Bovarie v. Woodford, et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv00687
Filed: November 9, 2006
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2011 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff Request for Service of Subpoena by the U.S. Marshal: The Clerk of Court shall issue and forward to Plaintiff a Subpoena in a Civil Case form in blank and a U.S. Marshal 285 form in blank as well as a copy of this Order. Upon receipt of the properly completed U.S. Marshal 285 form and accompanying subpoena, the U.S. Marshal is directed to promptly effect service of Plaintiff's subpoena. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 5/18/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cc: USM) (forms sent to Plaintiff)(lmt)(jrd)
October 4, 2010 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 128 Plaintiff's Request for "Funds to Acquire Expert Witness". Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 10/4/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)(date verified w/chambers) (cap).
March 1, 2010 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Sustaining in Part and Overruling in Part Plaintiff's 115 Objection to Defendant's R&R; Overruling Plaintiff's 120 Objection to Smelosky R&R; Adopting in Part and Rejecting in Part Defendants 112 R&R; Adopting Smelosky [114 ] R&R; and Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' and Defendant Smelosky's 100 , 113 Motions to Dismiss: Defendants are Ordered to file an Answer to the remaining claims in the Fourth Amended Complaint within 20 days of the Order being electronically docketed. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/1/10.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mkz) (jrl).
November 17, 2009 114 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant Smelosky's 113 Motion to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint: Objections to R&R due by 12/8/2009, Replies due by 12/18/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 11/17/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mkz) (jrl).
October 22, 2009 112 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' 100 Motion to Dismiss the 98 Fourth Amended Complaint: Objections to R&R due by 11/13/2009, Replies due by 11/23/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 10/22/09. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mkz) (jrl).
November 9, 2006 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, granting 10 Motion for leave to file second amended complaint, denying 12, 13, 14 Motion for appointment of paralegal . Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 11/08/06. (joeh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bovarie v. Woodford, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?