USA v. 32.42 Acres of Land, et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv01137
Filed: May 31, 2005
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Presiding Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 40:258(a) Public Buildings & Property: Land Condemnation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2010 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Interest Calculation re 115 Motion. The Court does not find the DT Act rate unreasonable or constitutionally inadequate. The parties shall submit a proposed Final Judgment, in accordance with this Order, on or before August 20, 2010. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/5/10. (lao)
December 14, 2009 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Denying Defendant's Motion that valuation be based on Plaintiff being responsible for demolition; and (2) Granting Defendant's Motion to Exclude evidence of property tax effects re 56 , 57 . Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/14/09. (lao) (jrl).
August 6, 2009 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Determining Whether Valuation Of Condemned Land May Be Based On The Difference Between The Unrestricted Fee And Restricted Leasehold Values (Re Doc. 49 ): A valuation of the Port's interest that is based on the difference between the subject property's unrestricted fee value and United States' leasehold value is not a reliable method under Fed. R. Evid. 702, and is therefore not admissible at trial. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/6/2009. (mdc) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. 32.42 Acres of Land, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?