Site Update Solutions LLC v. Accor North America Inc et al
Plaintiff: Site Update Solutions LLC
Defendant: Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, Aweber Systems Inc, CBS Corp, CDW LLC, Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Intuit Inc., Jasons Deli Corp, Linkedin Corporation, NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Overstock.Com Inc, Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc, Time Inc, Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc, The Walt Disney Company, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Time Warner, Inc.,, CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Home Box Office, Inc. and Ticketmaster L.L.C.
Mediator: James W Knowles
Case Number: 5:2011cv03306
Filed: July 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 692 ORDER DENYING SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR DECLARATION OF EXCEPTIONAL CASE AND AWARD OF FEES by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal denying 673 . (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 665 ORDER [REDACTED] DENYING DECLARATION OF EXCEPTIONAL CASE AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 649 Motion for Attorney Fees (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 653 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND TO MODIFY BRIEFING DEADLINES FOR NEWEGG'S MOTION FOR DECLARATION OF EXCEPTIONAL CASE AND AWARD OF FEES, granting 652 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time and to Modify Briefing Deadlines for Newegg's Motion for Declaration of Exceptional Case and Award of Fees: Deadline for Plaintiff to file its Response to the Motion is 12/17/2012. Deadline for Newegg to file its Reply is 12/28/2012. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 12/7/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2012)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 638 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FOR SEPTEMBER 25, 2012 FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE, granting 637 Notice (Other): Plaintiffs counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 9/24/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 635 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FOR FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE re 634 Notice (Other) Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 14, 2012. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 630 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF SITE UPDATE SOLUTIONS LLC'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FOR SEPTEMBER 4, 2012 FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, granting 629 Notice (Other). Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 8/29/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 602 JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SUBMISSION OF JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT AND ORDER, granting 601 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 4/26/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 572 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS ALL CLAIMS BETWEEN SITE UPDATE SOLUTIONS LLC AND WAL-MART STORES, INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE re 571 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/6/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Site Update Solutions LLC v. Accor North America Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Site Update Solutions LLC
Represented By: Wendy Lynn Boone
Represented By: Edward W. Goldstein
Represented By: Alisa Anne Lipski
Represented By: Corby R Vowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adobe Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Yar R. Chaikovsky
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Lance Lee
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: Philip Ou
Represented By: David Marc Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: Yar R. Chaikovsky
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Lance Lee
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: Philip Ou
Represented By: David Marc Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aweber Systems Inc
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Charles J Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corp
Represented By: John Scott Andrews
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Edward Robert Reines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDW LLC
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Thomas L. Duston
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: Anthony S Gabrielson
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Benjamin T Horton
Represented By: Scott A Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choice Hotels International Inc
Represented By: Kevin Paul Anderson
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Edward Vincent King, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory R Lyons
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Represented By: Dirk van Ausdall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daily News LP
Represented By: John Scott Andrews
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Edward Robert Reines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronic Arts Inc.
Represented By: John Scott Andrews
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Edward Robert Reines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company
Represented By: Umar Arshad
Represented By: Robert Leo Burns, II
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Scott Richard Mosko
Represented By: Jeffrey C Totten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Heidi Lyn Keefe
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Stameshkin
Represented By: Mark R. Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc
Represented By: John Scott Andrews
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Edward Robert Reines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSN Inc
Represented By: Bret Bocchieri
Represented By: Lawrence E. Butler
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Joseph Ronald Lanser
Represented By: Michael R Levinson
Represented By: Jason Dwain Mazingo
Represented By: E. Glenn Thames, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew Aaron Werber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intuit Inc.
Represented By: Yar R. Chaikovsky
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Lance Lee
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: Philip Ou
Represented By: David Marc Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jasons Deli Corp
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: David Marc Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linkedin Corporation
Represented By: Yar R. Chaikovsky
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Lance Lee
Represented By: Philip Ou
Represented By: David Marc Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBC Universal Inc
Represented By: John Scott Andrews
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Edward Robert Reines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newegg Inc.
Represented By: Yar R. Chaikovsky
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Lance Lee
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: Philip Ou
Represented By: David Marc Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Overstock.Com Inc
Represented By: John Hanson Barr, Jr.
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Damien Patrick Lillis
Represented By: Martin Lukas Pitha
Represented By: Christopher Schenck
Represented By: Christopher Aaron Shield
Represented By: John Allen Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears Roebuck and Co
Represented By: Yar R. Chaikovsky
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Lance Lee
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: Philip Ou
Represented By: David Marc Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staples Inc
Represented By: John Scott Andrews
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Edward Robert Reines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Yar R. Chaikovsky
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Lance Lee
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: Philip Ou
Represented By: David Marc Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc
Represented By: John Scott Andrews
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Edward Robert Reines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Inc
Represented By: John Scott Andrews
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Edward Robert Reines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc
Represented By: John Scott Andrews
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Edward Robert Reines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Walt Disney Company
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: R. Whitney Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Broadcasting Companies, Inc.
Represented By: John Caracappa
Represented By: Paul A. Gennari
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Michael Richard Heimbold
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: Tremayne M Norris
Represented By: R. Whitney Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner, Inc.,
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Interactive Inc.
Represented By: John Scott Andrews
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Edward Robert Reines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNN Interactive Group, Inc.
Represented By: John Scott Andrews
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Edward Robert Reines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Box Office, Inc.
Represented By: John Scott Andrews
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Edward Robert Reines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ticketmaster L.L.C.
Represented By: John Scott Andrews
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Edward Robert Reines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: James W Knowles
Represented By: James W Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?