Ramirez et al v. Target Corporation

Plaintiff: Ulises Ramirez and Adriana Ramirez
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv01956
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER; ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE. Last to file and serve dispositive motions is 4/29/209. Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2019 at 02:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 7/20/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor 09:00 AM in San Jose. See order for further deadlines. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousisn on 6/21/2019. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. Re: ECF #15 . Private mediation to be completed by 10/31/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2019. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/21/2019. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Target Corporation. (Livingston, Renee) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 14 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification (Janoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 6, 2019 Filing 13 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Livingston, Renee) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 6, 2019 Filing 12 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING STIPLATION TO CONTUNE Case Management Conference to 6/26/2019 at 10:00 PM in Courtroom5, 4th Floor. Counsel may participate by telephone. Case Management Statement due by 6/19/2019. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Case Management Conference filed by Adriana Ramirez, Ulises Ramirez. (Janoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
April 25, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] *Re-File as Motion to Continue* Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #9 Affidavit filed by Adriana Ramirez, Ulis es Ramirez (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 24, 2019 Filing 9 **Filing Error** AFFIDAVIT Request for Continuance of Case Management Conference by Adriana Ramirez, Ulises Ramirez. (Janoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/24/2019) Modified on 4/25/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING the Initial Case Management Conference to 6/12/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Nathanael Cousins in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. Counsel may participate by telephone. Case Management Statement due by 6/5/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Adriana Ramirez, Ulises Ramirez.. (Janoff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Target Corporation.. (Livingston, Renee) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Target Corporation (Livingston, Renee) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Target Corporation (Livingston, Renee) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Answer to Removal Complaint (Exhibit B, Docket #1 ) by Target Corporation. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/25/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for removal of action against Target Corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13253063). Filed byTarget Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Livingston, Renee) (Filed on 4/11/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez et al v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ulises Ramirez
Represented By: Jeffrey David Janoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adriana Ramirez
Represented By: Jeffrey David Janoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Renee Welze Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?