Holmes v. Campbell et al

Plaintiff: Rocky Holmes
Defendant: Campbell, Clark, Nisanni, Grim, M. Sepulveda and Rhoads
Case Number: 5:2013cv01944
Filed: April 29, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: PSLC CLA
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT SEPULVEDA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DIRECTING MARSHAL TO SERVE DEFENDANT RHOADS; SCHEDULING DISPOSITIVE MOTION by Judge William Alsup granting 14 Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2014)
December 17, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE OR PROVIDE LOCATION OF DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/17/14. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
March 16, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/16/15. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
July 3, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL AND OF SERVICE Habeas Answer or Dispositive Motion due by 10/4/2013.. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/2/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes v. Campbell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nisanni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Sepulveda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.