Ruiz v. Affinity Logistics

Case Number: 3:2005cv02125
Filed: November 14, 2005
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: John S. Rhoades
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2017 374 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 310 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Witness filed by XPO Last Mile, Inc. Having considered the parties' arguments and the law, the Court denies defendant's Motion. It is ordered that the Court is s atisfied that at this time Plaintiff's Expert should not be barred from testifying pursuant to any of defendant's asserted grounds. Accordingly, Defendant's Motion to Exclude is denied. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/23/2017.(dxj)
April 20, 2017 366 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 352 Ex Parte Motion to File Sur-Reply And 328 Motion for Attorneys' Fees And Costs. It is ordered that plaintiffs' counsel are awarded $21,967.50 in attorney fees. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/20/2017. (dxj)
December 19, 2016 321 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 301 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/19/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kcm)
August 27, 2012 216 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Following Remand Finding Plaintiff and Absent Class Members Properly Classified as Independent Contractors. The Court Finds in Favor of Defendant. The clerk shall close the file.Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/27/2012.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao)
March 22, 2010 187 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment is in favor of Affinity Logistics Corporation.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mkz) (av1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruiz v. Affinity Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?