Diaz et al v. Intuit, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christine Diaz and Michelle Fugatt
Defendant: Intuit, Inc.
Movant: James Lebinski
Case Number: 5:2015cv01778
Filed: April 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER Granting (183) Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement; GRANTING (184) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 5:15-cv-01778-EJD. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/15/2019. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting 140 Motion to Dismiss Second and Third Claims in Third Consolidated Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/15/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER denying 127 Motion for order certifying for interlocutory appeal or in the alternative leave to file motion for reconsideration. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/16/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER GRANTING 128 STIPULATION TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/7/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER GRANTING 125 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/19/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2017)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER ON 114 JOINT LETTER BRIEF RE ATO DOCUMENTS AND RELEVANCE OBJECTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 8/23/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2017)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING 111 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BY TODD SIEGEL. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/5/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2017)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING 34 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Joel R. Rhine. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/18/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2015)(Staff Notes: Correction of 35 Order)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz et al v. Intuit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Diaz
Represented By: Roger Norton Heller
Represented By: Jae Kook Kim
Represented By: Richard D. McCune, Jr.
Represented By: Michael W. Sobol
Represented By: Rachel Lynn Soffin
Represented By: David Christopher Wright
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Fugatt
Represented By: Roger Norton Heller
Represented By: Jae Kook Kim
Represented By: Richard D. McCune, Jr.
Represented By: Michael W. Sobol
Represented By: Rachel Lynn Soffin
Represented By: David Christopher Wright
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intuit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: James Lebinski
Represented By: Todd Anthony Seaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?