Ford, et al v. Verisign Inc, et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv00819
Filed: April 18, 2005
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T Miller
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2009 385 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for plaintiff Gerald Shuck's substitution of attorney 381 . Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 9/10/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
May 22, 2009 364 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 5/22/09. The motion to dismiss the RICO claim against all Defendants is granted. AT&T's motion to strike class allegations and compel arbitration is denied as prematurely filed and the court defers ruli ng on the motion until the class certification hearing date. Wireless Providers' motion to dismiss the UCL, FAL, and CLRA claims is granted with respect to the alleged deceptive marketing claims. Wireless Providers' motion to dismiss the F AL claim is granted with respect to the alleged false billing claim; and T-Mobiles motion to dismiss is denied. The court also grants all motions without leave to amend and requires all Defendants to file answers within 15 days of entry of this order.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
March 13, 2009 362 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 349 application to modify court order dated March 4, 2009. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 3/13/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
February 12, 2009 334 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 333 T-Mobile's application for leave to file revised memorandum in support of motion to dismiss first amended coordinated complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 2/12/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl)
February 2, 2009 317 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 2/2/09. The court grants in part and denies in part Plaintiff's motion to alter or amend the Order. The court grants the motion to compel arbitration and instructs the Clerk of Court to refer Harmon v. VeriSign, Inc., et al., No. 06 C0926, filed on January 16, 2006 in Cook County Circuit Court in Illinois and subsequently removed to the Northern District of Illinois, to the Panel on Multidistrict Litigation for remand to the Northern District of Illinois. Docket sheet; Order 316 305 and copy of this Order mailed to Clerk of the Panel, Washington, D.C per Chambers 2/3/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford, et al v. Verisign Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?