Martin v. San Diego County of, et al

Case Number: 3:2003cv01788
Filed: September 10, 2003
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2010 253 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 244 Motion for Judgment NOV, 244 Motion for New Trial and 246 Motion to Set Aside of Clerk's Award and Re-Tax Costs. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 10/4/2010. (jah)
April 20, 2010 207 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 194 Motion in Limine No. 3 to Preclude Defendants from Offering Testimony Regarding Det. Maus's Compliance with County Policy; Granting in Part/Denying in Part Plaintiff's 193 Motion In Limine No. 2 to Preclude Lt. Richardson from Testifying as an Expert Witness. Lt. Richardson's testimony and Pla's cross-examination will be limited as specified. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 4/20/2010. (jah)
August 12, 2009 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 150 Motion for Summary Judgment. Denying Plaintiff's 155 Motion for Summary Adjudication. Court grants Dfts' motion for summary judgment on Pla's claim against the County of San Diego under 42 USC 1983, as well as Pla's claim against Det. Maus and County of San Diego for battery and violation of Cal. Civ. Code 52.1. Court denies Dfts' motion for summary judgment on Pla's claim against Det. Maus under 4 2 1983 and for punitive damages and denies Dft's motion for summary judgment on Pla's claims against Det. Maus and County of San Diego under CA constitution and for common law false arrest/imprisonment and negligence. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2009 04:00 PM in Courtroom C before Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr.. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 8/12/2009. (jah) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. San Diego County of, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?