Smith v. Soto
Defendant: John Soto
Petitioner: Bobbie L. Smith
Case Number: 5:2016cv00697
Filed: February 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: PSLC CLA
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ON INITIAL REVIEW (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/6/2016)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE 9 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bobbie L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?