Local 101 of the American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Local 101 of the American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown, Jr., Rob Feckner, Michael Bilbrey, John Chiang, Richard Costigan, Richard Gillihan, Dana Hollinger, J J Jelincic, Henry Jones, Ron Lind, Bill Lockyer, Priya Sara Mathur, Bill Slaton, Anne Stausboll, State of California, CalPERS and George Diehr
Case Number: 5:2014cv05640
Filed: December 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER GRANTING 75 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; AND DENYING 72 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/16/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2017)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 67 STIPULATION TO MODIFY CASE SCHEDULE. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2017 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; AND SETTING CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/22/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 35 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/11/2015. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2015)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING 46 PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO SUBMIT MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT; AND VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/20/2015. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2015)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF FROM CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES; AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT THE JUNE 25, 2015 HEARING (addressing 38 ). Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Local 101 of the American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 101 of the American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees
Represented By: Teague Pryde Paterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Feckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bilbrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Chiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Costigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Gillihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Hollinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J J Jelincic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Lind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Lockyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priya Sara Mathur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Slaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Stausboll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CalPERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Diehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?