-JMA Pham v. Alameida, et al

Petitioner: Duy Pham
Respondent: Edward S Alameida, Jr and R J Ryan
Case Number: 3:2003cv00462
Filed: March 7, 2003
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2013 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Denying Second Amended Petition For Writ Of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 127 ); (2) Denying Request For Discovery; (3) Denying Evidentiary Hearing Request And (4) Granting A Certificate Of Appealability as to claims two and three of the Second Amended Petition and Petitioner's discovery request. The Clerk of the Court shall close this case. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 6/6/2013. (mdc)
March 25, 2011 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Petition and Application to Stay Proceedings Pending Exhaustion of State Court Remedies (Doc. 115 ) is granted. No later than 10 days from the date this Order is filed, Petitioner shall file the p roposed Second Amended Petition which is attached to the Motion. (Doc. 115 -2.) This action is stayed for 90 days from the date this Order is filed. No later than 75 days from the date this Order is filed, Petitioner shall file with this Court a status report regarding Petitioner's efforts to exhaust claims six and seven of the Second Amended Petition. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/25/2011. (mdc) (jrl).
May 28, 2010 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The 107 Report and Recommendation is adopted in part andnot adopted in part. Claim two of the First Amended Petition (Doc. # 21 ) is not procedurally defaulted. To the extent Petitioner contends that claim two encompasses a claim of prosecutorial misconduct related to Dong and Lonnie's alleged romantic interludes in the prosecutor's office, this claim is unexhausted. Petitioner's request for discovery is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 5/28/10. (pdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: -JMA Pham v. Alameida, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Duy Pham
Represented By: Martha McNab Hall(Designation CJA Appointment)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Edward S Alameida, Jr
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R J Ryan
Represented By: Bradley Allen Weinreb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?