Harney v. Palo Alto Police Department et al

Plaintiff: Tyler Harney
Defendant: Palo Alto Police Department, Dennis Burns, Santa Clara County, Santa Clara Sheriff's Department and Laurie Smith
Case Number: 5:2014cv03415
Filed: July 28, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 2, 2016 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on March 2, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2016)
March 1, 2016 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on March 1, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
February 5, 2016 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION 90 . Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on February 5, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
January 22, 2016 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST to permit Xerox Recovery Services to be represented by Dean Alper. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/22/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
December 23, 2015 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR XEROX RECOVERY SERVICES, INC. TO ATTEND MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IN COURTROOM 7 ON JANUARY 26, 2016 AT 9:30 AM. Plaintiff to serve this order on Xerox Recovery Services. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/23/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
December 16, 2015 74 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on December 16, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
June 24, 2015 59 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 24, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2015)
May 13, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE COUNSEL SUBSTITUTION. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on May 13, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2015)
March 16, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on March 16, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
December 17, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on December 17, 2014. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harney v. Palo Alto Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palo Alto Police Department
Represented By: Felicia Gross
Represented By: Molly Suzanne Stump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Clara County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Clara Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Harney
Represented By: David M. Helbraun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?