Flores, et al v. JC Penney Corp Inc, et al

Case Number: 3:2004cv02337
Filed: November 22, 2004
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2009 254 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 250 Motion to Retax Costs. Court vacates Clerk's Order Taxing Costs in favor of Defendants. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 3/5/2009. (jah) (jrl).
January 21, 2009 245 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 228 Motion for Attorney Fees and Expert Witness Fees. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 1/21/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah)
January 6, 2009 242 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Based upon the jury's response to the special verdict form. Court finds that Pla Antonio Flores is entitled as a matter of law to an award of nominal damages on his claim under 42 USC 1983. Judgment entered in favo r of Antonio Flores against Steven Shephard on claim under 42 USC 1983, and awarded nominal damages in the amount of $1.00. Judgment entered in favor of Defendants on the claims of all remaining Plaintiffs, and judgment entered in favor of Dft City of National City on the claims of Plaintiff Antonio Flores. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah)
January 5, 2009 241 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' 224 Motion to Alter or Amended Judgment. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 1/5/2009. Clerk directed to amend the last sentence of the judgment as follows: "Judgment entered in favor of Defendants on the claims of all remaining Plaintiffs, and judgment entered in favor of Defendant City of National City on the claims of Plaintiff Antonio Flores". Hearing on 1/12/2009 as to this motion only is vacated. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores, et al v. JC Penney Corp Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?