibit A Part 8, # 16 Exhibit A Part 9, # 17 Exhibit A Part 10, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Byron)
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER granting 360 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Discovery from Microsoft Corporation [Dkt. 307]. Responses due by 7/8/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/28/10. (ehs, )
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER granting 359 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs Motion For Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions against Microsoft Corporation. Responses due by 7/8/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/28/10. (ehs, )
June 28, 2010 Filing 361 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 300 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MEDIOSTREAM TO PROVIDE A COMPLETE RESPONSE TO JOINT INTERROGATORY NO. 8 filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Chan, Andy)
June 25, 2010 Filing 360 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 307 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Microsoft Corporation]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Microsoft Corporation] by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
June 25, 2010 Filing 359 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 310 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Defendant Microsoft Corporation]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Defendant Microsoft Corporation]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Defendant Microsoft Corporation]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Defendant Microsoft Corporation]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Defendant Microsoft Corporation] by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
June 25, 2010 Filing 358 Additional Attachments to Main Document: (CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) 351 Response to Motion,.. (Hogan, Holly) Modified on 7/14/2010 (ch, ).
June 25, 2010 Filing 357 Additional Attachments to Main Document: (CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) 350 Response to Motion,.. (Hogan, Holly) Modified on 7/14/2010 (ch, ).
June 25, 2010 Filing 356 Additional Attachments to Main Document: (CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) 349 Affidavit in Support of Motion,.. (Hogan, Holly) Modified on 7/14/2010 (ch, ).
June 25, 2010 Filing 355 Additional Attachments to Main Document: (CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) 348 Response to Motion,.. (Hogan, Holly) Modified on 7/14/2010 (ch, ).
June 24, 2010 Filing 354 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David J Goldstone on behalf of MedioStream Inc (Goldstone, David)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER granting 345 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 307 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Microsoft Corporation]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Microsoft Corporation] Responses due by 7/1/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on June 24, 2010. (jml)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER granting 344 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting 344 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 310 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Defendant Microsoft Corporation]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Defendant Microsoft Corporation]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Defendant Microsoft Corporation]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Defendant Microsoft Corporation]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Defendant Microsoft Corporation] ( Responses due by 7/1/2010). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/24/2010. (ch, )
June 24, 2010 Filing 351 RESPONSE to Motion re 305 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against CyberLink.com Corporation]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against CyberLink.com Corporation] filed by Cyberlink.com Corporation. (Hogan, Holly)
June 24, 2010 Filing 350 RESPONSE to Motion re 308 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Gateway, Inc.]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Gateway, Inc.] filed by Gateway, Inc.. (Hogan, Holly)
June 24, 2010 Filing 349 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 304 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Acer America Corp.]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Acer America Corp.] Declaration of Holly Hogan filed by Acer America Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Hogan, Holly)
June 24, 2010 Filing 348 RESPONSE to Motion re 304 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Acer America Corp.]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Acer America Corp.] filed by Acer America Corporation. (Hogan, Holly)
June 24, 2010 Filing 347 RESPONSE to Motion re 309 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Dell Inc.]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Dell Inc.] filed by Dell, Inc.. (Fulghum, Roger)
June 24, 2010 Filing 346 RESPONSE to Motion re 313 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Apple Inc.]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Apple Inc.] Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Non-Opposition filed by Apple Computer, Inc.. (Scarsi, Mark)
June 23, 2010 Filing 345 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 307 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Microsoft Corporation]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Microsoft Corporation] by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
June 23, 2010 Filing 344 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Defendant Microsoft Corporation, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 310 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Defendant Microsoft Corporation]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Defendant Microsoft Corporation]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Defendant Microsoft Corporation]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Defendant Microsoft Corporation]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Defendant Microsoft Corporation] by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER granting 341 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.s Motion to Compel Discovery From Defendant Apple Inc. Responses due by 7/1/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/23/10. (ehs, )
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER granting 340 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christl Denecke terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/23/10. (ehs, )
June 22, 2010 Filing 341 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 303 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendant Apple Inc.]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendant Apple Inc.]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendant Apple Inc.] by Apple Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scarsi, Mark)
June 22, 2010 Filing 340 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney [Christl Denecke] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Byron)
June 22, 2010 Filing 339 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: [PLAINTIFF MEDIOSTREAM, INC.'S CORRECTED CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE] 332 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Nero AG to Appear for Deposition in the United States]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Nero AG to Appear for Deposition in the United States]. (Cooper, Byron)
June 22, 2010 Filing 338 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT to Main Document: [PLAINTIFF MEDIOSTREAM, INC.'S CORRECTED CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE] 320 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendants Nero, Inc.and Nero AG]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendants Nero, Inc.and Nero AG]. (Cooper, Byron)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER granting 331 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants Sony Corporation and Sony Electronics Inc.s Motion to Compel MedioStream to Provide a Complete Response to Joint Interrogatory No. 8. Responses due by 6/28/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/21/10. (ehs, )
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER granting 330 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants Sony Corporation and Sony Electronics Inc.s Motion to Compel MedioStream to Produce Clawed Back Documents. Responses due by 6/28/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/21/10. (ehs, )
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER granting 328 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to MedioStream Inc.s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against ASUS. Responses due by 7/1/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/21/10. (ehs, )
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER granting 327 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to MedioStream Inc.s Motion to Compel ASUS to Produce Marketing and Revenue Documents. Responses due by 7/1/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/21/10. (ehs, )
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER granting 326 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to MedioStream Inc.s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Nero, Inc. and Nero AG. Responses due by 7/1/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/21/10. (ehs, )
June 18, 2010 Filing 332 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Nero AG to Appear for Deposition in the United States] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Denecke, Christl)
June 18, 2010 Filing 331 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 300 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MEDIOSTREAM TO PROVIDE A COMPLETE RESPONSE TO JOINT INTERROGATORY NO. 8 by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chan, Andy)
June 18, 2010 Filing 330 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 298 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MEDIOSTREAM TO PRODUCE CLAWED BACK DOCUMENTS by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chan, Andy)
June 18, 2010 Filing 329 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT re Dkt. No. 258 [PLAINTIFF MEDIOSTREAM, INC.'S REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 28, # 2 Exhibit 29)(Cooper, Byron)
June 18, 2010 Filing 328 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 306 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against ASUS Computer International, Inc.]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against ASUS Computer International, Inc.] by Asus Computer International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin)
June 18, 2010 Filing 327 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 301 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Defendant ASUS Computer International, Inc. to Produce Marketing and Revenue Documents]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Defendant ASUS Computer International, Inc. to Produce Marketing and Revenue Documents] by Asus Computer International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin)
June 18, 2010 Filing 326 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 302 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Nero, Inc. and Nero AG]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Nero, Inc. and Nero AG] by Nero AG, Nero, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin)
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER - Within three days, Mediostream is ordered to update its answer to interrogatory number 4 with either (1) the build number of NeoDVD displayed at PC Expo; or (2) a narrative response explaining why Mediostream cannot provide the build number. If Mediostream chooses option two, the narrative shall be accompanied by a statement from Mediostream declaring that it does not know and cannot determine the build number of the NeoDVD software displayed at PC Expo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/18/10. (ehs, )
June 16, 2010 Filing 324 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 315 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO ENFORCE THE COURT'S ORDER COMPELLING MEDIOSTREAM, INC. TO STATE THE "BUILD VERSION" OF NEODVD DISPLAYED AT PC EXPO filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cooper, Byron)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER denying 153 Motion for Reconsideration (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/16/2010. (ch, )
June 15, 2010 Filing 322 SEALED PATENT REPLY Brief In Further Support of Their Motion to Enforce the Court's Order Compelling Mediostream, Inc. to State the "Build Version" of NEODVD Displayed at PC Expo re 315 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO ENFORCE THE COURT'S ORDER COMPELLING MEDIOSTREAM, INC. TO STATE THE "BUILD VERSION" OF NEODVD DISPLAYED AT PC EXPO filed by Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Wilcox, Melvin)
June 14, 2010 Filing 321 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 315 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO ENFORCE THE COURT'S ORDER COMPELLING MEDIOSTREAM, INC. TO STATE THE "BUILD VERSION" OF NEODVD DISPLAYED AT PC EXPO filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Byron)
June 10, 2010 Filing 320 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendants Nero, Inc.and Nero AG] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Denecke, Christl)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER granting 318 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses to Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.s Motion to Compel Discovery from Sonic Solutions (Dkt. 312) and MedioStreams Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Sonic Solutions (Dkt. 311). Responses due by 7/6/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/10/10. (ehs, )
June 9, 2010 Filing 318 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 312 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream's Motion to Compel Discovery from Sonic Solutions]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream's Motion to Compel Discovery from Sonic Solutions]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream's Motion to Compel Discovery from Sonic Solutions], 311 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Sonic Solutions]Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Sonic Solutions] by Sonic Solutions. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leibnitz, Andrew)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDERED that the plaintiff is ordered to respond the defendants motion by Monday, June 14, 2010 at 5:00 p.m. Central Daylight Time and fully explain how its supplemental interrogatory response complied with this courts order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/9/10. (ehs, )
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER denying 247 Apple's Sealed Motion for Protection re depositions. Other rulings set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on June 9, 2010. (jml) Modified on 6/9/2010 (jml, ). Modified on 6/9/2010 (sm, ).
June 9, 2010 NOTICE FROM CLERK re 316 Order on Sealed Motion. Clerk has modified this entry to be unsealed per Judge Everingham. (jml)
June 9, 2010 NEF regenerated for Dkt. No. 316 to all attorneys.(jml)
June 8, 2010 Filing 315 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO ENFORCE THE COURT'S ORDER COMPELLING MEDIOSTREAM, INC. TO STATE THE "BUILD VERSION" OF NEODVD DISPLAYED AT PC EXPO by Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER denying 204 Sealed Emergency Motion for relief for protective order violations and Notice of joinder. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/8/2010. (ch, )
June 5, 2010 Filing 313 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Apple Inc.] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, # 3 Exhibit (s) 2-15, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Unruh, Rebecca)
June 5, 2010 Filing 312 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream's Motion to Compel Discovery from Sonic Solutions] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (s) 1 - 4, # 2 Exhibit (s) 5 - 6, # 3 Exhibit 7, # 4 Exhibit 8, # 5 Exhibit 9, # 6 Exhibit (s) 10 - 12, # 7 Exhibit (s) 13 - 14, # 8 Exhibit 15 Part 1, # 9 Exhibit 15 Part 2, # 10 Exhibit (s) 16 - 18, # 11 Exhibit 19, # 12 Exhibit (s) 20 - 22, # 13 Exhibit (s) 23 - 24, # 14 Exhibit 25, # 15 Exhibit (s) 26 - 27, # 16 Proposed Order)(Koch, Charles)
June 5, 2010 Filing 311 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Sonic Solutions] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 1 Part 3, # 4 Exhibit 1 Part 4, # 5 Exhibit (s) 2-30, # 6 Exhibit 31, # 7 Exhibit (s) 32-36, # 8 Exhibit (s) 37-39, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Byron)
June 5, 2010 Filing 310 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Defendant Microsoft Corporation] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit 44, # 45 Proposed Order)(Koch, Charles)
June 5, 2010 Filing 309 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Dell Inc.] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 1 Part 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Chan, Andy)
June 5, 2010 Filing 308 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Gateway, Inc.] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Chan, Andy)
June 5, 2010 Filing 307 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Microsoft Corporation] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Proposed Order)(Koch, Charles)
June 5, 2010 Filing 306 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against ASUS Computer International, Inc.] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Chan, Andy)
June 4, 2010 Filing 305 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against CyberLink.com Corporation] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit (s) 2-14, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Denecke, Christl)
June 4, 2010 Filing 304 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Acer America Corp.] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Proposed Order)(Chan, Andy)
June 4, 2010 Filing 303 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendant Apple Inc.] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rebecca L. Unruh in Support of Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendant Apple Inc., # 2 Unruh Exhibit 1, # 3 Unruh Exhibits 2-15, # 4 Unruh Exhibits 16-20, # 5 Unruh Exhibits 21-29, # 6 Unruh Exhibits 30-33, # 7 Unruh Exhibit 34, # 8 Unruh Exhibits 35-41, # 9 Proposed Order)(Unruh, Rebecca)
June 4, 2010 Filing 302 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Nero, Inc. and Nero AG] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, # 3 Exhibit (s) 2-17, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Denecke, Christl)
June 4, 2010 Filing 301 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Defendant ASUS Computer International, Inc. to Produce Marketing and Revenue Documents] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Anthony Cataldo, # 2 Exhibit (s) 1-9 to Cataldo Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Byron)
June 4, 2010 Filing 300 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MEDIOSTREAM TO PROVIDE A COMPLETE RESPONSE TO JOINT INTERROGATORY NO. 8 by Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E (1 OF 4), # 6 Exhibit E (2 OF 4), # 7 Exhibit E (3 OF 4), # 8 Exhibit E (4 OF 4), # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Exhibit L, # 16 Exhibit M, # 17 Exhibit N, # 18 Exhibit O, # 19 Exhibit P, # 20 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
June 4, 2010 Filing 299 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Gregory Phillip Love on behalf of Cyberlink.com Corporation (Love, Gregory)
June 4, 2010 Filing 298 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MEDIOSTREAM TO PRODUCE CLAWED BACK DOCUMENTS by Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y (1 OF 2), # 26 Exhibit Y (2 OF 2), # 27 Exhibit Z (1 OF 3), # 28 Exhibit Z (2 OF 3), # 29 Exhibit Z (3 OF 3), # 30 Exhibit AA, # 31 Exhibit BB, # 32 Exhibit CC, # 33 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER granting 94 Sealed Patent Motion for Nero, Inc. and Nero, AGs Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/1/10. (ehs, )
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER granting 149 Sealed Patent Motion. Based upon the disclosure of theNorris memo to a third-party, the memo is no longer subject to attorney-client privilege. Therefore, the court orders the production of the memo to Mediostream within five days.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/1/10. (ehs, )
May 31, 2010 Filing 295 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT, Apple Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Cheng C. Kao in Support of MedioStream Inc.'s Response to PATENT Motion re 247 Opposed SEALED MOTION For a Protective Order filed by Apple Computer, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Scarsi, Mark)
May 31, 2010 Filing 294 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 247 Opposed SEALED MOTION For a Protective Order filed by Apple Computer, Inc.. (Scarsi, Mark)
May 28, 2010 Filing 293 NOTICE re: ORDER from USCA for the Federal Circuit that Media Stream Inc is directed to respond no later than 17 days from the date of filing of this order (ehs, )
May 27, 2010 Filing 292 NOTICE from USCA for the Federal Court assigning the petition for writ of mandamus filed by ASUS on 5/24/10 case number MISC 942 IN RE ACER AMERICA (ehs, )
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 255 Motion to compel. The plaintiff Mediostream, Inc. (Mediostream) is directed to supplement its response to Interrogatory No. 7 and state the software build version of NeoDVD displayed at PC Expo. Mediostream is also directed to supplement its answer to Interrogatory No. 6 to state its contentions as to the reduction to practice of any asserted claim. The balance of Sonys motion is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/26/10. (ehs, )
May 20, 2010 Filing 290 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 223 SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Counterclaims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)] SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Counterclaims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)] filed by Nero AG. (Tyler, Marvin)
May 20, 2010 Filing 289 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 213 SEALED PATENT MOTION -- MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Nero AG's Counterclaims Pursuant To Rule 12(B)(1) In Its Fourth Amended Answer For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction SEALED PATENT MOTION -- MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Nero AG's Counterclaims Pursuant To Rule 12(B)(1) In Its Fourth Amended Answer For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Nero AG. (Tyler, Marvin)
May 17, 2010 Filing 288 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief re Docket No. 258. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Holm Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K)(Scarsi, Mark)
May 17, 2010 Filing 287 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 223 SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Counterclaims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)] filed by Asus Computer International Inc., Dell, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Nero, Inc., Sonic Solutions, Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
May 13, 2010 Filing 286 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 255 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MEDIOSTREAM TO PROVIDE COMPLETE RESPONSES TO JOINT INTERROGATORY NOS. 6 AND 7 filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Chan, Andy)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER granting 284 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 5/31/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/12/2010. (ch, )
May 11, 2010 Filing 284 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 279 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,,, by Apple Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scarsi, Mark)
May 7, 2010 Filing 283 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 213 SEALED PATENT MOTION -- MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Nero AG's Counterclaims Pursuant To Rule 12(B)(1) In Its Fourth Amended Answer For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction SEALED PATENT MOTION -- MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Nero AG's Counterclaims Pursuant To Rule 12(B)(1) In Its Fourth Amended Answer For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Mediostream, Inc.. (Unruh, Rebecca)
May 7, 2010 Filing 282 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 223 SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Counterclaims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)] SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Counterclaims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)] filed by Mediostream, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Unruh, Rebecca)
May 6, 2010 Filing 281 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 224 SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Affirmative Defenses Pursuant to Rule 12(f)] SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Affirmative Defenses Pursuant to Rule 12(f)] filed by Mediostream, Inc.. (Unruh, Rebecca)
May 6, 2010 Filing 280 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 223 SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Counterclaims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)] SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Counterclaims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)] filed by Mediostream, Inc.. (Unruh, Rebecca)
May 5, 2010 Filing 279 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 247 Opposed SEALED MOTION For a Protective Order filed by Mediostream, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Kao Declaration with Exhibits 1 and 2, # 2 Unruh Declaration, # 3 Unruh Exhibit A, # 4 Unruh Exhibit B, # 5 Unruh Exhibit C, # 6 Unruh Exhibit D, # 7 Unruh Exhibit E, # 8 Unruh Exhibit F, # 9 Unruh Exhibit G, # 10 Unruh Exhibit H, # 11 Unruh Exhibit I, # 12 Unruh Exhibit J, # 13 Unruh Exhibit K, # 14 Unruh Exhibit L, # 15 Unruh Exhibit M, # 16 Unruh Exhibit N, # 17 Unruh Exhibit O, # 18 Unruh Exhibit P, # 19 Unruh Exhibit Q, # 20 Unruh Exhibit R, # 21 Unruh Exhibit S, # 22 Unruh Exhibit T, # 23 Unruh Exhibit U, # 24 Text of Proposed Order)(Unruh, Rebecca)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER granting 274 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs Reply until May 6, 2010 and extension will not alter any other deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/3/10. (poa, )
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER granting 275 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Defendants opposition to Medio Stream Motion to Strike Defendants Inequitable Conduct Affirmative Defensese Pursuant to Rule 12(f). Plaintiff has until May 6, 2010 and such extension will not alter any other deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/3/10. (poa, )
April 30, 2010 Filing 276 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 255 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MEDIOSTREAM TO PROVIDE COMPLETE RESPONSES TO JOINT INTERROGATORY NOS. 6 AND 7 DEFENDANTS SONY CORPORATION AND SONY ELECTRONICS INC.'S REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MEDIOSTREAM TO PROVIDE COMPLETE RESPONSES TO JOINT INTERROGATORY NOS. 6 AND 7 filed by Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C (1 of 4), # 4 Exhibit C (2 of 4), # 5 Exhibit C (3 of 4), # 6 Exhibit C (4 of 4))(Wilcox, Melvin)
April 30, 2010 Filing 275 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 265 Sealed Response to Motion, [Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply to Defendants' Opposition to MedioStream's Motion to Strike Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Affirmative Defenses Pursuant to Rule 12(f)] by Mediostream, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Unruh, Rebecca)
April 30, 2010 Filing 274 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 263 Sealed Response to Motion,, [Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply to Defendants' Opposition to MedioStream's Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Counterclaims Pursuant to Rule 12(b(6)] by Mediostream, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Unruh, Rebecca)
April 30, 2010 Filing 273 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 153 Opposed MOTION for Reconsideration re 127 Memorandum & Opinion, Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Transfer to the Northern District of CaliforniaOpposed MOTION for Reconsideration re 127 Memorandum & Opinion, Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Transfer to the Northern District of California.. (Fulghum, Roger)
April 29, 2010 Filing 272 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 255 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MEDIOSTREAM TO PROVIDE COMPLETE RESPONSES TO JOINT INTERROGATORY NOS. 6 AND 7 filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Chan, Andy)
April 29, 2010 Filing 271 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Scott Ponder on behalf of Dell, Inc. (Ponder, Christopher)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 270 PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE AND USE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/27/2010. (ch, )
April 26, 2010 Filing 269 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 223 SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Counterclaims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)] SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Counterclaims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)] filed by Nero AG. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin)
April 26, 2010 Filing 268 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 213 SEALED PATENT MOTION -- MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Nero AG's Counterclaims Pursuant To Rule 12(B)(1) In Its Fourth Amended Answer For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction SEALED PATENT MOTION -- MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Nero AG's Counterclaims Pursuant To Rule 12(B)(1) In Its Fourth Amended Answer For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Nero AG. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin)
April 23, 2010 Filing 267 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 93 Protective Order by Apple Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Scarsi, Mark)
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER granting 264 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in their Response in Opposition to Plaintiff Mediostream, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss Defendants Inequitable Conduct Counterclaims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/23/10. (ehs, )
April 22, 2010 Filing 265 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 224 SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Affirmative Defenses Pursuant to Rule 12(f)]filed by Acer America Corporation, Asus Computer International Inc., Cyberlink.com Corporation, Dell, Inc., Gateway, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Nero AG, Nero, Inc., Sonic Solutions, Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
April 22, 2010 Filing 264 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Defendants' Response to Plaintiff Mediostream's Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Counterclaims Purusant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Asus Computer International Inc., Dell, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Nero, Inc., Sonic Solutions, Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
April 22, 2010 Filing 263 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 223 SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Counterclaims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Asus Computer International Inc., Dell, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Nero, Inc., Sonic Solutions, Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc. (Attachments: #(1) Affidavit Declaration of R. Sudarshan, #(2) Exhibit A to Sudarshan Declaration, #(3) Exhibit B to Sudarshan Declaration, #(4) Exhibit C to Sudarshan Declaration, #(5) Exhibit D to Sudarshan Declaration, #(6) Exhibit E to Sudarshan Declaration)(Smith, Melissa)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER granting 256 Motion For Extension Of Time To File. ORDERED that MedioStreams Motion for Extension of Time to File Its Response To Defendants Sony Corporation And Sony Electronics Inc.s Motion To Compel Complete Responses To Joint Interrogatory Nos. 6 and 7 be granted, and that MedioStream, Inc.s response will be due on April 29, 2010.Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/19/10. (ehs, )
April 16, 2010 Filing 261 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christina R Hollander,Matthew A Hollander for Sonic Solutions,Christina R Hollander,Matthew A Hollander for Sonic Solutions,Christina R Hollander,Matthew A Hollander for Sonic Solutions,Christina R Hollander,Matthew A Hollander for Sonic Solutions. (Attachments: # 1 PHV Matt Hollander (RECEIPT 6-1-21866))(rml, )
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER granting 259 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jessica Lea Hannah terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/15/10. (ehs, )
April 13, 2010 Filing 259 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jessica L. Hannah by MedioStream Inc(a California Corporation), Mediostream, Inc.(a Calfornia Corporation), Mediostream, Inc., Mediostream, Inc.(a California Corporation), Mediostream, Inc.(a California Corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 5, 2010 Filing 258 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Opening Construction Brief] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27)(Cooper, Byron)
April 2, 2010 Filing 257 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANTS SONY CORPORATION AND SONY ELECTRONICS INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF MEDIOSTREAM'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ITS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SONY CORPORATION AND SONY ELECTRONICS INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLETE RESPONSES TO JOINT INTERROGATORY NOS. 6 AND 7 filed by Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
April 1, 2010 Filing 256 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to File its Response to Defendants Sony Corporation and Sony Electronics Inc.'s Motion to Compel Complete Responses to Joint Interrogatory Nos. 6 and 7] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Chan, Andy)
March 26, 2010 Filing 255 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MEDIOSTREAM TO PROVIDE COMPLETE RESPONSES TO JOINT INTERROGATORY NOS. 6 AND 7 by Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Zaed m. Billah, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
March 24, 2010 Filing 254 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel M Forman on behalf of MedioStream Inc (Forman, Daniel)
March 24, 2010 Filing 253 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel M Forman on behalf of MedioStream Inc (Forman, Daniel) Modified on 3/24/2010 (ch, ).
March 24, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY WILL NEED TO FILE SIGNING AND USING OWN LOGIN AND PASSWORD. Document # 253, Notice of Attorney Appearance. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
March 23, 2010 Filing 252 Sealed Document - Defendants' Second Supplemental Brief in Further Support of Defendants Microsoft Corp., Nero AG, Nero Inc., Acer America Corp., Cyberlink.com Corp., and Gateway, Inc.'s Emergency Motion for Relief for Protective Order Violations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Melissa)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER granting 250 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 247 Opposed SEALED MOTION For a Protective Order Responses due by 5/5/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/23/2010. (ch, )
March 22, 2010 Filing 250 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 247 Opposed SEALED MOTION For a Protective Order by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Unruh, Rebecca)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER granting 248 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Deanna L Kwong; Stanley Young; Kirran Bari and Kevin Joseph Hickey terminated for Sonic Solutions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/22/10. (ehs, )
March 19, 2010 Filing 248 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Covington & Burling's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant Sonic Solutions by Sonic Solutions. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Young, Stanley)
March 18, 2010 Filing 247 Opposed SEALED MOTION For a Protective Order by Apple Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jon Rubinstein, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Steve Jobs, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Chris Holm, # 4 Exhibit Holm Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit Holm Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit Holm Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit Holm Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit Holm Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit Holm Exhibit F, # 10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 11 Certificate of Service)(Scarsi, Mark)
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER granting 244 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to MedioStream Inc.s Motions to Dismiss and Motion to Strike. Responses due by 4/26/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/17/10. (ehs, )
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER granting 243 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendants Inequitable Conduct Affirmative Defenses Pursuant to Rule 12(f). Responses due by 4/22/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/17/10. (ehs, )
March 16, 2010 Filing 244 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Nero AG, Nero, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin)
March 16, 2010 Filing 243 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 224 SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Affirmative Defenses Pursuant to Rule 12(f)] SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Affirmative Defenses Pursuant to Rule 12(f)] by Asus Computer International Inc., Dell, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Nero, Inc., Sonic Solutions, Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER granting 241 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ruby Wood terminated as counsel for MedioStream Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/16/2010. (ch, )
March 15, 2010 Filing 241 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney [Ruby Wayne Wood for MedioStream, Inc.] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Denecke, Christl)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER granting 239 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 223 SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Counterclaims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)] SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Counterclaims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)] Responses due by 4/22/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/12/2010. (ch, )
March 11, 2010 Filing 239 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 223 SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Counterclaims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)] SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Counterclaims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)] by Dell, Inc., Asus Computer International Inc., Sony Electronics, Inc., Nero, Inc., Sonic Solutions, Sony Corporation, Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting 226 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages on its Motion to Dismiss Dfts Inequitable Conduct Counterclaims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/9/2010. (ch, )
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER granting 222 Sealed Patent Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions against Dell Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/9/2010. (ch, )
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER granting 221 Sealed Patent Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions against Gateway Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/9/2010. (ch, )
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER granting 220 Sealed Patent Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions against Sonic Solutions Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/9/2010. (ch, )
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER granting 219 Sealed Patent Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions against Nero, Inc and Nero AG. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/9/2010. (ch, )
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER granting 218 Sealed Patent Motion for leave to Amend Infringement Contentions against Microsoft Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/9/2010. (ch, )
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER granting 217 Sealed Patent Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Cyberlink.Com Corp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/9/2010. (ch, )
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER granting 216 Sealed Patent Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Asus Computer International Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/9/2010. (ch, )
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER granting 212 Sealed Patent Motion for leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Acer America Corp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/9/2010. (ch, )
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER granting 211 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/9/2010. (ch, )
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER granting 210 Sealed Motion for Leave to Supplement and Amend Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/9/2010. (ch, )
March 8, 2010 Filing 227 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 204 Opposed SEALED MOTION Emergency Motion for Relief for Protective Order Violations filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Cooper, Byron)
March 8, 2010 Filing 226 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Byron)
March 8, 2010 Filing 225 SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Nero AG by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Byron)
March 8, 2010 Filing 224 SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Affirmative Defenses Pursuant to Rule 12(f)] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Byron)
March 8, 2010 Filing 223 SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Counterclaims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Byron)
March 8, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. TWO MOTIONS FILED IN ONE PLEADING Document # 215, Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
March 8, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. TWO MOTIONS FILED IN ONE PLEADING Document # 214, Motion to Dismiss. Motion to Strike PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
March 5, 2010 Filing 222 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Dell Inc.] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 1 Part 3, # 4 Exhibit 1 Part 4, # 5 Exhibit 1 Part 5, # 6 Exhibit 1 Part 6A, # 7 Exhibit 1 Part 6B, # 8 Exhibit 1 Part 6C, # 9 Exhibit 1 Part 6D, # 10 Exhibit 1 Part 6E, # 11 Exhibit 1 Part 6F, # 12 Exhibit 1 Part 6G, # 13 Exhibit 1 Part 7, # 14 Exhibit 1 Part 8A, # 15 Exhibit 1 Part 8B, # 16 Exhibit 1 Part 8C, # 17 Exhibit 1 Part 8D, # 18 Exhibit 1 Part 8E, # 19 Exhibit 1 Part 8F, # 20 Exhibit 1 Part 9, # 21 Exhibit 1 Part 10, # 22 Exhibit 1 Part 11, # 23 Exhibit 1 Part 12, # 24 Exhibit 1 Part 13, # 25 Exhibit 1 Part 14, # 26 Exhibit 1 Part 15, # 27 Exhibit 1 Part 16, # 28 Exhibit 2, # 29 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Byron)
March 5, 2010 Filing 221 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Gateway, Inc.] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 1 Part 3, # 4 Exhibit 1 Part 4, # 5 Exhibit 1 Part 5A, # 6 Exhibit 1 Part 5B, # 7 Exhibit 1 Part 5C, # 8 Exhibit 1 Part 5D, # 9 Exhibit 1 Part 5E, # 10 Exhibit 1 Part 5F, # 11 Exhibit 1 Part 5G, # 12 Exhibit 1 Part 6, # 13 Exhibit 1 Part 7A, # 14 Exhibit 1 Part 7B, # 15 Exhibit 1 Part 7C, # 16 Exhibit 1 Part 7D, # 17 Exhibit 1 Part 7E, # 18 Exhibit 1 Part 7F, # 19 Exhibit 1 Part 7G, # 20 Exhibit 1 Part 8, # 21 Exhibit 1 Part 9, # 22 Exhibit 1 Part 10, # 23 Exhibit 2, # 24 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Byron)
March 5, 2010 Filing 220 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Sonic Solutions] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 1 Part 3, # 4 Exhibit 1 Part 4, # 5 Exhibit 1 Part 5, # 6 Exhibit 1 Part 6, # 7 Exhibit 1 Part 7, # 8 Exhibit 1 Part 8, # 9 Exhibit 1 Part 9, # 10 Exhibit 2, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Denecke, Christl)
March 5, 2010 Filing 219 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Nero, Inc. and Nero AG] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 1 Part 3, # 4 Exhibit 1 Part 4A, # 5 Exhibit 1 Part 4B, # 6 Exhibit 1 Part 5, # 7 Exhibit 1 Part 6, # 8 Exhibit 1 Part 7, # 9 Exhibit 1 Part 8, # 10 Exhibit 2, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Denecke, Christl)
March 5, 2010 Filing 218 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Microsoft Corporation] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 1 Part 3, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Byron)
March 5, 2010 Filing 217 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against CyberLink.com Corporation] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 1 Part 3A, # 4 Exhibit 1 Part 3B, # 5 Exhibit 1 Part 3C, # 6 Exhibit 1 Part 4, # 7 Exhibit 1 Part 5A, # 8 Exhibit 1 Part 5B, # 9 Exhibit 1 Part 5C, # 10 Exhibit 1 Part 6, # 11 Exhibit 1 Part 7, # 12 Exhibit 2, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Byron)
March 5, 2010 Filing 216 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against ASUS Computer International, Inc.] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 1 Part 3, # 4 Exhibit 1 Part 4, # 5 Exhibit 1 Part 5, # 6 Exhibit 1 Part 6A, # 7 Exhibit 1 Part 6B, # 8 Exhibit 1 Part 6C, # 9 Exhibit 1 Part 6D, # 10 Exhibit 1 Part 6E, # 11 Exhibit 1 Part 6F, # 12 Exhibit 1 Part 6G, # 13 Exhibit 1 Part 7, # 14 Exhibit 1 Part 8, # 15 Exhibit 1 Part 9, # 16 Exhibit 1 Part 10, # 17 Exhibit 2, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Byron)
March 5, 2010 Filing 215 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** SEALED PATENT MOTION -- Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Nero AG's Counterclaims Pursuant To Rule 12(B)(6) And Motion To Strike Nero AG's Affirmative Defense Of Inequitable Conduct Pursuant To Rule 12(F) In Its Fourth Amended Answer by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Byron) Modified on 3/8/2010 (ch, ).
March 5, 2010 Filing 214 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** SEALED PATENT MOTION -- Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaim Of Inequitable Conduct Pursuant To Rule 12(B)(6) And Motion To Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defense Of Inequitable Conduct Pursuant To Rule 12(F) by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Byron) Modified on 3/8/2010 (ch, ).
March 5, 2010 Filing 213 SEALED PATENT MOTION -- MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Nero AG's Counterclaims Pursuant To Rule 12(B)(1) In Its Fourth Amended Answer For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Byron)
March 5, 2010 Filing 212 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Acer America Corp.] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 1 Part 3, # 4 Exhibit 1 Part 4, # 5 Exhibit 1 Part 5, # 6 Exhibit 1 Part 6, # 7 Exhibit 1 Part 7, # 8 Exhibit 1 Part 8A, # 9 Exhibit 1 Part 8B, # 10 Exhibit 1 Part 8C, # 11 Exhibit 1 Part 8D, # 12 Exhibit 1 Part 8E, # 13 Exhibit 1 Part 8F, # 14 Exhibit 1 Part 8G, # 15 Exhibit 1 Part 9A, # 16 Exhibit 1 Part 9B, # 17 Exhibit 1 Part 9C, # 18 Exhibit 1 Part 9D, # 19 Exhibit 1 Part 9E, # 20 Exhibit 1 Part 9F, # 21 Exhibit 2, # 22 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Byron)
March 5, 2010 Filing 211 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Defendants' Unopposed Joint Motion for Leave to Supplement and Amend Invalidity Contentions by Acer America Corporation, Apple Computer, Inc., Dell, Inc., Gateway, Inc., Asus Computer International Inc., Sony Electronics, Inc., Nero, Inc., Sonic Solutions, Cyberlink.com Corporation, Nero AG, Sony Corporation, Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 5, 2010 Filing 210 Unopposed SEALED MOTION "Joint" Motion for Leave to Supplement and Amend Invalidity Contentions by Acer America Corporation, Apple Computer, Inc., Dell, Inc., Gateway, Inc., Asus Computer International Inc., Sony Electronics, Inc., Nero, Inc., Sonic Solutions, Cyberlink.com Corporation, Nero AG, Sony Corporation, Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Decl. of Andrew Leibnitz, # 3 Affidavit Decl. of Chris L. Holm, # 4 Affidavit Decl. of Henning Schmidt, # 5 Affidavit Decl. of Holly Hogan, # 6 Affidavit Decl. of Robert J. Williams, # 7 Affidavit Decl. of Zaed M. Billah, # 8 Exhibit A, # 9 Exhibit B, # 10 Exhibit C, # 11 Exhibit D, # 12 Exhibit E, # 13 Exhibit F, # 14 Exhibit G, # 15 Exhibit H, # 16 Exhibit I, # 17 Exhibit J, # 18 Exhibit K, # 19 Exhibit L, # 20 Exhibit M, # 21 Exhibit N, # 22 Exhibit O, # 23 Exhibit P, # 24 Exhibit Q, # 25 Exhibit R)(Smith, Melissa)
March 3, 2010 Filing 209 Sealed Supplement to Reply in Further Support of Defendants Microsoft Corporation, Nero AG, Nero Inc., Acer America Corporation, Cyberlink.com Corporation, and Gateway, Inc.'s Emergency Motion for Relief for Protective Order Violations. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Smith, Melissa)
March 3, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, ATTY FILED A NOTICE OF JOINDER IN ITS PLACE (SEE #208). Document # 207, Emergency Motion for joinder has been terminated. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
March 2, 2010 Filing 208 NOTICE by Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Corporation re 204 Opposed SEALED MOTION Emergency Motion for Relief for Protective Order Violations NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS SONY ELECTRONICS INC. AND SONY CORP.'S JOINDER IN EMERGENCY MOTION FOR RELIEF FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER VIOLATIONS (Wilcox, Melvin)
March 2, 2010 Filing 207 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, PLEASE IGNORE***Emergency MOTION for Joinder in Emergency Motion for Relief for Protective Order Violations by Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Corporation. (Wilcox, Melvin) Modified on 3/3/2010 (sm, ).
February 26, 2010 Filing 206 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 204 Opposed SEALED MOTION Emergency Motion for Relief for Protective Order Violations filed by Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc., Nero, Inc., Cyberlink.com Corporation, Nero AG, Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Chow Declaration, # 2 Affidavit Tyler Declaration, # 3 Affidavit Sudarshan Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit A to Sudarshan Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit B to Sudarshan Declaration)(Smith, Melissa)
February 24, 2010 Filing 205 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 204 Opposed SEALED MOTION Emergency Motion for Relief for Protective Order Violations filed by Mediostream, Inc., MedioStream Inc, Mediostream, Inc.(a California Corporation), Mediostream, Inc., Mediostream, Inc.(a Calfornia Corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Cooper Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 1, # 3 Exhibit 1 Part 2, # 4 Exhibit 1 Part 3, # 5 Exhibit 1 Part 4, # 6 Exhibit 1 Part 5, # 7 Exhibit 1 Part 6, # 8 Exhibit 1 Part 7, # 9 Exhibit 1 Part 8, # 10 Exhibit 1 Part 9, # 11 Exhibit 1 Part 10, # 12 Exhibit 1 Part 11, # 13 Exhibit 1 Part 12, # 14 Exhibit 1 Part 13, # 15 Exhibit 1 Part 14, # 16 Exhibit 1 Part 15, # 17 Exhibit 1 Part 16, # 18 Exhibit 1 Part 17, # 19 Exhibit 1 Part 18, # 20 Exhibit 1 Part 19, # 21 Exhibit 1 Part 20, # 22 Exhibit 1 Part 21, # 23 Exhibit 1 Part 22, # 24 Exhibit 1 Part 23, # 25 Exhibit 1 Part 24, # 26 Exhibit 1 Part 25, # 27 Exhibit 1 Part 26, # 28 Exhibit 1 Part 27, # 29 Exhibit 2 Part 1, # 30 Exhibit 2 Part 2, # 31 Exhibit 2 Part 3, # 32 Exhibit 2 Part 4, # 33 Exhibit 2 Part 5, # 34 Exhibit 2 Part 6, # 35 Exhibit 2 Part 7, # 36 Exhibit 3, # 37 Exhibit 4, # 38 Exhibit 5, # 39 Exhibit 6, # 40 Exhibit 7, # 41 Affidavit Chan Declaration, # 42 Affidavit Kao Declaration, # 43 Affidavit Desproges Declaration, # 44 Affidavit Jones Declaration, # 45 Affidavit Cho Declaration, # 46 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Byron)
February 22, 2010 Filing 204 Opposed SEALED MOTION Emergency Motion for Relief for Protective Order Violations by Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc., Nero, Inc., Cyberlink.com Corporation, Nero AG, Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Rainey, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Exhibit S, # 22 Exhibit T, # 23 Exhibit U, # 24 Exhibit V, # 25 Exhibit W)(Smith, Melissa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2010: # 26 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ).
February 19, 2010 Filing 203 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Andrew Leibnitz for Sonic Solutions. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-1-0021126) (ehs, )
February 19, 2010 Filing 202 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Roderick M Thompson for Sonic Solutions. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-1-0021126) (ehs, )
February 17, 2010 Filing 201 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 185 Sealed Document,,,. (Tyler, Marvin)
February 16, 2010 Filing 200 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 192 Sealed Patent Document,,,. (Hogan, Holly)
February 16, 2010 Filing 199 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 191 Sealed Patent Document,,,. (Hogan, Holly)
February 16, 2010 Filing 198 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 189 Sealed Patent Document,,,. (Hogan, Holly)
February 16, 2010 NOTICE FROM CLERK - Disregard Filed in Error Notice for Documents 193, 194, 195, 196 this case has been consolidated with 2:08-cv-369 (ch, )
February 12, 2010 Filing 197 Sealed Document (DELL'S FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO MEDIOSTREAM'S FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34)(Fulghum, Roger) Modified on 2/16/2010 (sm, ).
February 12, 2010 Filing 196 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: Sony Electronics Inc. First Amended Answer and Counterclaims to Mediostream's Fourth Amended Complaint 195 Sealed Patent Document,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 16, # 2 Exhibit 17, # 3 Exhibit 18, # 4 Exhibit 19, # 5 Exhibit 20, # 6 Exhibit 21, # 7 Exhibit 22, # 8 Exhibit 23, # 9 Exhibit 24, # 10 Exhibit 25, # 11 Exhibit 26, # 12 Exhibit 27, # 13 Exhibit 28, # 14 Exhibit 29, # 15 Exhibit 30, # 16 Exhibit 31, # 17 Exhibit 32, # 18 Exhibit 33, # 19 Exhibit 34)(Wilcox, Melvin) Modified on 2/16/2010 (ch, ).
February 12, 2010 Filing 195 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT.SONY ELECTRONICS INC. FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO MEDIOSTREAM'S FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15)(Wilcox, Melvin) Modified on 2/16/2010 (ch, ).
February 12, 2010 Filing 194 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: SONY CORPORATION'S FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO MEDIOSTREAMS'S FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT 193 Sealed Patent Document,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 16, # 2 Exhibit 17, # 3 Exhibit 18, # 4 Exhibit 19, # 5 Exhibit 20, # 6 Exhibit 21, # 7 Exhibit 22, # 8 Exhibit 23, # 9 Exhibit 24, # 10 Exhibit 25, # 11 Exhibit 26, # 12 Exhibit 27, # 13 Exhibit 28, # 14 Exhibit 29, # 15 Exhibit 30, # 16 Exhibit 31, # 17 Exhibit 32, # 18 Exhibit 33, # 19 Exhibit 34)(Wilcox, Melvin) Modified on 2/16/2010 (ch, ).
February 12, 2010 Filing 193 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT.Sony Corporation's First Amended Answer and Counterclaims to Mediostream's Fourth Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15)(Wilcox, Melvin) Modified on 2/16/2010 (ch, ).
February 12, 2010 Filing 192 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Amended Answer of Dft Gateway, Inc. to Fourth Amended Complaint; Counterclaim for Declaratory Relief. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Errata 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34)(Hogan, Holly) Modified on 2/16/2010 (ch, ).
February 12, 2010 Filing 191 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Amended Answer of Dft Cyberlink.com Corporation to Fourth Amended Complaint; Courterclaim for Declaratory Relief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Errata 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Errata 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Errata 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34)(Hogan, Holly) Modified on 2/16/2010 (ch, ).
February 12, 2010 Filing 190 SEALED DOCUMENT Defendant ASUS Computer International, Inc.'s Second Amended Answer to Fourth Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Errata 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 21, # 21 Exhibit 22, # 22 Exhibit 23, # 23 Exhibit 24, # 24 Exhibit 25, # 25 Exhibit 26, # 26 Exhibit 27, # 27 Exhibit 28, # 28 Exhibit 29, # 29 Exhibit 30, # 30 Exhibit 31, # 31 Exhibit 32, # 32 Exhibit 33, # 33 Exhibit 34)(Tyler, Marvin)
February 12, 2010 Filing 189 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Amended Answer of Dft Acer America Corp. To Fourth Amended Complaint ; Counterclaim for Declaratory Relief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34)(Hogan, Holly) Modified on 2/16/2010 (ch, ).
February 12, 2010 Filing 188 Sealed Document - Sonic Solutions' Amended Answer to MedioStream, Inc.'s Fourth Amended Complaint, Defenses, and Counterclaims. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34)(Young, Stanley)
February 12, 2010 Filing 187 SEALED DOCUMENT Defendant Nero Inc.'s Third Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to Plaintiff Mediostream, Inc.'s Fourth Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Errata 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Errata 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34)(Tyler, Marvin)
February 12, 2010 Filing 186 Sealed Document - Microsoft Corporations First Amended Answer and Counterclaims. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 2/16/2010 (ch, ).
February 12, 2010 Filing 185 Sealed Document Defendant Nero AG's Fourth Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to Plaintiff Mediostream, Inc.'s Fourth Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41)(Tyler, Marvin)
February 8, 2010 Filing 184 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 153 Opposed MOTION for Reconsideration re 127 Memorandum & Opinion, Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Transfer to the Northern District of CaliforniaOpposed MOTION for Reconsideration re 127 Memorandum & Opinion, Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Transfer to the Northern District of California filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Byron Cooper, # 2 Exhibit A to Byron Cooper Declaration, # 3 Exhibit (s) B-G to Byron Cooper Declaration)(Cooper, Byron)
February 8, 2010 Filing 183 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rebecca L Unruh on behalf of MedioStream Inc (Unruh, Rebecca)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER granting 179 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Elizabeth Frances Stone terminated as counsel for Plaintiff MedioStream Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/1/2010. (ch, )
February 1, 2010 Filing 181 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deborah J Race on behalf of Sonic Solutions (Race, Deborah)
January 29, 2010 Filing 180 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles F Koch on behalf of MedioStream Inc (Koch, Charles)
January 29, 2010 Filing 179 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Denecke, Christl)
January 29, 2010 Filing 178 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andy H Chan on behalf of MedioStream Inc (Chan, Andy)
January 29, 2010 Filing 177 RESPONSE to Motion re 153 Opposed MOTION for Reconsideration re 127 Memorandum & Opinion, Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Transfer to the Northern District of CaliforniaOpposed MOTION for Reconsideration re 127 Memorandum & Opinion, Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Transfer to the Northern District of California Defendant Apple Inc's Statement of Nonopposition filed by Apple Computer, Inc.. (Scarsi, Mark)
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting 173 Sealed Patent Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Sony Corporation and Sony Electronics, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/29/10. (ehs, )
January 29, 2010 Filing 175 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 153 Opposed MOTION for Reconsideration re 127 Memorandum & Opinion, Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Transfer to the Northern District of CaliforniaOpposed MOTION for Reconsideration re 127 Memorandum & Opinion, Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Transfer to the Northern District of California filed by Acer America Corporation, Dell, Inc., Gateway, Inc., Asus Computer International Inc., Sony Electronics, Inc., Nero, Inc., Sonic Solutions, Cyberlink.com Corporation, Nero AG, Sony Corporation, Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Sudarshan Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Sudarshan Declaration Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Sudarshan Declaration Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Sudarshan Declaration Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Sudarshan Declaration Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Sudarshan Declaration Exhibit E, # 7 Affidavit Carriere Declaration, # 8 Affidavit Fulghum Declaration, # 9 Exhibit Fulghum Declaration Exhibit A, # 10 Exhibit Fulghum Declaration Exhibit B, # 11 Exhibit Fulghum Declaration Exhibit C, # 12 Affidavit Roth Declaration)(Smith, Melissa)
January 28, 2010 Filing 174 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kirran Bari for Sonic Solutions.(APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-1-20880)(ehs, )
January 28, 2010 Filing 173 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Sony Corporation and Sony Electronics, Inc. by Mediostream, Inc., MedioStream Inc, Mediostream, Inc.(a California Corporation), Mediostream, Inc., Mediostream, Inc.(a Calfornia Corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 1 Part 3, # 4 Exhibit 1 Part 4, # 5 Exhibit 1 Part 5, # 6 Exhibit 1 Part 6, # 7 Exhibit 1 Part 7, # 8 Exhibit 1 Part 8, # 9 Exhibit 1 Part 9, # 10 Exhibit 1 Part 10, # 11 Exhibit 1 Part 11, # 12 Exhibit 1 Part 12, # 13 Exhibit 1 Part 13, # 14 Exhibit 1 Part 14, # 15 Exhibit 1 Part 15, # 16 Errata 1 Part 16, # 17 Exhibit 1 Part 17, # 18 Exhibit 1 Part 18, # 19 Exhibit 1 Part 19, # 20 Exhibit 1 Part 20, # 21 Exhibit 1 Part 21, # 22 Exhibit 1 Part 22, # 23 Exhibit 1 Part 23, # 24 Exhibit 1 Part 24, # 25 Exhibit 1 Part 25, # 26 Exhibit 1 Part 26, # 27 Exhibit 1 Part 27, # 28 Exhibit 1 Part 28, # 29 Exhibit 1 Part 29, # 30 Exhibit 1 Part 30, # 31 Exhibit 2, # 32 Exhibit 3, # 33 Text of Proposed Order)(Denecke, Christl)
January 28, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT - ATTY WILL REFILE Document # 172, Sealed Document. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
January 28, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY - ATTY WILL REFILE Document # 171, Unopposed Patent Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
January 27, 2010 Filing 172 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 1 Part 3, # 4 Exhibit 1 Part 4, # 5 Exhibit 1 Part 5, # 6 Exhibit 1 Part 6, # 7 Exhibit 1 Part 7, # 8 Exhibit 1 Part 8, # 9 Exhibit 1 Part 9, # 10 Exhibit 1 Part 10, # 11 Exhibit 1 Part 11, # 12 Exhibit 1 Part 12, # 13 Exhibit 1 Part 13, # 14 Exhibit 1 Part 14, # 15 Exhibit 1 Part 15, # 16 Exhibit 1 Part 16, # 17 Exhibit 1 Part 17, # 18 Exhibit 1 Part 18, # 19 Exhibit 1 Part 19, # 20 Exhibit 1 Part 20, # 21 Exhibit 1 Part 21, # 22 Exhibit 1 Part 22, # 23 Exhibit 1 Part 23, # 24 Exhibit 1 Part 24, # 25 Exhibit 1 Part 25, # 26 Exhibit 1 Part 26, # 27 Exhibit 1 Part 27, # 28 Exhibit 1 Part 28, # 29 Exhibit 1 Part 29, # 30 Exhibit 1 Part 30, # 31 Exhibit 2, # 32 Exhibit 3, # 33 Text of Proposed Order)(Denecke, Christl) Modified on 1/28/2010 (ch, ).
January 27, 2010 Filing 171 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Sony Corporation and Sony Electronics Inc.] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1, Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 1, Part 3, # 4 Exhibit 1, Part 4, # 5 Exhibit 1, Part 5, # 6 Exhibit 1, Part 6, # 7 Exhibit 1, Part 7, # 8 Exhibit 1, Part 8, # 9 Exhibit 1, Part 9, # 10 Exhibit 1, Part 10, # 11 Exhibit 1, Part 11, # 12 Exhibit 1, Part 12, # 13 Exhibit 1, Part 13, # 14 Exhibit 1, Part 14, # 15 Exhibit 1, Part 15, # 16 Exhibit 1, Part 16, # 17 Exhibit 1, Part 17, # 18 Exhibit 1, Part 18, # 19 Exhibit 1, Part 19, # 20 Exhibit 1, Part 20, # 21 Exhibit 1, Part 21, # 22 Exhibit 1, Part 22, # 23 Exhibit 1, Part 23, # 24 Exhibit 2, # 25 Exhibit 3, # 26 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Byron) Modified on 1/28/2010 (ch, ).
January 26, 2010 Filing 170 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kevin Joseph Hickey for Sonic Solutions. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5162 (ch, )
January 21, 2010 Filing 169 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 153 Opposed MOTION for Reconsideration re 127 Memorandum & Opinion, Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Transfer to the Northern District of CaliforniaOpposed MOTION for Reconsideration re 127 Memorandum & Opinion, Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Transfer to the Northern District of California filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Byron Cooper, # 2 Exhibit (s) A-L to Byron Cooper Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Byron)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting 167 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Nero AGs Third Amended Answer and Nero, Inc.s Second Amended Answer. Responses due by 3/3/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/21/10. (ehs, )
January 15, 2010 Filing 167 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 163 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, 164 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Nero AG's Third Amended Answer and Nero, Inc.'s Second Amended Answer] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Byron)
January 14, 2010 Filing 166 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 164 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. (Tyler, Marvin)
January 14, 2010 Filing 165 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 164 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C, # 2 Exhibit D, # 3 Exhibit E)(Tyler, Marvin)
January 14, 2010 Filing 164 SEALED Third Amended ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against MedioStream Inc by Nero AG.(Tyler, Marvin)(SEALED PER REQUEST FROM ATTORNEY) Modified on 1/15/2010 (ch, ).
January 14, 2010 Filing 163 Second Amended ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against MedioStream Inc by Nero, Inc..(Tyler, Marvin)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting 160 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 153 Opposed MOTION for Reconsideration re 127 Memorandum & Opinion, Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Transfer to the Northern District of CaliforniaOpposed MOTION for Reconsideration re 127 Memorandum & Opinion, Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Transfer to the Northern District of California Responses due by 1/21/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/8/2010. (ch, )
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting 159 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. MedioStream deadline to respond to Nero AG's Second Amended Answer is extended to 2/10/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/8/2010. (ch, )
January 7, 2010 Filing 160 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 153 Opposed MOTION for Reconsideration re 127 Memorandum & Opinion, Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Transfer to the Northern District of CaliforniaOpposed MOTION for Reconsideration re 127 Memorandum & Opinion, Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Transfer to the Northern District of California [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Transfer to the Northern District of California] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Byron)
January 7, 2010 Filing 159 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 154 Answer to Counterclaim, [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Nero AG's Second Amended Answer] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Byron)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting 65 Motion for Leave to File exhibits in support of the plaintiffs motion to compel under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/7/10. (ehs, )
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting 156 Patent Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Apple Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/5/10. (ehs, )
December 30, 2009 Filing 156 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Apple Inc.] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 1 Part 3, # 4 Exhibit 1 Part 4, # 5 Exhibit 1 Part 5, # 6 Exhibit 1 Part 6, # 7 Exhibit (s) 2-8, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Byron)
December 23, 2009 Filing 155 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 154 Answer to Counterclaim,. (Tyler, Marvin)
December 23, 2009 Filing 154 Second Amended ANSWER to 52 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, COUNTERCLAIM against MedioStream Inc by Nero AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E)(Tyler, Marvin)
December 23, 2009 Filing 153 Opposed MOTION for Reconsideration re 127 Memorandum & Opinion, Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Transfer to the Northern District of California by Acer America Corporation, Dell, Inc., Gateway, Inc., Asus Computer International Inc., Sony Electronics, Inc., Nero, Inc., Sonic Solutions, Cyberlink.com Corporation, Nero AG, Sony Corporation, Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
December 14, 2009 Filing 152 NOTICE by Apple Computer, Inc., Dell, Inc., Gateway, Inc., Asus Computer International Inc., Sony Electronics, Inc., Cyberlink, Inc., Nero, Inc., Sonic Solutions, Nero AG, Sony Corporation, MedioStream Inc, Acer America Corporation, Microsoft Corporation [Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Cooper, Byron)
December 9, 2009 Filing 151 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jessica Lea Hannah on behalf of Mediostream, Inc., MedioStream Inc, Mediostream, Inc.(a California Corporation), Mediostream, Inc., Mediostream, Inc.(a Calfornia Corporation) (Hannah, Jessica)
December 1, 2009 Filing 150 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steve T Tsai for Acer America Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5060 (ch, )
November 30, 2009 Filing 149 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION of Plaintiff Mediostream and Third Party Intervenor ASUSTeK to Resolve Discovery/Privilege Dispute Regarding Document Produced by Nero in this Litigation by ASUSTeK Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Byron Cooper In Support, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits to Declaration of Byron Cooper, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Laura Lee Norris in Support, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of Jacky Lu in Support, # 5 Affidavit Declaration of M. Craig Tyler in Support, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Erskine, Blake)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting 144 Motion to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Determining Applicability of Attorney-Client/Work Product Privilege.ASUSTeK to intervene in this action for the limited purpose of asserting the attorney-client privilege and/or work product privilege in connection with a four-page memo from ASUSTeKs counsel Laura Lee Norris to ASUSTek General Counsel, Vincent Hong. In that the parties have agreed to brief the privilege issue the subject of the motion in a fifteen page motion, with each side presenting their arguments in seven pages, with a waiver of the right by both parties to file any reply or sur-reply briefs on the issue, it is therefore ORDERED that the fifteen page brief/motion is to be filed on or before the 30th day of November,2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/13/09. (ehs, )
November 6, 2009 Filing 147 NOTICE by Nero, Inc., Nero AG Regarding Disputes Concerning Privilege Documents (Tyler, Marvin)
November 6, 2009 Filing 146 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Notice to the Court Regarding Disputes Over Privileged Documents (Smith, Melissa)
November 6, 2009 Filing 145 NOTICE by Sony Corporation Regarding Disputes Concerning Privileged Documents (Wilcox, Melvin)
November 5, 2009 Filing 144 Joint MOTION to Intervene for Limited Intervention by ASUSTeK Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erskine, Blake)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting 139 Defendants' Joint Motion for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on October 30, 2009. (jml)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting 128 MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against CyberLink.com. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on October 30, 2009. (jml)
October 22, 2009 Filing 141 RESPONSE to Motion re 128 MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against CyberLink.com in NON-OPPOSITION filed by Cyberlink.com Corporation. (Chen, Lei)
October 22, 2009 Filing 140 NOTICE by MedioStream Inc re 139 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Supplement Invalidity Contentions [MedioStream, Inc.'s Notice of Non-Opposition to Docket No. 139] (Cooper, Byron)
October 22, 2009 Filing 139 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Supplement Invalidity Contentions by Sonic Solutions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D Part 1 of 3, # 5 Exhibit D Part 2 of 3, # 6 Exhibit D Part 3 of 3, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Young, Stanley)
October 22, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR. USED WRONG EVENT Document # 130, Joint Motion for Leave. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (DOCUMENT WAS FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT, JUDGES CHAMBERS IS REQUESTING THAT THIS BE REFILED AS A MOTION)(ch, )
October 16, 2009 Filing 138 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ranganath Sudarshan for Microsoft Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4967 (ch, )
October 9, 2009 Filing 137 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard L Rainey for Microsoft Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4957 (ch, )
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting 131 Sealed Patent Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Nero, Inc. and Nero AG. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/8/09. (ehs, )
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER - for the reasons indicated herein the court is denying 66 Motion to Compel; denying 67 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/8/09. (ch, )
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting 132 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jack Wesley Hill terminated as counsel for Sonic Solutions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/8/09. (ch, )
October 7, 2009 Filing 133 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Alden Dietzel on behalf of Nero, Inc., Nero AG (Dietzel, Brian)
October 7, 2009 Filing 132 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Sonic Solutions. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack)
October 6, 2009 Filing 131 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION [MedioStream, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Nero, Inc. and Nero AG] by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 Part 1, # 4 Exhibit 3 Part 2, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15 Part 1, # 17 Exhibit 15 Part 2, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Denecke, Christl)
October 6, 2009 Filing 130 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED USING WRONG EVENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT PATENT INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS filed by Sonic Solutions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D (Part 1 of 3), # 5 Exhibit D (Part 2 of 3), # 6 Exhibit D (Part 3 of 3), # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Young, Stanley) Modified on 10/22/2009 (ch, ).
October 5, 2009 Filing 129 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 128 MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against CyberLink.com. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 1 Part 3, # 4 Exhibit 1 Part 4, # 5 Exhibit 1 Part 5, # 6 Exhibit 1 Part 6, # 7 Exhibit 1 Part 7, # 8 Exhibit 1 Part 8, # 9 Exhibit 5 Part 1, # 10 Exhibit 5 Part 2, # 11 Exhibit 5 Part 3)(Denecke, Christl)
October 5, 2009 Filing 128 MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against CyberLink.com by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (filed under seal), # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5 (filed under seal), # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Denecke, Christl)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - the court GRANTS the motion for leave to file a surreply 232 in Case No 2:07-cv-376. The court DENIES both the motion to reconsider 206 in Case No 2:07-cv-376 and the motion to transfer 15 in Case No 2:08-cv-369 (see order for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/30/09. (ch, )
September 15, 2009 Filing 126 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christl Denecke on behalf of MedioStream Inc (Denecke, Christl)
September 9, 2009 Filing 125 NOTICE by Mediostream, Inc. of Compliance with Docket Control Order and Discovery Order Regarding Privilege Log (Cooper, Byron)
September 9, 2009 Filing 124 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of Compliance with Docket Control Order Regarding Privilege Log (Smith, Melissa)
September 9, 2009 Filing 123 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Colin F Campbell for Nero, Inc.. (APPROVED FEE PAID 2-1-4903)(ehs, )
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting 120 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Sonic Solutions Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/8/09. (ch, )
September 3, 2009 Filing 121 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 120 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Sonic Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1 Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2 Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit 10 Under Seal)(Cooper, Byron)
September 3, 2009 Filing 120 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Against Sonic Solutions, Inc. by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1 (filed under seal), # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2 (filed under seal), # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10 (filed under seal), # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Byron)
August 26, 2009 Filing 119 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joshua M Masur for Asus Computer International Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-4879) (ehs, )
August 26, 2009 Filing 118 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Karen I Boyd for Asus Computer International Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-4879) (ehs, )
August 17, 2009 Filing 117 NOTICE by Gateway, Inc. Notice of Law Firm Name Change (Love, Gregory)
August 17, 2009 Filing 116 NOTICE by Cyberlink.com Corporation Notice of Law Firm Name Change (Love, Gregory)
August 17, 2009 Filing 115 NOTICE by Acer America Corporation Law Firm Name Change (Love, Gregory)
August 12, 2009 Filing 114 NOTICE by Apple Computer, Inc. DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PATENT RULE 4-2 (Scarsi, Mark)
August 12, 2009 Filing 113 NOTICE of Disclosure by MedioStream Inc MedioStream, Inc.'s Notice of Compliance with Patent Rule 4-2 (Cooper, Byron)
August 11, 2009 Filing 112 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 110 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Cooper Exhibit 45)(Cooper, Byron)
August 11, 2009 Filing 111 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 110 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Cooper Exhibit 59A of 59D, # 2 Cooper Exhibit 59B of 59D, # 3 Cooper Exhibit 59C of 59D, # 4 Cooper Exhibit 59D of 59D)(Cooper, Byron)
August 10, 2009 Filing 110 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 94 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Dr. Cheng C. Kao In Support of MedioStream, Inc.'s Surreply in Opposition to Nero, Inc. and Nero AG's Motion for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions, # 2 Kao Exhibits 1 - 10, # 3 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Byron Cooper in Support of MedioStream, Inc.'s Opposition and Sur-Reply to Nero, Inc., and Nero AG's Motion for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions, # 4 Cooper Exhibits 35 to 47, # 5 Cooper Exhibits 48 - 52, # 6 Cooper Exhibits 53 - 55, # 7 Cooper Exhibit 56, # 8 Cooper Exhibit 57, # 9 Cooper Exhibit 58, # 10 Cooper Exhibit 60)(Cooper, Byron)
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting 107 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on July 30, 2009. (jml)
July 29, 2009 Filing 108 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 94 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions filed by Nero, Inc., Nero AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A1, # 2 Exhibit A2, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of H. Schmidt in Support, # 4 Exhibit 1 to Decl of H. Schmidt, # 5 Affidavit Declaration of M. Ladra in Support, # 6 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of M. Ladra, # 7 Affidavit Declaration of M. Eno in Support, # 8 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of M. Eno, # 9 Exhibit 9.1 to Declaration of M. Eno, # 10 Exhibit 9.2 to Declaration of M. Eno, # 11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of M. Eno, # 12 Exhibit 10.1 to Declaration of M. Eno, # 13 Exhibit 10.2 to Declaration of M. Eno, # 14 Exhibit 10.3 to Declaration of M. Eno, # 15 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of M. Eno, # 16 Exhibit 11.1 to Declaration of M. Eno, # 17 Exhibit 11.2 to Declaration of M. Eno, # 18 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of M. Eno, # 19 Exhibit 12.1 to Declaration of M. Eno, # 20 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of M. Eno, # 21 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of M. Eno)(Tyler, Marvin)
July 29, 2009 Filing 107 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Nero, Inc., Nero AG. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin)
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting 104 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 104 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Replies due by 7/29/2009. Surreply due 8/10/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on July 28, 2009. (jml)
July 24, 2009 Filing 105 NOTICE by Apple Computer, Inc. DEFENDANTS' NOTICE TO THE COURT REGARDING DISPUTES OVER PRIVILEGED DOCUMENTS (Scarsi, Mark)
July 23, 2009 Filing 104 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Nero, Inc., Nero AG. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed)(Tyler, Marvin)
July 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting 100 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nancy Claire Abernathy terminated for MedioStream, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/21/09. (ehs, )
July 20, 2009 Filing 102 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Compel and Motion for Sanctions hearings held on 7/9/09 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (85 pgs)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/10/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/20/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2009. (tja, )
July 16, 2009 Filing 101 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 94 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Cooper Declaration in Support of Opposition, # 2 Exhibit 1-6, # 3 Exhibit 7-9, # 4 Exhibit 10-12, # 5 Exhibit 13, # 6 Exhibit 14-16, # 7 Exhibit Part 1, # 8 Exhibit 17 Part 2, # 9 Exhibit 18, # 10 Exhibit 19, # 11 Exhibit 20, # 12 Exhibit 21, # 13 Exhibit 22, # 14 Exhibit 23 Part 1, # 15 Exhibit 23 Part 2, # 16 Exhibit 24 Part 1, # 17 Exhibit 24 Part 2, # 18 Exhibit 25, # 19 Exhibit 26, # 20 Exhibit 27, # 21 Exhibit 28, # 22 Exhibit 29 Part 1A, # 23 Exhibit 29 Part 1B, # 24 Exhibit 29 Part 2, # 25 Exhibit 29 Part 3, # 26 Exhibit 29 Part 4, # 27 Exhibit 30 Part 1, # 28 Exhibit 30 Part 2, # 29 Exhibit 31, # 30 Exhibit 32-34, # 31 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Byron)
July 16, 2009 Filing 100 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney N. Claire Abernathy by Mediostream, Inc., MedioStream Inc, Mediostream, Inc.(a California Corporation), Mediostream, Inc., Mediostream, Inc.(a Calfornia Corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting 97 Motion for leave to Amend Infringement Contentions with respect to Sony Corporation and Sony Electronics Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/16/09. (ch, )
July 13, 2009 Filing 98 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 97 Unopposed MOTION For Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions With Respect to Sony Corporation and Sony Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-E Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit 2-E Under Seal)(Wood, Ruby)
July 13, 2009 Filing 97 Unopposed MOTION For Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions With Respect to Sony Corporation and Sony Electronics, Inc. by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 1-A, # 4 Exhibit 1-B, # 5 Exhibit 1-C, # 6 Exhibit 1-D, # 7 Exhibit 1-E (Filed Under Seal), # 8 Exhibit 2, # 9 Exhibit 2-A, # 10 Exhibit 2-B, # 11 Exhibit 2-C, # 12 Exhibit 2-D, # 13 Exhibit 2-E (Filed Under Seal), # 14 Exhibit 3, # 15 Exhibit 4, # 16 Exhibit 5, # 17 Exhibit 6, # 18 Exhibit 7, # 19 Exhibit 8, # 20 Exhibit 9)(Wood, Ruby)
July 9, 2009 Filing 96 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Evidentiary Hearing held on 7/9/2009. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign-in sheet) (jml)
July 8, 2009 Filing 95 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lewis V Popovski for Sony Electronics, Inc. and Sony Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4798 (ch, )
July 1, 2009 Filing 94 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions by Nero, Inc., Nero AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A continued, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Monica Eno In Support, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding the disclosure and use of discovery materials. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/25/09. (ehs, )
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 66 MOTION to Compel; 67 MOTION for Sanctions : Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2009 02:30 PM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Court adopts the pltf's protective order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/25/09. (ehs, )
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting 90 Motion for Leave. ORDERED that Defendants Sony Corporation, Nero AG, and Microsoft Corporation be granted leave to supplement their Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/23/09. (ch, )
June 19, 2009 Filing 90 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Unopposed Defendants' Joint Motion for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions by Sony Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Declaration of Lewis V. Popovski, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
June 19, 2009 Filing 89 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of Service): 85 Unopposed Motion to Seal. (ch, )
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting 85 Motion to Seal SURREPLY OF DEFENDANTS NERO, INC. AND NER AG T0MEDIOSTREAMS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST NERO, INC. ANDNERO, INC.S COUNSEL;SURREPLY OF DEFENDANTS NERO, INC. AND NERO AG TOMEDIOSTREAMS MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH PATENT RULES3-3 AND 3-4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/19/09. (ch, )
June 18, 2009 Filing 87 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 67 MOTION for Sanctions Against Nero, Inc. and Nero, Inc.'s Counsel filed by Nero, Inc., Nero AG. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Monica Mucchetti Eno in Support, # 2 Exhibit 28 to Eno Declaration, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Frank Danzer in Support, # 4 Exhibit A to Danzer Decl., # 5 Exhibit B to Danzer Decl., # 6 Exhibit C to Danzer Decl., # 7 Exhibit D to Danzer Decl., # 8 Exhibit E to Danzer Decl., # 9 Exhibit F to Danzer Decl.)(Tyler, Marvin)
June 18, 2009 Filing 86 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 66 MOTION to Compel Nero, Inc. and Nero AG to Comply with Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 filed by Nero, Inc., Nero AG. (Tyler, Marvin)
June 18, 2009 Filing 85 Unopposed MOTION to Seal by Nero, Inc., Nero AG. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin)
June 8, 2009 Filing 84 REPLY to Response to Motion re 66 MOTION to Compel Nero, Inc. and Nero AG to Comply with Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 MedioStream, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Nero, Inc. and Nero AG to Comply with Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 filed by MedioStream Inc. (Cooper, Byron)
June 8, 2009 Filing 83 REPLY to Response to Motion re 67 MOTION for Sanctions Against Nero, Inc. and Nero, Inc.'s Counsel - MedioStream, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion for Sanctions Against Nero, Inc. and Nero, Inc.'s Counsel filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Cooper, Byron)
June 4, 2009 Filing 82 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Acer America Corporation, Apple Computer, Inc., Dell, Inc., Gateway, Inc., Asus Computer International Inc., Sony Electronics, Inc., Cyberlink, Inc., Nero, Inc., Sonic Solutions, Nero AG, Sony Corporation, MedioStream Inc, Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 MedioStream's proposed Protective Order (Exhibit A), # 2 Defendants' proposed Protective Order (Exhibit B))(Cooper, Byron)
June 2, 2009 Filing 81 NOTICE by Nero, Inc. of Service of Privilege Document Log (Tyler, Marvin)
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 76 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/2/09. (ch, )
May 29, 2009 Filing 79 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 66 MOTION to Compel Nero, Inc. and Nero AG to Comply with Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 filed by Nero, Inc., Nero AG. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Frank Fletcher in Support, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Simone Hoefer in Support, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Reiner Kopf in Support, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of Monica Mucchetti Eno in Support, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 13, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 14, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 15, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 16, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 17, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit 18, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit 19, # 24 Exhibit Exhibit 20, # 25 Exhibit Exhibit 21, # 26 Exhibit Exhibit 22, # 27 Exhibit Exhibit 23, # 28 Exhibit Exhibit 23 pt 2, # 29 Exhibit Exhibit 23 pt 3, # 30 Exhibit Exhibit 24, # 31 Exhibit Exhibit 25, # 32 Exhibit Exhibit 26, # 33 Exhibit Exihbit 27, # 34 Exhibit Exhibit 28, # 35 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin)
May 29, 2009 Filing 78 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 67 MOTION for Sanctions Against Nero, Inc. and Nero, Inc.'s Counsel filed by Nero, Inc., Nero AG. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Frank Fletcher in Support, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Simone Hoefer in Support, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Reiner Kopf in Support, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of Sharon Halverson in Support, # 5 Affidavit Declaration of Monica Mucchetti Eno in Support, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 13, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 14, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 15, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 16, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit 17, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit 18, # 24 Exhibit Exhibit 19, # 25 Exhibit Exhibit 20, # 26 Exhibit Exhibit 21, # 27 Exhibit Exhibit 22, # 28 Exhibit Exhibit 23, # 29 Exhibit Exhibit 24, # 30 Exhibit Exhibit 25, # 31 Exhibit Exhibit 25 pt 2, # 32 Exhibit Exhibit 25 pt 3, # 33 Exhibit Exhibit 26, # 34 Exhibit Exhibit 27, # 35 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin)
May 29, 2009 Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition re 66 MOTION to Compel Nero, Inc. and Nero AG to Comply with Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 NON-NERO DEFENDANTS' BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO MEDIOSTREAM'S MOTION TO COMPEL NERO TO COMPLY WITH PATENT RULES 3-3 AND 3-4 filed by Acer America Corporation, Apple Computer, Inc., Dell, Inc., Gateway, Inc., Sony Electronics, Inc., Sonic Solutions, Cyberlink.com Corporation, Sony Corporation, Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
May 29, 2009 Filing 76 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Nero, Inc., Nero AG. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin)
May 26, 2009 Filing 75 NOTICE of Disclosure by MedioStream Inc (Plaintiff MedioStream, Inc.'s Notice of Additional Disclosures) (Cooper, Byron)
May 26, 2009 Filing 74 ANSWER to 55 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim MEDIOSTREAM'S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS OF ASUS COMPUTER INTERNATIONAL, INC. TO MEDIOSTREAM'S FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT by MedioStream Inc.(Cooper, Byron)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting 70 Motion Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions with Respect to Nero, Inc., Nero AG and ASUS Computer International, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/20/09. (ch, )
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 69 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits A - C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/20/09. (ch, )
May 18, 2009 Filing 71 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 69 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits A, B, And C To Plaintiff MedioStream Inc.'s Unopposed Motion For Leave To Amend Infringement Contentions With Respect To Nero, Inc., Nero AG And ASUS Computer International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit B Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit C Under Seal)(Wood, Ruby)
May 18, 2009 Filing 70 Unopposed MOTION For Leave To Amend Infringement Contentions With Respect To Nero, Inc., Nero AG and ASUS Computer International, Inc. re 69 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits A, B, And C To Plaintiff MedioStream Inc.'s Unopposed Motion For Leave To Amend Infringement Contentions With Respect To Nero, Inc., Nero AG And ASUS Computer International, Inc. by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A - C (Filed Under Seal), # 3 Exhibit D - K)(Wood, Ruby)
May 18, 2009 Filing 69 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits A, B, And C To Plaintiff MedioStream Inc.'s Unopposed Motion For Leave To Amend Infringement Contentions With Respect To Nero, Inc., Nero AG And ASUS Computer International, Inc. by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wood, Ruby)
May 12, 2009 Filing 68 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 66 MOTION to Compel Nero, Inc. and Nero AG to Comply with Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4, 65 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits 65 and 66 to the Declaration of Byron Cooper in Support of MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Nero, Inc. and Nero AG to Comply with Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 and MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for, 67 MOTION for Sanctions Against Nero, Inc. and Nero, Inc.'s Counsel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Under Seal 65 - 66 to Declaration of Byron Cooper)(Cooper, Byron)
May 12, 2009 Filing 67 MOTION for Sanctions Against Nero, Inc. and Nero, Inc.'s Counsel by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Byron)
May 12, 2009 Filing 66 MOTION to Compel Nero, Inc. and Nero AG to Comply with Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Byron Cooper, # 3 Exhibit 1 - 28 to Declaration of Byron Cooper, # 4 Exhibit 29 - 52 to Declaration of Byron Cooper, # 5 Exhibit 53 - 58 to Declaration of Byron Cooper, # 6 Exhibit 59 - 61 to Declaration of Byron Cooper, # 7 Exhibit 62 - 64, 67 to Declaration of Byron Cooper)(Cooper, Byron)
May 12, 2009 Filing 65 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits 65 and 66 to the Declaration of Byron Cooper in Support of MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Nero, Inc. and Nero AG to Comply with Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 and MedioStream, Inc.'s Motion for Sanctions Against Nero, Inc. and Nero, Inc.'s Counsel by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Byron)
May 12, 2009 Filing 64 NOTICE of Disclosure by Sonic Solutions (Young, Stanley)
May 12, 2009 Filing 63 NOTICE by Dell, Inc. re 59 Notice of Disclosure Corrected Certificate of Service (Parker, Joshua)
May 12, 2009 Filing 62 NOTICE by Asus Computer International Inc., Nero, Inc., Nero AG of Service of Proposed Terms and Claim Elements For Construction (Tyler, Marvin)
May 12, 2009 Filing 61 NOTICE by Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Corporation DEFENDANTS' SONY CORPORATION AND SONY ELECTRONICS INC. NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PATENT RULE 4-1 (Wilcox, Melvin)
May 12, 2009 Filing 60 NOTICE by Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc., Cyberlink, Inc. OF COMPLIANCE WITH PATENT LOCAL RULE 4-1 (Chen, Lei)
May 12, 2009 Filing 59 NOTICE of Disclosure by Dell, Inc. of Compliance with Patent Rule 4-1 (Parker, Joshua)
May 12, 2009 Filing 58 NOTICE of Disclosure by Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation's Notice of Service of Proposed Terms and Claim Elements for Construction (Smith, Melissa)
May 11, 2009 Filing 57 NOTICE of Disclosure by Apple Computer, Inc. of Compliance with Patent Rule 4-1 (Scarsi, Mark)
May 11, 2009 Filing 56 NOTICE by MedioStream Inc of Compliance with Patent Rule 4-1 (Cooper, Byron)
May 8, 2009 Filing 55 First Amended ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against MedioStream Inc by Asus Computer International Inc..(Tyler, Marvin)
May 6, 2009 Filing 54 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of Mediostream, Inc., MedioStream Inc, Mediostream, Inc.(a California Corporation), Mediostream, Inc., Mediostream, Inc.(a Calfornia Corporation) (Rambin, Daymon)
April 20, 2009 Filing 53 ANSWER OF MEDIOSTREAM, INC. TO COUNTERCLAIMS OF NERO, INC. TO MEDIOSTREAM'S FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM OF NERO, INC. against Nero, Inc. by Mediostream, Inc..(Cooper, Byron)
April 20, 2009 Filing 52 ANSWER OF MEDIOSTREAM, INC. TO COUNTERCLAIMS OF NERO AG TO MEDIOSTREAM'S FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM OF NERO AG against Nero AG by Mediostream, Inc..(Cooper, Byron)
April 14, 2009 Filing 51 NOTICE of Disclosure by Asus Computer International Inc., Nero, Inc. of Compliance with Section 3(b) of the Discovery Order (Tyler, Marvin)
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER Amended Pleadings due by 2/12/2010., Discovery due by 10/15/2010.,., Markman Hearing set for 8/4/2010 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham., Motions due by 12/14/2010., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/14/2010., Jury Selection set for 1/4/2011 09:00AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham., Pretrial Conference set for 12/28/2010 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Mediation deadline is 12/3/2010. All other deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/9/09. (ch, )
April 9, 2009 Filing 49 NOTICE by Dell, Inc. Notice of Compliance with Section 3(b) (Parker, Joshua)
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/9/09. (ehs, )
April 8, 2009 Filing 47 NOTICE of Disclosure by Nero AG of Compliance with Patent Rule 3-3 (Tyler, Marvin)
April 8, 2009 Filing 46 NOTICE of Disclosure by Sony Corporation SONY CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH P.R. 3-3 (Wilcox, Melvin)
April 6, 2009 Filing 45 NOTICE of Disclosure by Microsoft Corporation Compliance with Patent Rule 3-3 (Smith, Melissa)
April 3, 2009 Filing 44 Joint MOTION (Joint Motion for Entry of Discovery Order and Docket Control Order) by MedioStream Inc, Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Abernathy, Nancy)
March 16, 2009 Filing 43 NOTICE of Disclosure by Sonic Solutions in Compliance with Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 (Young, Stanley)
March 16, 2009 Filing 42 NOTICE by Sony Electronics, Inc. of Compliance with Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 (Wilcox, Melvin)
March 12, 2009 Filing 41 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christina Olson for Microsoft Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4563 (ch, )
March 10, 2009 Filing 40 NOTICE of Disclosure by MedioStream Inc MedioStream, Inc.'s Notice of Additional Disclosures (Cooper, Byron)
March 2, 2009 Filing 39 NOTICE of Disclosure by MedioStream Inc MedioStream's Notice of Compliance with Initial Disclosures (Cooper, Byron)
March 2, 2009 Filing 38 NOTICE of Disclosure by Nero AG pursuant to F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) (Tyler, Marvin)
February 27, 2009 Filing 37 NOTICE of Disclosure by Microsoft Corporation (Smith, Melissa)
February 27, 2009 Filing 36 NOTICE of Disclosure by Sony Corporation SC's Notice of Compliance With Disclosure Requirements Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) and Discovery Order (Wilcox, Melvin)
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 32 Motion to Consolidate Cases. The Court, having considered the Agreed Motion to Consolidate, hereby ORDERS that the MedioStream v. Acer America Corporation, et al., Civil Action No. 2:07-cv- 376-CE is consolidated with MedioStream v. Microsoft Corporation, Civil Action No. 2:08- cv-369-CE. The action will proceed under Civil Action No. 2:08-CV-369.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/26/09. (ch, )
February 25, 2009 Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Microsoft Corporation identifying Corporate Parent None for Microsoft Corporation, Microsoft Corporation. (Smith, Melissa)
February 24, 2009 Filing 32 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases No. 2:08-cv-369(CE) and No. 2:07-CV-376(CE) by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Byron)
February 23, 2009 Filing 33 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert J Williams for Microsoft Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4518 (ch, )
February 2, 2009 Filing 31 NOTICE of Disclosure by MedioStream Inc of Compliance with Patent Rules 3-1 and 3-2 (Wood, Ruby)
January 29, 2009 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ruby Wood on behalf of MedioStream Inc (Wood, Ruby)
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER assigning case to Judge Everingham by consent of the parties for all further proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/22/09. (ehs, )
January 23, 2009 Filing 28 CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (ehs, )
January 20, 2009 Filing 27 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 15 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue Defendant and Counterclaimant Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California for the Convenience of the Parties and the Witnesses Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 (a)Opposed MOTION to Change Venue Defendant and Counterclaimant Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California for the Convenience of the Parties and the Witnesses Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 (a) : MEDIOSTREAM'S SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO MICROSOFT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cooper, Byron)
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 15 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue Defendant and Counterclaimant Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California for the Convenience of the Parties and the Witnesses Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 (a)Opposed MOTION to Change Venue Defendant and Counterclaimant Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California for the Convenience of the Parties and the Witnesses Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 (a) : Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2009 11:15 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom. Each side shall have fifteen (15) minutes to present their arguments on all the matters.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/16/09. (mrm, )
January 12, 2009 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re 15 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue Defendant and Counterclaimant Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California for the Convenience of the Parties and the Witnesses Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 (a)Opposed MOTION to Change Venue Defendant and Counterclaimant Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California for the Convenience of the Parties and the Witnesses Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 (a) Reply Brief of Defendant/Counterclaimant Microsoft Corporation in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California for the Convenience of the Parties and the Witnesses Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Smith, Melissa)
January 8, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 24, NOTICE by MedioStream Inc CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. PLEASE IGNORE. These form are not filed electronically, attorney to mail the Magistrate Consent form to the Marshall Clerk's office.*** (mpv, )
January 7, 2009 Filing 24 ***FILED IN ERROR; PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE by MedioStream Inc CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Cooper, Byron) Modified on 1/8/2009 (mpv, ).
January 6, 2009 Filing 23 MedioStream, Inc.'s ANSWER to 14 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Microsoft Corporation by MedioStream Inc.(Cooper, Byron)
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Plaintiff Mediostream, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to Respond to Microsoft Corporation's Counterclaims)Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Plaintiff Mediostream, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to Respond to Microsoft Corporation's Counterclaims) Responses due by 1/6/2009. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/5/09. (mrm, )
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 15 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue Defendant and Counterclaimant Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California for the Convenience of the Parties and the Witnesses Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 (a)Opposed MOTION to Change Venue Defendant and Counterclaimant Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California for the Convenience of the Parties and the Witnesses Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 (a) Responses due by 1/12/2009. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/5/09. (mrm, )
December 29, 2008 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Plaintiff Mediostream, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to Respond to Microsoft Corporation's Counterclaims) by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abernathy, Nancy)
December 29, 2008 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Mediostream Inc.'s Opposition to Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section1404 by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
December 22, 2008 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re 15 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue Defendant and Counterclaimant Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California for the Convenience of the Parties and the Witnesses Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 (a)Opposed MOTION to Change Venue Defendant and Counterclaimant Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California for the Convenience of the Parties and the Witnesses Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 (a) filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of John Huang, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of John Huang, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of Stephane Desproges, # 5 Affidavit Declaration of Romonia Isaac, # 6 Exhibit A to Declaration of Romonia Isaac, # 7 Affidavit Declaration of Stuart Bartow, # 8 Exhibit A to Declaration of Stuart Bartow, # 9 Exhibit B to Declaration of Stuart Bartow, # 10 Exhibit C to Declaration of Stuart Bartow, # 11 Exhibit D to Declaration of Stuart Bartow, # 12 Exhibit E to Declaration of Stuart Bartow, # 13 Exhibit F to Declaration of Stuart Bartow, # 14 Exhibit G to Declaration of Stuart Bartow, # 15 Exhibit H to Declaration of Stuart Bartow, # 16 Exhibit I to Declaration of Stuart Bartow, # 17 Exhibit J to Declaration of Stuart Bartow, # 18 Exhibit K to Declaration of Stuart Bartow)(Cooper, Byron)
December 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, PROPOSED DEADLINES FOR DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, AND DISCOVERY ORDER, ( Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2009 11:15 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/11/08. (mrm, )
December 5, 2008 Filing 16 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney George F Pappas for Microsoft Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-4319 (ch, )
December 5, 2008 Filing 15 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue Defendant and Counterclaimant Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California for the Convenience of the Parties and the Witnesses Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 (a) by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
December 5, 2008 Filing 14 Microsoft Corporation's ANSWER to 1 Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against MedioStream Inc by Microsoft Corporation.(Smith, Melissa)
December 4, 2008 Filing 13 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Scott A Schrader for Microsoft Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-4302 (ch, )
October 29, 2008 Filing 12 ***REPLACES #11***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 10/29/2008 (mpv, ).
October 29, 2008 Filing 11 ***FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY WILL REFILE***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 10/29/2008 (ch, ).
October 29, 2008 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 11, Notice of Appearance. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (Attorney will refile)(ch, )
October 3, 2008 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Frances Stone on behalf of MedioStream Inc (Stone, Elizabeth)
October 3, 2008 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Scott Bishop on behalf of MedioStream Inc (Bishop, Gregory)
October 3, 2008 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Byron Willie Cooper on behalf of MedioStream Inc (Cooper, Byron)
October 3, 2008 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Microsoft Corporation. (ch, )
October 2, 2008 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of MedioStream Inc (Bunt, Robert)
October 2, 2008 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Ainsworth on behalf of MedioStream Inc (Ainsworth, Charles)
October 1, 2008 Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 2-1-4118 (ch, )
October 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge T. John Ward recused. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/1/08. (ch, )
September 30, 2008 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form Mailed to MedioStream Inc (ehs, )
September 30, 2008 Filing 3 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding A Patent or Trademark. (Copy forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office.). (ehs, )
September 30, 2008 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MedioStream Inc. stating MedioStream has no parent and there is no publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its corporate stock (ehs, )
September 30, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Microsoft Corporation (Filing fee $ 350.), filed by MedioStream Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ehs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MedioStream Inc v. Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MedioStream Inc
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Gregory S. Bishop
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Anthony H Cataldo, III
Represented By: Andy H Chan
Represented By: Byron W. Cooper
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Daniel M. Forman
Represented By: David J Goldstone
Represented By: Joseph Samuel Grinstein
Represented By: Charles Foster Koch
Represented By: John E. Lord
Represented By: Frederick G. Michaud, Jr.
Represented By: Daymon Jeffrey Rambin
Represented By: Stephen D. Susman
Represented By: Brooke Ashley-May Taylor
Represented By: Max Lalon Tribble, Jr.
Represented By: Rebecca L Unruh
Represented By: Ruby Wayne Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Brian G. Bieluch
Represented By: Roger A. Ford
Represented By: Christina Olson
Represented By: George Frank Pappas
Represented By: Richard L Rainey
Represented By: Scott Schrader
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Ranganath Sudarshan
Represented By: Ramtin Taheri
Represented By: Robert Joseph Williams
Represented By: William Edward Zapf, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: MedioStream, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Byron W. Cooper
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Andrew Thompson Gorham
Represented By: John E. Lord
Represented By: Robert M Parker
Represented By: Daymon Jeffrey Rambin
Represented By: Rebecca L Unruh
Represented By: Ruby Wayne Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: ACER America Corporation
Represented By: Danny Scot Ashby
Represented By: Lei Howard Chen
Represented By: Elaine Y. Chow
Represented By: Holly Anne Hogan
Represented By: Gregory Phillip Love
Represented By: Ramiz I. Rafeedie
Represented By: Scott English Stevens
Represented By: Steve T Tsai
Represented By: Timothy Paar Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Apple Computer, Inc.
Represented By: Eric M. Albritton
Represented By: Hannah Lynn Cannom
Represented By: Caitlin Hawks
Represented By: Chris Holm
Represented By: Mark C Scarsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Dell, Inc.
Represented By: Roger Fulghum
Represented By: Joshua Jamison Parker
Represented By: Scott F. Partridge
Represented By: Christopher Scott Ponder
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Gateway, Inc.
Represented By: Danny Scot Ashby
Represented By: Steven Robert Daniels
Represented By: Mason Abel Gross
Represented By: Holly Anne Hogan
Represented By: Gregory Phillip Love
Represented By: Scott English Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Asus Computer International Inc.
Represented By: Karen I Boyd
Represented By: Monica Mucchetti Eno
Represented By: Michael A. Ladra
Represented By: Joshua M Masur
Represented By: Marvin Craig Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Sony Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Zaed Billah
Represented By: Michelle Carniaux
Represented By: Thomas R Makin
Represented By: Lewis V. Popovski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Cyberlink, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Nero, Inc.
Represented By: Colin F Campbell
Represented By: Brian Dietzel
Represented By: Monica Mucchetti Eno
Represented By: Michael A. Ladra
Represented By: Marvin Craig Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Sonic Solutions
Represented By: Otis W Carroll, Jr
Represented By: Christina Rose Hollander
Represented By: Matthew Adam Hollander
Represented By: Noel Andrew Leibnitz
Represented By: Deborah J Race
Represented By: Roderick Manley Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Cyberlink.com Corporation
Represented By: Danny Scot Ashby
Represented By: Lei Howard Chen
Represented By: Holly Anne Hogan
Represented By: Gregory Phillip Love
Represented By: Scott English Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Nero AG
Represented By: Brian Dietzel
Represented By: Monica Mucchetti Eno
Represented By: Marvin Craig Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Sony Corporation
Represented By: Thomas R Makin
Represented By: Lewis V. Popovski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_countercla: Dell, Inc.
Represented By: Roger Fulghum
Represented By: Scott F. Partridge
Represented By: Christopher Scott Ponder
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Represented By: Roger Fulghum
Represented By: Joshua Jamison Parker
Represented By: Scott F. Partridge
Represented By: Christopher Scott Ponder
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Represented By: Roger Fulghum
Represented By: Scott F. Partridge
Represented By: Christopher Scott Ponder
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_countercla: ACER America Corporation
Represented By: Danny Scot Ashby
Represented By: Lei Howard Chen
Represented By: Elaine Y. Chow
Represented By: Gregory Phillip Love
Represented By: Danny Scot Ashby
Represented By: Lei Howard Chen
Represented By: Elaine Y. Chow
Represented By: Gregory Phillip Love
Represented By: Danny Scot Ashby
Represented By: Lei Howard Chen
Represented By: Elaine Y. Chow
Represented By: Gregory Phillip Love
Represented By: Ramiz I. Rafeedie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_countercla: Gateway, Inc.
Represented By: Danny Scot Ashby
Represented By: Steven Robert Daniels
Represented By: Mason Abel Gross
Represented By: Gregory Phillip Love
Represented By: Danny Scot Ashby
Represented By: Steven Robert Daniels
Represented By: Mason Abel Gross
Represented By: Gregory Phillip Love
Represented By: Danny Scot Ashby
Represented By: Steven Robert Daniels
Represented By: Mason Abel Gross
Represented By: Gregory Phillip Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_countercla: Cyberlink.com Corporation
Represented By: Danny Scot Ashby
Represented By: Gregory Phillip Love
Represented By: Danny Scot Ashby
Represented By: Gregory Phillip Love
Represented By: Danny Scot Ashby
Represented By: Gregory Phillip Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_countercla: Apple Computer, Inc.
Represented By: Eric M. Albritton
Represented By: Hannah Lynn Cannom
Represented By: Chris Holm
Represented By: Mark C Scarsi
Represented By: Eric M. Albritton
Represented By: Hannah Lynn Cannom
Represented By: Chris Holm
Represented By: Mark C Scarsi
Represented By: Eric M. Albritton
Represented By: Hannah Lynn Cannom
Represented By: Chris Holm
Represented By: Mark C Scarsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_countercla: Asus Computer International Inc.
Represented By: Karen I Boyd
Represented By: Joshua M Masur
Represented By: Marvin Craig Tyler
Represented By: Karen I Boyd
Represented By: Monica Mucchetti Eno
Represented By: Michael A. Ladra
Represented By: Joshua M Masur
Represented By: Marvin Craig Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_countercla: Nero, Inc.
Represented By: Colin F Campbell
Represented By: Brian Dietzel
Represented By: Marvin Craig Tyler
Represented By: Colin F Campbell
Represented By: Monica Mucchetti Eno
Represented By: Michael A. Ladra
Represented By: Marvin Craig Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_countercla: Sonic Solutions
Represented By: Otis W Carroll, Jr
Represented By: Christina Rose Hollander
Represented By: Matthew Adam Hollander
Represented By: Noel Andrew Leibnitz
Represented By: Otis W Carroll, Jr
Represented By: Christina Rose Hollander
Represented By: Matthew Adam Hollander
Represented By: Noel Andrew Leibnitz
Represented By: Otis W Carroll, Jr
Represented By: Christina Rose Hollander
Represented By: Matthew Adam Hollander
Represented By: Noel Andrew Leibnitz
Represented By: Roderick Manley Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_countercla: Nero AG
Represented By: Brian Dietzel
Represented By: Marvin Craig Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_counterdft: MedioStream, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Byron W. Cooper
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Andrew Thompson Gorham
Represented By: John E. Lord
Represented By: Robert M Parker
Represented By: Daymon Jeffrey Rambin
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Byron W. Cooper
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Andrew Thompson Gorham
Represented By: John E. Lord
Represented By: Robert M Parker
Represented By: Daymon Jeffrey Rambin
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Byron W. Cooper
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Andrew Thompson Gorham
Represented By: John E. Lord
Represented By: Robert M Parker
Represented By: Daymon Jeffrey Rambin
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Byron W. Cooper
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Andrew Thompson Gorham
Represented By: John E. Lord
Represented By: Robert M Parker
Represented By: Daymon Jeffrey Rambin
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Byron W. Cooper
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Andrew Thompson Gorham
Represented By: John E. Lord
Represented By: Robert M Parker
Represented By: Daymon Jeffrey Rambin
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Byron W. Cooper
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Andrew Thompson Gorham
Represented By: John E. Lord
Represented By: Robert M Parker
Represented By: Daymon Jeffrey Rambin
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Byron W. Cooper
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Andrew Thompson Gorham
Represented By: John E. Lord
Represented By: Robert M Parker
Represented By: Daymon Jeffrey Rambin
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Byron W. Cooper
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Andrew Thompson Gorham
Represented By: John E. Lord
Represented By: Robert M Parker
Represented By: Daymon Jeffrey Rambin
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Byron W. Cooper
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Andrew Thompson Gorham
Represented By: John E. Lord
Represented By: Robert M Parker
Represented By: Daymon Jeffrey Rambin
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Byron W. Cooper
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Andrew Thompson Gorham
Represented By: John E. Lord
Represented By: Robert M Parker
Represented By: Daymon Jeffrey Rambin
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Byron W. Cooper
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Andrew Thompson Gorham
Represented By: John E. Lord
Represented By: Robert M Parker
Represented By: Daymon Jeffrey Rambin
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Byron W. Cooper
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Andrew Thompson Gorham
Represented By: John E. Lord
Represented By: Robert M Parker
Represented By: Daymon Jeffrey Rambin
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Byron W. Cooper
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Andrew Thompson Gorham
Represented By: John E. Lord
Represented By: Robert M Parker
Represented By: Daymon Jeffrey Rambin
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Byron W. Cooper
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Andrew Thompson Gorham
Represented By: John E. Lord
Represented By: Robert M Parker
Represented By: Daymon Jeffrey Rambin
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Byron W. Cooper
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Andrew Thompson Gorham
Represented By: John E. Lord
Represented By: Robert M Parker
Represented By: Daymon Jeffrey Rambin
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Byron W. Cooper
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Andrew Thompson Gorham
Represented By: John E. Lord
Represented By: Robert M Parker
Represented By: Daymon Jeffrey Rambin
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Byron W. Cooper
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Andrew Thompson Gorham
Represented By: John E. Lord
Represented By: Robert M Parker
Represented By: Daymon Jeffrey Rambin
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Byron W. Cooper
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Andrew Thompson Gorham
Represented By: John E. Lord
Represented By: Robert M Parker
Represented By: Daymon Jeffrey Rambin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Asustek Computer, Inc.
Represented By: Blake Charles Erskine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?