Muhammad v. YouTube LLC et al
Plaintiff: Yakub Muhammad
Defendant: Alphabet Inc., Larry Page, Diane B. Greene, YouTube LLC, GOOG.O, Ann Mather, Roger W. Ferguson, Jr., k ram shriram, Alan R. Mulally, Sergey Brin, XXVI Holdings Inc, John L Hennessy, L. John Doerr, Eric E Schmidt, YouTube Entertainment Media LLC, Google LLC and Sundar Pichai
Case Number: 5:2019cv03083
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal #27 . (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alphabet Inc., Sergey Brin, L. John Doerr, Roger W. Ferguson, Jr, Google LLC, Diane B. Greene, John L Hennessy, Ann Mather, Alan R. Mulally, Larry Page, Sundar Pichai, Eric E Schmidt, XXVI Holdings Inc, YouTube Entertainment Media LLC, YouTube LLC, k ram shriram re #27 Stipulation, #26 Notice of Appearance (Reed Dippo, Samuel) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Alphabet Inc., Sergey Brin, L. John Doerr, Roger W. Ferguson, Jr, Google LLC, Diane B. Greene, John L Hennessy, Ann Mather, Alan R. Mulally, Larry Page, Sundar Pichai, Eric E Schmidt, XXVI Holdings Inc, YouTube Entertainment Media LLC, YouTube LLC, k ram shriram. (Reed Dippo, Samuel) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel James Reed Dippo on behalf of Defendants (Reed Dippo, Samuel) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 6/25/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 6, 2019 Filing 23 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:18-cv-00836. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 4, 2019 Filing 24 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/4/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order Transferring Case to the Northern District of California, San Jose Division.. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 6/3/2019. (SWE)
June 3, 2019 Filing 21 RULING denying #13 Motion for Rule 11 Sanction. Defendants' #11 Motion to Transfer Venue is GRANTED, and this case shall be transferred to District of Northern District of California, San Jose Division. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 6/3/2019. (SWE)
April 9, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Alphabet Inc., Sergey Brin, L. John Doerr, Roger W. Ferguson, Jr, Google LLC, Diane B. Greene, John L. Hennessy, Ann Mather, Alan R. Mulally, Larry Page, Sundar Pichai, Eric E. Schmidt, K. Ram Shriram, XXVI Holdings Inc., YouTube Entertainment Media LLC, YouTube LLC re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, San Jose Division (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Mendez, Andrew)
November 16, 2018 Filing 18 Notice to Counsel: In light of the pending #11 Motion to Transfer Case, good cause is shown to CANCEL the Scheduling Conference set for 11/29/2018. Court court will review this matter in 60 days. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
November 15, 2018 Filing 19 Reply Memorandum in Support of #11 Motion to Transfer Venue, with Supplemental Declaration of Sami Sharaiha & Exs. 2-3 filed by Alphabet Inc., Sergey Brin, L. John Doerr, Roger W. Ferguson, Jr., Google LLC, Diane B. Greene, John L. Hennessy, Ann Mather, Alan R. Mulally, Larry Page, Sundar Pichai, Eric E. Schmidt, K. Ram Shriram, XXVI Holdings Inc., YouTube Entertainment Media LLC, YouTube LLC. (LLH)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue with Supplemental Declaration of Sami Sharaiha & Exs. 2-3 filed by Roger W. Ferguson, Jr., Google LLC, L. John Doerr, XXVI Holdings Inc., Diane B. Greene, Eric E. Schmidt, Larry Page, Alphabet Inc., John L. Hennessy, K. Ram Shriram, YouTube LLC, Sergey Brin, Sundar Pichai, Ann Mather, YouTube Entertainment Media LLC, Alan R. Mulally. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/15/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BKA)
November 5, 2018 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #13 Rule 11 Sanctions filed by All Defendants. (Mendez, Andrew) Modified on 11/6/2018 to edit the text (KAH).
November 5, 2018 Filing 15 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue with Supplemental Declaration of Sami Sharaiha & Exs. 2-3 by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Reply Memorandum and Supplemental Declaration of Sami Sharaiha & Exs. 2-3, #2 Proposed Order)(Mendez, Andrew) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/6/2018) (KAH).
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: In light of the #11 Motion to Transfer Venue, the #12 Consent MOTION to Stay the Court's September 19, 2018 Scheduling Order is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/22/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
October 22, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #11 MOTION to Transfer Case and for Rule 11 Sanctions filed by Yakub Muhammad. (EDC) Modified on 11/6/2018 to change the event type (KAH).
October 22, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 Consent MOTION to Stay the Court's September 19, 2018 Scheduling Order. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
October 19, 2018 Filing 12 Consent MOTION to Stay the Court's September 19, 2018 Scheduling Order by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Mendez, Andrew)
October 19, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, San Jose Division by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Sami Sharaiha)(Mendez, Andrew)
October 1, 2018 Filing 10 Certificate of Compliance for Filing Amended Notice of Removal in State Court by Alphabet Inc., Sergey Brin, L. John Doerr, Roger W. Ferguson, Jr, Google LLC, Diane B. Greene, John L. Hennessy, Ann Mather, Alan R. Mulally, Larry Page, Sundar Pichai, Eric E. Schmidt, K. Ram Shriram, XXVI Holdings Inc., YouTube Entertainment Media LLC, YouTube LLC to 9 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Filing Amended Notice of Removal in State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice Filed in State Court (Amended Notice of Removal))(Mendez, Andrew) Modified on 10/2/2018 to edit text (SGO).
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the R. Doc. #8 Ex Parte Motion to Substitute Amended Notice of Removal filed by all Defendants IS GRANTED. The clerk is directed to file R. Doc. [8-2] in place of R. Doc. #1 , which shall become the operative notice of removal and exhibits in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/28/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
September 28, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Amended Notice of Removal. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SGO)
September 27, 2018 Filing 8 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Amended Notice of Removal by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Amended Notice of Removal with Exhibits A-C)(Mendez, Andrew) Modified on 9/28/2018 to edit text (SGO).
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/29/2018 at 02:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 11/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/19/2018. (SGO)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE AND ORDER: Defendants Larry Page and Google LLC shall have ten (10) days from the date of this Order to file a Motion to Substitute the Notice of Removal with a proposed comprehensive amended Notice of Removal, that includes all of Defendants' numbered allegations, as revised, supplemented, and/or amended, that properly sets forth the citizenship particulars required to establish that the Court has diversity jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332 over the case, or, alternatively, a proposed comprehensive amended Notice of Removal, that includes all of Defendants' numbered allegations, as revised, supplemented, and/or amended, that properly sets forth the basis for this Court's federal question jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1331. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/18/2018. (SGO)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Plead filed by Defendants. All defendants are allowed an extension of 21 days from the time their pleading or response would otherwise be due, through and including October 19, 2018, to plead or otherwise respond in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/17/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 Certificate of Compliance for Filing Notice of Removal in State Court by Alphabet Inc., Sergey Brin, L. John Doerr, Roger W. Ferguson, Jr, Google LLC, Diane B. Greene, John L. Hennessy, Ann Mather, Alan R. Mulally, Larry Page, Sundar Pichai, Eric E. Schmidt, K. Ram Shriram, XXVI Holdings Inc., YouTube Entertainment Media LLC, YouTube LLC to #1 Notice of Removal,, (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice to State Court)(Mendez, Andrew) Modified on 9/13/2018 to edit text (SGO).
September 13, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Pleading in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SGO)
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, XXVI Holdings Inc., YouTube Entertainment Media LLC, YouTube LLC. (Mendez, Andrew)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Pleading in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mendez, Andrew)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Nineteenth Judicial District Court, Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number 672398. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1829477), filed by Roger W. Ferguson, Jr, Larry Page, YouTube LLC, K. Ram Shriram, Eric E. Schmidt, Ann Mather, XXVI Holdings Inc., YouTube Entertainment Media LLC, John L. Hennessy, Diane B. Greene, Alan R. Mulally, Sundar Pichai, Sergey Brin, Google LLC, L. John Doerr, Alphabet Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit State Court Record, #4 Exhibit State Court Record)(Mendez, Andrew) Modified on 10/1/2018 to replace documents as per Order #9 (LLH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muhammad v. YouTube LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphabet Inc.
Represented By: Andrew David Mendez
Represented By: Samuel James Reed Dippo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Page
Represented By: Andrew David Mendez
Represented By: Samuel James Reed Dippo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane B. Greene
Represented By: Andrew David Mendez
Represented By: Samuel James Reed Dippo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube LLC
Represented By: Andrew David Mendez
Represented By: Samuel James Reed Dippo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOOG.O
Represented By: Andrew David Mendez
Represented By: Samuel James Reed Dippo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Mather
Represented By: Andrew David Mendez
Represented By: Samuel James Reed Dippo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger W. Ferguson, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew David Mendez
Represented By: Samuel James Reed Dippo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: k ram shriram
Represented By: Andrew David Mendez
Represented By: Samuel James Reed Dippo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan R. Mulally
Represented By: Andrew David Mendez
Represented By: Samuel James Reed Dippo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergey Brin
Represented By: Andrew David Mendez
Represented By: Samuel James Reed Dippo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XXVI Holdings Inc
Represented By: Andrew David Mendez
Represented By: Samuel James Reed Dippo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John L Hennessy
Represented By: Andrew David Mendez
Represented By: Samuel James Reed Dippo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. John Doerr
Represented By: Andrew David Mendez
Represented By: Samuel James Reed Dippo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric E Schmidt
Represented By: Andrew David Mendez
Represented By: Samuel James Reed Dippo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube Entertainment Media LLC
Represented By: Andrew David Mendez
Represented By: Samuel James Reed Dippo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Andrew David Mendez
Represented By: Samuel James Reed Dippo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sundar Pichai
Represented By: Andrew David Mendez
Represented By: Samuel James Reed Dippo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yakub Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?