Latimer v. SD Cty Government, et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv02090
Filed: November 9, 2005
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T Miller
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 12, 2010 132 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED CLERK'S JUDGMENT - the court grants summary judgment in favor of Defendant Orr and against Plaintiff Latimer. As all claims against all parties have now been adjudicated in favor of all Defendants and against Plaintiff, the Clerk of Court is instructed to enter final judgment in the case and to close the file.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (Main Document 132 replaced and regenerated NEF on 5/12/2010) (tkl).
May 11, 2010 131 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT - the court grants summary judgment in favor of Defendant Orr and against Plaintiff Latimer. As all claimsagainst all parties have now been adjudicated in favor of all Defendants and against Plaintiff.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)
May 10, 2010 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 127 Motion for summary judgment in favor of Defendant Orr and against Plaintiff Latimer. As all claims against all parties have now been adjudicated in favor of all Defendants and against Plaintiff, the Clerk of Court is instructed to enter final judgment in the case and to close the file. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 5/10/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)
November 23, 2009 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 119 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 11/23/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (jrl).
August 28, 2009 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 100 Defendant's motion to dismiss. The court grants the motion to dismiss of Defendants Runyen, Goldstein and Garcia but denies the motion to dismiss of Defendant Orr. Defendant Orr is instructed to file an answer within 15 days of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 8/28/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
July 27, 2009 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 99 Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Compelling Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 7/24/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (jrl).
January 5, 2009 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/4/2009. Court construes Plaintiff's Notice that the Fourth Amended Complaint my be filed 10 days late, as a Motion for Enlargement of Time. Court grants Pla lave to file Fourth Amended Complaint by 1/16/2009. (Notice not on the docket) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Latimer v. SD Cty Government, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?