Chan v. Time Warner Inc et al
Plaintiff: Chan and Peng Chan
Defendant: TimeWarner Inc, Jim Barksdale, TimeWarner, Inc., Chris DeWolfe, Edgar Bronfman, Jr, Mazher Mahmood, News Corporation, Inc., Alphabet, Inc., John Hanke and Barry Diller
Intervenor: Brad Greenspan
Case Number: 5:2016cv06268
Filed: October 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
2 Judge: Howard R Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Filing 70 USCA Memorandum AFFIRMED as to #68 Notice of Appeal, filed by Peng Chan (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2018) Modified on 10/30/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2018 Filing 69 USCA Case Number 18-15412 9th circuit court of appeals for #68 Notice of Appeal, filed by Peng Chan. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2018)
March 13, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Peng Chan. Appeal of Order on Motion for Reconsideration #67 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-12182437 paid.) (Attachments: #1Order Denying Motion for reconsideration(Peterson, Jared) (Filed on 3/13/2018) Modified on 3/13/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER DENYING #64 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/26/2018. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
October 31, 2017 Filing 66 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #64 MOTION for Reconsideration ) filed byTimeWarner, Inc.. (Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 18, 2017 Filing 65 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING ON MOTION. Please take NOTICE that the motion hearing as to #64 Motion for Reconsideration is set for 3/1/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 10/31/2017. Replies due by 11/7/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 17, 2017 Filing 64 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Peng Chan. (Peterson, Jared) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER terminating #62 Motion. Plaintiff may re-file the motion only after obtaining an appropriate hearing date from the Courtroom Deputy. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/12/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2017)
October 11, 2017 Filing 62 MOTION for Reconsideration re #60 Order on Motion for Recusal, filed by Peng Chan. (Peterson, Jared) (Filed on 10/11/2017)
September 13, 2017 Filing 61 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/13/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2017)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DENYING #55 , #56 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECUSAL AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/13/2017. The Clerk shall close this file. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2017) Modified on 9/13/2017 (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2017 Filing 59 ADR Remark: The ADR phone conference set for August 21, 2017, at 10:30 am is off calendar . The parties shall contact the ADR Unit to set a new ADR phone conference date when the Court sets a new case management conference date. (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 17, 2017 Filing 58 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #56 MOTION for Leave to File motion for reconsideration ) /Defendant Time Warner's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to file a Motion for Reconsideration filed byTimeWarner, Inc.. (Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 8/17/2017)
August 17, 2017 Filing 57 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #55 MOTION for Recusal ) Defendant Time Warner's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion For Recusal filed byTimeWarner, Inc.. (Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 8/17/2017)
August 3, 2017 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Peng Chan. (Peterson, Jared) (Filed on 8/3/2017) Modified on 8/4/2017 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2017 Filing 55 MOTION for Recusal filed by Peng Chan. Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 8/17/2017. Replies due by 8/24/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Peterson, Jared) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
July 27, 2017 ***Set OSC Deadlines pursuant to ECF #54 OSC Order (no hearing set): Show Cause Response due by 8/3/2017. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2017)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/27/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2017)
July 19, 2017 Filing 53 NOTICE by TimeWarner, Inc. re #52 Order on Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief, Order on Motion for More Definite Statement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 7/19/2017)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING #25 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/20/2017. The 6/22/2017 hearing is vacated. No appearance necessary. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
February 17, 2017 Filing 51 REPLY (re #25 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief MOTION for More Definite Statement ) /Defendant Time Warner's Reply ISO Motion for More Definite Statement filed byTimeWarner, Inc.. (Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
February 14, 2017 Filing 50 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 2/14/2017 with Howard Herman. Plaintiff's counsel failed to appear. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled on 8/21/2017 at 10:30 AM. The call-in information remains the same. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
February 14, 2017 Filing 49 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #25 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief MOTION for More Definite Statement ) Opposition to Motion for More Definite Statement filed byPeng Chan. (Peterson, Jared) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/9/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
February 9, 2017 Filing 47 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER /Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines filed by TimeWarner, Inc.. (Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
February 6, 2017 Filing 46 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Intervene (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
February 2, 2017 Filing 45 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on February 14, 2017 at 10:30 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
February 2, 2017 Filing 44 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Kaplan, Adam) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
January 31, 2017 Filing 43 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options /ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Kaplan, Adam) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
January 31, 2017 Filing 42 ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING #40 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 6-1 AND 6-2. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/30/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
January 27, 2017 Filing 40 STIPULATION Stipulation to Extend Time filed by Peng Chan. (Peterson, Jared) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 25, 2017 Filing 39 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #31 MOTION to Compel ) /Defendant Time Warner's Opposition to Non-Party Brad Greenspan's Petition to Compel Arbitration filed byTimeWarner, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service to Defendant Time Warner's Opposition to Non-Party Brad Greenspan's Petition to Compel Arbitration)(Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
January 25, 2017 Filing 38 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #27 MOTION to Intervene ) /Defendant Time Warner's Opposition to Brad Greenspan's Motion to Intervene filed byTimeWarner, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service to Defendant Time Warner's Opposition to Brad Greenspan's Motion to Intervene)(Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen for all further discovery proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/20/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
January 17, 2017 Filing 36 Clerk's DECLINATION OF DEFAULT as to TIMEWARNER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (Related documents(s) #33 )(pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
January 17, 2017 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn Douglas Pomerantz (Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
January 17, 2017 Filing 34 Certificate of Interested Entities by TimeWarner, Inc. Defendant Time Warner's Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement And Civil Local Rule 3-15 Certification Of Interested Entities Or Persons (Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
January 13, 2017 Filing 26 Request for Judicial Notice re #25 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by TimeWarner, Inc.. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 1/13/2017) Modified on 1/13/2017 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2017 Filing 25 MOTION for More Definite Statement /; Memorandum Of Points Of Authorities filed by TimeWarner, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 1/27/2017. Replies due by 2/3/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order(Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 1/13/2017) Modified on 1/13/2017 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2017 Filing 33 MOTION for Entry of Default against Third Party Plaintiff Time Warner, Inc., filed by Brad Greenspan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
January 11, 2017 Filing 32 Proposed Order re #31 MOTION to Compel by Brad Greenspan. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
January 11, 2017 Filing 31 PETITION to Compel Arbitration filed by Brad Greenspan. Responses due by 1/25/2017. Replies due by 2/1/2017. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
January 11, 2017 Filing 30 Proposed Order re #27 MOTION to Intervene by Brad Greenspan. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
January 11, 2017 Filing 29 Declaration of Brad Greenspan in Support of #27 MOTION to Intervene filed by Brad Greenspan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #27 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
January 11, 2017 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support re #27 MOTION to Intervene filed byBrad Greenspan. (Related document(s) #27 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
January 11, 2017 Filing 27 MOTION to Intervene for limited purpose filed by Brad Greenspan. Responses due by 1/25/2017. Replies due by 2/1/2017. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
January 11, 2017 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Peng Chan (Peterson, Jared) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/30/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2016)
December 30, 2016 Filing 22 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1 filed by TimeWarner, Inc.. (Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 12/30/2016)
December 15, 2016 Filing 21 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/9/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/16/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
December 15, 2016 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] Re: #17 Notice (Other) filed by Peng Chan (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Edward J. Davila and for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd remains as referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 12/15/2016. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
December 15, 2016 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
December 14, 2016 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT 1st Amended Complaint against All Defendants. Filed byPeng Chan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits)(Peterson, Jared) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
December 14, 2016 Filing 17 ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT*** NOTICE by Peng Chan Declination to proceed before magistrate judge. (Peterson, Jared) (Filed on 12/14/2016) Modified text on 12/15/2016 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2016 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Consent/Declination due by 12/14/2016. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
November 8, 2016 Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #6 Proposed Summons filed by Peng Chan. Counsel submitted a summons for Kleiner Perkins Caufield LLC. Kleiner Perkins Caufield LLC is not named as a defendant on the complaint. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
November 8, 2016 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to TimeWarner, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
November 8, 2016 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to News Corporation, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
November 8, 2016 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Mazher Mahmood. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
November 8, 2016 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to John Hanke. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
November 8, 2016 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Barry Diller. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
November 8, 2016 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Chris DeWolfe. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
November 8, 2016 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Edgar Bronfman, Jr. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
November 8, 2016 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Jim Barksdale. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
November 8, 2016 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Alphabet, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
November 7, 2016 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Peterson, Jared) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 7, 2016 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety using the correct event Proposed Summons. Re: #5 Complaint filed by Peng Chan. ECF E-FILING EVENTS, TUTORIAL AND TRAINING CAN BE FOUND ON THE COURT'S WEBSITE (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 4, 2016 Filing 5 ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT*** COMPLAINT Summons against All Defendants. Filed byPeng Chan. (Peterson, Jared) (Filed on 11/4/2016) Modified text on 11/7/2016 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2016 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #4 Complaint filed by Peng Chan (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
November 2, 2016 Filing 4 Exhibits re #1 Complaint against All Defendants. Filed by Peng Chan. (Peterson, Jared) (Filed on 11/2/2016) Modified on 11/3/2016 incorrect event selected when posting document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2016 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/24/2017. Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2016)
October 31, 2016 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/14/2016. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2016)
October 30, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10891488.). Filed byPeng Chan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Peterson, Jared) (Filed on 10/30/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chan v. Time Warner Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TimeWarner Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Barksdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TimeWarner, Inc.
Represented By: Glenn Douglas Pomerantz
Represented By: Adam Isaac Kaplan
Represented By: Bradley Stuart Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris DeWolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgar Bronfman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mazher Mahmood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: News Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphabet, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hanke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Diller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peng Chan
Represented By: Jared Daniel Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Brad Greenspan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?