Hurd v. Giurbino, et al

Case Number: 3:2002cv00460
Filed: March 11, 2002
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2010 218 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Court adopts the Report and Recommendation dated August 31, 2006 in its entirety, grants Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, and Denies Plaintiff's request to amend the Judgment of September 29, 2006.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
August 9, 2010 217 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting Report and Recommendation, Granting Motion for Summary Judgment, and Denying Request to Amend Judgment. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/8/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
July 8, 2010 214 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Request for Additional Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 7/8/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
April 8, 2010 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge and Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Disqualification. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/8/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurd v. Giurbino, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?