Antoninetti v. Chipotle Mexican, et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv01660
Filed: August 22, 2005
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Presiding Judge: Napoleon A. Jones
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2012 377 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 364 Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Other Expenses: Plaintiff is awarded $484,240.00 in fees for work performed by Ms Vandeveld, $32,945.00 in fees for work performe d by Mr. Ferleger, $1908.75 in copy costs associated with Plaintiffs opposition to the petition for certiorari, $6,690.55 in "costs," and $19,294.75 in "litigation expenses", for a total award of $545,079.05. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 7/17/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (rlu)
March 21, 2012 360 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Judgment is in favor of Plaintiff and against the Defendant in the amount of $5,000 in damages. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (ecs)
May 15, 2009 304 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 295 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Napoleon A. Jones, Jr on 05/15/09. (bjb) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antoninetti v. Chipotle Mexican, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?