Smith et al v. Facebook, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Smith, Jane Doe I, Winston Smith and Jane Doe II
Defendant: Facebook, Inc, Facebook, Inc., BJC Healthcare, University of Texas - MD Anderson Cancer Center, American Cancer Society, Inc., American Society of Clinical Oncology, Inc., Adventist Health System, Cleveland Clinic and Melanoma Research Foundation
Case Number: 5:2016cv01282
Filed: March 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Edward J Davila
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Property
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 170 MANDATE of USCA The judgment of this Court, entered December 06, 2018, takes effect this date.This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court. as to #166 Notice of Appeal filed by Winston Smith, Jane Doe II, Jane Doe I (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2018)
December 6, 2018 Filing 169 USCA MEMORANDUM AFFIRMED. as to #166 Notice of Appeal filed by Winston Smith, Jane Doe II, Jane Doe I (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
July 10, 2017 Filing 168 Transcript Designation Form re #166 Notice of Appeal, #167 USCA Case Number Transcript due by 8/7/2017. (Ramirez, Nicole) (Filed on 7/10/2017)
June 12, 2017 Filing 167 USCA Case Number 17-16206 9th Circuit Court of Appeals for #166 Notice of Appeal filed by Winston Smith, Jane Doe II, Jane Doe I. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2017)
June 8, 2017 Filing 166 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-11455553 paid.) (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 JUDGMENT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that judgment is entered in favor of Defendant Facebook, Inc. All other matters are TERMINATED and VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/9/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER GRANTING #96 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/9/2017. The Clerk shall close this file. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
April 20, 2017 Filing 163 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward J. Davila: Motion Hearing re #110 Motion for Preliminary Injunction held on 4/20/2017. Oral argument heard. The Court took the matter under submission. The Court to issue the order. Plaintiff Attorney Jeffrey Koncius, Jay Barnes, Lauren Goldman. Defendant Attorney Michael Rubin, Lauren White, David Carney, Shelley Hurwitz, Jeffrey Rabkin, Paul Karlsgodt. Total Time in Court:9:04-10:16am(1Hr.12Mins.) Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. This is a text-only Minute Entry (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/20/2017)
April 3, 2017 Filing 162 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING. Please take NOTICE that the motion hearing as to #110 Motion for Preliminary Injunction previously scheduled for 4/13/2017 is CONTINUED to 4/20/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER denying #157 Administrative Motion for Leave to Present Testimony. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/29/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017)
March 29, 2017 Filing 160 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 3/29/2017 with Tamara Lange. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled on 5/18/2017 at 10:30 AM. Please use the same call-in information. Any party may request an earlier ADR Phone Conference if needed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017)
March 14, 2017 Filing 159 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #157 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to Present Testimony at Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief re #110 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byBJC Healthcare. (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 3/14/2017)
March 13, 2017 Filing 158 OBJECTIONS to re #156 Reply to Opposition/Response In Support Of Motion For Injunctive Relief by BJC Healthcare. (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
March 10, 2017 Filing 157 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to Present Testimony at Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief re #110 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith. Responses due by 3/14/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Nicole Ramirez, #2 Proposed Order)(Ramirez, Nicole) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
March 6, 2017 Filing 156 REPLY (re #110 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byWinston Smith. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jeffrey A. Koncius, #2 Declaration Timothy Libert)(Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
February 13, 2017 Filing 155 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #110 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) Healthcare Defendants' Joint Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief filed byBJC Healthcare. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
February 8, 2017 Filing 154 NOTICE by Winston Smith of New Authority (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
January 27, 2017 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #153 Notice (Other) filed by Winston Smith (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 25, 2017 Filing 153 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d and request for leave Civil Local Rule 7-3.d by Winston Smith re #105 Opposition/Response to Motion, #96 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/25/2017) Modified on 1/27/2017 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 17, 2017 Filing 152 REPLY (re #143 Joint MOTION to Stay ) filed byAmerican Society of Clinical Oncology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jeffrey Rabkin in Support of Reply)(Rabkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
January 17, 2017 Filing 151 REPLY (re #144 MOTION to Stay Discovery and for Protective Order ) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
January 10, 2017 Filing 150 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #143 Joint MOTION to Stay ) filed byJane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith. (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/10/2017)
January 10, 2017 Filing 149 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #144 MOTION to Stay Discovery and for Protective Order ) filed byJane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith. (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/10/2017)
January 3, 2017 Filing 148 DECLARATION of Nicole Ramirez in Opposition to #147 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by Winston Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #147 ) (Ramirez, Nicole) (Filed on 1/3/2017) Modified on 1/27/2017 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 3, 2017 Filing 147 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #146 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear Defendants' Motions to Stay re #143 Joint MOTION to Stay , #144 MOTION to Stay Discovery and for Protective Order ) filed byWinston Smith. (Ramirez, Nicole) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
December 28, 2016 Filing 146 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear Defendants' Motions to Stay re #143 Joint MOTION to Stay , #144 MOTION to Stay Discovery and for Protective Order filed by American Society of Clinical Oncology, Inc.. Responses due by 1/3/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jeffrey Rabkin, #2 Proposed Order)(Rabkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/28/2016)
December 27, 2016 Filing 145 ADDENDUM TO JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith. (Ramirez, Nicole) (Filed on 12/27/2016) Modified on 12/30/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 27, 2016 Filing 144 MOTION to Stay Discovery and for Protective Order filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 1/10/2017. Replies due by 1/17/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 12/27/2016)
December 27, 2016 Filing 143 Joint MOTION to Stay filed by American Society of Clinical Oncology, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 1/10/2017. Replies due by 1/17/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jeffrey Rabkin, #2 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Stay)(Rabkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/27/2016)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Since it appears the parties did not previously participate in a Rule 26(f) conference with this information, they shall do so within 10 days of the date of this order. They shall thereafter file an addendum to their joint statement reporting the results of the conference on or before 12/27/2016. The Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/15/2016 is premature and is VACATED. The administrative motion to continue the Case Management Conference #131 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/12/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
December 12, 2016 Filing 141 Declaration of Jeffrey A. Koncius in Support of #140 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byJane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith. (Related document(s) #140 ) (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
December 12, 2016 Filing 140 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #131 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Continue the Case Management Conference Pursuant to Local Rules 7-11 and 16-2 re 104 Clerk's Notice, ) filed byJane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
December 8, 2016 Filing 139 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith. (Ramirez, Nicole) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER denying #119 Administrative Motion TO ADVANCE THE HEARING DATE OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/8/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
December 8, 2016 Filing 137 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for MD Anderson Cancer Center (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Karlsgodt, Paul) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
December 7, 2016 Filing 136 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options of Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
December 7, 2016 Filing 135 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 12/7/2016 with Tamara Lange. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled on 3/29/2017 at 10:30 AM. Please use the same call-in information. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 7, 2016 Filing 134 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Melanoma Research Foundation (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Holtzman, David) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
December 7, 2016 Filing 133 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Adventist Health System Sunbelt Healthcare Corporation (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Holtzman, David) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
December 7, 2016 Filing 132 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for American Cancer Society (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Holtzman, David) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
December 6, 2016 Filing 131 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Continue the Case Management Conference Pursuant to Local Rules 7-11 and 16-2 re 104 Clerk's Notice, filed by Facebook, Inc.. Responses due by 12/12/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Nadolenco, #2 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
December 6, 2016 Filing 130 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Parties and Counsel (Rabkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
December 5, 2016 Filing 129 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 12/5/2016)
December 5, 2016 Filing 128 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Facebook, Inc.. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 12/5/2016)
December 5, 2016 Filing 127 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook, Inc. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 12/5/2016)
November 29, 2016 Filing 126 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiff Winston Smith (Ramirez, Nicole) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
November 28, 2016 Filing 125 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on December 7, 2016 at 12:00 PM Pacific Standard Time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
November 23, 2016 Filing 124 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Ramirez, Nicole) (Filed on 11/23/2016)
November 23, 2016 Filing 123 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiff Jane Doe II (Ramirez, Nicole) (Filed on 11/23/2016)
November 23, 2016 Filing 122 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiff Jane Doe I (Ramirez, Nicole) (Filed on 11/23/2016)
November 21, 2016 Filing 121 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #119 Administrative Motion to advance the hearing date ) filed byAdventist Health System, American Cancer Society, Inc., American Society of Clinical Oncology, Inc., BJC Healthcare, Cleveland Clinic, Melanoma Research Foundation, University of Texas - MD Anderson Cancer Center. (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
November 18, 2016 Filing 120 Declaration of NICOLE RAMIREZ in Support of #119 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to advance the hearing date of plaintiffs Motion for Injunctive relief to the same date as the currently scheduled initial case management conference filed by Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith. (Related document(s) #119 ) (Ramirez, Nicole) (Filed on 11/18/2016) Modified on 11/18/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 18, 2016 Filing 119 Administrative Motion to advance the hearing date of plaintiffs Motion for Injunctive relief to the same date as the currently scheduled initial case management conference filed by Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith. Responses due by 11/22/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ramirez, Nicole) (Filed on 11/18/2016) Modified on 11/18/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2016 Filing 118 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. The Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint #96 filed by Defendants before Judge Edward J. Davila previously noticed for 11/17/2016 at 9:00 AM has been taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civ. L.R. 7-1(b). The Motion to Dismiss hearing is VACATED, NO APPEARANCE REQUIRED. The Court to issue further Order on the submitted motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Granting #116 Stipulated Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Pursuant to stipulation of the parties Opposition is due 2/13/2017 and reply is due 3/6/2017. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/21/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2016)
October 21, 2016 ***Reset Deadlines pursuant to #117 Order as to #110 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Opposition due by 2/23/2017. Replies due by 3/6/2017. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2016)
October 20, 2016 Filing 116 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #110 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BJC Healthcare. (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 10/20/2016)
October 14, 2016 Filing 115 Declaration of Timothy Libert in Support of #110 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byJane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith. (Related document(s) #110 ) (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
October 14, 2016 Filing 114 Declaration of Jane Doe II in Support of #110 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byJane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith. (Related document(s) #110 ) (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
October 14, 2016 Filing 113 Declaration of Jane Doe I in Support of #110 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byJane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith. (Related document(s) #110 ) (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
October 14, 2016 Filing 112 Declaration of Winston Smith in Support of #110 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byJane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith. (Related document(s) #110 ) (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
October 14, 2016 Filing 111 Declaration of Jason "Jay" Barnes in Support of #110 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byJane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith. (Related document(s) #110 ) (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
October 14, 2016 Filing 110 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith. Motion Hearing set for 4/13/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 10/28/2016. Replies due by 11/4/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
August 22, 2016 Filing 109 REPLY (re #96 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint ) filed byAdventist Health System, American Cancer Society, Inc., American Society of Clinical Oncology, Inc., BJC Healthcare, Cleveland Clinic, Facebook, Inc., Melanoma Research Foundation, University of Texas - MD Anderson Cancer Center. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 8/22/2016)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER denying without prejudice #80 Motion for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Counsel. The hearing scheduled for 8/18/2016 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/8/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Granting #106 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Andrew Lyskowski, Counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/4/2016.(amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
August 3, 2016 Filing 106 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10658393.) filed by Winston Smith. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Admission as as Attorney at Law)(Lyskowski, Andrew) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
August 1, 2016 Filing 105 RESPONSE (re #96 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint ) PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS filed byJane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith. (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
July 11, 2016 Filing 104 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING AUGUST 18, 2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: 8/18/2016 Case Management Conference is reset to 12/15/2016 at 10:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2016. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY STEVEN M. DETTELBACH PRO HAC VICE, granting #100 . Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 7/1/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY DANIEL R. WARREN PRO HAC VICE, granting #98 . Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 7/1/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY DAVID CARNEY PRO HAC VICE, granting #97 . Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 7/1/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 30, 2016 Filing 100 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Steven Dettelbach ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10574757.) filed by Cleveland Clinic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate)(Dettelbach, Steven) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 30, 2016 Filing 99 Request for Judicial Notice re #96 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed byUniversity of Texas - MD Anderson Cancer Center. (Related document(s) #96 ) (Chow, Teresa) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 30, 2016 Filing 98 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Daniel Warren ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10574688.) Filing fee previously paid on 6/30/2016 filed by Cleveland Clinic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate)(Warren, Daniel) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 30, 2016 Filing 97 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for David Carney ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10573442.) Filing fee previously paid on 6/30/2016 filed by Cleveland Clinic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate)(Carney, David) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 30, 2016 Filing 96 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Adventist Health System, American Cancer Society, Inc., American Society of Clinical Oncology, Inc., BJC Healthcare, Cleveland Clinic, Facebook, Inc., Melanoma Research Foundation, University of Texas - MD Anderson Cancer Center. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 8/1/2016. Replies due by 8/22/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 30, 2016 Filing 95 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Matthew D Pearson for The University of Texas - MD Anderson Cancer Center (Pearson, Matthew) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 30, 2016 Filing 94 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Matthew D Pearson for Cleveland Clinic Foundation (Pearson, Matthew) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 29, 2016 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Gallo White for Defendant BJC HealthCare (White, Lauren) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
June 29, 2016 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Teresa Carey Chow for The University of Texas - MD Anderson Cancer Center (Chow, Teresa) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
June 29, 2016 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Teresa Carey Chow for Cleveland Clinic Foundation (Chow, Teresa) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
June 21, 2016 Filing 90 Statement of Non-Opposition re #80 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) #80 ) (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #74 Stipulated Motion for Administrative Relief. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/17/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2016)
June 16, 2016 Filing 88 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM 8/4/2016 to 8/18/2016. Case Management Statement due by 8/11/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/18/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
June 8, 2016 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J Weibell for defendant BJC Healthcare (Weibell, Anthony) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
June 7, 2016 Filing 86 Declaration of Amy Collignon Gunn in Support of #80 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith. (Related document(s) #80 ) (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/7/2016) Modified on 6/8/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2016 Filing 85 Declaration of Andrew S. Lyskowski in Support of #80 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith. (Related document(s) #80 ) (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/7/2016) Modified on 6/8/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2016 Filing 84 Declaration of Barry R. Eichen in Support of #80 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith. (Related document(s) #80 ) (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/7/2016) Modified on 6/8/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2016 Filing 83 Declaration of Jason Barnes in Support of #80 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith. (Related document(s) #80 ) (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/7/2016) Modified on 6/8/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2016 Filing 82 Declaration of Stephen M. Gorny in Support of #80 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith. (Related document(s) #80 ) (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/7/2016) Modified on 6/8/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2016 Filing 81 Declaration of Paul R. Kiesel in Support of #80 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith. (Related document(s) #80 ) (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/7/2016) Modified on 6/8/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2016 Filing 80 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith. Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 6/21/2016. Replies due by 6/28/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/7/2016) Modified on 6/8/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Order Granting #65 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Casie Collignon for Univ. of Texas-MD Anderson Cancer Ctr. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 6/3/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Order Granting #64 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paul Karlsgodt for Univ. of Texas-MD Anderson Cancer Ctr. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 6/3/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Order Granting #72 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ashley Smith for Plaintiffs. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 6/3/2016.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting #71 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Evan J. Rosenberg for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/3/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Order Granting #70 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Barry Eichen for Plaintiffs. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 6/3/2016.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
May 16, 2016 Filing 74 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Regarding Responses to Complaint and Subsequent Briefing filed by Facebook, Inc.. Responses due by 5/20/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 73 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/28/2016 before Hon. Edward J. Davila by Adventist Health System, American Cancer Society, Inc., Melanoma Research Foundation, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Kern, John) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 10, 2016 Filing 72 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10439289.) filed by Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith. (Smith, Ashley) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
May 10, 2016 Filing 71 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10436994.) filed by Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith. (Rosenberg, Evan) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
May 9, 2016 Filing 70 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10436034.) filed by Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith. (Eichen, Barry) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
May 9, 2016 Filing 69 Letter from Ashley A. Smith, Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice . (Smith, Ashley) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
May 9, 2016 Filing 68 Letter from Evan J. Rosenberg, Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice . (Rosenberg, Evan) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
May 9, 2016 Filing 67 Letter from Barry R. Eichen, Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice . (Eichen, Barry) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
May 9, 2016 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Filing fee not paid. Please pay the filing fee through Pay.gov. [err701]Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #68 Letter filed by Winston Smith, Jane Doe II, Jane Doe I (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
May 9, 2016 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Filing fee not paid. Please pay the filing fee through Pay.gov by clicking on Civil > Other Documents > Filing Fee in CM/ECF. [err701]Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #67 Letter filed by Winston Smith, Jane Doe II, Jane Doe I (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
May 9, 2016 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Filing fee not paid. Please pay the filing fee through Pay.gov [err701]Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #69 Letter filed by Winston Smith, Jane Doe II, Jane Doe I (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
May 6, 2016 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith re #14 Summons Issued as to BJC Healthcare (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
May 6, 2016 Filing 65 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Casie D. Collignon ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10431425.) filed by University of Texas - MD Anderson Cancer Center. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing-Colorado)(Collignon, Casie) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
May 6, 2016 Filing 64 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Paul G. Karlsgodt ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10431193.) filed by University of Texas - MD Anderson Cancer Center. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - Colorado, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Washington)(Karlsgodt, Paul) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
May 4, 2016 Filing 63 Certificate of Interested Entities by University of Texas - MD Anderson Cancer Center (Forsheit, Tanya) (Filed on 5/4/2016)
May 4, 2016 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Tanya Lee Forsheit of Baker & Hostetler LLP (Forsheit, Tanya) (Filed on 5/4/2016)
April 22, 2016 Filing 61 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cleveland Clinic (Forsheit, Tanya) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
April 22, 2016 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Tanya Lee Forsheit (Forsheit, Tanya) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
April 22, 2016 Filing 59 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Move, Plead or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Cleveland Clinic. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1(a) IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by and between the Parties, through their respective counsel, that the Clinic shall have up to and including May 31, 2016 to move or plead in response to the Complaint and that the Clinic reserves all rights and defenses including, without limitation, all rights and defenses with respect to venue and jurisdiction. (Forsheit, Tanya) (Filed on 4/22/2016) Modified text on 4/25/2016 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2016 Filing 58 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Stipulation For Extension Of Time To Respond To The Complaint filed by BJC Healthcare. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1(a) Defendant BJC Healthcare shall have up to and including May 31, 2016 to move or plead in response to the Complaint and that BJC reserves all rights and defenses including, without limitation, all rights and defenses with respect to venue and jurisdiction.(Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 4/20/2016) Modified text on 4/21/2016 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2016 Filing 57 Certificate of Interested Entities by BJC Healthcare (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
April 20, 2016 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael H. Rubin on behalf of BJC HealthCare (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
April 19, 2016 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith re #19 Summons Issued as to University of Texas - MD Anderson Cancer Center (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Order Granting #41 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lauren Goldman for Facebook, Inc. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 4/18/2016.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2016)
April 18, 2016 Filing 53 (Text Only) CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/28/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/4/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2016)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Order Granting #49 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brandy Ranjan for American Society of Clinical Oncology. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 4/18/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2016)
April 15, 2016 Filing 51 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
April 15, 2016 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith re #18 Summons Issued as to Cleveland Clinic (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
April 15, 2016 Filing 49 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10374270.) filed by American Society of Clinical Oncology, Inc.. (McDonald, Alexandra) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
April 14, 2016 Filing 48 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant American Society of Clinical Oncology to Move or Plead in Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by American Society of Clinical Oncology, Inc. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1(a) IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by and between the parties, through their respective counsel, that ASCO shall have up to and including May 31, 2016 to move or plead in response to the Complaint and that ASCO reserves all rights and defenses including, without limitation, all rights and defenses with respect to venue and jurisdiction. (McDonald, Alexandra) (Filed on 4/14/2016) Modified text on 4/15/2016 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2016 Filing 47 Certificate of Interested Entities by American Society of Clinical Oncology, Inc. (McDonald, Alexandra) (Filed on 4/14/2016)
April 14, 2016 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Alford McDonald Notice of Appearance of Jones Day as Counsel for Defendant American Society of Clinical Oncology, Inc. (McDonald, Alexandra) (Filed on 4/14/2016)
April 14, 2016 Filing 45 DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1 AND CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-15 by Adventist Health System, American Cancer Society, Inc., Melanoma Research Foundation. (Hurwitz, Shelley) (Filed on 4/14/2016) Modified on 4/14/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2016 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith re #16 Summons Issued as to American Society of Clinical Oncology, Inc. (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 4/13/2016. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
April 12, 2016 Filing 42 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
April 12, 2016 Filing 41 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney Lauren R. Goldman ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10364745.) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 4/12/2016) Modified on 4/13/2016 (srnS, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2016 Filing 40 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Adventist Health System, American Cancer Society, Inc., Melanoma Research Foundation.. (Hurwitz, Shelley) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
April 12, 2016 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Shelley Gershon Hurwitz , John Kern, and David I. Holtzman (Hurwitz, Shelley) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
April 12, 2016 Filing 38 STIPULATION TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 6-1(a) filed by Adventist Health System, American Cancer Society, Inc., Melanoma Research Foundation. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1(a) IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by and between Plaintiffs and Defendants, that Defendants will have additional time to answer or respond to the Complaint, which answer or response is due on or before May 31, 2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shelley G. Hurwitz)(Hurwitz, Shelley) (Filed on 4/12/2016) Modified text on 4/18/2016 (ecgS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/18/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2016 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith re #15 Summons Issued as to American Cancer Society, Inc. (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
April 11, 2016 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith re #20 Summons Issued as to Melanoma Research Foundation (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
April 8, 2016 Filing 35 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
April 8, 2016 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by John Nadolenco on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Amy Gunn Pro Hac Vice #32 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
April 8, 2016 Filing 32 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney Amy Gunn ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10355344.) filed by Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith. (Gunn, Amy) (Filed on 4/8/2016) Modified on 4/11/2016 (srnS, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Christopher Dandurand #30 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
April 4, 2016 Filing 30 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10343706.) filed by Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Dandurand, Christopher) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
March 31, 2016 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith re #17 Summons Issued as to Adventist Health System (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
March 31, 2016 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Winston Smith re #21 Summons Issued as to Facebook, Inc. (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Stephen Gorny Pro Hac Vice #26 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
March 29, 2016 Filing 26 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney Stephen M. Gorny ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10326086.) filed by Winston Smith. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Gorny, Stephen) (Filed on 3/29/2016) Modified on 3/30/2016 (srnS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Nimrod Chapel Pro Hac Vice #24 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
March 24, 2016 Filing 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10317360.) filed by Winston Smith. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Chapel, Nimrod) (Filed on 3/24/2016)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order granting #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice entered by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
March 24, 2016 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10314913.) filed by Winston Smith. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Barnes, Jay) (Filed on 3/24/2016)
March 16, 2016 Filing 21 Summons Issued as to Facebook, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 16, 2016 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Melanoma Research Foundation. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 16, 2016 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to University of Texas - MD Anderson Cancer Center. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 16, 2016 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Cleveland Clinic. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 16, 2016 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Adventist Health System. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 16, 2016 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to American Society of Clinical Oncology, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 16, 2016 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to American Cancer Society, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 16, 2016 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to BJC Healthcare. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 16, 2016 Filing 13 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/7/2016. Case Management Conference set for 6/14/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins for all further proceedings pursuant to Order of Recusal. Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 3/16/2016. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 3/16/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 16, 2016 Filing 10 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. by 3/30/2016. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 15, 2016 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
March 15, 2016 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
March 15, 2016 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
March 15, 2016 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
March 15, 2016 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
March 15, 2016 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
March 15, 2016 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
March 15, 2016 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
March 15, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adventist Health System, American Cancer Society, Inc., American Society of Clinical Oncology, Inc., BJC Healthcare, Cleveland Clinic, Facebook, Inc., Melanoma Research Foundation, University of Texas - MD Anderson Cancer Center ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10292326.). Filed byJane Doe II, Jane Doe I, Winston Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - F, #2 Exhibits G - K, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Koncius, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/15/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Facebook, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren R Goldman
Represented By: John Nadolenco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BJC Healthcare
Represented By: Michael H. Rubin
Represented By: Anthony J Weibell
Represented By: Lauren Gallo White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Texas - MD Anderson Cancer Center
Represented By: Teresa Carey Chow
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Represented By: Matthew D. Pearson
Represented By: Tanya Lee Forsheit
Represented By: Casie Dell Collignon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Cancer Society, Inc.
Represented By: Shelley Gershon Hurwitz
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: John Palmer Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Society of Clinical Oncology, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Rabkin
Represented By: Brian G Selden
Represented By: Alexandra Alford McDonald
Represented By: Brandy Hutton Ranjan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adventist Health System
Represented By: Shelley Gershon Hurwitz
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: John Palmer Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleveland Clinic
Represented By: Teresa Carey Chow
Represented By: Steven M. Dettelbach
Represented By: Matthew D. Pearson
Represented By: Daniel Rubin Warren
Represented By: Tanya Lee Forsheit
Represented By: David A. Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanoma Research Foundation
Represented By: Shelley Gershon Hurwitz
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: John Palmer Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe I
Represented By: Nicole Ramirez
Represented By: Ashley Ann Smith
Represented By: Stephen M Gorny
Represented By: Christopher David Dandurand
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Koncius
Represented By: Jay Barnes
Represented By: Barry R Eichen
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Evan J. Rosenberg
Represented By: Amy Collignon Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winston Smith
Represented By: Nicole Ramirez
Represented By: Ashley Ann Smith
Represented By: Stephen M Gorny
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Koncius
Represented By: Jay Barnes
Represented By: Nimrod Thomas Chapel, Jr.
Represented By: Barry R Eichen
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Evan J. Rosenberg
Represented By: Andrew Stephan Lyskowski
Represented By: Amy Collignon Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe II
Represented By: Nicole Ramirez
Represented By: Ashley Ann Smith
Represented By: Stephen M Gorny
Represented By: Christopher David Dandurand
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Koncius
Represented By: Jay Barnes
Represented By: Barry R Eichen
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Evan J. Rosenberg
Represented By: Amy Collignon Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?