Jimenez v. Sambrano, et al

Case Number: 3:2004cv01833
Filed: September 13, 2004
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Referring Judge: Peter C. Lewis
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2010 417 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 413 Plaintiff's Motion to Retax Costs: No costs shall be awarded in this case. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 4/29/2010. (mjj)
February 22, 2010 411 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 410 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Review of Bill of Costs by Court. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 2/22/2010. (mjj) (jrl).
January 6, 2010 396 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 386 Motion in Limine and Vacating Hearing Date: The hearing scheduled for 1/11/2010 at 10:30 a.m. is VACATED. Plaintiffs motion to admit evidence of his acquittal is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. However, the motion is GRANTED to the extent that Plaintiff may offer witness testimony stating no more than he was not convicted of any crime arising out of the incident. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 1/5/2010. (mjj) (jrl).
August 6, 2009 348 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Inmate-Witness Isidro Roman, CDCR No. J-41754: Granting 345 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 8/6/2009. (Certified copies to AUSA, USM and Warden) (mjj) (jrl).
July 31, 2009 344 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 282 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Use-of-Force Expert Robert Borg. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/31/2009. (mjj)(jrl).
June 19, 2009 299 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Proposed Amended Pretrial Order: The court will sign the proposed pretrial order the parties submitted for the May 11, 2009 final pretrial conference, which does not include the admissions Defendants withdrew and includes modifications to P laintiffs admissions. If Plaintiff determines he needs to reopen discovery regarding the issues whether he asked for a higher ranking officer and whether his request was denied, Plaintiff must file an ex parte application no later than June 22, 2009. Any such request must include a time estimate for the discovery and state whether Plaintiff also requests a continuance of any dates set in the May 13, 2009 Order Re: Trial. Any opposition shall be filed no later than June 24, 2009. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 6/18/2009. (mjj)(jrl).
April 6, 2009 254 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 239 Motion to Amend Complaint to add a prayer for punitive damages and to dismiss Defendant E. Delgado; and Granting 253 Motion to Supplement Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Opposition to the Motion to Amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 4/6/2009. (mjj) (jrl).
March 12, 2009 244 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 233 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Expert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 3/12/2009. (mjj)(jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jimenez v. Sambrano, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?