Johnson v. San Benito County et al
Plaintiff: Brett Johnson
Defendant: San Benito County, Patrick Turturici and Tony Lamonica
Case Number: 5:2012cv03691
Filed: July 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Benito
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 40 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 43 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 49 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 52 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 54 Motion ; granting 55 Motion ; finding as moot 66 Stipulation (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER VACATING HEARING AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 64 . Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/6/2013. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND EXTENDING DEADLINE TO COMPLETE ENE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/08/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER EXTENDING ADR DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on May 28, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REGARDING REQUEST FOR INTERNAL AFFAIRS RECORDS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/14/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 22 Stipulation for Protective Order.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re 15 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Patrick Turturici. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/25/13. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 13 Stipulation to Extend the Deadline for Plaintiff to Amend hi Complaint.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. San Benito County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Benito County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Turturici
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Lamonica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Johnson
Represented By: John Houston
Represented By: W. Gordon Kaupp
Represented By: Lizabeth N. de Vries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?