Gebrezgie v. Luders et al
Plaintiff: Yohannes Tekie Gebrezgie
Defendant: Luders, Kolman, Toby, House, Cleek, J. Alves, E. Lewis, Mel, Johnson, C. Mel and Perez
Case Number: 5:2012cv04358
Filed: August 22, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: PSLC HHL
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER OF SERVICE; DISMISSING CLAIMS AGAINST DEFS. KOLMAN AND HOUSE; DIRECTING DEFENDANT HARFORD TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTION OR NOTICE REGARDING SUCH MOTION; INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a Notice of Lawsuit and Request fo r Waiver of Service of Summons, two copies of the Waiver of Service of Summons, a copy of the amended complaint (Docket No. 13), the supplemental complaint (Docket No. 44), and all attachments thereto, and a copy of this order upon Defendants Karin H arford, P.A. at the Sonoma County Jail (2777 Ventura Ave. Santa Rosa, CA 95403). The Clerk shall also mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. The claims against Defendants Sheriff House and Dr. Debra Kolman are DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk sha ll terminate these defendants from this action. In light of this dismissal, Defendant House's motion for Summary Judgment (Docket No. 24) is DISMISSED as moot. Habeas Answer or Dispositive Motion due by 4/22/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/21/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF SERVICE; DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTION OR NOTICE REGARDING SUCH MOTION; INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, two copies of the Waiver of Service of Summons, a copy of the amended complaint, (Docket No. 13), all attachments thereto, and a copy of this order upon Defendants Dr. Kolman, Dr. Luders and Lieutenant House at the Sonoma County Jail (2777 Ventura Ave., Santa Rosa, CA 95403) . The Clerk shall also mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. The Clerk shall terminate all other defendants from this action as Plaintiff has made no allegations against them in his amended complaint. Johnson (Deputy Grievance Officer Johnson Inv ividually and in their offical capacities ), E. Lewis, Mel (Program Officer), C. Mel, Perez (Deputy Grievance Officer ), J. Alves (Deputy Sheriff) and Cleek (Sergeant) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/18/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT RE 12 Letter filed by Yohannes Tekie Gebrezgie. Plaintiff's amended complaint is timely filed. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/14/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT AND REOPENING CASE. The Judgment entered on November 2, 2012 is VACATED. The Court will conduct an initial review of the petition in a separate order. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/15/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012) Modified text on 11/16/2012 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 JUDGMENT. The Court dismissed the instant civil action without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to pay the filing fee. A judgment of dismissal without prejudice is entered. The Clerk shall close the file. ***PSP Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/1/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gebrezgie v. Luders et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yohannes Tekie Gebrezgie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kolman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Alves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Mel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?