Barrett v. Negrete, et al

Case Number: 3:2002cv02210
Filed: November 7, 2002
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 25, 2010 223 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 152 Motion in Limine; granting 153 Motion in Limine; granting 154 Motion in Limine; denying 155 Motion in Limine; denying 156 Motion in Limine; granting 157 Motion in Limine; denying 158 Motion in Limine; granting 159 M otion in Limine; denying 160 Motion in Limine; granting 161 Motion in Limine; denying 162 Motion in Limine; granting 163 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 164 Motion in Limine; granting 165 Motion in Limine; denying 166 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 5/25/2010. (mjj) (jrl).
February 8, 2010 218 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Striking 217 Defendant's Notice of Order. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 2/8/2010.(mjj) (jrl).
November 16, 2009 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 146 Ex Parte Motion to Substitute Estate of Hulda Clark as Defendant. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 11/16/2009. (mjj) (jrl).
May 19, 2009 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff Attorneys' Fees: Plaintiff's request for sanctions is GRANTED. Negrete shall make payment to plaintiff on or before 5/29/2009. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 5/19/2009. (mjj) (jrl).
March 30, 2009 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Imposing Sanctions; Requiring a Proposed Pretrial Order and Setting a Trial Date: IT IS ORDERED rejecting defendants proposed pretrial order filed as an exhibit to Negretes declaration in response to the order to show cause. IT IS FURTHER ORDER ED sanctioning Negrete personally for failing to comply with the Courts Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs unilateral proposed pretrial order is ADOPTED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer within 10 days to prepare a final pretrial order in conformity with this Order. The final pretrial order shall be submitted directly to the Chambers of the undersigned no later than April 30, 2009. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall jointly contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Bencivengo within five days of the filing of this Order to schedule a settlement conference. Jury Trial is set for 11/3/2009 09:00 AM before Judge M. James Lorenz. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/30/2009. (mjj) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrett v. Negrete, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?