Green et al v. Page et al
Plaintiff: Ian Green, Steve Sims and Leo Shumacher
Defendant: Larry Page, Alan R. Mulally, Diane B. Greene, Alphabet Inc., Ruth M. Porat, John L. Hennessy, Roger W. Ferguson, Jr., Ann Mather, Amit Singhal, Shirley M. Tilghman, Andrew E. Rubin, Sergey Brin, Eric E. Schmidt, K. Ram Shriram, L. John Doerr, David C. Drummond and Sundar Pichai
Interested Party: Joseph Lipovich
Case Number: 5:2019cv01165
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Filing 40 DECLARATION of Sanders in Opposition to #39 Opposition/Response to Motion to Stay filed byLeo Shumacher, Steve Sims. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) #39 ) (Sanders, Shane) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 39 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #15 MOTION to Stay Shareholder Derivative Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof ) filed byIan Green, Leo Shumacher, Steve Sims. (Sanders, Shane) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 38 **CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING HEARING DATE** The previously-scheduled hearing for #15 MOTION to Stay Shareholder Derivative Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof is ADVANCED to July 11, 2019 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California before the Hon. Lucy H. Koh. All other hearings and deadliness remain as set. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING RELIEF FROM REFERRAL TO ADR PROGRAM #35 #36 .(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 22, 2019 Filing 36 STIPULATION filed by Alphabet Inc., Sergey Brin, L. John Doerr, David C. Drummond, Roger W. Ferguson, Jr., Diane B. Greene, John L. Hennessy, Ann Mather, Alan R. Mulally, Larry Page, Sundar Pichai, Ruth M. Porat, Eric E. Schmidt, K. Ram Shriram, Shirley M. Tilghman. (Feldman, Boris) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 22, 2019 Filing 35 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Relief from Referral to ADR Program filed by Alphabet Inc., Sergey Brin, L. John Doerr, David C. Drummond, Roger W. Ferguson, Jr., Diane B. Greene, John L. Hennessy, Ann Mather, Alan R. Mulally, Larry Page, Sundar Pichai, Ruth M. Porat, Eric E. Schmidt, K. Ram Shriram, Shirley M. Tilghman. Responses due by 4/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion for Relief From Referral to ADR Program)(Feldman, Boris) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 19, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Ian Green, Leo Shumacher, Steve Sims, Joseph Lipovich. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 5/3/2019. Replies due by 5/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Sanders, Shane) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leo Shumacher, Steve Sims. Andrew E. Rubin served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019; Amit Singhal served on 3/26/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. (Oddo, Stephen) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety using correct event "Summons Returned Executed". Re: #32 Certificate of Service fi led by Steve Sims, Leo Shumacher, Ian Green (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 32 ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT*** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ian Green, Leo Shumacher, Steve Sims for Andrew E. Rubin & Amit Singhal (Oddo, Stephen) (Filed on 4/8/2019) Modified text on 4/8/2019 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2019 Filing 31 STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by Andrew E. Rubin. (Tough, Margaret) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #26 Stipulation Modifying Briefing Schedule on Motion to Stay.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 29 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Amit Singhal. (Weiss, Olivia) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
April 3, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety using correct event "Summons Returned Executed". Re: #28 Certificate of Service fi led by Steve Sims, Leo Shumacher, Ian Green (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
April 2, 2019 Filing 28 ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT***CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ian Green, Leo Shumacher, Steve Sims for Amit Singhal (Robbins, Brian) (Filed on 4/2/2019) Modified text on 4/3/2019 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2019 Filing 27 Declaration of Benjamin M. Crosson in Support of #26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #15 MOTION to Stay Shareholder Derivative Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof, Set/Reset Hearings Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Modifying Briefing Schedule on Mo tion to Stay filed byAlphabet Inc., Sergey Brin, L. John Doerr, David C. Drummond, Roger W. Ferguson, Jr., Diane B. Greene, John L. Hennessy, Ann Mather, Alan R. Mulally, Larry Page, Sundar Pichai, Ruth M. Porat, Eric E. Schmidt, K. Ram Shriram, Shirley M. Tilghman. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Crosson, Benjamin) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
April 1, 2019 Filing 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #15 MOTION to Stay Shareholder Derivative Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof, Set/Reset Hearings Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Modifying Briefing Schedule on Motion to Stay filed by Alphabet Inc., Sergey Brin, L. John Doerr, David C. Drummond, Roger W. Ferguson, Jr., Diane B. Greene, John L. Hennessy, Ann Mather, Alan R. Mulally, Larry Page, Sundar Pichai, Ruth M. Porat, Eric E. Schmidt, K. Ram Shriram, Shirley M. Tilghman. (Feldman, Boris) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE by Amit Singhal , specifically, Notice of Joinder (Croley, Daniel) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Croley , specifically, Notice of Appearance of Counsel of Record (Croley, Daniel) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 23 **CLERK'S NOTICE** Following the case reassignment to Hon. Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for July 3, 2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due 7 days prior. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 28, 2019 Per #22 Renotice motion hearing, Hearing for Motion to Stay set for 8/1/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 27, 2019 Filing 22 Renotice motion hearing re #15 MOTION to Stay Shareholder Derivative Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed byAlphabet Inc., Sergey Brin, L. John Doerr, David C. Drummond, Roger W. Ferguson, Jr., Diane B. Greene, John L. Hennessy, Ann Mather, Alan R. Mulally, Larry Page, Sundar Pichai, Ruth M. Porat, Eric E. Schmidt, K. Ram Shriram, Shirley M. Tilghman. (Related document(s) #15 ) (Feldman, Boris) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 3/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2019)
March 26, 2019 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 19 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Alphabet Inc., Sergey Brin, L. John Doerr, David C. Drummond, Roger W. Ferguson, Jr., Diane B. Greene, John L. Hennessy, Ann Mather, Alan R. Mulally, Larry Page, Sundar Pichai, Ruth M. Porat, Eric E. Schmidt, K. Ram Shriram, Shirley M. Tilghman.. (Feldman, Boris) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Whitney Weber on behalf of Andrew E. Rubin (Weber, Whitney) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Tough on behalf of Andrew E. Rubin (Tough, Margaret) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT [UNREDACTED] Verified Stockholder Derivative Complaint against Alphabet Inc., Sergey Brin, L. John Doerr, David C. Drummond, Roger W. Ferguson, Jr., Diane B. Greene, John L. Hennessy, Ann Mather, Alan R. Mulally, Larry Page, Sundar Pichai, Ruth M. Porat, Andrew E. Rubin, Eric E. Schmidt, K. Ram Shriram, Amit Singhal, Shirley M. Tilghman. Filed byLeo Shumacher, Ian Green, Steve Sims. (Robbins, Brian) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay Shareholder Derivative Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Alphabet Inc., Sergey Brin, L. John Doerr, David C. Drummond, Roger W. Ferguson, Jr., Diane B. Greene, John L. Hennessy, Ann Mather, Alan R. Mulally, Larry Page, Sundar Pichai, Ruth M. Porat, Eric E. Schmidt, K. Ram Shriram, Shirley M. Tilghman. Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Responses due by 4/1/2019. Replies due by 4/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of B. Crosson with Exhs A-E, #2 Proposed Order)(Feldman, Boris) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Leo Shumacher, Ian Green, Steve Sims. Service waived by Alphabet Inc. waiver sent on 3/14/2019, answer due 5/13/2019; Sergey Brin waiver sent on 3/14/2019, answer due 5/13/2019; L. John Doerr waiver sent on 3/14/2019, answer due 5/13/2019; David C. Drummond waiver sent on 3/14/2019, answer due 5/13/2019; Roger W. Ferguson, Jr. waiver sent on 3/14/2019, answer due 5/13/2019; Diane B. Greene waiver sent on 3/14/2019, answer due 5/13/2019; John L. Hennessy waiver sent on 3/14/2019, answer due 5/13/2019; Ann Mather waiver sent on 3/14/2019, answer due 5/13/2019; Alan R. Mulally waiver sent on 3/14/2019, answer due 5/13/2019; Larry Page waiver sent on 3/14/2019, answer due 5/13/2019; Sundar Pichai waiver sent on 3/14/2019, answer due 5/13/2019; Ruth M. Porat waiver sent on 3/14/2019, answer due 5/13/2019; Eric E. Schmidt waiver sent on 3/14/2019, answer due 5/13/2019; K. Ram Shriram waiver sent on 3/14/2019, answer due 5/13/2019; Shirley M. Tilghman waiver sent on 3/14/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Arroyo, Felipe) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/27/2019. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL Re: Dkt. No. #4 . Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 03/12/19. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Joint Notice of Withdrawal (Feldman, Boris) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alphabet Inc., Sergey Brin, L. John Doerr, David C. Drummond, Roger W. Ferguson, Jr., Diane B. Greene, John L. Hennessy, Ann Mather, Alan R. Mulally, Larry Page, Sundar Pichai, Ruth M. Porat, Eric E. Schmidt, K. Ram Shriram, Shirley M. Tilghman and L.R. 3-15 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Feldman, Boris) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Boris Feldman , Benjamin M. Crosson and Laurie Smilan (Feldman, Boris) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Alphabet Inc., Sergey Brin, L. John Doerr, David C. Drummond, Roger W. Ferguson, Jr., Diane B. Greene, John L. Hennessy, Ann Mather, Alan R. Mulally, Larry Page, Sundar Pichai, Ruth M. Porat, Andrew E. Rubin, Eric E. Schmidt, K. Ram Shriram, Amit Singhal, Shirley M. Tilghman. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/18/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ian Green, Leo Shumacher, Steve Sims re #4 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Complaint (Robbins, Brian) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Complaint filed by Ian Green, Leo Shumacher, Steve Sims. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Redacted Version, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Version)(Robbins, Brian) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ian Green, Leo Shumacher, Steve Sims (Robbins, Brian) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Robbins, Brian) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Redacted Version) against Alphabet Inc., Sergey Brin, L. John Doerr, David C. Drummond, Roger W. Ferguson, Jr., Diane B. Greene, John L. Hennessy, Ann Mather, Alan R. Mulally, Larry Page, Sundar Pichai, Ruth M. Porat, Andrew E. Rubin, Eric E. Schmidt, K. Ram Shriram, Amit Singhal, Shirley M. Tilghman ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13136467.). Filed byLeo Shumacher, Ian Green, Steve Sims. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robbins, Brian) (Filed on 3/1/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green et al v. Page et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Page
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Benjamin Matthew Crosson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan R. Mulally
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Benjamin Matthew Crosson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane B. Greene
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Benjamin Matthew Crosson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphabet Inc.
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Benjamin Matthew Crosson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth M. Porat
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Benjamin Matthew Crosson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John L. Hennessy
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Benjamin Matthew Crosson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger W. Ferguson, Jr.
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Benjamin Matthew Crosson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Mather
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Benjamin Matthew Crosson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amit Singhal
Represented By: Daniel A. Croley
Represented By: Patricia L. Glaser
Represented By: Olivia Weiss
Represented By: Aaron Peter Allan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley M. Tilghman
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Benjamin Matthew Crosson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew E. Rubin
Represented By: Whitney Weber
Represented By: Margaret Tough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergey Brin
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Benjamin Matthew Crosson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric E. Schmidt
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Benjamin Matthew Crosson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Ram Shriram
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Benjamin Matthew Crosson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. John Doerr
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Benjamin Matthew Crosson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C. Drummond
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Benjamin Matthew Crosson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sundar Pichai
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Benjamin Matthew Crosson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Green
Represented By: Brian J. Robbins
Represented By: Felipe Javier Arroyo
Represented By: Shane Palmesano Sanders
Represented By: Craig Wallace Smith
Represented By: Stephen J. Oddo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Sims
Represented By: Brian J. Robbins
Represented By: Felipe Javier Arroyo
Represented By: Shane Palmesano Sanders
Represented By: Stephen J. Oddo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Shumacher
Represented By: Brian J. Robbins
Represented By: Felipe Javier Arroyo
Represented By: Shane Palmesano Sanders
Represented By: Stephen J. Oddo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Joseph Lipovich
Represented By: Shane Palmesano Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?