Ybarrondo v. NCO Financial Sys, et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv02057
Filed: November 3, 2005
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 28, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 34 Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement: This action is certified as a class action and the Second Amended Class Action Settlement Agreement (Settlement) is approved as fundamentally fair, adequate, and reasonable. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 10/28/2009. (mjj) (kaj).
June 30, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 31 Joint Motion for Final Approval of Settlement: The motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and the hearing set for July 6, 2009 is VACATED. No later than October 9, 2009, the parties shall file a motion or joint motion for final settlement approval. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 6/30/2009. (mjj)(jrl).
March 4, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 29 Joint Motion for Certification of a Settlement Class, Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement Agreement, and Approving Notice to the Class With Modifications. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/4/2009. (mjj) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ybarrondo v. NCO Financial Sys, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?