GoPro, Inc. v. C&A Marketing, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: GoPro, Inc.
Defendant: C&A Marketing, Inc., C&A Licensing, LLC and PLR IP Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 5:2016cv03590
Filed: June 27, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2017 83 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 82 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by GoPro, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 8/16/2017 at 5:00 PM. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 1, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2017)
July 24, 2017 80 Opinion or Order of the Court CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 24, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
June 15, 2017 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 40 Motion to Stay. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
May 30, 2017 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 54 Motion to Strike. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
May 24, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 54 MOTION to Strike Declaration of Alan C. Bovik - Stipulation to Set an Earlier Hearing Date filed by GoPro, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 24, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2017)
May 16, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 47 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 39 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint Stipulation, Notice and [Proposed] Order filed by GoPro, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 16, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
May 8, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Time for Plaintiff to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay filed by GoPro, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 8, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2017)
May 1, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Time for Defendants to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File filed by GoPro, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 1, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
March 9, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Time To Serve Damages Contentions and Responsive Damages Contentions filed by GoPro, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 9, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
January 18, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Serve Invalidity Contentions and Exchange Preliminary Claim Constructions filed by C&A Marketing, Inc., C&A Licensing, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 18, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
October 3, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 25 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by GoPro, Inc. filed by GoPro, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 3, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
September 20, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of Initial Case Management Conference filed by C&A Marketing, Inc., PLR IP Holdings, LLC, C&A Licensing, LLC. Case Management Statement due by 10/7/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 20, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GoPro, Inc. v. C&A Marketing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GoPro, Inc.
Represented By: Mehrnaz Boroumand Smith
Represented By: Steven David Moore
Represented By: Darius C. Samerotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&A Marketing, Inc.
Represented By: Nathaniel Bryan Sabri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&A Licensing, LLC
Represented By: Nathaniel Bryan Sabri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLR IP Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Nathaniel Bryan Sabri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?