Love v. Scribner

Case Number: 3:2006cv00640
Filed: March 22, 2006
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner's 64 Application for a Certificate of Appealability is GRANTED. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/18/2010. (USCA Case No. 10-55387. Order electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals.) (akr)
February 18, 2010 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (Doc. 55 ) is adopted in its entirety, except for the following two amendments: (1) Page 6, line 26 is stricken in its entirety and replaced with, "'20'. Baker responded, &# 039;20 indeterminate life sentence.'" (2) On page 7, line 4, "Lovecchino" is stricken and replaced with "Lovecchio". The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 1 ) will be granted, unless the State of California grants Petitioner a new trial no later than 180 days from the date of this Order. The parties shall file a joint status report no later than 180 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 2/18/2010. (mdc)(mam).
November 30, 2009 55 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Granting Petition For Writ Of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 1 ) And ORDER Granting Respondent's Motion To Strike Exhibit B: Objections to R&R due by 12/18/2009. Replies due by 1/8/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 11/30/2009. (mdc) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Love v. Scribner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?