In Re: National Western, et al v. , et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv01018
Filed: May 11, 2005
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T Miller
Referring Judge: Leo S. Papas
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2013 394 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 387 Defendant's Motion to Decertify Class. The hearing on National Western's Motion, currently set for February 15, 2013, is Vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/14/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)(jrd)
February 10, 2012 327 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 241 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 274 Motion to Exclude the Declaration of Craig Merrill. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 2/10/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
May 25, 2011 278 Opinion or Order of the Court Fifth Amended Case Management Conference Order Regulating Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings and Order granting 277 Joint Motion to Take Deposition. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 11/14/2011. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/2/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 05/25/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
April 6, 2011 262 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Discovery Dispute Regarding Taking of Apex Depositions re 252 Transcript, 251 Discovery Hearing, 259 Response to Declarations, 254 Declaration, 250 Notice, 249 Notice, 253 Declaration, 261 Notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 04/06/2011.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajf) Modified text on 4/6/2011 (cge).
January 19, 2011 229 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling in Part and Sustaining in Part 224 Plaintiff's Limited Objections: Plaintiffs' objections regarding the number of depositions and the allocation of examination time during depositions are overruled. In light of the partie s' agreement, Plaintiffs' objections regarding the deponent selection procedure are sustained, subject to requirements discussed supra. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/19/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
November 19, 2010 221 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended ORDER on 216 Joint Hearing Statement on Discovery Dispute Granting National Western's Request to Take Limited Depositions of Absent Class Members: The Court grants National Western's request subject to limitations. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 11/19/10.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt) (cap).
July 12, 2010 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 177 Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Class Certification: The renewed motion for class certification is granted in part and denied in part and the National RICO Class is certified in full and the California Class is certified as to all calims except breach of fiduciary duty. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/12/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: National Western, et al v. , et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?