Christopher A Nelson v. Seagate Technology LLC

Plaintiff: Christopher A. Nelson
Defendant: Seagate Technology LLC
Case Number: 5:2016cv00523
Filed: February 1, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 25, 2017 130 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 114 Motion to Strike; granting in part and denying in part 114 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
February 9, 2017 100 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 68 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs may file a third consolidated amended complaint no later than March 3, 2017. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
July 25, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER, granting 64 . Signed by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte on 7/25/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
June 21, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte denying 42 Motion to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christopher A Nelson v. Seagate Technology LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher A. Nelson
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Marc Adam Goldich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seagate Technology LLC
Represented By: Anna S. McLean
Represented By: Lien Hoang Payne
Represented By: Neil A. Friedman Popovic
Represented By: David Edward Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?