Dhariwal v. Mayorkas et al

Plaintiff: Santokh Singh Dhariwal
Defendant: Janet Napolitano, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Alejandro Mayorkas and U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 5:2011cv02593
Filed: May 31, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 27, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 9 Motion to Dismiss (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
August 29, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR PARTIES TO FILE EITHER A "CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE," OR ELSE A "DECLINATION TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT." Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 29, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
June 30, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO SAN JOSE DIVISION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/30/2011. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dhariwal v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santokh Singh Dhariwal
Represented By: Shuting Chen
Represented By: Robert B. Jobe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?