RPA Intl Pty Ltd, et al v. Compact Intl Inc, et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv01147
Filed: May 26, 2006
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2011 193 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 186 ) Motion for Relief From and/or to Alter, Amend, and/or Vacate Default Judgment filed by Defendants Lee Johnson and Compact International, Inc. is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 9/21/2011. (mdc)
February 7, 2011 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 177 ) Motion for Reconsideration filed by Defendant Kok Cheong Soo is denied. The (Doc. 175 ) Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiffs is granted. Plaintiffs are entitled to an award of $321,347.44 in attorneys' fees. The (Doc. 179 ) Motion to Enter Judgment filed by Plaintiffs is granted. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 2/7/2011. (mdc)
August 11, 2010 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiffs' (Doc. 172 ) Motion Seeking Entry of Money Judgments and a Permanent Injunction or Alternatively Partial Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) Including a Permanent Injunction is granted in part and denied in part. The motion is den ied as to attorney's fees from BZ Global Sdn Bhd and BZ Global HK Limited and otherwise granted. Plaintiffs are awarded damages against Compact International in the amount of $51,205 and against Kok Cheong Soo in the amount of $1,743,000. No later than 21 days from the date of this Order, Plaintiffs shall file a motion for the specific amount of attorney's fees which it is seeking in this matter. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/11/2010. (mdc)
March 10, 2010 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant Kok Cheong Soo's (Doc. 163 ) Motion for Reconsideration is denied. The judgment entered 7/16/2009 (Doc. 150 ) is vacated. Plaintiffs' (Doc. 151 ) Motion to Revise the Court's Summary Judgment Order and to Enter a Pe rmanent Injunction is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs' Motion to Revise the Court's Summary Judgment Order is granted. The Court vacates the portion of the order at page 13, lines 25-26 which directs the Clerk of the Court to enter judgment. Plaintiff's Motion to Enter a Permanent Injunction is denied without prejudice. The parties shall file any further motions within 60 days of the date of this order. The Court will set a pretrial conference date thereafter. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/10/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc) (jrl).
July 14, 2009 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 143 ) is granted. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to enter summary judgment in favor of Plaintiffs and against Kok Cheong Soo on Count III of the Complaint for infringement of the '1 13 patent; and on counterclaims one, two, three, four, five and nine of the Counterclaim filed by Kok Cheong Soo. The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over counterclaims six, seven, eight, ten and eleven of the Counterclaim filed by Kok Cheong Soo. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 7/14/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
February 18, 2009 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Ex Parte Motion for Permission to File Documents under Seal (Doc. 120 ) is denied. The Clerk of the Court shall return the documents submitted with this Ex Parte Motion to the Plaintiff. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 2/18/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RPA Intl Pty Ltd, et al v. Compact Intl Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?