Amalgamated Transit, et al v. Laidlaw Transit, et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv01199
Filed: June 9, 2005
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 11, 2010 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 186 Motion to Certify Class. Court finds that Plaintiffs' UCL class claims against First Transit are not barred by the statute of limitations because they were timely when filed. Court declines to exercise its discretion to either amend the prior class certification order or certify new class. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 2/11/2010. (jah)(jrl).
August 10, 2009 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 159 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 160 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court: 1.) denies Laidlaw's motion and Plaintiffs' motion regarding me al break claims, 2.) denies Laidlaw's motion and Plaintiffs' motion regarding rest period claims, 3.) grants Laidlaw's motion w/ respect to CA Labor Code 203 waiting time penalties and denies Plaintiffs' cross-motion on waiting time penalties, 4.) grants Laidlaw's motion regarding the civil penalties and denies Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment regarding the civil penalties. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 8/10/2009. (jah) (kaj).
February 2, 2009 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff Amalgamated Transit's 136 Motion to Certify Class. Court designates plaintiff class representative, certifies the class, and appoints Neyhart, Anderson, Flynn and Grosboll class counsel. Class counsel is ordered to provide Court w/ a proposed class notice w/in 15 days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 2/2/2009. (jah) Modified on 2/2/2009 - Edited text (jah).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amalgamated Transit, et al v. Laidlaw Transit, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?