Lopez Manzo v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Maria Cristina Lopez Manzo
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 5:2011cv05137
Filed: October 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying 13 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 18 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/29/13. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING Second Extension for Defendant to File Notice, Motion, and Memorandum in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment re 16 Proposed Order, filed by Michael J. Astrue. Motions due by 6/8/2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/9/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING 14 FIRST EXTENSION FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE NOTICE, MOTION,AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Defendant shall have a 30-day extension, or u ntil May 9, 2012, in which to file his Notice, Motion, and Memorandum in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/3/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez Manzo v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Cristina Lopez Manzo
Represented By: Tom F. Weathered
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: Elizabeth Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?