Perez v. Target Corporation

Plaintiff: Deysi Perez
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 5:2016cv06638
Filed: November 16, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 16, 2018 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Re: Dkt. No. 38 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/16/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
December 5, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Re: Dkt. No. 28 . By 12/12/2017, Perez must file a response to this order indicating intent to prosecute the case. Plaintiff's counsel must serve this order on the plaintiff and file proof of service, also by 12/12. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/5/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
November 16, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Perez must respond to this order within 7 days, by 11/23/2017. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 11/16/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Gail C. Trabish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deysi Perez
Represented By: Robert Emanuel Haberer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?