Diaz v. City of Santa Clara et al
Plaintiff: Marcus Dean Diaz
Defendant: Paul Garces, Jason D'Amico, City of Santa Clara, Zachary Wicht, Tom Liu, Does 1 through 200, Maximilian Nielepko, Peter Stephens and Anthony Pianto
Case Number: 5:2020cv03506
Filed: May 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to City of Santa Clara, Jason D'Amico, Paul Garces, Tom Liu, Maximilian Nielepko, Anthony Pianto, Peter Stephens, Zachary Wicht. (Attachments: #1 City SC USMS 285, #2 Anthony USMS 285, #3 Jason USMS 285, #4 Maximilion USMS 285, #5 Paul USMS 285, #6 Peter USMS 285, #7 Tom USMS 285', #8 Zackary USMS 285)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Marcus Dean Diaz.. (Lagos, Panos) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons [Proposed] Wicht, #2 Summons [Proposed] Nielepko, #3 Summons [Proposed] D'Amico, #4 Summons [Proposed] Pianto, #5 Summons [Proposed] Stephens, #6 Summons [Proposed] Liu, #7 Summons [Proposed] Garces)(Lagos, Panos) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 2, 2020 #Electronic filing error.proposed Summons not Complete. Please re-file with address of where Marshals are to serve defendants. This filing will not be processed by the clerks of fice.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Marcus Dean Diaz (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis; Screening Complaint and Ordering Service. Re: Dkt. No. #3 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 27, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Plaintiff is requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 6/10/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/19/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2020)
May 26, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/9/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Marcus Dean Diaz. (Lagos, Panos) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Lagos, Panos) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint for Damages, Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants. Filed byMarcus Dean Diaz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lagos, Panos) (Filed on 5/22/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz v. City of Santa Clara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Dean Diaz
Represented By: Panos Lagos
Represented By: Sanjay S. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Garces
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason D'Amico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Clara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Wicht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 200
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maximilian Nielepko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Pianto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?