Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. et al v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Bay Area Surgical Group Inc., Knowles Surgery Center, LLC, National Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC, Los Altos Surgery Center, LP, Forest Ambulatory Surgical Associates, LP and SOAR Surgery Center, LLC
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Lockheed Martin Healthworks Plan, Lockheed Martin Corporation Flexible Benefits Plan, Adobe Systems Incorporated, Adobe Systems Incorporated Group Welfare Plan, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Costco Wholesale Corporation Employee Benefits Plan Program, Applied Materials, Inc., Applied Materials, Inc. Welfare Plan, Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation Welfare Plan, VMware, Inc., VMware, Inc. Flexible Spending Account Plan, VMware Group Health Plan, Yahoo!, Inc, Yahoo Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Xilinx, Inc., Xilinx Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Becton Dickinson and Company, SAP America, Inc., Sap America Health & Welfare Plan, National Semiconductor Corporation, National Semiconductor Corporation Flexible Life Insurance Plan, National Semiconductor Corporation Comprehensive Medical and Dental Plan, Salesforce.com, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Delaware Salesforce.com, Salesforce.com Health and Welfare Plan, Ericsson Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as EUS Inc., Ericsson Flexible Benefits Plan, Facebook, Inc., Facebook, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, United Parcel of America, Inc., UPS Flexible Benefits Plan, Altera Corporation a Delaware corporation doing business as Delaware Altera Corporation, Altera Corporation Health, Life and Disability Plan, Jabil Circuit, Inc., Jabil Circuit, Inc. Health Benefit Plan, Avaya, Inc., Avaya, Inc. Represented Employees Post-Retirement Health Benefits Trust, The Avaya Inc. Health & Welfare Benefits Plan for Salaried Employees, Avaya Inc. Medical Expense Plan, Avaya Inc. Retiree Medical Expense Plan for Salaried Employees, Avaya Inc. Health & Welfare Benefits Plan, The Avaya Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Plan for Retirees, The Avaya Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Plan For Salaried Retirees, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Group Benefits Program, Bank of America Corpoation Corporate Benefits Committee, STMicroelectronics, Inc., STMicroelectronics, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefits Plan, Citigroup Inc., Citigroup Flexible Benefits Plan, Citigroup Health Benefit Plan, Canon U.S.A., Inc., Canon Welfare Benefit Plan, Symantec Corporation, Symantec Corporation Group Welfare Benefit Plan, SRI International, Echelon Corporation, Echelon Employee Benefit Plan, Vishay Intertechnology, Inc., Vishay Intertechnology, Inc. Welfare Plan, Life Technologies Corporation, Life Technologies Corporation Health and Welfare Plan, Tyco Electronics Corporation, Tyco Electronics Corporation Health and Welfare Plan, Align Technology, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as (Delaware) Align Technology, Inc., Align Technology, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Infosys Limited, Infosys Limited Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, First Solar, Inc., First Solar, Inc. Group Health Insurance Plan, Renesas Electronics America, Inc., Renesas Electronic America Inc. Benefit Plan, Plexus Corp., Health Plan for Employees of Plexus Corp., Tutor Perini Corporation, Tutor Perini Corporation Health and Welfare Plan, Cepheid, Cepheid Consolidated Welfare Benefit Plan, Hyatt Corporation, Hyatt Corporation Welfare Benefit Plan, Global Foundries U.S., Inc., Globalfoundries U.S., Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Liveops, Inc., Liveops, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Securitas Security Services USA, Inc., Securitas Security Services USA, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Bridge Capital Holdings, Bridge Bank, N.A. Employee Benefit Plan, Sanmina Corporation, Sanmina Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Hospira, Inc., Hospira Flexible Benefits Plan, Hospira Health Care Plan, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Panasonic Group Comprehensive Medical and Dental Plan, Dell Inc., Dell, Inc., c/o Nicki Huschka, Sonicwall, Inc. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Infineon Technologies North America Corp., Infineon Technologies Welfare Benefit Plan, Cox Enterprises, Inc., Cox Enterprises, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, CA, Inc., CA, Inc. Comprehensive Health and Welfare Plan, Sybase, Inc., Sybase, Inc. Group Welfare Plan, Manpower, Inc./California Peninsula, Check Point Software Technologies, Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Inc. Welfare Plan, Reliance Steel & Aluminum Co., Reliance Steel & Aluminum Co., Life, Accidental Death & Dismemberment Health Plan, Toys 'R' Us-Delaware, Inc., Toys 'R' Us Employee Benefit Plan, ADP Totalsource, Inc., ADP Totalsource, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Omron Management Center of America, Inc., Omron Management Center of America, Inc. Employee Welfare Plan, BMC Software, Inc., BMC Software, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, KPMG LLP, KPMG LLP Health Plans, Tesoro Corporation, Tesoro Corporation Omnibus Group Welfare Benefits Plan, Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc., Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc. Employer Funded Welfare Benefit Plan, Amgen, Inc., Amgen, Inc. Master Benefits Plan, Arrow Electronics, Inc., Arrow Eelctronics Welfare Benefits Plan, Stantec Consulting Services, Inc., Stantec Health Plan, IHS, Inc., IHS Employee Benefit Plan, J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. Health & Welfare Benefits Plan, J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. Benefits Administration Committee, Pioneer North America, Inc., Pioneer North America, Inc. Group Life, Health Disability Plan, Sumtotal Systems, Inc., Sumsotal Systems Group Health & Welfare Plan, Intevac, Inc., Intevac Life and Welfare Plan, GCA Services Group, Inc., GCA Services Group Health and Welfare Plan, The Western Union Company a Delaware corporation doing business as T.W.U.C., The Western Union Company Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, NDS Surgical Imaging LLC, NDS Surgical Imaging, LLC Welfare Benefits Plan, Compass Group USA, Inc., Employee Benefit Plan of the Compass Group USA, Inc., BAE Systems, Inc., BAE Systems Funded Welfare Benefit Plan, TIN Inc., Temple-Inland Health & Welfare Benefits Wrap Plan, Fidelity National Financial, Inc., Fidelity National Financial, Inc. Welfare Plan, Software AG USA, Inc., Software AG USA, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan, Bausch & Lomb Incorporated, Bausch & Lomb Comprehensive Medical Plan, Avidex Industries, L.L.C., Avidex Industries Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Innovion Corporation, Innovion Corp Health Plan, Pinnacle Bank, a California corporation, Pinnacle Bank, Paragon Benefits, Inventiv Health, Inc., Inventiv Health, Inc. Employee Health Care Program, URS Corporation, URS Corporation Welfare Benefits Plan, Harsco Corporation, Harsco Corporation Insurance Plan, Right Management Consultants, Inc., WPP Group Holdings Corp., WPP Group USA, Inc. Benefis Plan, Fusionstorm, Fusionstorm Health and Welfare Plan, Owens Corning, Owens Corning Health Care & Benefits Plan for Active Employees, Graebel Companies, Inc., Graebel Companies, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC Health and Welfare Plan, Encore Industries, Inc., Encore Industries Inc. Employees Welfare Benefit Plan, Kforce Inc., Kforce Inc. Group Insurance Plan, SPX Corporation, SPX Corporation Comprehensive Medical Care Plan, Administrative Committee SPX Corporation, Tolt, LLC, Tolt Service Group, Tolt Technologies Benefit Welfare Plan, UBS Financial Services, Inc., UBS Financial Services, Inc. Group Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Louis DiMaria, c/o UBS Financial Services, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent U.S.A., Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Medical Expense Plan for Management Employees, Alcatel-Lucent Medical Expense Plan for Occupational Employees, Amazon Corporate, LLC, Automatic Data Processing Insurance Agency, Inc., Automatic Data Processing, Inc. Flex 2000 Plan, Barracuda Networks, Inc., Barracuda Networks, Inc. Benefit Plan, Blue Coat Systems, LLC, Blue Cost Systems, Inc. Flexible Benefit Plan, Boehringer Ingelheim Fremont, Inc., Bonhams & Butterfields Auctioneers Corporation, Butterfields Consolidated Welfare Plan, Booz Allen Hamilton, Booz Allen Hamilton Inc. All Risk Insurance, Cadence Design Systems, Inc., Cadence Group Life, Health and Disability Plan, Canon Anelva Corp., Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan, Coach, Inc., Coach, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation, Cognizant Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Corvel Corporation, Corvel Corporation Welfare Benefits Plan, Diageo North America Inc., Duran & Veneables, Inc., Dynamic Details Design, LLC, Dynamic Details, Inc., Welfare Benefit Plan, Emulex Corporation, Emulex - The Flexible Benefits Program for Emulex Employees, Ericsson Televison, Inc., Ericsson Television, Inc., Employee Benefit Package, GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, GlaxoSmithKline, Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, HGST, Inc., Hitachi Global Storage/Technologies, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Infotech Enterprises America, Inc., Infotech Enterprises America, Inc. Medical and Dental Plan, J. Crew, Inc., Group Ins. Plan for Associates of J. Crew Group, Inc., L-3 Communications Corporation, L-3 Communications Funded Grou Healh and Welfare Plan, Lehigh Hanson, Inc., Lehigh Hanson Inc. Healh & Welfare Plan Active Employees, Microsemi Corporation, Microsemi Group Benefits Plan, Natus Medical Incorporated, Naus Medical Health and Welfare Plan, Northwestern Polytechnic Univeristy, Oasis Outsourcing Holdings, Inc., Oasis Outsourcing Holdings, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefits Plan, Opticomp Corporation, Paychex, Inc., Paychex, Inc., Employee Health Benefits Plan, PVH Corp., PVH Corp. & Subsidiaries Health & Welfare Plan, Pole to Win America, Inc., Science Applications International Corp., Science Applications International Corporation Welfare Benefits Trust, Semtech Corp., Semtech Corp Group Medical and Dental Plan, R. Steven Peters, Inc., Te Connectivity Networks, Inc., TeleNav, Inc., TeleNav Health and Welfare Plan, Trident Microsystems, Inc., Trident Microsystems, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, The Kleinfelder Group, Inc., The Kleinfelder Group, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc., Tween Brands, Inc., Tween Brands, Inc. Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan, Unisource Worldwide, Inc., Vitesse Semiconductor Corporation, VWR International, LLC, VWR International, LLC Welfare Benefit Plan, WPG Americas, Inc., WPG Americas Health and Welfare Plan, Wycliffe Bible Translators, Inc., Wycliffe Bible Translators, Inc. Medical Health Plan HMO, Al-Razaq Enerprises Group Incorporated, Cordevalle, L.P., Cordevalle Welfare Benefits Plan, First American Financial Corporation, First American Financial Corporation Group Disability Benefits Trust, K.R. Anderson, Inc., K.R. Anderson Group Welfare Plan, LVI Services, Inc., LVI Services, Inc. Health Benefit Plan, Praxair, Inc., Praxair Medical Plan, SCI Management, LLC, Zetta, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Delaware Zetta, Luminex Corporation, Hathaway Dinwiddie Construction Company, Hathaway Dinwiddie Group Medical and Dental Plan, Saudi Arabian Cultural Mission, Royal Embassy of Saudi Arabia, United States Department of Defense, Farmers Insurance Company, Inc., TE Connectivity Ltd. and TE Connectivity Health and Welfare Benefits Plan
Case Number: 5:2013cv05430
Filed: November 22, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 737 ORDER re #734 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by SOAR Surgery Center, LLC, Forest Ambulatory Surgical Associates, LP, Los Altos Surgery Center, LP, Bay Area Surgical Group Inc., National Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC, Knowles Surgery Center, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/5/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 736 ORDER re #733 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by SOAR Surgery Center, LLC, Forest Ambulatory Surgical Associates, LP, Los Altos Surgery Center, LP, National Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC, Knowles Surgery Center, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/5/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 735 ORDER re #732 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/5/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
October 3, 2016 Filing 734 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc., Forest Ambulatory Surgical Associates, LP, Knowles Surgery Center, LLC, Los Altos Surgery Center, LP, National Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC, SOAR Surgery Center, LLC (Gibson, Heather) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
October 3, 2016 Filing 733 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Forest Ambulatory Surgical Associates, LP, Knowles Surgery Center, LLC, Los Altos Surgery Center, LP, National Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC, SOAR Surgery Center, LLC (Gibson, Heather) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
October 3, 2016 Filing 732 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Gibson, Heather) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
September 15, 2016 Filing 731 STATUS REPORT Joint by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 9/15/2016)
June 15, 2016 Filing 730 STATUS REPORT Joint by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Doren, Richard) (Filed on 6/15/2016)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 729 ORDER re #728 Status Report filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. Having reviewed the Joint Status Report filed on April 22, 2016 (Dkt. No. 728), the court has determined the stay of this action imposed on June 17, 2014, should remain in effect at this time. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' request to lift the stay is DENIED, and this action shall remain STAYED during the pendency of post-judgment proceedings in state court. As before, the parties shall submit a brief Joint Status Report every three months. Furthermore, within 10 days of either (1) a resolution of the state court action through settlement or other informal means, or (2) a final ruling on all post-trial motions by the state court, the parties shall file a joint notice informing the court of such development. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/3/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
April 22, 2016 Filing 728 STATUS REPORT Joint by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
July 1, 2015 Filing 727 STATUS REPORT Joint by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc., Forest Ambulatory Surgical Associates, LP, Knowles Surgery Center, LLC, Los Altos Surgery Center, LP, National Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC, SOAR Surgery Center, LLC. (Gibson, Heather) (Filed on 7/1/2015)
June 29, 2015 Filing 726 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Edward Fox (Fox, Stephen) (Filed on 6/29/2015)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 725 Order Granting #724 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Stephen E. Fox for Symantec Corporation and Symantec Corporation Group Welfare Benefit Plan. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 6/24/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2015)
June 23, 2015 Filing 724 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Stephen E. Fox ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9623334.) filed by Symantec Corporation, Symantec Corporation Group Welfare Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thompson, Charles) (Filed on 6/23/2015)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 723 ORDER denying #707 Motion for Relief from Stay. The hearing scheduled for 5/14/2015 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/11/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2015)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 722 Order Granting #721 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. Plaintiff's request that Document #719 be permanently deleted from the docket, ECF, and PACER. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2015.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 5, 2015 Filing 721 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc., Forest Ambulatory Surgical Associates, LP, Knowles Surgery Center, LLC, Los Altos Surgery Center, LP, National Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC, SOAR Surgery Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Gibson, Heather) (Filed on 3/5/2015)
March 5, 2015 Filing 720 REPLY (re #707 MOTION to Lift Stay ) filed byBay Area Surgical Group Inc., Forest Ambulatory Surgical Associates, LP, Knowles Surgery Center, LLC, Los Altos Surgery Center, LP, National Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC, SOAR Surgery Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-D, #2 Declaration, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Gibson, Heather) (Filed on 3/5/2015)
March 4, 2015 Filing 719 ***DOCUMENT REMOVED PER ORDER #722 ***REPLY (re #707 MOTION to Lift Stay ) filed byBay Area Surgical Group Inc., Forest Ambulatory Surgical Associates, LP, Knowles Surgery Center, LLC, Los Altos Surgery Center, LP, National Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC, SOAR Surgery Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declaration, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Gibson, Heather) (Filed on 3/4/2015) Locked document per party filer - confidential information contained. Modified on 3/5/2015 (srmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/5/2015 (srmS, COURT STAFF). (Main Document 719 replaced on 3/6/2015) (sp, COURT STAFF). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/6/2015) (sp, COURT STAFF). (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/6/2015) (sp, COURT STAFF). (Attachment 3 replaced on 3/6/2015) (sp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/6/2015 (sp, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 718 Order Granting #717 Ex Parte Application to Withdraw Counsel of Record. Counsel shall continue to be represented in this matter by co-counsel Heather Gibson of the Law Offices of Nicholas Lezotte, PC. Law firm of Hooper, Lundy & Bookman, PC. terminated. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 3/4/2015.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
March 3, 2015 Filing 717 Ex Parte Application WITHDRAW COUNSEL OF RECORD filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. (Dru, Katherine) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 716 Order Granting #715 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael D. Spencer terminated. The Broadcom Defendants shall continue to be represented by Harold M. Brody and Howard Shapiro. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 3/2/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2015)
February 27, 2015 Filing 715 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation Welfare Plan. Responses due by 3/13/2015. Replies due by 3/20/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brody, Harold) (Filed on 2/27/2015)
February 25, 2015 Filing 714 Joinder re #709 Opposition/Response to Motion for Relief from Stay by Applied Materials, Inc., Applied Materials, Inc. Welfare Plan. (Ridley, Eileen) (Filed on 2/25/2015)
February 25, 2015 Filing 713 Joinder re #709 Opposition/Response to Motion by Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brody, Harold) (Filed on 2/25/2015)
February 25, 2015 Filing 712 Joinder re #709 Opposition/Response to Motion for Relief from Stay by First American Financial Corporation, First American Financial Corporation Group Disability Benefits Trust. (Baker, James) (Filed on 2/25/2015)
February 25, 2015 Filing 711 Joinder re #709 Opposition/Response to Motion for Relief from Stay by Facebook, Inc., Facebook, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Jabil Circuit, Inc., Jabil Circuit, Inc. Health Benefit Plan, TE Connectivity Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, TE Connectivity Ltd., Te Connectivity Networks, Inc.. (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 2/25/2015)
February 25, 2015 Filing 710 Joinder re #709 Opposition/Response to Motion for Relief from Stay by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Costco Wholesale Corporation Employee Benefits Plan Program, Global Foundries U.S., Inc., Globalfoundries U.S., Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC Health and Welfare Plan, STMicroelectronics, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), STMicroelectronics, Inc., STMicroelectronics, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefits Plan. (Nowicki, Kevin) (Filed on 2/25/2015)
February 25, 2015 Filing 709 RESPONSE (re #707 MOTION to Lift Stay ) Opposition To Motion For Relief From Stay filed byAetna Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/25/2015)
February 12, 2015 Filing 708 NOTICE by Applied Materials, Inc., Applied Materials, Inc. Welfare Plan of Association of Counsel (Ridley, Eileen) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
February 11, 2015 Filing 707 MOTION to Lift Stay filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc., Forest Ambulatory Surgical Associates, LP, Knowles Surgery Center, LLC, Los Altos Surgery Center, LP, National Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC, SOAR Surgery Center, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 2/25/2015. Replies due by 3/4/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Gibson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
February 11, 2015 Filing 706 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Elizabeth Gibson (Gibson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
February 10, 2015 Filing 705 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kevin Ronald Nowicki (Nowicki, Kevin) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
December 15, 2014 Filing 704 STATUS REPORT JOINT by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. (Dru, Katherine) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
September 19, 2014 Filing 703 FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC. Judgment is entered for Plaintiffs Bay Area Surgical Group, Inc., Knowles Surgery Center, LLC, National Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC, Los Altos Surgery Center, LP, Forest Ambulatory Surgical Associates, LP, and SOAR Surgery Center, LLC and against Defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc., in the amount of Seventeen Thousand Eight Hundred and Fifteen Dollars ($17,815.00), which includes all claims for penalties, prejudgment interest, attorney's fees, and costs incurred in this action. Defendant Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. is DISMISSED from this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/19/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 18, 2014 Filing 702 [Proposed] Final Judgment Against Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. by Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc.. (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 9/18/2014) Modified on 9/18/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2014 Filing 701 STATUS REPORT [JOINT STATUS REPORT] by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 700 ORDER re #699 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Plaintiffs have accepted Defendant Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.'s Offer of Judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 68. See Docket Item No 699. Accordingly, Defendant Defendant Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. shall file a proposed judgment consistent with Plaintiffs' acceptance on or before September 19, 2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/11/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
September 10, 2014 Filing 699 NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. AS TO DEFENDANT TOYOTA MOTOR SALES U.S.A., INC. ONLY (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
June 17, 2014 Filing 698 Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/06/2014, before Judge Davila. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160 Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #696 Transcript Order, #695 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/15/2014. (Related documents(s) #696 , #695 ) (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 697 ORDER granting #329 Motion to Stay; denying without prejudice #255 , #279 , #326 , #329 , #363 , #387 , #389 , #459 , #460 , #462 , #558 Motions to Dismiss, Sever, for Joinder and for Sanctions. This action is STAYED in its entirety pending completion of the trial in Santa Clara County Superior Court Case Number 1-12-CV-217943, or until further order of the court. The clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this file. Plaintiffs and Aetna shall submit a brief Joint Status Report apprising the court of the status of the state court action on 9/15/2014 and continuing every three months thereafter. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/17/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 696 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Dru, Katherine) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 695 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Aetna Life Insurance Company for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 6, 2014 Filing 694 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/6/2014 before Judge Edward J. Davila (Date Filed: 6/6/2014) re #329 MOTION to Stay (replaces Doc. No. 327). The Court took the motion under submission after oral argument. The court to issue further order following hearing. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/6/2014)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 693 ORDER RE: HEARING ON JUNE 6, 2014. The court finds the motions to dismiss and to sever as well as the motion for sanctions and requests for joinder (Docket Item Nos. #255 , #279 , #326 , #363 , #387 , #389 , #459 , #460 , #558 ) each suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b). Accordingly, these motions are SUBMITTED and the June 6th hearing VACATED as to those motions. The only matter on which the court will hear argument at the June 6th hearing is Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Company's Motion to Stay (Docket Item No. 329). Counsel for that matter shall appear accordingly. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/4/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
May 28, 2014 Filing 692 OBJECTIONS to re #687 Opposition/Response to Motion to Stay by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 691 Order Granting #690 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Geoffrey M. Sigler. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 5/22/2014.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
May 22, 2014 Filing 690 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Geoffrey M. Sigler (replacing Doc. No. 689) ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8629842.) Filing fee previously paid on 05/20/2014 filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
May 20, 2014 Filing 689 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Geoffrey M. Sigler ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8629842.) filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
May 16, 2014 Filing 688 RESPONSE (re #329 MOTION to Stay (replaces Doc. No. 327) ) Objection to New Evidence in Decls. of Costco, GlobalFoundries, IV, and STM Defs. filed byBay Area Surgical Group Inc.. (Dru, Katherine) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
May 16, 2014 Filing 687 RESPONSE (re #329 MOTION to Stay (replaces Doc. No. 327) ) Objection to New Arguments in Aetna's Reply in Support of Motion to Stay filed byBay Area Surgical Group Inc.. (Dru, Katherine) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
May 6, 2014 Filing 686 EXHIBITS re #681 Declaration in Support,, #685 Exhibits,, #682 Exhibits,, #683 Exhibits,, Exhibit C filed byCostco Wholesale Corporation, Costco Wholesale Corporation Employee Benefits Plan Program, Ericsson Flexible Benefits Plan, Ericsson Inc., Ericsson Television, Inc., Employee Benefit Package, Ericsson Televison, Inc., Global Foundries U.S., Inc., Globalfoundries U.S., Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC Health and Welfare Plan, STMicroelectronics, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), STMicroelectronics, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefits Plan. (Related document(s) #681 , #685 , #682 , #683 ) (Nowicki, Kevin) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 5, 2014 Filing 685 EXHIBITS re #681 Declaration in Support,, #682 Exhibits,, #683 Exhibits,, Exhibit D filed byCostco Wholesale Corporation, Costco Wholesale Corporation Employee Benefits Plan Program, Ericsson Flexible Benefits Plan, Ericsson Inc., Ericsson Television, Inc., Employee Benefit Package, Ericsson Televison, Inc., Global Foundries U.S., Inc., Globalfoundries U.S., Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC Health and Welfare Plan, STMicroelectronics, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), STMicroelectronics, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefits Plan. (Related document(s) #681 , #682 , #683 ) (Nowicki, Kevin) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 5, 2014 Filing 684 REPLY (re #363 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint with Prejudice; Memorandum in Support of Motion ) filed byFacebook, Inc., Facebook, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Jabil Circuit, Inc., Jabil Circuit, Inc. Health Benefit Plan, Te Connectivity Networks, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc., TE Connectivity Ltd., TE Connectivity Health and Welfare Benefits Plan. (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 5, 2014 Filing 683 EXHIBITS re #681 Declaration in Support,, #682 Exhibits,, Exhibit B filed byCostco Wholesale Corporation, Costco Wholesale Corporation Employee Benefits Plan Program, Ericsson Flexible Benefits Plan, Ericsson Inc., Ericsson Television, Inc., Employee Benefit Package, Ericsson Televison, Inc., Global Foundries U.S., Inc., Globalfoundries U.S., Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC Health and Welfare Plan, STMicroelectronics, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), STMicroelectronics, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefits Plan. (Related document(s) #681 , #682 ) (Nowicki, Kevin) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 5, 2014 Filing 682 EXHIBITS re #681 Declaration in Support,, Exhibit A filed byCostco Wholesale Corporation, Costco Wholesale Corporation Employee Benefits Plan Program, Ericsson Flexible Benefits Plan, Ericsson Inc., Ericsson Television, Inc., Employee Benefit Package, Ericsson Televison, Inc., Global Foundries U.S., Inc., Globalfoundries U.S., Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC Health and Welfare Plan, STMicroelectronics, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), STMicroelectronics, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefits Plan. (Related document(s) #681 ) (Nowicki, Kevin) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 5, 2014 Filing 681 Declaration of James M. Zajac in Support of #680 Declaration in Support, #678 Joinder,, #679 Declaration in Support,, filed byCostco Wholesale Corporation, Costco Wholesale Corporation Employee Benefits Plan Program, Ericsson Flexible Benefits Plan, Ericsson Inc., Ericsson Television, Inc., Employee Benefit Package, Ericsson Televison, Inc., Global Foundries U.S., Inc., Globalfoundries U.S., Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC Health and Welfare Plan, STMicroelectronics, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), STMicroelectronics, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefits Plan. (Related document(s) #680 , #678 , #679 ) (Nowicki, Kevin) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 5, 2014 Filing 680 Declaration of Mary Innes in Support of #678 Joinder,, #679 Declaration in Support,, filed bySTMicroelectronics, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), STMicroelectronics, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefits Plan. (Related document(s) #678 , #679 ) (Nowicki, Kevin) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 5, 2014 Filing 679 Declaration of Nancy Ellington in Support of #678 Joinder,, filed byCostco Wholesale Corporation, Costco Wholesale Corporation Employee Benefits Plan Program, Ericsson Flexible Benefits Plan, Ericsson Inc., Ericsson Television, Inc., Employee Benefit Package, Ericsson Televison, Inc., Global Foundries U.S., Inc., Globalfoundries U.S., Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC Health and Welfare Plan, STMicroelectronics, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), STMicroelectronics, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefits Plan. (Related document(s) #678 ) (Nowicki, Kevin) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 5, 2014 Filing 678 Joinder in Aetna Life Insurance Company's Reply in Support of #389 Motion to Dismiss by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Costco Wholesale Corporation Employee Benefits Plan Program, Ericsson Flexible Benefits Plan, Ericsson Inc., Ericsson Television, Inc., Employee Benefit Package, Global Foundries U.S., Inc., Globalfoundries U.S., Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC Health and Welfare Plan, STMicroelectronics, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), STMicroelectronics, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefits Plan. (Nowicki, Kevin) (Filed on 5/5/2014) Modified on 5/13/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2014 Filing 677 Joinder in Aetna Life Insurance Company's Reply in Support of Motion to Stay by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Costco Wholesale Corporation Employee Benefits Plan Program, Ericsson Flexible Benefits Plan, Ericsson Inc., Ericsson Television, Inc., Employee Benefit Package, Ericsson Televison, Inc., Global Foundries U.S., Inc., Globalfoundries U.S., Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC Health and Welfare Plan, STMicroelectronics, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), STMicroelectronics, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefits Plan. (Nowicki, Kevin) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 5, 2014 Filing 676 NOTICE of Name Change of Firm Name by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Costco Wholesale Corporation Employee Benefits Plan Program, (Nowicki, Kevin) (Filed on 5/5/2014) Modified on 5/13/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2014 Filing 675 REPLY (re #387 MOTION to Sever and Memorandum in Support of Motion ) [Reply in Support of the Moving Defendants' Motion to Sever] filed byFacebook, Inc., Facebook, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Jabil Circuit, Inc., Jabil Circuit, Inc. Health Benefit Plan, Owens Corning, Owens Corning Health Care & Benefits Plan for Active Employees, Te Connectivity Networks, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc., Tyco Electronics Corporation, Tyco Electronics Corporation Health and Welfare Plan. (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 5, 2014 Filing 674 REPLY (re #389 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint ) In Support of Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed byAetna Life Insurance Company. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 5, 2014 Filing 673 REPLY (re #329 MOTION to Stay (replaces Doc. No. 327) ) In Support of Motion To Stay filed byAetna Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 5, 2014 Filing 672 REPLY (re #326 MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Asserted Against Them in the Complaint ) filed byGlaxoSmithKline, Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, VMware Group Health Plan, VMware, Inc., Xilinx Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Xilinx, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Birenbaum, Charles) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 5, 2014 Filing 671 RESPONSE (re #255 MOTION to Dismiss and In the Alternative, Motion to Sever ) filed byBroadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brody, Harold) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 670 ORDER GRANTING #666 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Owens Corning (a Delaware corporation) and Owens Corning Health Care & Benefits Plan for Active Employees ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Owens Corning (a Delaware corporation) and Owens Corning Health Care & Benefits Plan for Active Employees terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/5/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 669 ORDER GRANTING #664 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendants ADP TOTALSOURCE, INC., ADP TOTALSOURCE, INC. HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN; AL-RAZAQ ENTERPRISES GROUP INCORPORATED, AVIDEX INDUSTRIES, L.L.C., AVIDEX INDUSTRIES HEALTH AND WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN, BARRACUDA NETWORKS, INC., BARRACUDA NETWORKS, INC. BENEFIT PLAN, BLUE COAT SYSTEMS, INC., BLUE COST SYSTEMS, INC. FLEXIBLE BENEFIT PLAN, BONHAMS & BUTTERFIELDS AUCTIONEERS CORPORATION, BUTTERFIELDS CONSOLIDATED WELFARE PLAN, BRIDGE CAPITAL HOLDINGS, BRIDGE BA NK, N.A. EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN, CADENCE DESIGN SYSTEMS, INC., CADENCE GROUP LIFE, HEALTH AND DISABILITY PLAN, CANON ANELVA CORP, CEPHEID, CEPHEID CONSOLIDATED WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN, CORDEVALLE, L.P., CORDEVALLE WELFARE BENEFITS PLAN, DELL INC., DELL, INC., c/o NICKI HUSCHKA, SONICWALL, INC. HEALTH & WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN, DURAN & VENEABLES, INC., DYNAMIC DETAILS DESIGN, LLC, DYNAMIC DETAILS, INC. WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN, ECHELON CORPORATION, ECHELON EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN, EMULEX CORPORATION, EMUFLEX THE FLEXIBLE BENEFITS PROGRAM FOR EMULEX EMPLOYEES, EMULEX THE FLEXIBLE BENEFITS PROGRAM FOR EMULEX EMPLOYEES, ENCORE INDUSTRIES, INC., ENCORE INDUSTRIES INC. EMPLOYEES WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN, ERICSSON TELEVISION, INC., ERICSSON TELEVISION, INC. EMPL OYEE BENEFIT PACKAGE, FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY, INC., GCA SERVICES GROUP, INC., GCA SERVICES GROUP HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, HATHAWAY DINWIDDIE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, HATHAWAY DINWIDDIE GROUP MEDICAL AND DENTAL PLAN, HGST, INC., HITACHI GLOBAL STORAGE /TECHNOLOGIES, INC. WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN, INFOTECH ENTERPRISES AMERICA, INC., INFOTECH ENTERPRISES AMERICA, INC. MEDICAL AND DENTAL PLAN, INNOVION CORPORATION, INNOVION CORP HEALTH PLAN, INTEVAC, INC., INTEVAC LIFE AND WELFARE PLAN, K.R. ANDERSON, IN C., K.R. ANDERSON GROUP WELFARE PLAN, LIVEOPS, INC., LIVEOPS, INC. HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, LUMINEX CORPORATION, LVI SERVICES, INC., LVI SERVICES, INC. HEALTH BENEFIT PLAN, MICROSEMI CORPORATION, MICROSEMI GROUP BENEFITS PLAN, NATUS MEDICAL INCORPORA TED, NATUS MEDICAL HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, NDS SURGICAL IMAGING LLC., NDS SURGICAL IMAGING, LLC WELFARE BENEFITS PLAN, OASIS OUTSOURCING HOLDINGS, INC., OASIS OUTSOURCING HOLDINGS, INC. EMPLOYEE WELFARE BENEFITS PLAN, OPTICOMP CORPORATION, PINNACLE BANK, PINNACLE BANK, PARAGON BENEFITS, POLE TO WIN AMERICA, INC., SEMTECH CORP., SEMTECH CORP GROUP MEDICAL AND DENTAL PLAN, SRI INTERNATIONAL, TELENAV, INC., TELENAV HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, TOLT, LLC, TOLT SERVICE GROUP, TOLT TECHNOLOGIES BENEFIT W ELFARE PLAN, VITESSE SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION, WPG AMERICAS, INC, WPG AMERICAS HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, and ZETTA, INC., dba DELAWARE ZETTA filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/5/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 668 ORDER GRANTING #663 Stipulation Regarding Dismissal of Fully-Insured Plans and Claims With Prejudice filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/5/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 667 REPLY (re #279 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6), and Accompanying Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) Defendant First American Financial Corporations and the First American Financial Corporation Group Life, Medical, Dental & Disability Benefits Trusts Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed byFirst American Financial Corporation, First American Financial Corporation Group Disability Benefits Trust. (Baker, James) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 666 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal OF DEFENDANTS OWENS CORNING and OWENS CORNING HEALTH CARE & BENEFITS PLAN FOR ACTIVE EMPLOYEES by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 665 Supplemental Brief re #630 Opposition/Response to Motion, #631 Declaration in Opposition, filed byBay Area Surgical Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #630 , #631 ) (Dru, Katherine) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 664 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE OF ADP TOTALSOURCE, INC., ADP TOTALSOURCE, INC. HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN; AL-RAZAQ ENTERPRISES GROUP INCORPORATED, AVIDEX INDUSTRIES, L.L.C., AVIDEX INDUSTRIES HEALTH AND WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN, BARRACUDA NETWORKS, INC., BARRACUDA NETWORKS, INC. BENEFIT PLAN, BLUE COAT SYSTEMS, INC., BLUE COST SYSTEMS, INC. FLEXIBLE BENEFIT PLAN, BONHAMS & BUTTERFIELDS AUCTIONEERS CORPORATION, BUTTERFIELDS CONSOLIDATED WELFARE PLAN, BRIDGE CAPITAL HOLDINGS, BRIDGE BANK, N.A. EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN, CADENCE DESIGN SYSTEMS, INC., CADENCE GROUP LIFE, HEALTH AND DISABILITY PLAN, CANON ANELVA CORP, CEPHEID, CEPHEID CONSOLIDATED WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN, CORDEVALLE, L.P., CORDEVALLE WELFARE BENEFITS PLAN, DELL INC., DELL, INC., c/o NICKI HUSCHKA, SONICWALL, INC. HEALTH & WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN, DURAN & VENEABLES, INC., DYNAMIC DETAILS DESIGN, LLC, DYNAMIC DETAILS, INC. WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN, ECHELON CORPORATION, ECHELON EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN, EMULEX CORPORATION, EMUFLEX THE FLEXIBLE BENEFITS PROGRAM FOR EMULEX EMPLOYEES, EMULEX THE FLEXIBLE BENEFITS PROGRAM FOR EMULEX EMPLOYEES, ENCORE INDUSTRIES, INC., ENCORE INDUSTRIES INC. EMPLOYEES WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN, ERICSSON TELEVISION, INC., ERICSSON TELEVISION, INC. EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PACKAGE, FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY, INC., GCA SERVICES GROUP, INC., GCA SERVICES GROUP HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, HATHAWAY DINWIDDIE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, HATHAWAY DINWIDDIE GROUP MEDICAL AND DENTAL PLAN, HGST, INC., HITACHI GLOBAL STORAGE/TECHNOLOGIES, INC. WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN, INFOTECH ENTERPRISES AMERICA, INC., INFOTECH ENTERPRISES AMERICA, INC. MEDICAL AND DENTAL PLAN, INNOVION CORPORATION, INNOVION CORP HEALTH PLAN, INTEVAC, INC., INTEVAC LIFE AND WELFARE PLAN, K.R. ANDERSON, INC., K.R. ANDERSON GROUP WELFARE PLAN, LIVEOPS, INC., LIVEOPS, INC. HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, LUMINEX CORPORATION, LVI SERVICES, INC., LVI SERVICES, INC. HEALTH BENEFIT PLAN, MICROSEMI CORPORATION, MICROSEMI GROUP BENEFITS PLAN, NATUS MEDICAL INCORPORATED, NATUS MEDICAL HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, NDS SURGICAL IMAGING LLC., NDS SURGICAL IMAGING, LLC WELFARE BENEFITS PLAN, OASIS OUTSOURCING HOLDINGS, INC., OASIS OUTSOURCING HOLDINGS, INC. EMPLOYEE WELFARE BENEFITS PLAN, OPTICOMP CORPORATION, PINNACLE BANK, PINNACLE BANK, PARAGON BENEFITS, POLE TO WIN AMERICA, INC., SEMTECH CORP., SEMTECH CORP GROUP MEDICAL AND DENTAL PLAN, SRI INTERNATIONAL, TELENAV, INC., TELENAV HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, TOLT, LLC, TOLT SERVICE GROUP, TOLT TECHNOLOGIES BENEFIT WELFARE PLAN, VITESSE SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION, WPG AMERICAS, INC, WPG AMERICAS HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, and ZETTA, INC., dba DELAWARE ZETTA by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 663 STIPULATION Regarding Dismissal of Fully-Insured Plans and Claims With Prejudice filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 662 ORDER GRANTING #661 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to LVI SERVICES, INC. and LVI SERVICES, INC. HEALTH BENEFIT PLAN ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. LVI Services, Inc. (a Delware corporation) and LVI Services, Inc. Health Benefit Plan terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/15/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 14, 2014 Filing 661 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal OF LVI SERVICES, INC. and LVI SERVICES, INC. HEALTH BENEFIT PLAN by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 660 ORDER GRANTING #653 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. as to FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY INC. ONLY. Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. (a California corporation) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/4/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 659 ORDER GRANTING #652 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. AS TO AVIDEX INDUSTRIES, LLC and AVIDEX INDUSTRIES HEALTH AND WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN ONLY. Avidex Industries Health and Welfare Benefit Plan and Avidex Industries, L.L.C. (a Wasington limited liability company) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/4/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 658 ORDER GRANTING #651 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. as to Luminex Corporation ONLY. Luminex Corporation (a Delaware corporation) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/4/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 657 ORDER GRANTING #650 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. as to CEPHEID and CEPHEID CONSOLIDATED WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN ONLY. Cepheid (a California corporation) and Cepheid Consolidated Welfare Benefit Plan terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/3/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 656 ORDER GRANTING #649 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc as to Tolt, LLC (a Delaware Limited Liability Company), Tolt Service Group and Tolt Technologies Benefit Welfare Plan ONLY. Tolt, LLC (a Delaware Limited Liability Company), Tolt Service Group and Tolt Technologies Benefit Welfare Plan terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/3/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
March 28, 2014 Filing 655 Statement Corporate Disclousre Statement of Defendants STMicroelectronics, Inc. and STMicroelectronics, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefits Plan by STMicroelectronics, Inc., STMicroelectronics, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefits Plan. (Nowicki, Kevin) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 Filing 654 Certificate of Interested Entities by STMicroelectronics, Inc., STMicroelectronics, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefits Plan, STMicroelectronics, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent STMicroelectronics, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefits Plan for STMicroelectronics, Inc., STMicroelectronics, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefits Plan. (Nowicki, Kevin) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 Filing 653 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 Filing 652 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants AVIDEX INDUSTRIES, LLC and AVIDEX INDUSTRIES HEALTH AND WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 Filing 651 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant LUMINEX CORPORATION by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 Filing 650 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants CEPHEID and CEPHEID CONSOLIDATED WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 Filing 649 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants TOLT, LLC, TOLT SERVICE GROUP and TOLT TECHNOLOGIES BENEFIT WELFARE PLAN by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 26, 2014 Filing 648 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement by Global Foundries U.S., Inc., Globalfoundries U.S., Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan. (Nowicki, Kevin) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 26, 2014 Filing 647 Certificate of Interested Entities by Global Foundries U.S., Inc., Globalfoundries U.S., Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan identifying Corporate Parent Global Foundries U.S., Inc. for Global Foundries U.S., Inc., Globalfoundries U.S., Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan. (Nowicki, Kevin) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 26, 2014 Filing 646 Certificate of Interested Entities by Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC Health and Welfare Plan identifying Corporate Parent Intellectual Ventures Management LLC for Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC Health and Welfare Plan. (Nowicki, Kevin) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 26, 2014 Filing 645 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement by Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC Health and Welfare Plan. (Nowicki, Kevin) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 26, 2014 Filing 644 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement of Defendants by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Costco Wholesale Corporation Employee Benefits Plan Program. (Nowicki, Kevin) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 26, 2014 Filing 643 Certificate of Interested Entities by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Costco Wholesale Corporation Employee Benefits Plan Program identifying Corporate Parent Costco Wholesale Corporation for Costco Wholesale Corporation, Costco Wholesale Corporation Employee Benefits Plan Program. (Nowicki, Kevin) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 642 RESPONSE (re #255 MOTION to Dismiss and In the Alternative, Motion to Sever, #387 MOTION to Sever and Memorandum in Support of Motion ) CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION filed byBay Area Surgical Group Inc.. (Dru, Katherine) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 641 RESPONSE (re #329 MOTION to Stay (replaces Doc. No. 327) ) AETNA, ET AL. filed byBay Area Surgical Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Dru, Katherine) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 640 RESPONSE (re #389 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint ) AETNA, ET AL. filed byBay Area Surgical Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Dru, Katherine) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 639 RESPONSE (re #326 MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Asserted Against Them in the Complaint ) GLAXOSMITHKLINE, ET AL. filed byBay Area Surgical Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Dru, Katherine) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 638 RESPONSE (re #255 MOTION to Dismiss and In the Alternative, Motion to Sever ) BROADCOM filed byBay Area Surgical Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Dru, Katherine) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 637 RESPONSE (re #363 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint with Prejudice; Memorandum in Support of Motion ) FACEBOOK, ET AL. filed byBay Area Surgical Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Dru, Katherine) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 636 RESPONSE (re #279 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6), and Accompanying Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) FIRST AMERICAN filed byBay Area Surgical Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Dru, Katherine) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 635 Request for Judicial Notice re #634 Reply to Opposition/Response,, Defendant First American Financial Corporation's and the First American Financial Corporation Group Life, Medical, Dental & Disability Benefits Trust's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Reply in Support of Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 filed byFirst American Financial Corporation, First American Financial Corporation Group Disability Benefits Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #634 ) (Baker, James) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 634 REPLY (re #558 MOTION for Sanctions Defendant First American Financial Corporation's and the First American Financial Corporation Group Life, Medical, Dental & Disability Benefits Trust's Notice of Motion, Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P filed by First American Financial Corporation, First American Financial Corporation Group Disability Benefits Trust. (Baker, James) (Filed on 3/24/2014) Modified on 3/25/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2014 Filing 633 Declaration of Greg Lawler in Support of #389 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed byAetna Life Insurance Company. (Related document(s) #389 ) (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 18, 2014 Filing 632 Statement re #431 Statement Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by URS Corporation, URS Corporation Welfare Benefits Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 17, 2014 Filing 631 DECLARATION of KATHERINE M. DRU in Opposition to #558 MOTION for Sanctions Defendant First American Financial Corporation's and the First American Financial Corporation Group Life, Medical, Dental & Disability Benefits Trust's Notice of Motion, Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P filed byBay Area Surgical Group Inc.. (Related document(s) #558 ) (Dru, Katherine) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 17, 2014 Filing 630 RESPONSE (re #558 MOTION for Sanctions Defendant First American Financial Corporation's and the First American Financial Corporation Group Life, Medical, Dental & Disability Benefits Trust's Notice of Motion, Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P ) OPPOSITION filed byBay Area Surgical Group Inc.. (Dru, Katherine) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 629 ORDER GRANTING #626 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to DYNAMIC DETAILS, INC. WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Dynamic Details, Inc., Welfare Benefit Plan terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/13/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 628 ORDER GRANTING #622 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Ericsson Television, Inc., Employee Benefit Package and Ericsson Televison, Inc. ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Ericsson Television, Inc., Employee Benefit Package and Ericsson Televison, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/13/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 13, 2014 Filing 627 Declaration of Lisa Adinolfi in Support of #389 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [389-2] filed byAetna Life Insurance Company. (Related document(s) #389 ) (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 626 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant DYNAMIC DETAILS, INC. WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 625 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant HATHAWAY DINWIDDIE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/10/2014) Modified text on 3/13/2014: Defendant previously terminated on 02/20/2014 see #547 ORDER (ecg, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2014 Filing 624 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant HITACHI GLOBAL STORAGE TECHNOLOGIES, INC. WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/10/2014) Modified text on 3/13/2014: Defendant previously terminated on 03/06/2014see #593 ORDER (ecg, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2014 Filing 623 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant OASIS OUTSOURCING INC. EMPLOYEE WELFARE BENEFITS PLAN by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/10/2014) Modified text on 3/13/2014: Defendant previously terminated on 03/06/2014 see #608 ORDER (ecg, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2014 Filing 622 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants ERICSSON TELEVISION, INC. and ERICSSON TELEVISION, INC., EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PACKAGE by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 621 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant EMUFLEX - THE FLEXIBLE BENEFITS PROGRAM FOR EMULEX EMPLOYEES by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/10/2014) Modified text on 3/13/2014: Defendant previously terminated on 02/20/2014 see #605 ORDER (ecg, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2014 Filing 620 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 619 Certificate of Interested Entities by Aetna Life Insurance Company (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 618 ORDER GRANTING #574 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to ERICSSON, INC., dba EUS INC. and ERICSSON FLEXIBLE BENEFITS PLAN ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Ericsson Flexible Benefits Plan and Ericsson Inc. (a Delaware corporation) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 617 ORDER GRANTING #588 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to BRIDGE CAPITAL HOLDINGS and BRIDGE BANK, N.A. EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Bridge Capital Holdings (a California corporation), Aetna Life Insurance Company and Bridge Bank, N.A. Employee Benefit Plan terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 616 ORDER GRANTING #587 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to ADP Totalsource, Inc. (a Florida corporation) and ADP Totalsource, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. ADP Totalsource, Inc. (a Florida corporation) and ADP Totalsource, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 615 ORDER GRANTING #586 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to BARRACUDA NETWORKS, INC. and BARRACUDA NETWORKS, INC. BENEFIT PLAN ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Barracuda Networks, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) and Barracuda Networks, Inc. Benefit Plan terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 614 ORDER GRANTING #585 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to BLUE COATSYSTEMS, INC. and BLUE COAT SYSTEMS, INC. FLEXIBLE BENEFIT PLAN ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Blue Coat Systems, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) and Blue Coat Systems, Inc. Flexible Benefit Plan terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 613 ORDER GRANTING #584 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to BONHAMS & BUTTERFIELDS AUCTIONEERS CORPORATION and BUTTERFIELDS CONSOLIDATED WELFARE PLAN filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Bonhams & Butterfields Auctioneers Corporation and Butterfields Consolidated Welfare Plan terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 612 ORDER GRANTING #583 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to ECHELON CORPORATION and ECHELON EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Echelon Corporation (a Delaware corporation) and Echelon Employee Benefit Plan terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 611 ORDER GRANTING #582 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to INFOTECH ENTERPRISES AMERICA, INC. and INFOTECH ENTERPRISES AMERICA, INC. MEDICAL AND DENTAL PLAN ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Infotech Enterprises America, Inc. (a California corporation) and Infotech Enterprises America, Inc. Medical and Dental Plan terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ORDER GRANTING #581 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to K.R. Anderson Group Welfare Plan and K.R. Anderson, Inc. ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. K.R. Anderson Group Welfare Plan and K.R. Anderson, Inc. (a California corporation) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 609 ORDER GRANTING #580 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Liveops, Inc and Liveops, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Liveops, Inc. (a Delware corporation) and Liveops, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 608 ORDER GRANTING #579 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to OASIS OUTSOURCING HOLDINGS, INC. and OASIS OUTSOURCING HOLDINGS, INC. EMPLOYEE WELFARE BENEFITS PLAN ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Oasis Outsourcing Holdings, Inc. (a Florida corporation) and Oasis Outsourcing Holdings, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefits Plan terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 607 ORDER GRANTING #578 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Opticomp Corporation ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Opticomp Corporation (a California corporation) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 606 ORDER GRANTING #577 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to SEMTECH CORP. and SEMTECH CORP GROUP MEDICAL AND DENTAL PLAN ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Semtech Corp Group Medical and Dental Plan and Semtech Corp. (a Delaware corporation) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 605 ORDER GRANTING #576 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to EMULEX CORPORATION and EMULEX THE FLEXIBLE BENEFITS PROGRAM FOR EMULEX EMPLOYEES ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Emulex - The Flexible Benefits Program for Emulex Employees and Emulex Corporation (a California corporation) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014) Modified text on 3/13/2014 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 604 *** DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY *** ORDER GRANTING #575 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to TELENAV, INC. and TELENAV HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. TeleNav Health and Welfare Plan and TeleNav, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014) Modified on 3/6/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 603 ORDER GRANTING #575 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to TELENAV, INC. and TELENAV HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Ericsson Flexible Benefits Plan and Ericsson Inc. (a Delaware corporation) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014) Modified on 3/6/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/6/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 602 ORDER GRANTING #573 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to CORDEVALLE, L.P. and CORDEVALLE WELFARE BENEFITS PLAN ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Cordevalle Welfare Benefits Plan and Cordevalle, L.P. (a California limited partnership) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 601 ORDER GRANTING #572 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Duran & Venables, Inc. ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Duran & Veneables, Inc. (a California corporation) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 600 ORDER GRANTING #571 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to GCA SERVICES GROUP, INC. and GCA SERVICES GROUP HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. GCA Services Group Health and Welfare Plan and GCA Services Group, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 599 ORDER GRANTING #570 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to INTEVAC, INC. and INTEVAC LIFE AND WELFARE PLAN ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Intevac Life and Welfare Plan and Intevac, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 598 ORDER GRANTING #569 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to NDS Surgical Imaging LLC nd NDS Surgical Imaging, LLC Welfare Benefits Plan ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc., NDS Surgical Imaging LLC (a Delaware limited liability company) and NDS Surgical Imaging, LLC Welfare Benefits Plan terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 597 ORDER GRANTING #568 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to DELL INC., DELL, INC., c/o NICKI HUSCHKA and SONICWALL, INC. HEALTH & WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Sonicwall, Inc. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Dell Inc. (a Delaware corporation) and Dell, Inc., c/o Nicki Huschka terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 596 ORDER GRANTING #567 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to SRI International ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. SRI International (a California corporation) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ORDER GRANTING #566 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Zetta, Inc., dba Delaware Zetta ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Zetta, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 594 ORDER GRANTING #565 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to WPG Americas, Inc. and WPG Americas Health and Welfare Plan ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. WPG Americas Health and Welfare Plan and WPG Americas, Inc. (a California corporation) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 593 ORDER GRANTING #564 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to HGST, Inc. and Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. HGST, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) and Hitachi Global Storage/Technologies, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 592 ORDER GRANTING #563 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Natus Medical Incorporated and Natus Medical Health And Welfare Plan ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Natus Medical Incorporated (a Delaware corporation) and Naus Medical Health and Welfare Plan terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 591 ORDER GRANTING #562 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Cadence Design Systems, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) and Cadence Group Life, Health and Disability Plan ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Cadence Design Systems, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) and Cadence Group Life, Health and Disability Plan terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 590 ORDER GRANTING #561 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Al-Razaq Enerprises Group Incorporated ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Al-Razaq Enerprises Group Incorporated (a Texas corporation) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 589 ORDER GRANTING #560 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Microsemi Corporation and Microsemi Group Benefits Plan ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Microsemi Corporation (a Delaware corporation) and Microsemi Group Benefits Plan terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/6/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 588 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants BRIDGE CAPITAL HOLDINGS and BRIDGE BANK, N.A. EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 587 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants ADP TOTALSOURCE, INC. and ADP TOTALSOURCE, INC. HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 586 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants BARRACUDA NETWORKS, INC. and BARRACUDA NETWORKS, INC. BENEFIT PLAN by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 585 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants BLUE COAT SYSTEMS, INC. and BLUE COAT SYSTEMS, INC. FLEXIBLE BENEFIT PLAN by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 584 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants BONHAMS & BUTTERFIELDS AUCTIONEERS CORPORATION and BUTTERFIELDS CONSOLIDATED WELFARE PLAN by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 583 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants ECHELON CORPORATION and ECHELON EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 582 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants INFOTECH ENTERPRISES AMERICA, INC. and INFOTECH ENTERPRISES AMERICA, INC. MEDICAL AND DENTAL PLAN by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 581 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants K.R. ANDERSON, INC. and K.R. ANDERSON GROUP WELFARE PLAN by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 580 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants LIVEOPS, INC. and LIVEOPS, INC. HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 579 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants OASIS OUTSOURCING HOLDINGS, INC. and OASIS OUTSOURCING HOLDINGS, INC. EMPLOYEE WELFARE BENEFITS PLAN by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 578 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Opticomp Corporation by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 577 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants SEMTECH CORP. and SEMTECH CORP GROUP MEDICAL AND DENTAL PLAN by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 576 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants EMULEX CORPORATION and EMULEX THE FLEXIBLE BENEFITS PROGRAM FOR EMULEX EMPLOYEES by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 575 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants TELENAV, INC. and TELENAV HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 574 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants ERICSSON, INC., dba EUS INC. and ERICSSON FLEXIBLE BENEFITS PLAN by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 573 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants CORDEVALLE, L.P. and CORDEVALLE WELFARE BENEFITS PLAN by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 572 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Duran & Venables, Inc. by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 571 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants GCA SERVICES GROUP, INC. and GCA SERVICES GROUP HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 570 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants INTEVAC, INC. and INTEVAC LIFE AND WELFARE PLAN by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 569 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants NDS SURGICAL IMAGING, LLC and NDS SURGICAL IMAGING, LLC WELFARE BENEFITS PLAN by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 568 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants DELL INC., DELL, INC., c/o NICKI HUSCHKA and SONICWALL, INC. HEALTH & WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 567 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant SRI International by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 566 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Zetta, Inc., dba Delaware Zetta by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 565 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants WPG Americas, Inc. and WPG Americas Health and Welfare Plan by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 564 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants HGST, Inc. and Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 563 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Natus Medical Incorporated and Natus Medical Health And Welfare Plan by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 562 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Cadence Design Systems, Inc. and Cadence Group Life, Health And Disability Plan by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 561 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Al-Razaq Enterprises Group Incorporated by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 560 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Microsemi Corporation and Microsemi Group Benefits Plan by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 3, 2014 Filing 559 Declaration of James P. Baker in Support of #558 MOTION for Sanctions Defendant First American Financial Corporation's and the First American Financial Corporation Group Life, Medical, Dental & Disability Benefits Trust's Notice of Motion, Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P filed byFirst American Financial Corporation, First American Financial Corporation Group Disability Benefits Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #558 ) (Baker, James) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
March 3, 2014 Filing 558 MOTION for Sanctions Defendant First American Financial Corporation's and the First American Financial Corporation Group Life, Medical, Dental & Disability Benefits Trust's Notice of Motion, Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11, and Accompanying Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by First American Financial Corporation, First American Financial Corporation Group Disability Benefits Trust. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 3/17/2014. Replies due by 3/24/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baker, James) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
March 3, 2014 Filing 557 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Tutor Perini Corporation, Tutor Perini Corporation Health and Welfare Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
March 3, 2014 Filing 556 Certificate of Interested Entities by Tutor Perini Corporation, Tutor Perini Corporation Health and Welfare Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 555 ORDER GRANTING #554 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan and Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan and Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/28/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 554 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. and Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 553 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 71. by Tesoro Corporation, Tesoro Corporation Omnibus Group Welfare Benefits Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 552 Certificate of Interested Entities by Tesoro Corporation, Tesoro Corporation Omnibus Group Welfare Benefits Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 551 Order Granting #548 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James P. Flynn for Panasonic Corporation of North America. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 2/21/2014.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 550 Order Granting #535 Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule and Continue Case Management Conference. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 2/20/2014.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 549 Order Granting #517 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Filing ADR Certification and Stipulation to ADR Process. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 2/20/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 20, 2014 Filing 548 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application of James P. Flynn (Epstein Becer & Green, PC) ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8391521.) filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Panasonic Corporation of North America. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 547 ORDER GRANTING #542 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants Hathaway Dinwiddie Group and Hathaway Dinwiddie Group Medical and Dental Plan filed by SOAR Surgery Center, LLC, Forest Ambulatory Surgical Associates, LP, Los Altos Surgery Center, LP, Bay Area Surgical Group Inc., National Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC, Knowles Surgery Center, LLC. ***Hathaway Dinwiddie Construction Compay (a California corporation) and Hathaway Dinwiddie Group Medical and Dental Plan terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/20/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 19, 2014 Filing 546 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by L-3 Communications Corporation, L-3 Communications Funded Grou Healh and Welfare Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 19, 2014 Filing 545 Certificate of Interested Entities by L-3 Communications Corporation, L-3 Communications Funded Grou Healh and Welfare Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 19, 2014 Filing 544 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Corvel Corporation, Corvel Corporation Welfare Benefits Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 19, 2014 Filing 543 Certificate of Interested Entities by Corvel Corporation, Corvel Corporation Welfare Benefits Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 19, 2014 Filing 542 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Hathaway Dinwiddie Group and Hathaway Dinwiddie Group Medical and Dental Plan by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc., Forest Ambulatory Surgical Associates, LP, Knowles Surgery Center, LLC, Los Altos Surgery Center, LP, National Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC, SOAR Surgery Center, LLC (Dru, Katherine) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 19, 2014 Filing 541 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Securitas Security Services USA, Inc., Securitas Security Services USA, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 19, 2014 Filing 540 Certificate of Interested Entities by Securitas Security Services USA, Inc., Securitas Security Services USA, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 19, 2014 Filing 539 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Harsco Corporation, Harsco Corporation Insurance Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 19, 2014 Filing 538 Certificate of Interested Entities by Harsco Corporation, Harsco Corporation Insurance Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 19, 2014 Filing 537 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation Welfare Plan re #536 Joinder (Spencer, Michael) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 19, 2014 Filing 536 Joinder re #363 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint with Prejudice; Memorandum in Support of Motion by Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation Welfare Plan. (Spencer, Michael) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 18, 2014 Filing 535 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (L.R. 7.2) filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dru, Katherine) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 18, 2014 Filing 534 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 (filed on behalf of Zephyr Photonics Inc., Successor To Opticomp Corp.) by Opticomp Corporation. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 18, 2014 Filing 533 Certificate of Interested Entities by Opticomp Corporation filed on beahlf of Zephy Photonics Inc., Successor To Opticomp Corp. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 18, 2014 Filing 532 NOTICE of Joinder by Opticomp Corporation re #389 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, #329 MOTION to Stay filed on behalf of Zephyr Photonics Inc., Successor To Opticomp Corp. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/18/2014) Modified on 2/18/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2014 Filing 531 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Intevac Life and Welfare Plan, Intevac, Inc.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 18, 2014 Filing 530 Certificate of Interested Entities by Intevac Life and Welfare Plan, Intevac, Inc. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 18, 2014 Filing 529 Joinder re #389 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, #329 MOTION to Stay by PVH Corp., PVH Corp. & Subsidiaries Health & Welfare Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/18/2014) Modified on 2/18/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 528 ORDER GRANTING #503 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. AS TO Graebel Companies, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) and Graebel Companies, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan ONLY. Graebel Companies, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) and Graebel Companies, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/18/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 527 Order Granting #254 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Michael Spencer for Broadcom Corporation and the Broadcom Corporation Welfare Plan. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 2/18/2014.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 526 Order Granting #253 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Howard Shaprio for Broadcom Corporation and the Broadcom Corporation Welfare Plan. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 2/18/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 525 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by First American Financial Corporation, First American Financial Corporation Group Disability Benefits Trust re #302 Certificate of Interested Entities, #331 Statement, #285 Declaration in Support, #292 Request for Judicial Notice, #279 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6), and Accompanying Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #295 Declaration in Support, (Baker, James) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 524 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Tolt Service Group, Tolt Technologies Benefit Welfare Plan, Tolt, LLC. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 523 Certificate of Interested Entities by Tolt Service Group, Tolt Technologies Benefit Welfare Plan, Tolt, LLC (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 522 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Altera Corporation, Altera Corporation Health, Life and Disability Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 521 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Fidelity National Financial, Inc., Fidelity National Financial, Inc. Welfare Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 520 Certificate of Interested Entities by Fidelity National Financial, Inc., Fidelity National Financial, Inc. Welfare Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 519 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule 7.1 by Altera Corporation, Altera Corporation Health, Life and Disability Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 518 Certificate of Interested Entities by Altera Corporation, Altera Corporation Health, Life and Disability Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 517 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Deadline For Filing ADR Certification and Stipulation To ADR Process filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation To Extend Deadline, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 13, 2014 Filing 516 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Software AG USA, Inc., Software AG USA, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 13, 2014 Filing 515 Certificate of Interested Entities by Software AG USA, Inc., Software AG USA, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 13, 2014 Filing 514 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Liveops, Inc., Liveops, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 13, 2014 Filing 513 Certificate of Interested Entities by Liveops, Inc., Liveops, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 13, 2014 Filing 512 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Paychex, Inc., Paychex, Inc., Employee Health Benefits Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 13, 2014 Filing 511 Certificate of Interested Entities by Paychex, Inc., Paychex, Inc., Employee Health Benefits Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER GRANTING #499 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. as to VMware, Inc. Flexible Spending Account Plan ONLY. *** VMware, Inc. Flexible Spending Account Plan terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/12/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 509 ORDER re #498 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. as to Pinnacle Bank and Pinnacle Bank, a California corporation (a California corporation) ONLY. ***Pinnacle Bank and Pinnacle Bank, a California corporation (a California corporation) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/12/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER GRANT #497 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. as to Pole to Win America, Inc. ONLY (a California corporation). ***Pole to Win America, Inc. (a California corporation) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/12/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
February 12, 2014 Filing 507 Certificate of Interested Entities by HGST, Inc., Hitachi Global Storage/Technologies, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan (Replaces Doc. 323) (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
February 12, 2014 Filing 506 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 (Replaces Doc. 310 and Doc 505) by Cox Enterprises, Inc., Cox Enterprises, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
February 12, 2014 Filing 505 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 (Replaces Doc. 310) by Cox Enterprises, Inc., Cox Enterprises, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
February 12, 2014 Filing 504 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aetna Life Insurance Company re #330 Declaration in Support,,, #389 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, #329 MOTION to Stay (replaces Doc. No. 327) (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
February 12, 2014 Filing 503 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Graebel Companies, Inc. and Graebel Companies, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
February 12, 2014 Filing 502 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by WPP Group Holdings Corp., WPP Group USA, Inc. Benefis Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
February 12, 2014 Filing 501 Certificate of Interested Entities by WPP Group Holdings Corp., WPP Group USA, Inc. Benefis Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 500 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GlaxoSmithKline, Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, VMware Group Health Plan, VMware, Inc., Xilinx Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Xilinx, Inc. re #333 Declaration in Support, #326 MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Asserted Against Them in the Complaint, #339 Declaration in Support,, #332 Declaration in Support, (Birenbaum, Charles) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 499 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Vmware, Inc. Flexible Spending Account Plan by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 498 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Pinnacle Bank, a California corporation and Pinnacle Bank by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 497 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Pole to Win America, Inc. by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 496 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Infineon Technologies North America Corp., Infineon Technologies Welfare Benefit Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 495 Certificate of Interested Entities by Infineon Technologies North America Corp., Infineon Technologies Welfare Benefit Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 494 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Hyatt Corporation, Hyatt Corporation Welfare Benefit Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 493 Certificate of Interested Entities by Hyatt Corporation, Hyatt Corporation Welfare Benefit Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 492 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by K.R. Anderson Group Welfare Plan, K.R. Anderson, Inc.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 491 Certificate of Interested Entities by K.R. Anderson Group Welfare Plan, K.R. Anderson, Inc. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 490 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 (Replaces Doc. No. 479) by Align Technology, Inc., Align Technology, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 489 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by SPX Corporation, SPX Corporation Comprehensive Medical Care Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 488 Certificate of Interested Entities by SPX Corporation, SPX Corporation Comprehensive Medical Care Plan (Replaces Doc. No. 487) (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 487 Certificate of Interested Entities by SPX Corporation, SPX Corporation Comprehensive Medical Care Plan, SRI International (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 486 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by IHS Employee Benefit Plan, IHS, Inc.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 485 Certificate of Interested Entities by IHS Employee Benefit Plan, IHS, Inc. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 484 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Louis DiMaria, c/o UBS Financial Services, Inc., UBS Financial Services, Inc., UBS Financial Services, Inc. Group Health and Welfare Benefits Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 483 Certificate of Interested Entities by Louis DiMaria, c/o UBS Financial Services, Inc., UBS Financial Services, Inc., UBS Financial Services, Inc. Group Health and Welfare Benefits Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 482 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 (Replaces Doc. No. 471) by PVH Corp., PVH Corp. & Subsidiaries Health & Welfare Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 481 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by TIN Inc., Temple-Inland Health & Welfare Benefits Wrap Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 480 Certificate of Interested Entities by TIN Inc., Temple-Inland Health & Welfare Benefits Wrap Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 479 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Align Technology, Inc., Align Technology, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 478 Certificate of Interested Entities by Align Technology, Inc., Align Technology, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 477 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Applied Materials, Inc., Applied Materials, Inc. Welfare Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 476 Certificate of Interested Entities by Applied Materials, Inc., Applied Materials, Inc. Welfare Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 475 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Science Applications International Corp., Science Applications International Corporation Welfare Benefits Trust. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 474 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Rehon, Peter) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 473 Certificate of Interested Entities by Pinnacle Bank identifying Corporate Parent Pinnacle Bank for Pinnacle Bank. (Rehon, Peter) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 472 Certificate of Interested Entities by Science Applications International Corp., Science Applications International Corporation Welfare Benefits Trust (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 471 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by PVH Corp., PVH Corp. & Subsidiaries Health & Welfare Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 470 Certificate of Interested Entities by PVH Corp., PVH Corp. & Subsidiaries Health & Welfare Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 469 Statement of Disclosure Pursuant to Federal Rule 7.1 by Pinnacle Bank. (Rehon, Peter) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 468 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by The Kleinfelder Group, Inc., The Kleinfelder Group, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 467 Certificate of Interested Entities by The Kleinfelder Group, Inc., The Kleinfelder Group, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 466 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Automatic Data Processing Insurance Agency, Inc., Automatic Data Processing, Inc. Flex 2000 Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 465 Certificate of Interested Entities by Automatic Data Processing Insurance Agency, Inc., Automatic Data Processing, Inc. Flex 2000 Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 464 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 (replaces Doc. No. 259) by ADP Totalsource, Inc., ADP Totalsource, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 463 Certificate of Interested Entities by ADP Totalsource, Inc., ADP Totalsource, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan (Replaces Doc. No. 258) (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 462 MOTION for Joinder In Consolidated AETNA Defendants' Motion To Dismiss and Motion To Stay filed by Harsco Corporation, Harsco Corporation Insurance Plan. Defendants Harsco Corporation and Harsco Corporation Insurance Plan hereby join the Consolidated Aetna Defendants' motion to stay [DKT Nos. #329 ] and motion to dismiss [DKT Nos. #389 for the reasons stated therein. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/11/2014) Modified text on 2/12/2014 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2014 Filing 461 Joinder re #329 re #389 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Pinnacle Bank. (Rehon, Peter) (Filed on 2/11/2014) Modified on 2/11/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2014 Filing 460 MOTION for Joinder re #329 filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Costco Wholesale Corporation Employee Benefits Plan Program, Ericsson Flexible Benefits Plan, Ericsson Inc., Ericsson Television, Inc., Employee Benefit Package, Ericsson Televison, Inc., Global Foundries U.S., Inc., Globalfoundries U.S., Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC Health and Welfare Plan, STMicroelectronics, Inc., STMicroelectronics, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefits Plan. (Nowicki, Kevin) (Filed on 2/11/2014) Modified on 2/11/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2014 Filing 459 MOTION for Joinder re #389 filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Costco Wholesale Corporation Employee Benefits Plan Program, Ericsson Inc., Ericsson Television, Inc., Employee Benefit Package, Ericsson Televison, Inc., Global Foundries U.S., Inc., Globalfoundries U.S., Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC Health and Welfare Plan, STMicroelectronics, Inc., STMicroelectronics, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefits Plan. (Nowicki, Kevin) (Filed on 2/11/2014) Modified on 2/11/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2014 Filing 458 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Encore Industries, Inc. and Encore Industries, Inc. Employees Welfare Benefit Plan by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 457 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Farmers Insurance Company, Inc.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 456 Certificate of Interested Entities by Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 455 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Dell Inc., Dell, Inc., c/o Nicki Huschka. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 454 Certificate of Interested Entities by Dell Inc., Dell, Inc., c/o Nicki Huschka (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 453 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Cognizant Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 452 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cognizant Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 451 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Bank of America Corpoation Corporate Benefits Committee, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Group Benefits Program. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 450 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bank of America Corpoation Corporate Benefits Committee, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Group Benefits Program (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 449 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Boehringer Ingelheim Fremont, Inc.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 448 Certificate of Interested Entities by Boehringer Ingelheim Fremont, Inc. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 447 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Bausch & Lomb Comprehensive Medical Plan, Bausch & Lomb Incorporated. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 446 Certificate of Interested Entities by Administrative Committee SPX Corporation, Bausch & Lomb Comprehensive Medical Plan, Bausch & Lomb Incorporated (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 445 Certificate of Interested Entities by Amgen, Inc., Amgen, Inc. Master Benefits Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 444 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Amgen, Inc., Amgen, Inc. Master Benefits Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 443 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Zetta, Inc.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 442 Certificate of Interested Entities by Zetta, Inc. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 441 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Yahoo Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Yahoo!, Inc. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 440 Certificate of Interested Entities by Yahoo Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Yahoo!, Inc (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 439 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Wycliffe Bible Translators, Inc., Wycliffe Bible Translators, Inc. Medical Health Plan HMO. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 438 Certificate of Interested Entities by Wycliffe Bible Translators, Inc., Wycliffe Bible Translators, Inc. Medical Health Plan HMO (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 437 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by WPG Americas Health and Welfare Plan, WPG Americas, Inc.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 436 Certificate of Interested Entities by WPG Americas Health and Welfare Plan, WPG Americas, Inc. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 435 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by VWR International, LLC, VWR International, LLC Welfare Benefit Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 434 Certificate of Interested Entities by VWR International, LLC, VWR International, LLC Welfare Benefit Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 433 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Vishay Intertechnology, Inc., Vishay Intertechnology, Inc. Welfare Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 432 Certificate of Interested Entities by Vishay Intertechnology, Inc., Vishay Intertechnology, Inc. Welfare Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 431 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by URS Corporation, URS Corporation Welfare Benefits Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 430 Certificate of Interested Entities by URS Corporation, URS Corporation Welfare Benefits Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 429 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by UPS Flexible Benefits Plan, United Parcel of America, Inc.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 428 Certificate of Interested Entities by UPS Flexible Benefits Plan, United Parcel of America, Inc. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 427 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Unisource Worldwide, Inc.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 426 Certificate of Interested Entities by Unisource Worldwide, Inc. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 425 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Tween Brands, Inc., Tween Brands, Inc. Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 424 Certificate of Interested Entities by Tween Brands, Inc., Tween Brands, Inc. Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 423 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Toys 'R' US-Delaware, Inc., Toys 'R' Us Employee Benefit Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 422 Certificate of Interested Entities by Toys 'R' US-Delaware, Inc., Toys 'R' Us Employee Benefit Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 421 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by The Western Union Company, The Western Union Company Health and Welfare Benefit Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 420 Certificate of Interested Entities by The Western Union Company, The Western Union Company Health and Welfare Benefit Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 419 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by TeleNav Health and Welfare Plan, TeleNav, Inc.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 418 Certificate of Interested Entities by TeleNav Health and Welfare Plan, TeleNav, Inc. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 417 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Symantec Corporation, Symantec Corporation Group Welfare Benefit Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 416 Certificate of Interested Entities by Symantec Corporation, Symantec Corporation Group Welfare Benefit Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 415 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Sybase, Inc., Sybase, Inc. Group Welfare Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 414 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sybase, Inc., Sybase, Inc. Group Welfare Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 413 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Sumsotal Systems Group Health & Welfare Plan, Sumtotal Systems, Inc.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 412 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sumsotal Systems Group Health & Welfare Plan, Sumtotal Systems, Inc. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 411 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Stantec Consulting Services, Inc., Stantec Health Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 410 Certificate of Interested Entities by Stantec Consulting Services, Inc., Stantec Health Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 409 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by SRI International. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 408 Certificate of Interested Entities by SRI International (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 407 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Semtech Corp Group Medical and Dental Plan, Semtech Corp.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 406 Certificate of Interested Entities by Semtech Corp Group Medical and Dental Plan, Semtech Corp. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 405 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by SAP America, Inc., Sap America Health & Welfare Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 404 Certificate of Interested Entities by SAP America, Inc., Sap America Health & Welfare Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 403 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Sanmina Corporation, Sanmina Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 402 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sanmina Corporation, Sanmina Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 401 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Salesforce.com Health and Welfare Plan, Salesforce.com, Inc.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 400 Certificate of Interested Entities by Salesforce.com Health and Welfare Plan, Salesforce.com, Inc. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 399 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Renesas Electronic America Inc. Benefit Plan, Renesas Electronics America, Inc.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 398 Certificate of Interested Entities by Renesas Electronic America Inc. Benefit Plan, Renesas Electronics America, Inc. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 397 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Reliance Steel & Aluminum Co., Reliance Steel & Aluminum Co., Life, Accidental Death & Dismemberment Health Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 396 Certificate of Interested Entities by Reliance Steel & Aluminum Co., Reliance Steel & Aluminum Co., Life, Accidental Death & Dismemberment Health Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 395 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Praxair Medical Plan, Praxair, Inc.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 394 Certificate of Interested Entities by Praxair Medical Plan, Praxair, Inc. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 393 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Plexus Corp.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 392 Certificate of Interested Entities by Plexus Corp. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 391 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Pioneer North America, Inc., Pioneer North America, Inc. Group Life, Health Disability Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 390 Certificate of Interested Entities by Pioneer North America, Inc., Pioneer North America, Inc. Group Life, Health Disability Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 389 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Aetna Life Insurance Company, and ERISA Plan Defendants listed in exhibit A - Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 2/24/2014. Replies due by 3/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Lisa Adinolfi, #3 Exhibit Ex. B, #4 Exhibit Ex. C, #5 Exhibit Ex. D, #6 Proposed Order)(Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014) Modified on 2/11/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2014 Filing 388 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Facebook, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Jabil Circuit, Inc., Jabil Circuit, Inc. Health Benefit Plan, Owens Corning, Owens Corning Health Care & Benefits Plan for Active Employees, Te Connectivity Networks, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc., Tyco Electronics Corporation, Tyco Electronics Corporation Health and Welfare Plan re #363 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint with Prejudice; Memorandum in Support of Motion, #376 Declaration in Support,, #384 Declaration in Support,, #373 Declaration in Support,, #380 Declaration in Support,, #387 MOTION to Sever and Memorandum in Support of Motion, #368 Declaration in Support,, (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 387 MOTION to Sever and Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Facebook, Inc., Facebook, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Jabil Circuit, Inc., Jabil Circuit, Inc. Health Benefit Plan, Owens Corning, Owens Corning Health Care & Benefits Plan for Active Employees, Te Connectivity Networks, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc., Tyco Electronics Corporation, Tyco Electronics Corporation Health and Welfare Plan. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 2/24/2014. Replies due by 3/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Sever)(Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 386 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Panasonic Corporation of North America, Panasonic Group Comprehensive Medical and Dental Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 385 Certificate of Interested Entities by Panasonic Corporation of North America, Panasonic Group Comprehensive Medical and Dental Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 384 Declaration of Matt Gonzales in Support of #363 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint with Prejudice; Memorandum in Support of Motion filed byFacebook, Inc., Facebook, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Jabil Circuit, Inc., Jabil Circuit, Inc. Health Benefit Plan, Owens Corning, Owens Corning Health Care & Benefits Plan for Active Employees, Te Connectivity Networks, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc., Tyco Electronics Corporation, Tyco Electronics Corporation Health and Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #363 ) (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 383 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Omron Management Center of America, Inc., Omron Management Center of America, Inc. Employee Welfare Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 382 Certificate of Interested Entities by Omron Management Center of America, Inc., Omron Management Center of America, Inc. Employee Welfare Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 381 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Oasis Outsourcing Holdings, Inc., Oasis Outsourcing Holdings, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefits Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 380 Declaration of Mark Snyder in Support of #363 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint with Prejudice; Memorandum in Support of Motion filed byFacebook, Inc., Facebook, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Jabil Circuit, Inc., Jabil Circuit, Inc. Health Benefit Plan, Owens Corning, Owens Corning Health Care & Benefits Plan for Active Employees, Te Connectivity Networks, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc., Tyco Electronics Corporation, Tyco Electronics Corporation Health and Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #363 ) (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 379 Certificate of Interested Entities by Oasis Outsourcing Holdings, Inc., Oasis Outsourcing Holdings, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefits Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 378 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Northwestern Polytechnic Univeristy. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 377 Certificate of Interested Entities by Northwestern Polytechnic Univeristy (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 376 Declaration of Cathy TenEyck in Support of #363 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint with Prejudice; Memorandum in Support of Motion filed byFacebook, Inc., Facebook, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Jabil Circuit, Inc., Jabil Circuit, Inc. Health Benefit Plan, Owens Corning, Owens Corning Health Care & Benefits Plan for Active Employees, Te Connectivity Networks, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc., Tyco Electronics Corporation, Tyco Electronics Corporation Health and Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1, Part 2, #3 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #363 ) (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 375 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by NDS Surgical Imaging LLC, NDS Surgical Imaging, LLC Welfare Benefits Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 374 Certificate of Interested Entities by NDS Surgical Imaging LLC, NDS Surgical Imaging, LLC Welfare Benefits Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 373 Declaration of Daniel Bishop in Support of #363 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint with Prejudice; Memorandum in Support of Motion filed byFacebook, Inc., Facebook, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Jabil Circuit, Inc., Jabil Circuit, Inc. Health Benefit Plan, Owens Corning, Owens Corning Health Care & Benefits Plan for Active Employees, Te Connectivity Networks, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc., Tyco Electronics Corporation, Tyco Electronics Corporation Health and Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #363 ) (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 372 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Natus Medical Incorporated, Naus Medical Health and Welfare Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 371 Certificate of Interested Entities by Natus Medical Incorporated, Naus Medical Health and Welfare Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 370 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by National Semiconductor Corporation, National Semiconductor Corporation Comprehensive Medical and Dental Plan, National Semiconductor Corporation Flexible Life Insurance Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 369 Certificate of Interested Entities by National Semiconductor Corporation, National Semiconductor Corporation Comprehensive Medical and Dental Plan, National Semiconductor Corporation Flexible Life Insurance Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 368 Declaration of Melanie Bauer in Support of #363 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint with Prejudice; Memorandum in Support of Motion filed byFacebook, Inc., Facebook, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Jabil Circuit, Inc., Jabil Circuit, Inc. Health Benefit Plan, Owens Corning, Owens Corning Health Care & Benefits Plan for Active Employees, Te Connectivity Networks, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc., Tyco Electronics Corporation, Tyco Electronics Corporation Health and Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #363 ) (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 367 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Microsemi Corporation, Microsemi Group Benefits Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 366 Certificate of Interested Entities by Microsemi Corporation, Microsemi Group Benefits Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 365 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc., Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc. Employer Funded Welfare Benefit Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 364 Certificate of Interested Entities by Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc., Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc. Employer Funded Welfare Benefit Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 363 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint with Prejudice; Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Facebook, Inc., Facebook, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Jabil Circuit, Inc., Jabil Circuit, Inc. Health Benefit Plan, Owens Corning, Owens Corning Health Care & Benefits Plan for Active Employees, Te Connectivity Networks, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc., Tyco Electronics Corporation, Tyco Electronics Corporation Health and Welfare Plan. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 2/24/2014. Replies due by 3/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 362 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Manpower, Inc./California Peninsula, Right Management Consultants, Inc.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 361 Certificate of Interested Entities by Manpower, Inc./California Peninsula, Right Management Consultants, Inc. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 360 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by LVI Services, Inc., LVI Services, Inc. Health Benefit Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 359 Certificate of Interested Entities by LVI Services, Inc., LVI Services, Inc. Health Benefit Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 358 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Luminex Corporation. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 357 Certificate of Interested Entities by Luminex Corporation (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 356 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Lockheed Martin Corporation, Lockheed Martin Corporation Flexible Benefits Plan, Lockheed Martin Healthworks Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 355 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lockheed Martin Corporation, Lockheed Martin Corporation Flexible Benefits Plan, Lockheed Martin Healthworks Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 354 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Life Technologies Corporation, Life Technologies Corporation Health and Welfare Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 353 Certificate of Interested Entities by Life Technologies Corporation, Life Technologies Corporation Health and Welfare Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 352 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Lehigh Hanson Inc. Healh & Welfare Plan Active Employees, Lehigh Hanson, Inc.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 351 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lehigh Hanson Inc. Healh & Welfare Plan Active Employees, Lehigh Hanson, Inc. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 350 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by KPMG LLP, KPMG LLP Health Plans. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 349 Certificate of Interested Entities by KPMG LLP, KPMG LLP Health Plans (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 348 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Kforce Inc., Kforce Inc. Group Insurance Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 347 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kforce Inc., Kforce Inc. Group Insurance Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 346 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. Benefits Administration Committee, J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. Health & Welfare Benefits Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 345 Certificate of Interested Entities by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. Benefits Administration Committee, J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. Health & Welfare Benefits Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 344 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Group Ins. Plan for Associates of J. Crew Group, Inc., J. Crew, Inc.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 343 Certificate of Interested Entities by Group Ins. Plan for Associates of J. Crew Group, Inc., J. Crew, Inc. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 342 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Inventiv Health, Inc., Inventiv Health, Inc. Employee Health Care Program. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 341 Certificate of Interested Entities by Inventiv Health, Inc., Inventiv Health, Inc. Employee Health Care Program (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 340 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Infotech Enterprises America, Inc., Infotech Enterprises America, Inc. Medical and Dental Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 339 Declaration of Barbara Oshima in Support of #326 MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Asserted Against Them in the Complaint filed byGlaxoSmithKline, Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, VMware Group Health Plan, VMware, Inc., Xilinx Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Xilinx, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 (Part 1 of 2), #4 Exhibit 3 (Part 2 of 2), #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5 (Part 1 of 2), #7 Exhibit 5 (Part 2 of 2), #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) #326 ) (Birenbaum, Charles) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 338 Certificate of Interested Entities by Infotech Enterprises America, Inc., Infotech Enterprises America, Inc. Medical and Dental Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 337 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Infosys Limited, Infosys Limited Health & Welfare Benefit Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 336 Certificate of Interested Entities by Infosys Limited, Infosys Limited Health & Welfare Benefit Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 335 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Hospira Flexible Benefits Plan, Hospira Health Care Plan, Hospira, Inc.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 334 Certificate of Interested Entities by Hospira Flexible Benefits Plan, Hospira Health Care Plan, Hospira, Inc. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 333 Declaration of Michelle Killian in Support of #326 MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Asserted Against Them in the Complaint filed byGlaxoSmithKline, Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, VMware Group Health Plan, VMware, Inc., Xilinx Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Xilinx, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #326 ) (Birenbaum, Charles) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 332 Declaration of Vanessa Brown in Support of #326 MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Asserted Against Them in the Complaint filed byGlaxoSmithKline, Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, VMware Group Health Plan, VMware, Inc., Xilinx Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Xilinx, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) #326 ) (Birenbaum, Charles) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 331 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement by First American Financial Corporation, First American Financial Corporation Group Disability Benefits Trust. (Baker, James) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 330 Declaration of Heather L. Richardson in Support of #329 MOTION to Stay (replaces Doc. No. 327) filed byAetna Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D, #5 Exhibit Ex. E, #6 Exhibit Ex. F, #7 Exhibit Ex. G, #8 Exhibit Ex. H, #9 Exhibit Ex. I, #10 Exhibit Ex. J, #11 Exhibit Ex. K, #12 Exhibit Ex. L, #13 Exhibit Ex. M, #14 Exhibit Ex. N, #15 Exhibit Ex. O, #16 Exhibit Ex. P, #17 Exhibit Ex. Q, #18 Exhibit Ex. R, #19 Exhibit Ex. S, #20 Exhibit Ex. T, #21 Exhibit Ex. U, #22 Exhibit Ex. V, #23 Exhibit Ex. W, #24 Exhibit Ex. X, #25 Exhibit Ex. Y, #26 Exhibit Ex. Z, #27 Exhibit Ex. AA, #28 Exhibit Ex. BB)(Related document(s) #329 ) (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 329 MOTION to Stay (replaces Doc. No. 327) filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company, and ERISA Plan Defendants listed in exhibit A - Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 2/24/2014. Replies due by 3/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order)(Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014) Modified on 2/11/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/11/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2014 Filing 328 Joinder re #327 (Filed in Error), #329 (Corrected) MOTION to Stay by Pinnacle Bank. Defendant Pinnacle Bank hereby joins in the Consolidated Aetna Defendants' motion to stay and motion to dismiss for the reasons stated therein (Rehon, Peter) (Filed on 2/10/2014) Modified text on 2/12/2014 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2014 Filing 327 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see amended #329 MOTION to Stay filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 2/24/2014. Replies due by 3/3/2014. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014) Modified on 2/11/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2014 Filing 326 MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Asserted Against Them in the Complaint filed by GlaxoSmithKline, Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, VMware Group Health Plan, VMware, Inc., Xilinx Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Xilinx, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 2/24/2014. Replies due by 3/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss All Claims Asserted Against Them in the Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Birenbaum, Charles) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 325 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by HGST, Inc., Hitachi Global Storage/Technologies, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 324 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation Welfare Plan re #321 Statement, #319 Certificate of Interested Entities (Brody, Harold) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 323 Certificate of Interested Entities by HGST, Inc., Hitachi Global Storage/Technologies, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 322 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by GCA Services Group Health and Welfare Plan, GCA Services Group, Inc.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 321 Statement Corporate Disclosure Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. P. 7.1 by Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation Welfare Plan. (Brody, Harold) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 320 Certificate of Interested Entities by GCA Services Group Health and Welfare Plan, GCA Services Group, Inc. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 319 Certificate of Interested Entities by Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation Welfare Plan (Brody, Harold) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 318 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by First Solar, Inc., First Solar, Inc. Group Health Insurance Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 317 Certificate of Interested Entities by First Solar, Inc., First Solar, Inc. Group Health Insurance Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 316 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Emulex - The Flexible Benefits Program for Emulex Employees, Emulex Corporation. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 315 Certificate of Interested Entities by Emulex - The Flexible Benefits Program for Emulex Employees, Emulex Corporation (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 314 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Echelon Corporation, Echelon Employee Benefit Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 313 Certificate of Interested Entities by Echelon Corporation, Echelon Employee Benefit Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 312 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Duran & Veneables, Inc.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 311 Certificate of Interested Entities by Duran & Veneables, Inc. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 310 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Cox Enterprises, Inc., Cox Enterprises, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 309 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cox Enterprises, Inc., Cox Enterprises, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 308 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Cordevalle Welfare Benefits Plan, Cordevalle, L.P.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 307 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cordevalle Welfare Benefits Plan, Cordevalle, L.P. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 306 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Compass Group USA, Inc., Employee Benefit Plan of the Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 305 Certificate of Interested Entities by Compass Group USA, Inc., Employee Benefit Plan of the Compass Group USA, Inc. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 304 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Coach, Inc., Coach, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 303 Certificate of Interested Entities by Coach, Inc., Coach, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 302 Certificate of Interested Entities by First American Financial Corporation, First American Financial Corporation Group Disability Benefits Trust identifying Corporate Parent First American Financial Corporation for First American Financial Corporation, First American Financial Corporation Group Disability Benefits Trust. (Baker, James) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 301 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Citigroup Flexible Benefits Plan, Citigroup Health Benefit Plan, Citigroup Inc.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 300 Certificate of Interested Entities by Citigroup Flexible Benefits Plan, Citigroup Health Benefit Plan, Citigroup Inc. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 299 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Check Point Software Technologies Inc. Welfare Plan, Check Point Software Technologies, Inc.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 298 Certificate of Interested Entities by Check Point Software Technologies Inc. Welfare Plan, Check Point Software Technologies, Inc. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 297 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Cepheid, Cepheid Consolidated Welfare Benefit Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 296 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cepheid, Cepheid Consolidated Welfare Benefit Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 295 Declaration of James P. Baker in Support of #292 Request for Judicial Notice, filed byFirst American Financial Corporation, First American Financial Corporation Group Disability Benefits Trust. (Related document(s) #292 ) (Baker, James) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 294 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Canon U.S.A., Inc., Canon Welfare Benefit Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 293 Certificate of Interested Entities by Canon U.S.A., Inc., Canon Welfare Benefit Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 292 Request for Judicial Notice re #279 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6), and Accompanying Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byFirst American Financial Corporation, First American Financial Corporation Group Disability Benefits Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B (Part 1), #3 Exhibit B (Part 2))(Related document(s) #279 ) (Baker, James) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 291 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Cadence Design Systems, Inc., Cadence Group Life, Health and Disability Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 290 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cadence Design Systems, Inc., Cadence Group Life, Health and Disability Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 289 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by CA, Inc., CA, Inc. Comprehensive Health and Welfare Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 288 Certificate of Interested Entities by CA, Inc., CA, Inc. Comprehensive Health and Welfare Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 287 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Bridge Bank, N.A. Employee Benefit Plan, Bridge Capital Holdings. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 286 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bridge Bank, N.A. Employee Benefit Plan, Bridge Capital Holdings (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 285 Declaration of Karen Williams in Support of #279 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6), and Accompanying Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byFirst American Financial Corporation, First American Financial Corporation Group Disability Benefits Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #279 ) (Baker, James) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 284 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Bonhams & Butterfields Auctioneers Corporation, Butterfields Consolidated Welfare Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 283 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bonhams & Butterfields Auctioneers Corporation, Butterfields Consolidated Welfare Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 282 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by BMC Software, Inc., BMC Software, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefit Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 281 Certificate of Interested Entities by BMC Software, Inc., BMC Software, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefit Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 280 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Blue Coat Systems, Inc., Blue Cost Systems, Inc. Flexible Benefit Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 279 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6), and Accompanying Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by First American Financial Corporation, First American Financial Corporation Group Disability Benefits Trust. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 2/24/2014. Replies due by 3/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baker, James) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 278 Certificate of Interested Entities by Blue Coat Systems, Inc., Blue Cost Systems, Inc. Flexible Benefit Plan (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 277 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Becton Dickinson and Company. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 276 Certificate of Interested Entities by Becton Dickinson and Company identifying Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson and Company for Becton Dickinson and Company. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 275 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Barracuda Networks, Inc., Barracuda Networks, Inc. Benefit Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 274 Certificate of Interested Entities by Barracuda Networks, Inc., Barracuda Networks, Inc. Benefit Plan identifying Corporate Parent Barracuda Networks, Inc. for Barracuda Networks, Inc., Barracuda Networks, Inc. Benefit Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 273 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Booz Allen Hamilton, Booz Allen Hamilton Inc. All Risk Insurance. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 272 Certificate of Interested Entities by Booz Allen Hamilton, Booz Allen Hamilton Inc. All Risk Insurance identifying Corporate Parent Booz Allen Hamilton for Booz Allen Hamilton, Booz Allen Hamilton Inc. All Risk Insurance. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 271 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by BAE Systems Funded Welfare Benefit Plan, BAE Systems, Inc.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 270 Certificate of Interested Entities by BAE Systems Funded Welfare Benefit Plan, BAE Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BAE Systems, Inc. for BAE Systems Funded Welfare Benefit Plan, BAE Systems, Inc.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 269 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Avidex Industries Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Avidex Industries, L.L.C.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 268 Certificate of Interested Entities by Avidex Industries Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Avidex Industries, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent Avidex Industries, L.L.C. for Avidex Industries Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Avidex Industries, L.L.C.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 267 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Avaya Inc. Health & Welfare Benefits Plan, Avaya Inc. Medical Expense Plan, Avaya Inc. Retiree Medical Expense Plan for Salaried Employees, Avaya, Inc., Avaya, Inc. Represented Employees Post-Retirement Health Benefits Trust, The Avaya Inc. Health & Welfare Benefits Plan for Salaried Employees, The Avaya Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Plan For Salaried Retirees, The Avaya Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Plan for Retirees. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 266 Certificate of Interested Entities by Avaya Inc. Health & Welfare Benefits Plan, Avaya Inc. Medical Expense Plan, Avaya Inc. Retiree Medical Expense Plan for Salaried Employees, Avaya, Inc., Avaya, Inc. Represented Employees Post-Retirement Health Benefits Trust, The Avaya Inc. Health & Welfare Benefits Plan for Salaried Employees, The Avaya Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Plan For Salaried Retirees, The Avaya Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Plan for Retirees identifying Corporate Parent Avaya for Avaya Inc. Health & Welfare Benefits Plan, Avaya Inc. Medical Expense Plan, Avaya Inc. Retiree Medical Expense Plan for Salaried Employees, Avaya, Inc., Avaya, Inc. Represented Employees Post-Retirement Health Benefits Trust, The Avaya Inc. Health & Welfare Benefits Plan for Salaried Employees, The Avaya Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Plan For Salaried Retirees, The Avaya Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Plan for Retirees. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 265 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Arrow Eelctronics Welfare Benefits Plan, Arrow Electronics, Inc.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 264 Certificate of Interested Entities by Arrow Eelctronics Welfare Benefits Plan, Arrow Electronics, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Arrow for Arrow Eelctronics Welfare Benefits Plan, Arrow Electronics, Inc.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 263 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Amazon Corporate, LLC. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 262 Certificate of Interested Entities by Amazon Corporate, LLC (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 261 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Alcatel-Lucent Medical Expense Plan for Management Employees, Alcatel-Lucent Medical Expense Plan for Occupational Employees, Alcatel-Lucent U.S.A., Inc.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 260 Certificate of Interested Entities by Alcatel-Lucent Medical Expense Plan for Management Employees, Alcatel-Lucent Medical Expense Plan for Occupational Employees, Alcatel-Lucent U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Alcatel for Alcatel-Lucent Medical Expense Plan for Management Employees, Alcatel-Lucent Medical Expense Plan for Occupational Employees, Alcatel-Lucent U.S.A., Inc.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 259 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by ADP Totalsource, Inc., ADP Totalsource, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 258 Certificate of Interested Entities by ADP Totalsource, Inc., ADP Totalsource, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan identifying Corporate Parent ADP for ADP Totalsource, Inc., ADP Totalsource, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 257 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule 7.1 by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Adobe Systems Incorporated Group Welfare Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 256 Certificate of Interested Entities by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Adobe Systems Incorporated Group Welfare Plan identifying Corporate Parent Adobe for Adobe Systems Incorporated, Adobe Systems Incorporated Group Welfare Plan. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 255 MOTION to Dismiss and In the Alternative, Motion to Sever filed by Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation Welfare Plan. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 2/24/2014. Replies due by 3/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Harold M. Brody In Support of, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brody, Harold) (Filed on 2/10/2014) Modified on 2/10/2014.(counsel failed to select multiple motions.).) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2014 Filing 254 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8364176.) filed by Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation Welfare Plan. (Spencer, Michael) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 253 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8364004.) filed by Broadcom Corporation, Broadcom Corporation Welfare Plan. (Shapiro, Howard) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER GRANTING #251 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. as to Canon Anelva Corp. ONLY. Canon Anelva Corp. (a Japan corporation) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/7/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
February 7, 2014 Filing 251 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Canon Anelva Corp. by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 250 Order Granting #249 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Donald L. Havermann for individual defendants. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 2/7/2014.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
February 7, 2014 Filing 249 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Donald L. Havermann (Replaces DKT 242) ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8358723.) filed by Facebook, Inc., Facebook, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Jabil Circuit, Inc., Jabil Circuit, Inc. Health Benefit Plan, Owens Corning, Owens Corning Health Care & Benefits Plan for Active Employees, Te Connectivity Networks, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc., Tyco Electronics Corporation, Tyco Electronics Corporation Health and Welfare Plan. (Havermann, Donald) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 248 Order Granting #246 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew Sakallaris for individual defendants. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 2/7/2014.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 247 Order Granting #245 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Emily Glunz for Individual Defendants. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 2/7/2014.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
February 6, 2014 Filing 246 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Andrew G. Sakallaris (Replaces DKT #243 ) ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8355415.) filed by Facebook, Inc., Facebook, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Jabil Circuit, Inc., Jabil Circuit, Inc. Health Benefit Plan, Owens Corning, Owens Corning Health Care & Benefits Plan for Active Employees, Te Connectivity Networks, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc., Tyco Electronics Corporation, Tyco Electronics Corporation Health and Welfare Plan. (Sakallaris, Andrew) (Filed on 2/6/2014) Modified on 2/6/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/6/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2014 Filing 245 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Emily A. Glunz (Replaces DKT #244 ) ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8355206.) filed by Facebook, Inc., Facebook, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Jabil Circuit, Inc., Jabil Circuit, Inc. Health Benefit Plan, Owens Corning, Owens Corning Health Care & Benefits Plan for Active Employees, Te Connectivity Networks, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc., Tyco Electronics Corporation, Tyco Electronics Corporation Health and Welfare Plan. (Glunz, Emily) (Filed on 2/6/2014) Modified on 2/6/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/6/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2014 Filing 244 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see #245 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Emily A. Glunz (Filing fee $ 305.)receipt number 0971-8355206. filed by Facebook, Inc., Facebook, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Jabil Circuit, Inc., Jabil Circuit, Inc. Health Benefit Plan, Owens Corning, Owens Corning Health Care & Benefits Plan for Active Employees, Te Connectivity Networks, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc., Tyco Electronics Corporation, Tyco Electronics Corporation Health and Welfare Plan. (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 2/5/2014) Modified on 2/6/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/6/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2014 Filing 243 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see #246 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Andrew G. Sakallaris (Filing fee $ 305.) receipt number 0971-8355415.) filed by Facebook, Inc., Facebook, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Jabil Circuit, Inc., Jabil Circuit, Inc. Health Benefit Plan, Owens Corning, Owens Corning Health Care & Benefits Plan for Active Employees, Te Connectivity Networks, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc., Tyco Electronics Corporation, Tyco Electronics Corporation Health and Welfare Plan. (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 2/5/2014) Modified on 2/6/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2014 Filing 242 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see #249 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Donald L. Havermann (Filing fee NOT PAID filed by Facebook, Inc., Facebook, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Jabil Circuit, Inc., Jabil Circuit, Inc. Health Benefit Plan, Owens Corning, Owens Corning Health Care & Benefits Plan for Active Employees, Te Connectivity Networks, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc., Tyco Electronics Corporation, Tyco Electronics Corporation Health and Welfare Plan. (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 2/5/2014) Modified on 2/6/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/7/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 241 Order Granting #240 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Daniel Alter for Wycliffe Bible Translators, Inc. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 2/5/2014.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
February 4, 2014 Filing 240 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Attorney Daniel Alter ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8348696.) filed by Wycliffe Bible Translators, Inc., Wycliffe Bible Translators, Inc. Medical Health Plan HMO. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
January 22, 2014 Filing 239 Certificate of Interested Entities by GlaxoSmithKline, Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, GlaxoSmithKline, LLC (Birenbaum, Charles) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 22, 2014 Filing 238 Statement Defendants' Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule 7.1 by GlaxoSmithKline, Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, GlaxoSmithKline, LLC. (Birenbaum, Charles) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 22, 2014 Filing 237 Certificate of Interested Entities by Xilinx Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Xilinx, Inc. (Birenbaum, Charles) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 22, 2014 Filing 236 Statement Defendants' Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule 7.1 by Xilinx Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Xilinx, Inc.. (Birenbaum, Charles) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 22, 2014 Filing 235 Certificate of Interested Entities by VMware Group Health Plan, VMware, Inc., VMware, Inc. Flexible Spending Account Plan (Birenbaum, Charles) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 22, 2014 Filing 234 Statement - Defendants' Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule 7.1 by VMware Group Health Plan, VMware, Inc., VMware, Inc. Flexible Spending Account Plan. (Birenbaum, Charles) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 233 *** PDR FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD *** ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/16/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2014) Modified text on 1/16/2014 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 232 Order Granting #231 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John C. Lemaster for Defendant Tolt LLC. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 1/16/2014.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 16, 2014 Filing 231 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney John C. Lemaster ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8302766.) filed by Tolt Service Group, Tolt Technologies Benefit Welfare Plan, Tolt, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing (AZ and CO))(Lemaster, John) (Filed on 1/16/2014) Modified text to add attorney's name on 1/17/2014 (srm, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2014 Filing 230 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule 7.1 by Jabil Circuit, Inc., Jabil Circuit, Inc. Health Benefit Plan. (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 15, 2014 Filing 229 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jabil Circuit, Inc., Jabil Circuit, Inc. Health Benefit Plan (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 14, 2014 Filing 228 Statement Owens Corning's Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule 7.1 by Owens Corning, Owens Corning Health Care & Benefits Plan for Active Employees. (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
January 14, 2014 Filing 227 Certificate of Interested Entities by Owens Corning, Owens Corning Health Care & Benefits Plan for Active Employees (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
January 10, 2014 Filing 226 NOTICE of Appearance by Sacha Marie Steenhoek (Steenhoek, Sacha) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
January 10, 2014 Filing 225 Certificate of Interested Entities by Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Corporate Parent Toyota Motor Corporation for Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc.. (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
January 10, 2014 Filing 224 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement by Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc.. (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
January 10, 2014 Filing 223 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole A. Diller (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
January 10, 2014 Filing 222 Certificate of Interested Entities by Te Connectivity Networks, Inc., Tyco Electronics Corporation, Tyco Electronics Corporation Health and Welfare Plan (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
January 10, 2014 Filing 221 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement by Te Connectivity Networks, Inc., Tyco Electronics Corporation, Tyco Electronics Corporation Health and Welfare Plan. (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
January 10, 2014 Filing 220 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook, Inc., Facebook, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
January 10, 2014 Filing 219 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement by Facebook, Inc., Facebook, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan. (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 218 Order Granting #212 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Lindsey C. Edelmann for GlaxoSmithKline, Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, VMware Group Health Plan, VMware, Inc., VMware, Inc. Flexible Spending Account Plan, Xilinx Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Xilinx, Inc. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 1/9/2014.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 217 Order Granting #211 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Todd D. Wozniak for GlaxoSmithKline, Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, VMware Group Health Plan, VMware, Inc., VMware, Inc. Flexible Spending Account Plan, Xilinx Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Xilinx, Inc. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 1/9/2014.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER GRANTING #210 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants Trident Microsystems, Inc. and Trident Microsystems, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefit Plan filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Trident Microsystems, Inc. (a California corporation) and Trident Microsystems, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefit Plan terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/9/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER GRANTING #209 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Dynamic Details Design, LLC ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Dynamic Details Design, LLC (a Delaware limited liability company) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/9/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER GRANTING #208 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant SCI Management, LLC ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. SCI Management, LLC (a Minnesota limited liability company) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/9/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER GRANTING #207 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Diageo North America Inc. ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Diageo North America Inc. (a Connecticut corporation) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/9/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
January 9, 2014 Filing 212 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8282071.) filed by GlaxoSmithKline, Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, VMware Group Health Plan, VMware, Inc., VMware, Inc. Flexible Spending Account Plan, Xilinx Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Xilinx, Inc.. (Edelmann, Lindsey) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
January 9, 2014 Filing 211 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8282045.) filed by GlaxoSmithKline, Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, VMware Group Health Plan, VMware, Inc., VMware, Inc. Flexible Spending Account Plan, Xilinx Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Xilinx, Inc.. (Wozniak, Todd) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
January 8, 2014 Filing 210 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Trident Microsystems, Inc. and Trident Microsystems, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefit Plan by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 8, 2014 Filing 209 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Dynamic Details Design, LLC by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 8, 2014 Filing 208 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant SCI Management, LLC by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 8, 2014 Filing 207 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Diageo North America, Inc. by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting #197 Ex Parte Application to Extend Time For All Defendants To Respond To The Complaint. The deadline for all defendants to respond to the Complaint is extended to 2/10/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/8/2014. *** Stipulation terminated as moot #198 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS OWENS CORING CORP. & THE OWENS CORNING HEALTH CARE & BENEFITS PLAN FOR ACTIVE EMPLOYEES' DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Owens Corning, Owens Corning Health Care & Benefits Plan for Active Employees. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014) Modified text on 1/8/2014 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
January 8, 2014 Filing 205 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. TIN Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Temple-Inland Health & Welfare Benefits Wrap Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 8, 2014 Filing 204 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Administrative Committee SPX Corporation served on 12/16/2013, answer due 1/6/2014; SPX Corporation Comprehensive Medical Care Plan served on 12/16/2013, answer due 1/6/2014. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 8, 2014 Filing 203 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Tolt Service Group served on 12/16/2013, answer due 1/6/2014; Tolt Technologies Benefit Welfare Plan served on 12/16/2013, answer due 1/6/2014. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 8, 2014 Filing 202 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Sumsotal Systems Group Health & Welfare Plan served on 12/5/2013, answer due 12/26/2013; Sumtotal Systems, Inc. served on 12/5/2013, answer due 12/26/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 8, 2014 Filing 201 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Louis DiMaria, c/o UBS Financial Services, Inc. served on 12/13/2013, answer due 1/3/2014; UBS Financial Services, Inc. Group Health and Welfare Benefits Plan served on 12/13/2013, answer due 1/3/2014. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 8, 2014 Filing 200 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Dell, Inc., c/o Nicki Huschka served on 12/13/2013, answer due 1/3/2014; Sonicwall, Inc. Health & Welfare Benefit Plan served on 12/13/2013, answer due 1/3/2014. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 8, 2014 Filing 199 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Infotech Enterprises America, Inc. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Infotech Enterprises America, Inc. Medical and Dental Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 8, 2014 Filing 198 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS OWENS CORING CORP. & THE OWENS CORNING HEALTH CARE & BENEFITS PLAN FOR ACTIVE EMPLOYEES' DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Owens Corning, Owens Corning Health Care & Benefits Plan for Active Employees. (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 6, 2014 Filing 197 Ex Parte Application re #1 Complaint, To Extend Time For All Defendants To Respond To The Complaint filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Ps and As, #2 Declaration of Heather Richardson, #3 Exhibit A - G to Richardson Decl., #4 Exhibit H to Richardson Decl., #5 Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte App To Extend Time For All Defendants, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
December 30, 2013 Filing 196 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Canon Anelva Corp. served on 12/6/2013, answer due 12/27/2013. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 30, 2013 Filing 195 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Encore Industries Inc. Employees Welfare Benefit Plan served on 12/6/2013, answer due 12/27/2013; Encore Industries, Inc. served on 12/6/2013, answer due 12/27/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 30, 2013 Filing 194 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. VWR International, LLC served on 12/16/2013, answer due 1/6/2014; VWR International, LLC Welfare Benefit Plan served on 12/16/2013, answer due 1/6/2014. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 30, 2013 Filing 193 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Bank of America Corpoation Corporate Benefits Committee served on 12/13/2013, answer due 1/3/2014; Bank of America Group Benefits Program served on 12/13/2013, answer due 1/3/2014. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 30, 2013 Filing 192 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. Benefits Administration Committee served on 12/16/2013, answer due 1/6/2014; J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. Health & Welfare Benefits Plan served on 12/16/2013, answer due 1/6/2014. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 30, 2013 Filing 191 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Tolt, LLC served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 30, 2013 Filing 190 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Opticomp Corporation served on 12/6/2013, answer due 12/27/2013. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 30, 2013 Filing 189 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Omron Management Center of America, Inc. served on 12/6/2013, answer due 12/27/2013; Omron Management Center of America, Inc. Employee Welfare Plan served on 12/6/2013, answer due 12/27/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 30, 2013 Filing 188 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Manpower, Inc./California Peninsula served on 12/6/2013, answer due 12/27/2013. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 30, 2013 Filing 187 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Dell Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 30, 2013 Filing 186 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. ADP Totalsource, Inc. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; ADP Totalsource, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 30, 2013 Filing 185 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Tesoro Corporation served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Tesoro Corporation Omnibus Group Welfare Benefits Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 30, 2013 Filing 184 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. SRI International served on 12/5/2013, answer due 12/26/2013. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER granting #181 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR THE CORVEL DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT. Response due by 1/10/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/23/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER granting #180 STIPULATION to Extend Defendants Facebook, Inc., Facebook, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Jabil Circuit, Inc., Jabil Circuit, Inc. Health Benefit Plan, Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc., TE Connectivity Ltd (erroneously sued as Tyco Electronics Corporation), The TE Connectivity Health and Welfare Benefits Plan (erroneously sued as Tyco Electronics Corporation Health and Welfare Plan), and TE Connectivity Network, Inc.'s Deadline to Respond to Complaint. Response due by 1/31/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/23/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 23, 2013 Filing 181 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR THE CORVEL DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 180 STIPULATION to Extend Defendants Facebook, Inc., Facebook, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Jabil Circuit, Inc., Jabil Circuit, Inc. Health Benefit Plan, Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc., TE Connectivity Ltd (erroneously sued as Tyco Electronics Corporation), The TE Connectivity Health and Welfare Benefits Plan (erroneously sued as Tyco Electronics Corporation Health and Welfare Plan), and TE Connectivity Network, Inc.'s Deadline to Respond to Complaint filed by Facebook, Inc., Facebook, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Jabil Circuit, Inc., Jabil Circuit, Inc. Health Benefit Plan, Te Connectivity Networks, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc., Tyco Electronics Corporation, Tyco Electronics Corporation Health and Welfare Plan. (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 179 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole A. Diller (Diller, Nicole) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 178 NOTICE of Appearance by Sacha Marie Steenhoek (Steenhoek, Sacha) (Filed on 12/20/2013) Modified on 12/24/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2013 Filing 177 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Oasis Outsourcing Holdings, Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Oasis Outsourcing Holdings, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefits Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 176 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Duran & Veneables, Inc. served on 12/4/2013, answer due 12/26/2013. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 175 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Zetta, Inc. served on 12/4/2013, answer due 12/26/2013. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 174 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Bridge Bank, N.A. Employee Benefit Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Bridge Capital Holdings served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 173 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Avidex Industries Health and Welfare Benefit Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Avidex Industries, L.L.C. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 172 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Al-Razaq Enerprises Group Incorporated served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 171 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Citigroup Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 170 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Pinnacle Bank, a California corporation served on 12/4/2013, answer due 12/26/2013. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 169 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 168 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. SPX Corporation served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 167 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Bank of America Corporation served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 166 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. UBS Financial Services, Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER GRANTING #164 Stipulation Extending Time to File Response as to Defendants GlaxoSmithKline, LLC and GlaxoSmithKline Health and Welfare Benefits Plan filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Response due 1/10/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/20/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 19, 2013 Filing 164 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR THE GLAXOSMITHKLINE DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND re #161 Stipulation as to the Kleinfelder Group, Inc, and the Kleinfelder Group, Inc Health and Welfare Plan filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Response due 1/10/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/18/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER GRANTING #160 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Paragon Benefits ONLY filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Paragon Benefits terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/18/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 18, 2013 Filing 161 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR THE THE THE KLEINFELDER GROUP DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 18, 2013 Filing 160 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Paragon Benefits by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 159 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. KPMG LLP served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; KPMG LLP Health Plans served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 158 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 157 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. K.R. Anderson Group Welfare Plan served on 12/6/2013, answer due 12/27/2013; K.R. Anderson, Inc. served on 12/6/2013, answer due 12/27/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 156 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Echelon Corporation served on 12/4/2013, answer due 12/26/2013; Echelon Employee Benefit Plan served on 12/4/2013, answer due 12/26/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 155 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Amazon Corporate, LLC served on 12/5/2013, answer due 12/26/2013. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 154 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Cox Enterprises, Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Cox Enterprises, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 153 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Coach, Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Coach, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 152 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Graebel Companies, Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Graebel Companies, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 151 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Automatic Data Processing Insurance Agency, Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Automatic Data Processing, Inc. Flex 2000 Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 150 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Group Ins. Plan for Associates of J. Crew Group, Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; J. Crew, Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 149 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. CA, Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; CA, Inc. Comprehensive Health and Welfare Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 148 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc. Employer Funded Welfare Benefit Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 147 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Diageo North America Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 146 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Cepheid served on 12/4/2013, answer due 12/26/2013; Cepheid Consolidated Welfare Benefit Plan served on 12/4/2013, answer due 12/26/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 145 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. TeleNav Health and Welfare Plan served on 12/4/2013, answer due 12/26/2013; TeleNav, Inc. served on 12/4/2013, answer due 12/26/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 144 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Intevac Life and Welfare Plan served on 12/4/2013, answer due 12/26/2013; Intevac, Inc. served on 12/4/2013, answer due 12/26/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 143 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Adobe Systems Incorporated served on 12/4/2013, answer due 12/26/2013; Adobe Systems Incorporated Group Welfare Plan served on 12/4/2013, answer due 12/26/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 142 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Fidelity National Financial, Inc. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Fidelity National Financial, Inc. Welfare Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 141 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Cadence Design Systems, Inc. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Cadence Group Life, Health and Disability Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 140 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc. Flexible Benefits Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 139 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Cordevalle Welfare Benefits Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Cordevalle, L.P. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 138 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Compass Group USA, Inc. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Employee Benefit Plan of the Compass Group USA, Inc. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 137 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Bonhams & Butterfields Auctioneers Corporation served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Butterfields Consolidated Welfare Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 136 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Broadcom Corporation served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Broadcom Corporation Welfare Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 135 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. The Western Union Company served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; The Western Union Company Health and Welfare Benefit Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 134 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. First Solar, Inc. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; First Solar, Inc. Group Health Insurance Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 133 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. GCA Services Group Health and Welfare Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; GCA Services Group, Inc. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 132 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Harsco Corporation served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Harsco Corporation Insurance Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 131 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Fusionstorm served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Fusionstorm Health and Welfare Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 130 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. HGST, Inc. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Hitachi Global Storage/Technologies, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 129 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Hospira Flexible Benefits Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Hospira Health Care Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Hospira, Inc. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 128 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Infosys Limited served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Infosys Limited Health & Welfare Benefit Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 127 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Inventiv Health, Inc. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Inventiv Health, Inc. Employee Health Care Program served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 126 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Jabil Circuit, Inc. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Jabil Circuit, Inc. Health Benefit Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 125 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Kforce Inc. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Kforce Inc. Group Insurance Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 124 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. L-3 Communications Corporation served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; L-3 Communications Funded Grou Healh and Welfare Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 123 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. National Semiconductor Corporation served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; National Semiconductor Corporation Comprehensive Medical and Dental Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; National Semiconductor Corporation Flexible Life Insurance Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 122 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. NDS Surgical Imaging LLC served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; NDS Surgical Imaging, LLC Welfare Benefits Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 121 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Owens Corning served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Owens Corning Health Care & Benefits Plan for Active Employees served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 120 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR THE CHIPOTLE DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 119 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Costco Wholesale Corporation served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Costco Wholesale Corporation Employee Benefits Plan Program served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 118 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Emulex - The Flexible Benefits Program for Emulex Employees served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Emulex Corporation served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 117 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Boehringer Ingelheim Fremont, Inc. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 116 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Panasonic Corporation of North America served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Panasonic Group Comprehensive Medical and Dental Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 115 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Paychex, Inc. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Paychex, Inc., Employee Health Benefits Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 114 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Luminex Corporation served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 113 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Renesas Electronic America Inc. Benefit Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Renesas Electronics America, Inc. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 112 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. SAP America, Inc. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Sap America Health & Welfare Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 111 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Science Applications International Corp. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Science Applications International Corporation Welfare Benefits Trust served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 110 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Securitas Security Services USA, Inc. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Securitas Security Services USA, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 109 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. STMicroelectronics, Inc. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; STMicroelectronics, Inc. Employee Welfare Benefits Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 108 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Sybase, Inc. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Sybase, Inc. Group Welfare Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 107 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Te Connectivity Networks, Inc. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 106 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. URS Corporation served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; URS Corporation Welfare Benefits Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 105 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Health Plan for Employees of Plexus Corp. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Plexus Corp. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 104 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Cognizant Health & Welfare Benefit Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 103 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 102 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Tutor Perini Corporation served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Tutor Perini Corporation Health and Welfare Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 101 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Tween Brands, Inc. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Tween Brands, Inc. Comprehensive Welfare Benefits Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 100 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Tyco Electronics Corporation served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Tyco Electronics Corporation Health and Welfare Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 99 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Unisource Worldwide, Inc. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 98 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. VMware Group Health Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; VMware, Inc. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; VMware, Inc. Flexible Spending Account Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 97 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. VWR International, LLC served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; VWR International, LLC Welfare Benefit Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 96 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Yahoo Inc. Health and Welfare Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Yahoo!, Inc served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 95 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Arrow Eelctronics Welfare Benefits Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Arrow Electronics, Inc. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 94 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Avaya Inc. Health & Welfare Benefits Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Avaya Inc. Medical Expense Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Avaya Inc. Retiree Medical Expense Plan for Salaried Employees served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Avaya, Inc. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Avaya, Inc. Represented Employees Post-Retirement Health Benefits Trust served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; The Avaya Inc. Health & Welfare Benefits Plan for Salaried Employees served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; The Avaya Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Plan For Salaried Retirees served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; The Avaya Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Plan for Retirees served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 93 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. BAE Systems Funded Welfare Benefit Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; BAE Systems, Inc. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 92 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Bausch & Lomb Comprehensive Medical Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; Bausch & Lomb Incorporated served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 91 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Becton Dickinson and Company served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 90 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. BMC Software, Inc. served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013; BMC Software, Inc. Health and Welfare Benefit Plan served on 11/25/2013, answer due 12/16/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 89 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Aetna Life Insurance Company served on 11/22/2013, answer due 12/13/2013. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 88 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. WPG Americas Health and Welfare Plan served on 11/27/2013, answer due 12/18/2013; WPG Americas, Inc. served on 11/27/2013, answer due 12/18/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 87 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. LVI Services, Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; LVI Services, Inc. Health Benefit Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 86 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Praxair Medical Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Praxair, Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 85 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. The Kleinfelder Group, Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; The Kleinfelder Group, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 84 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Semtech Corp Group Medical and Dental Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Semtech Corp. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 83 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Hathaway Dinwiddie Construction Compay served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Hathaway Dinwiddie Group Medical and Dental Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 82 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Northwestern Polytechnic Univeristy served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 81 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Barracuda Networks, Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Barracuda Networks, Inc. Benefit Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 80 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Microsemi Corporation served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Microsemi Group Benefits Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 79 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Natus Medical Incorporated served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Naus Medical Health and Welfare Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 78 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. PVH Corp. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; PVH Corp. & Subsidiaries Health & Welfare Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 77 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Ericsson Television, Inc., Employee Benefit Package served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Ericsson Televison, Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 76 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Lehigh Hanson Inc. Healh & Welfare Plan Active Employees served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Lehigh Hanson, Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 75 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Pole to Win America, Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 74 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Sanmina Corporation served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Sanmina Corporation Health and Welfare Benefit Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 73 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Life Technologies Corporation served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Life Technologies Corporation Health and Welfare Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 72 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Align Technology, Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Align Technology, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 71 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Ericsson Flexible Benefits Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Ericsson Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 70 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. UPS Flexible Benefits Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; United Parcel of America, Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 69 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Lockheed Martin Corporation served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Lockheed Martin Corporation Flexible Benefits Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Lockheed Martin Healthworks Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 68 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Salesforce.com Health and Welfare Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Salesforce.com, Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 67 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Altera Corporation served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Altera Corporation Health, Life and Disability Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 66 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Xilinx Inc. Health and Welfare Plan served on 11/27/2013, answer due 12/18/2013; Xilinx, Inc. served on 11/27/2013, answer due 12/18/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 65 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Pioneer North America, Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Pioneer North America, Inc. Group Life, Health Disability Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 64 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Toys 'R' US-Delaware, Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Toys 'R' Us Employee Benefit Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 63 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Symantec Corporation served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Symantec Corporation Group Welfare Benefit Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 62 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Vishay Intertechnology, Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Vishay Intertechnology, Inc. Welfare Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 61 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Liveops, Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Liveops, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 60 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Software AG USA, Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Software AG USA, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 59 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Stantec Consulting Services, Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Stantec Health Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 58 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Hyatt Corporation served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Hyatt Corporation Welfare Benefit Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 57 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Canon U.S.A., Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Canon Welfare Benefit Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 56 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Reliance Steel & Aluminum Co. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Reliance Steel & Aluminum Co., Life, Accidental Death & Dismemberment Health Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 55 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Amgen, Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Amgen, Inc. Master Benefits Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 54 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Check Point Software Technologies Inc. Welfare Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Check Point Software Technologies, Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 53 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Infineon Technologies North America Corp. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Infineon Technologies Welfare Benefit Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 52 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Alcatel-Lucent Medical Expense Plan for Management Employees served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Alcatel-Lucent Medical Expense Plan for Occupational Employees served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Alcatel-Lucent U.S.A., Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 51 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Right Management Consultants, Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 50 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC Health and Welfare Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 49 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Innovion Corp Health Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Innovion Corporation served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 48 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. GlaxoSmithKline, Health and Welfare Benefits Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; GlaxoSmithKline, LLC served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 47 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Dynamic Details Design, LLC served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Dynamic Details, Inc., Welfare Benefit Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Corvel Corporation served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Corvel Corporation Welfare Benefits Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Blue Coat Systems, Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Blue Cost Systems, Inc. Flexible Benefit Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 44 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. First American Financial Corporation served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; First American Financial Corporation Group Disability Benefits Trust served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 43 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Wycliffe Bible Translators, Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Wycliffe Bible Translators, Inc. Medical Health Plan HMO served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 42 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Global Foundries U.S., Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Globalfoundries U.S., Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Facebook, Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Facebook, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 40 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. Applied Materials, Inc. served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013; Applied Materials, Inc. Welfare Plan served on 11/26/2013, answer due 12/17/2013. under 29 U.S.C. 1132(D)(1) (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #36 Stipulation TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR THE VMWARE DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT. Response due by 1/10/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/17/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #35 Stipulation TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR THE NDS DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT. Response due by 1/10/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/17/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #34 Stipulation TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR THE GRAEBEL DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT. Response due by 1/10/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/17/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 16, 2013 Filing 36 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR THE VMWARE DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 16, 2013 Filing 35 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR THE NDS DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 16, 2013 Filing 34 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR THE GRAEBEL DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 13, 2013 Filing 33 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT RE RECUSAL ORDER. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/4/2013. Case Management Conference set for 4/11/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. All other deadlines associated with the initial case management conference are adjusted accordingly by the parties. The Court does not issue a revised Initial ADR Scheduling Order. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING #25 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. as to Fusionstorm (a Delaware corporation) and Fusionstorm Health and Welfare Plan ONLY. Fusionstorm (a Delaware corporation) and Fusionstorm Health and Welfare Plan terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/13/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING #24 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. as to Innovion Corp Health Plan and Innovion Corporation (a California corporation) ONLY. Innovion Corp Health Plan and Innovion Corporation (a California corporation) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/13/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING #23 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response as to Defendants Fidelity National Financial, Inc. and Fidelity National Financial, Inc. Welfare Plan filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Response due 1/10/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/13/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING #22 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response as to Defendants Tolt LLC, Tolt Technologies Benefit Welfare Plan, and Tolt Service Groupfiled by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Response due 1/10/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/13/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING #21 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response as to Defendants Barracuda Networks, Inc. and Barracuda Networks, Inc. Benefit Plan filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Response due 1/10/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/13/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING #19 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response as to Defendants Owens Corning, Owens Corning Health Care & Benefits Plan for Active Employees filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. Response due 1/10/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/13/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME AS TO Aetna Life Insurance Company re #16 Stipulation filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. Response due 1/10/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/13/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 13, 2013 Filing 25 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants FusionStorm and FusionStorm Health and Welfare Plan by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 13, 2013 Filing 24 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Innovion Corporation and Innovion Corp Health Plan by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 12, 2013 Filing 23 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR THE FIDELITY DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
December 12, 2013 Filing 22 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR THE TOLT DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
December 12, 2013 Filing 21 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR THE BARRACUDA DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
December 12, 2013 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aetna Life Insurance Company re #16 Stipulation To Extend Deadline To Respond To The Complaint (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
December 12, 2013 Filing 19 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR THE OWENS CORNING DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to the Honorable Edward J. Davila, United States District Judge. Signed by Judge Executive Committee on 12/12/2013. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
December 11, 2013 Filing 17 *** ERROR *** please see #19 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, filed by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/11/2013) Modified on 12/12/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2013 Filing 16 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/11/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
December 10, 2013 Filing 14 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT Appellant Brief due by 3/5/2014. Case Management Conference set for 3/12/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. *****THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY NOTICE. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS DOCKET ENTRY***** (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
December 6, 2013 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Vitesse Semiconductor Corporation by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
December 3, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant R. Stevens Peters, Inc. by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
December 3, 2013 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore for all discovery matters. Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal no longer assigned to the case. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
December 2, 2013 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Royal Embassy of Saudi Arabia by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
December 2, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Saudi Arabian Cultural Mission by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
December 2, 2013 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of United States Department of Defense by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on December 2, 2013. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 11/27/2013. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/26/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 25, 2013 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc... (Tooch, Daron) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 22, 2013 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 22, 2013 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 22, 2013 Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 2/25/2014. Case Management Conference set for 3/4/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 22, 2013 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bay Area Surgical Group Inc., Forest Ambulatory Surgical Associates, LP, Los Altos Surgery Center, LP, National Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC, SOAR Surgery Center, LLC (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 22, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400., receipt #54611014296). Filed by National Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC, SOAR Surgery Center, LLC, Los Altos Surgery Center, LP, Bay Area Surgical Group Inc., Forest Ambulatory Surgical Associates, LP, Knowles Surgery Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bay Area Surgical Group Inc. et al v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bay Area Surgical Group Inc.
Represented By: Daron Lael Tooch
Represented By: Heather Elizabeth Gibson
Represented By: Katherine Markowski Dru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Knowles Surgery Center, LLC
Represented By: Daron Lael Tooch
Represented By: Heather Elizabeth Gibson
Represented By: Katherine Markowski Dru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC
Represented By: Daron Lael Tooch
Represented By: Heather Elizabeth Gibson
Represented By: Katherine Markowski Dru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Los Altos Surgery Center, LP
Represented By: Daron Lael Tooch
Represented By: Heather Elizabeth Gibson
Represented By: Katherine Markowski Dru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forest Ambulatory Surgical Associates, LP
Represented By: Daron Lael Tooch
Represented By: Heather Elizabeth Gibson
Represented By: Katherine Markowski Dru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOAR Surgery Center, LLC
Represented By: Daron Lael Tooch
Represented By: Heather Elizabeth Gibson
Represented By: Katherine Markowski Dru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Represented By: Richard Joseph Doren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Healthworks Plan
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation Flexible Benefits Plan
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adobe Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adobe Systems Incorporated Group Welfare Plan
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Kevin Ronald Nowicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation Employee Benefits Plan Program
Represented By: Kevin Ronald Nowicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Applied Materials, Inc.
Represented By: Eileen Regina Ridley
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Applied Materials, Inc. Welfare Plan
Represented By: Eileen Regina Ridley
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadcom Corporation
Represented By: Harold M. Brody
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Represented By: Michael D. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadcom Corporation Welfare Plan
Represented By: Harold M. Brody
Represented By: Howard Shapiro
Represented By: Michael D. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VMware, Inc.
Represented By: Charles S. Birenbaum
Represented By: Lindsey Camp Edelmann
Represented By: Todd David Wozniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VMware, Inc. Flexible Spending Account Plan
Represented By: Charles S. Birenbaum
Represented By: Lindsey Camp Edelmann
Represented By: Todd David Wozniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VMware Group Health Plan
Represented By: Charles S. Birenbaum
Represented By: Lindsey Camp Edelmann
Represented By: Todd David Wozniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo!, Inc
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo Inc. Health and Welfare Plan
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xilinx, Inc.
Represented By: Charles S. Birenbaum
Represented By: Lindsey Camp Edelmann
Represented By: Todd David Wozniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xilinx Inc. Health and Welfare Plan
Represented By: Charles S. Birenbaum
Represented By: Lindsey Camp Edelmann
Represented By: Todd David Wozniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becton Dickinson and Company
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAP America, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sap America Health & Welfare Plan
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Semiconductor Corporation
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Semiconductor Corporation Flexible Life Insurance Plan
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Semiconductor Corporation Comprehensive Medical and Dental Plan
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salesforce.com, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Delaware Salesforce.com
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salesforce.com Health and Welfare Plan
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ericsson Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as EUS Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Ronald Nowicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ericsson Flexible Benefits Plan
Represented By: Kevin Ronald Nowicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole A. Diller
Represented By: Andrew George Sakallaris
Represented By: Donald Lawrence Havermann, Esq.
Represented By: Emily Anne Glunz
Represented By: Sacha Marie Steenhoek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan
Represented By: Nicole A. Diller
Represented By: Andrew George Sakallaris
Represented By: Donald Lawrence Havermann, Esq.
Represented By: Emily Anne Glunz
Represented By: Sacha Marie Steenhoek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel of America, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPS Flexible Benefits Plan
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altera Corporation a Delaware corporation doing business as Delaware Altera Corporation
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altera Corporation Health, Life and Disability Plan
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jabil Circuit, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole A. Diller
Represented By: Andrew George Sakallaris
Represented By: Donald Lawrence Havermann, Esq.
Represented By: Emily Anne Glunz
Represented By: Sacha Marie Steenhoek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jabil Circuit, Inc. Health Benefit Plan
Represented By: Nicole A. Diller
Represented By: Andrew George Sakallaris
Represented By: Donald Lawrence Havermann, Esq.
Represented By: Emily Anne Glunz
Represented By: Sacha Marie Steenhoek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avaya, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avaya, Inc. Represented Employees Post-Retirement Health Benefits Trust
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Avaya Inc. Health & Welfare Benefits Plan for Salaried Employees
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avaya Inc. Medical Expense Plan
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avaya Inc. Retiree Medical Expense Plan for Salaried Employees
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avaya Inc. Health & Welfare Benefits Plan
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Avaya Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Plan for Retirees
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Avaya Inc. Health and Welfare Benefits Plan For Salaried Retirees
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Group Benefits Program
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corpoation Corporate Benefits Committee
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STMicroelectronics, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Ronald Nowicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendan