Five Navy Seals, et al v. Associated Press, et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs allege that defendant Seth Hettena, a reporter for defendant Associated Press, took photographs from plaintiff\'s personal digital photo album at smugmug.com without permission. Plaintiffs further allege that defendants published some of these photos, which depicted five Navy SEALs, without concealing the identities of the servicemen.

Plaintiff: Jane Doe and Four Navy Seals
Defendant: Associated Press, Seth Hettena and DOES
Case Number: 3:2005cv00555
Filed: March 21, 2005
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T Miller
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 1, 2005 40
Stipulation for dismissal of the entire case w/ prej and Order by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller : terminating case (tkl)
August 3, 2005 39
Stipulation and Order by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller for extension of time to file amd cmp. Answer ddl extended to 8/29/05 for Seth Hettena, for Associated Press (tkl)
August 1, 2005 38
Stipulation and Order by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller : Answer ddl by 8/29/05 for Seth Hettena, for Associated Press (tkl)
July 12, 2005 37
Order by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller: dft's motion to dismiss [5-1] and to strike [5-2] the privacy claims pursuant to CA of Civil Procedure 425.16 are granted, w/ prej. Dft's mot to compel a more definite stmt of the copyright claim pursuant to FRCP 12(e) is granted. Within 30 days of this order, plas shall file an amened cmp addressing the copyright claim concerns above. (tkl)
June 10, 2005 36
Reply by plaintiff Jane Doe, plaintiff Four Navy Seals to dft's augmentation of record by recent documents; nunc pro tunc 6/8/05 (tkl)
June 1, 2005 34
Notice by defendant Associated Press, defendant Seth Hettena of augmentation of record by recent documents. (tkl)
May 20, 2005 33
Scheduling Order by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller: dft's motion to dismiss first amd cmp [5-1] and motion to strike first amd cmp [5-2] is set for 3:00 6/1/05 before Judge Jeffrey Miller (tkl)
May 12, 2005 32
Order by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller: motion to dismiss first amd cmp [5-1] and motion to strike first amd cmp [5-2] will be held 3:00 5/24/05 before Judge Jeffrey Miller (tkl)
May 4, 2005 31
Objections by plaintiff Jane Doe, plaintiff Four Navy Seals to declaration [29-1] (tkl)
April 29, 2005 30
Declaration of Tracy Gitnick by defendant Associated Press, defendant Seth Hettena re motion reply [27-1] (tkl)
April 26, 2005 26
Document Sealed (pursuant to Court Order) (ksr)
April 25, 2005 23
Proof of service by plaintiff Jane Doe, plaintiff Four Navy Seals (tkl)
April 21, 2005 22
Objections by plaintiff Jane Doe, plaintiff Four Navy Seals to declaration of Seth Hettena in support of dfts' mot to dismiss and strike [8-1] (tkl)
April 14, 2005 11
Return of Service of summons and cmp executed upon defendant Seth Hettena on 4/7/05 (tkl)
April 13, 2005 9
Pro Hac Vice approved on behalf of defendant Associated Press, defendant Seth Hettena for David A Schulz (joeh)
April 8, 2005 8
Declaration of Seth Hettena in support of defendant Associated Press, defendant Seth Hettena re motion to dismiss first amd cmp [5-1], re motion to strike first amd cmp [5-2] (bar)
April 6, 2005 4
Summons issued dkt clerk)
March 21, 2005 2
Summons issued (jrl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Five Navy Seals, et al v. Associated Press, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: James W. Huston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Four Navy Seals
Represented By: James W. Huston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Press
Represented By: Robert G Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth Hettena
Represented By: Robert G Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?