United States of America v. Cade Corporation

Petitioner: United States Of America
Respondent: Cade Corporation
Case Number: 5:2016cv01996
Filed: April 15, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT granting 15 Application. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/23/2017 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/18/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
August 26, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 1 Verified Petition to Enforce IRS Summons. Respondent is directed to obey the summons issued. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 8/26/2016. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2016)
July 1, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Donato denying 5 Motion to Relate Case. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
May 24, 2016 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE ENFORCEMENT OF INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE SUMMONS. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/7/2016 09:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 6/16/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/24/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Cade Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States Of America
Represented By: Thomas Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cade Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?